Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2372163

EP2372163 - Fan [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  22.12.2016
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip29.05.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
29.05.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Convotherm Elektrogeräte GmbH
Talstrasse 35
82436 Eglfing / DE
[2011/40]
Inventor(s)01 / Riefenstein, Lutz
Parchetwiesen 18
82362 Weilheim / DE
02 / Smits, Stan
Oderdingerstrasse 23
82362 Weilheim / DE
03 / Wurdinger, Günther
Haimhausenstrasse 34
82380 Peissenberg / DE
04 / Lang, Thomas
Birkenstrasse 15
82377 Penzberg / DE
05 / Lammerskitten, Rainer
Talstrasse 28
82436 Eglfing / DE
06 / Berchtenbreiter, Andreas
Perlacher Strasse 20
82418 Riegsee-Hagen / DE
 [2011/40]
Representative(s)Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Pilgersheimer Straße 20
81543 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/41]Schmitz, Hans-Werner
Hoefer & Partner
Patentanwälte
Pilgersheimer Strasse 20
81543 München / DE
Former [2011/40]Schmitz, Hans-Werner
Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte Pilgersheimer Strasse 20
81543 München / DE
Application number, filing date10003653.201.04.2010
[2011/40]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2372163
Date:05.10.2011
Language:DE
[2011/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2372163
Date:08.10.2014
Language:DE
[2014/41]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.09.2010
ClassificationInternational:F04D29/28
[2011/40]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2011/40]
TitleGerman:Lüfterrad[2011/40]
English:Fan[2011/40]
French:Roue de ventilateur[2011/40]
Examination procedure01.03.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.03.2012Examination requested  [2012/15]
14.06.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.10.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.06.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.10.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.04.2014Date of oral proceedings
24.04.2014Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
30.04.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.08.2014Fee for grant paid
25.08.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
25.08.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  14.06.2012
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  07.07.2015   
Rational AG
Iglinger Strasse 62
86899 Landsberg/Lech / DE
Opponent's representative
Weber-Bruls, Dorothée
Jones Day
Nextower
Thurn-und-Taxis-Platz 6
60313 Frankfurt am Main / DE
 [2015/33]
14.08.2015Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
16.12.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
05.12.2016Date of oral proceedings
23.12.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
23.12.2016Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition16.01.2017Appeal received No.  T0122/17
27.04.2017Statement of grounds filed
10.02.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.06.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
27.09.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
28.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.201203   M06   Fee paid on   26.06.2012
30.04.201304   M06   Fee paid on   27.09.2013
30.04.201405   M06   Fee paid on   28.07.2014
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU01.04.2010
BG08.10.2014
CY08.10.2014
CZ08.10.2014
DK08.10.2014
EE08.10.2014
ES08.10.2014
FI08.10.2014
HR08.10.2014
LT08.10.2014
LV08.10.2014
MC08.10.2014
MK08.10.2014
MT08.10.2014
NL08.10.2014
PL08.10.2014
RO08.10.2014
SE08.10.2014
SI08.10.2014
SK08.10.2014
SM08.10.2014
TR08.10.2014
NO08.01.2015
GR09.01.2015
IS08.02.2015
PT09.02.2015
AT01.04.2015
GB01.04.2015
IE01.04.2015
LU01.04.2015
BE30.04.2015
CH30.04.2015
FR30.04.2015
LI30.04.2015
[2018/30]
Former [2017/38]HU01.04.2010
BG08.10.2014
CY08.10.2014
CZ08.10.2014
DK08.10.2014
EE08.10.2014
ES08.10.2014
FI08.10.2014
HR08.10.2014
LT08.10.2014
LV08.10.2014
MC08.10.2014
MT08.10.2014
NL08.10.2014
PL08.10.2014
RO08.10.2014
SE08.10.2014
SI08.10.2014
SK08.10.2014
SM08.10.2014
TR08.10.2014
NO08.01.2015
GR09.01.2015
IS08.02.2015
PT09.02.2015
AT01.04.2015
GB01.04.2015
IE01.04.2015
LU01.04.2015
BE30.04.2015
CH30.04.2015
FR30.04.2015
LI30.04.2015
Former [2017/03]CY08.10.2014
CZ08.10.2014
DK08.10.2014
EE08.10.2014
ES08.10.2014
FI08.10.2014
HR08.10.2014
LT08.10.2014
LV08.10.2014
MC08.10.2014
MT08.10.2014
NL08.10.2014
PL08.10.2014
RO08.10.2014
SE08.10.2014
SI08.10.2014
SK08.10.2014
NO08.01.2015
GR09.01.2015
IS08.02.2015
PT09.02.2015
AT01.04.2015
GB01.04.2015
IE01.04.2015
LU01.04.2015
CH30.04.2015
FR30.04.2015
LI30.04.2015
Former [2016/36]CY08.10.2014
CZ08.10.2014
DK08.10.2014
EE08.10.2014
ES08.10.2014
FI08.10.2014
HR08.10.2014
LT08.10.2014
LV08.10.2014
MC08.10.2014
NL08.10.2014
PL08.10.2014
RO08.10.2014
SE08.10.2014
SI08.10.2014
SK08.10.2014
NO08.01.2015
GR09.01.2015
IS08.02.2015
PT09.02.2015
AT01.04.2015
GB01.04.2015
IE01.04.2015
LU01.04.2015
CH30.04.2015
FR30.04.2015
LI30.04.2015
Former [2016/20]CY08.10.2014
CZ08.10.2014
DK08.10.2014
EE08.10.2014
ES08.10.2014
FI08.10.2014
HR08.10.2014
LT08.10.2014
LV08.10.2014
MC08.10.2014
NL08.10.2014
PL08.10.2014
RO08.10.2014
SE08.10.2014
SI08.10.2014
SK08.10.2014
NO08.01.2015
GR09.01.2015
IS08.02.2015
PT09.02.2015
GB01.04.2015
IE01.04.2015
LU01.04.2015
CH30.04.2015
FR30.04.2015
LI30.04.2015
Former [2016/12]CY08.10.2014
CZ08.10.2014
DK08.10.2014
EE08.10.2014
ES08.10.2014
FI08.10.2014
HR08.10.2014
LT08.10.2014
LV08.10.2014
MC08.10.2014
NL08.10.2014
PL08.10.2014
RO08.10.2014
SE08.10.2014
SI08.10.2014
SK08.10.2014
NO08.01.2015
GR09.01.2015
IS08.02.2015
PT09.02.2015
GB01.04.2015
LU01.04.2015
CH30.04.2015
FR30.04.2015
LI30.04.2015
Former [2016/07]CY08.10.2014
CZ08.10.2014
DK08.10.2014
EE08.10.2014
ES08.10.2014
FI08.10.2014
HR08.10.2014
LT08.10.2014
LV08.10.2014
MC08.10.2014
NL08.10.2014
PL08.10.2014
RO08.10.2014
SE08.10.2014
SK08.10.2014
NO08.01.2015
GR09.01.2015
IS08.02.2015
PT09.02.2015
GB01.04.2015
LU01.04.2015
CH30.04.2015
LI30.04.2015
Former [2016/06]CY08.10.2014
CZ08.10.2014
DK08.10.2014
EE08.10.2014
ES08.10.2014
FI08.10.2014
HR08.10.2014
LT08.10.2014
LV08.10.2014
MC08.10.2014
NL08.10.2014
PL08.10.2014
RO08.10.2014
SE08.10.2014
SK08.10.2014
NO08.01.2015
GR09.01.2015
IS08.02.2015
PT09.02.2015
LU01.04.2015
CH30.04.2015
LI30.04.2015
Former [2016/01]CY08.10.2014
CZ08.10.2014
DK08.10.2014
EE08.10.2014
ES08.10.2014
FI08.10.2014
HR08.10.2014
LT08.10.2014
LV08.10.2014
MC08.10.2014
NL08.10.2014
PL08.10.2014
RO08.10.2014
SE08.10.2014
SK08.10.2014
NO08.01.2015
GR09.01.2015
IS08.02.2015
PT09.02.2015
LU01.04.2015
Former [2015/52]CY08.10.2014
CZ08.10.2014
DK08.10.2014
EE08.10.2014
ES08.10.2014
FI08.10.2014
HR08.10.2014
LT08.10.2014
LV08.10.2014
NL08.10.2014
PL08.10.2014
RO08.10.2014
SE08.10.2014
SK08.10.2014
NO08.01.2015
GR09.01.2015
IS08.02.2015
PT09.02.2015
LU01.04.2015
Former [2015/37]CY08.10.2014
CZ08.10.2014
DK08.10.2014
EE08.10.2014
ES08.10.2014
FI08.10.2014
HR08.10.2014
LT08.10.2014
LV08.10.2014
NL08.10.2014
PL08.10.2014
RO08.10.2014
SE08.10.2014
SK08.10.2014
NO08.01.2015
GR09.01.2015
IS08.02.2015
PT09.02.2015
Former [2015/36]CY08.10.2014
CZ08.10.2014
DK08.10.2014
EE08.10.2014
ES08.10.2014
FI08.10.2014
HR08.10.2014
LT08.10.2014
LV08.10.2014
NL08.10.2014
PL08.10.2014
RO08.10.2014
SE08.10.2014
NO08.01.2015
GR09.01.2015
IS08.02.2015
PT09.02.2015
Former [2015/35]CY08.10.2014
DK08.10.2014
EE08.10.2014
ES08.10.2014
FI08.10.2014
HR08.10.2014
LT08.10.2014
LV08.10.2014
NL08.10.2014
PL08.10.2014
SE08.10.2014
NO08.01.2015
GR09.01.2015
IS08.02.2015
PT09.02.2015
Former [2015/26]CY08.10.2014
ES08.10.2014
FI08.10.2014
HR08.10.2014
LT08.10.2014
LV08.10.2014
NL08.10.2014
PL08.10.2014
SE08.10.2014
NO08.01.2015
GR09.01.2015
IS08.02.2015
PT09.02.2015
Former [2015/24]ES08.10.2014
FI08.10.2014
HR08.10.2014
LT08.10.2014
LV08.10.2014
NL08.10.2014
PL08.10.2014
SE08.10.2014
NO08.01.2015
GR09.01.2015
IS08.02.2015
PT09.02.2015
Former [2015/23]ES08.10.2014
FI08.10.2014
LT08.10.2014
NL08.10.2014
NO08.01.2015
IS08.02.2015
PT09.02.2015
Former [2015/22]LT08.10.2014
NL08.10.2014
NO08.01.2015
PT09.02.2015
Former [2015/21]LT08.10.2014
NL08.10.2014
NO08.01.2015
Former [2015/20]LT08.10.2014
NL08.10.2014
Former [2015/16]NL08.10.2014
Documents cited:Search[IY]DE102005047457  (WSS GMBH [DE]) [I] 1-6,8,9,11-14 * paragraph [0043]; figure 13 * [Y] 7,10;
 [YD]DE10315341  (NEUBAUER KURT MKN MASCHF [DE]) [YD] 7 * figure 4 *;
 [Y]FR1058628  (BABCOCK & WILCOX FRANCE) [Y] 10 * page 2, column 1, lines 11-17; figures 1,2 *
ExaminationFR1058690
by applicantEP1530682
 DE10239246
 DE10315341
 DE10234214
 EP0615069