Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2377563

EP2377563 - Dialysis apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2011/42]Dialysis apparatus and method for controlling a dialysis apparatus
[2012/04]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  27.04.2012
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip10.12.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
10.12.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Gambro Lundia AB
P.O. Box 10101
220 10 Lund / SE
[2011/42]
Inventor(s)01 / Vantard, Georges
No. 33, rue de la Noyera
Cedex 342bis
38090 Villefontaine / FR
02 / Bene, Bernard
No. 35, rue de la Visina
69540 Irigny / FR
 [2011/42]
Representative(s)Ponzellini, Gianmarco , et al
PGA S.P.A., Milano
Succursale di Lugano
Viale Castagnola, 21c
6900 Lugano / CH
[N/P]
Former [2014/13]Ponzellini, Gianmarco , et al
Ponzellini, Gioia e Associati S.r.l. Via Mascheroni, 31
20145 Milano / IT
Former [2011/42]Ponzellini, Gianmarco
Gambro Legal and Intellectual Property Dept. P.O. Box 98
41037 Mirandola / IT
Application number, filing date10004110.219.04.2010
[2011/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2377563
Date:19.10.2011
Language:EN
[2011/42]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2377563
Date:30.05.2012
Language:EN
[2012/22]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.10.2010
ClassificationInternational:A61M1/16
[2011/42]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2011/42]
TitleGerman:Dialysegerät und Verfahren zur Steuerung eines Dialysegeräts[2015/11]
English:Dialysis apparatus[2012/04]
French:Appareil de dialyse et procédé de contrôle d'un appareil de dialyse[2015/11]
Former [2011/42]Dialysegerät und Verfahren zur Steuerung eines Dialysegeräts
Former [2011/42]Dialysis apparatus and method for controlling a dialysis apparatus
Former [2011/42]Appareil de dialyse et procédé de contrôle d'un appareil de dialyse
Examination procedure04.10.2011Examination requested  [2011/46]
04.11.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
30.12.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.04.2012Fee for grant paid
05.04.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  30.12.2011
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  28.02.2013   
Fresenius Medical Care Deutschland GmbH
Else-Kröner-Strasse 1
61352 Bad Homburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Herrmann, Uwe, et al
Lorenz Seidler Gossel
Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte
Partnerschaft mbB
Widenmayerstraße 23
80538 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2013/15]
Opponent(s)01  28.02.2013   
Fresenius Medical Care Deutschland GmbH
Else-Kröner-Strasse 1
61352 Bad Homburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Herrmann, Uwe, et al
Lorenz - Seidler - Gossel
Widenmayerstrasse 23
D-80538 München / DE
09.04.2013Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
18.10.2013Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
28.01.2015Date of oral proceedings
16.04.2015Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
16.04.2015Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition16.06.2015Appeal received No.  T1191/15
26.08.2015Statement of grounds filed
11.06.2015Appeal received No.  T1191/15
26.08.2015Statement of grounds filed
21.02.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU19.04.2010
AT30.05.2012
BE30.05.2012
CY30.05.2012
CZ30.05.2012
DK30.05.2012
EE30.05.2012
FI30.05.2012
HR30.05.2012
LT30.05.2012
LV30.05.2012
MC30.05.2012
MK30.05.2012
MT30.05.2012
NL30.05.2012
PL30.05.2012
RO30.05.2012
SE30.05.2012
SI30.05.2012
SK30.05.2012
SM30.05.2012
TR30.05.2012
BG30.08.2012
NO30.08.2012
GR31.08.2012
IS30.09.2012
PT01.10.2012
IE19.04.2013
LU19.04.2013
CH30.04.2014
LI30.04.2014
[2015/34]
Former [2015/32]AT30.05.2012
BE30.05.2012
CY30.05.2012
CZ30.05.2012
DK30.05.2012
EE30.05.2012
FI30.05.2012
HR30.05.2012
LT30.05.2012
LV30.05.2012
MC30.05.2012
MK30.05.2012
MT30.05.2012
NL30.05.2012
PL30.05.2012
RO30.05.2012
SE30.05.2012
SI30.05.2012
SK30.05.2012
SM30.05.2012
TR30.05.2012
BG30.08.2012
NO30.08.2012
GR31.08.2012
IS30.09.2012
PT01.10.2012
IE19.04.2013
CH30.04.2014
LI30.04.2014
Former [2015/24]AT30.05.2012
BE30.05.2012
CY30.05.2012
CZ30.05.2012
DK30.05.2012
EE30.05.2012
FI30.05.2012
HR30.05.2012
LT30.05.2012
LV30.05.2012
MC30.05.2012
MT30.05.2012
NL30.05.2012
PL30.05.2012
RO30.05.2012
SE30.05.2012
SI30.05.2012
SK30.05.2012
SM30.05.2012
BG30.08.2012
NO30.08.2012
GR31.08.2012
IS30.09.2012
PT01.10.2012
IE19.04.2013
CH30.04.2014
LI30.04.2014
Former [2015/13]AT30.05.2012
BE30.05.2012
CY30.05.2012
CZ30.05.2012
DK30.05.2012
EE30.05.2012
FI30.05.2012
HR30.05.2012
LT30.05.2012
LV30.05.2012
MC30.05.2012
MT30.05.2012
NL30.05.2012
PL30.05.2012
RO30.05.2012
SE30.05.2012
SI30.05.2012
SK30.05.2012
BG30.08.2012
NO30.08.2012
GR31.08.2012
IS30.09.2012
PT01.10.2012
IE19.04.2013
CH30.04.2014
LI30.04.2014
Former [2015/08]AT30.05.2012
BE30.05.2012
CY30.05.2012
CZ30.05.2012
DK30.05.2012
EE30.05.2012
FI30.05.2012
HR30.05.2012
LT30.05.2012
LV30.05.2012
MC30.05.2012
NL30.05.2012
PL30.05.2012
RO30.05.2012
SE30.05.2012
SI30.05.2012
SK30.05.2012
BG30.08.2012
NO30.08.2012
GR31.08.2012
IS30.09.2012
PT01.10.2012
IE19.04.2013
CH30.04.2014
LI30.04.2014
Former [2014/20]AT30.05.2012
BE30.05.2012
CY30.05.2012
CZ30.05.2012
DK30.05.2012
EE30.05.2012
FI30.05.2012
HR30.05.2012
LT30.05.2012
LV30.05.2012
MC30.05.2012
NL30.05.2012
PL30.05.2012
RO30.05.2012
SE30.05.2012
SI30.05.2012
SK30.05.2012
BG30.08.2012
NO30.08.2012
GR31.08.2012
IS30.09.2012
PT01.10.2012
IE19.04.2013
Former [2014/01]AT30.05.2012
BE30.05.2012
CY30.05.2012
CZ30.05.2012
DK30.05.2012
EE30.05.2012
FI30.05.2012
HR30.05.2012
LT30.05.2012
LV30.05.2012
MC30.05.2012
NL30.05.2012
PL30.05.2012
RO30.05.2012
SE30.05.2012
SI30.05.2012
SK30.05.2012
BG30.08.2012
NO30.08.2012
GR31.08.2012
IS30.09.2012
PT01.10.2012
Former [2013/34]AT30.05.2012
BE30.05.2012
CY30.05.2012
CZ30.05.2012
DK30.05.2012
EE30.05.2012
FI30.05.2012
HR30.05.2012
LT30.05.2012
LV30.05.2012
NL30.05.2012
PL30.05.2012
RO30.05.2012
SE30.05.2012
SI30.05.2012
SK30.05.2012
BG30.08.2012
NO30.08.2012
GR31.08.2012
IS30.09.2012
PT01.10.2012
Former [2013/13]AT30.05.2012
BE30.05.2012
CY30.05.2012
CZ30.05.2012
DK30.05.2012
EE30.05.2012
FI30.05.2012
HR30.05.2012
LT30.05.2012
LV30.05.2012
NL30.05.2012
PL30.05.2012
RO30.05.2012
SE30.05.2012
SI30.05.2012
SK30.05.2012
NO30.08.2012
GR31.08.2012
IS30.09.2012
PT01.10.2012
Former [2013/11]AT30.05.2012
BE30.05.2012
CY30.05.2012
CZ30.05.2012
DK30.05.2012
EE30.05.2012
FI30.05.2012
HR30.05.2012
LT30.05.2012
LV30.05.2012
NL30.05.2012
PL30.05.2012
RO30.05.2012
SE30.05.2012
SI30.05.2012
SK30.05.2012
NO30.08.2012
GR31.08.2012
IS30.09.2012
Former [2013/10]AT30.05.2012
BE30.05.2012
CY30.05.2012
CZ30.05.2012
DK30.05.2012
EE30.05.2012
FI30.05.2012
HR30.05.2012
LT30.05.2012
LV30.05.2012
NL30.05.2012
RO30.05.2012
SE30.05.2012
SI30.05.2012
SK30.05.2012
NO30.08.2012
GR31.08.2012
IS30.09.2012
Former [2013/09]AT30.05.2012
BE30.05.2012
CY30.05.2012
DK30.05.2012
EE30.05.2012
FI30.05.2012
HR30.05.2012
LT30.05.2012
LV30.05.2012
NL30.05.2012
SE30.05.2012
SI30.05.2012
NO30.08.2012
GR31.08.2012
IS30.09.2012
Former [2013/08]AT30.05.2012
BE30.05.2012
CY30.05.2012
DK30.05.2012
FI30.05.2012
HR30.05.2012
LT30.05.2012
LV30.05.2012
NL30.05.2012
SE30.05.2012
SI30.05.2012
NO30.08.2012
GR31.08.2012
IS30.09.2012
Former [2013/07]AT30.05.2012
BE30.05.2012
CY30.05.2012
FI30.05.2012
HR30.05.2012
LT30.05.2012
LV30.05.2012
SE30.05.2012
SI30.05.2012
NO30.08.2012
GR31.08.2012
IS30.09.2012
Former [2013/04]BE30.05.2012
CY30.05.2012
FI30.05.2012
HR30.05.2012
LT30.05.2012
LV30.05.2012
SE30.05.2012
SI30.05.2012
NO30.08.2012
GR31.08.2012
IS30.09.2012
Former [2012/51]CY30.05.2012
FI30.05.2012
HR30.05.2012
LT30.05.2012
LV30.05.2012
SE30.05.2012
SI30.05.2012
NO30.08.2012
GR31.08.2012
IS30.09.2012
Former [2012/50]CY30.05.2012
FI30.05.2012
HR30.05.2012
LT30.05.2012
LV30.05.2012
SE30.05.2012
NO30.08.2012
GR31.08.2012
IS30.09.2012
Former [2012/49]CY30.05.2012
FI30.05.2012
LT30.05.2012
SE30.05.2012
NO30.08.2012
IS30.09.2012
Former [2012/48]FI30.05.2012
LT30.05.2012
SE30.05.2012
NO30.08.2012
Former [2012/47]LT30.05.2012
NO30.08.2012
Documents cited:Search[XYI]EP1776972  (BELLCO SPA [IT]) [X] 1-3,8,9 * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0017]; figure 1 * [Y] 6,7 [I] 4,5;
 [XI]EP1810703  (BELLCO SRL [IT]) [X] 1-3,8,9 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0019]; figure - * [I] 4,5;
 [YA]US2001037968  (BENE BERNARD [FR], et al) [Y] 6,7 * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0023]; figure - * [A] 1-5,8,9;
 [A]US2005242034  (CONNELL MARK E [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * paragraph [0069] - paragraph [0236]; figure - *
by applicantEP1389475
 US6123847
 US5567320
 EP0547025