Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP2377563 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2377563



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 718
07.05.2020 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 1
27.04.2020 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
27.04.2020 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
27.04.2020 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
20.04.2020 Communication about missing proof of delivery Appeal 1
14.04.2020 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Appeal 1
14.04.2020 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
06.04.2020 Submission concerning change of applicant's representative Appeal 2
23.03.2020 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
16.03.2020 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 18
16.03.2020 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 2
16.03.2020 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 2
28.02.2020 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 2
28.02.2020 F3317 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Proprietor + Opponent) Appeal 3
27.01.2020 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 1
27.01.2020 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 1
27.01.2020 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
24.01.2020 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
21.01.2020 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
21.01.2020 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
21.01.2020 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
21.01.2020 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
21.01.2020 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
21.01.2020 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
21.01.2020 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 11
21.01.2020 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
14.01.2020 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
14.01.2020 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
10.01.2020 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
10.01.2020 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
10.01.2020 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
09.01.2020 F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition Appeal 2
07.01.2020 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
16.12.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
13.12.2019 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 5
13.12.2019 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 5
11.12.2019 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 4
10.12.2019 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
21.03.2019 F3303.17 Change of the composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member Appeal 1
01.12.2017 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Appeal 1
01.12.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
28.11.2017 Submission concerning representation Appeal 1
03.02.2016 Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents Appeal 1
03.02.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
21.01.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
21.01.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
15.01.2016 Request concerning representative opponent Appeal 2
12.01.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
12.01.2016 Claims Appeal 2
12.01.2016 Claims Appeal 2
12.01.2016 Claims Appeal 2
12.01.2016 Reply to appeal Appeal 49
12.01.2016 Reply to appeal Appeal 2
08.01.2016 Reply to appeal Appeal 6
27.11.2015 F3303.14 Composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member Appeal 1
02.09.2015 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
02.09.2015 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
26.08.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
26.08.2015 Claims Appeal 2
26.08.2015 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 2
26.08.2015 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 18
26.08.2015 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 21
23.07.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
18.06.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
18.06.2015 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 2
18.06.2015 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 2
16.06.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
16.06.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
16.06.2015 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
15.06.2015 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
11.06.2015 Notice of appeal Appeal 3
11.06.2015 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
05.05.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
24.04.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
16.04.2015 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
16.04.2015 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
16.04.2015 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 6
16.04.2015 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
16.04.2015 Druckexemplar in opposition procedure Opposition 11
16.04.2015 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 17
16.04.2015 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
16.04.2015 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
16.04.2015 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
16.04.2015 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 2
16.04.2015 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
16.04.2015 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
16.04.2015 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
16.04.2015 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 8
16.04.2015 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 9
16.04.2015 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 4
16.04.2015 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 9
28.01.2015 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 27
26.01.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
26.01.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
26.01.2015 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
26.01.2015 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
23.01.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
23.01.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
23.01.2015 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 7
15.01.2015 Submission concerning representation Opposition 2
13.01.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.12.2014 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 7
23.09.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
18.09.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
18.09.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
16.09.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
15.09.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
15.09.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
15.09.2014 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
11.09.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
11.09.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
11.09.2014 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
02.09.2014 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
02.09.2014 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
02.09.2014 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 4
02.09.2014 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
02.09.2014 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
02.09.2014 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
02.09.2014 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
24.02.2014 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
24.02.2014 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
19.02.2014 Submission concerning change of applicant's representative Search / examination 5
19.02.2014 Submission concerning change of applicant's representative Search / examination 4
17.02.2014 Request for correction Search / examination 5
17.02.2014 Submission concerning change of applicant's representative Search / examination 4
24.10.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
18.10.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
18.10.2013 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
18.10.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
18.10.2013 Main request during Opposition procedure Opposition 2
18.10.2013 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 29
22.08.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
22.08.2013 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
29.07.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
29.07.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
29.07.2013 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
09.04.2013 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
09.04.2013 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
07.03.2013 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
28.02.2013 Notice of opposition Opposition 18
28.02.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
28.02.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
28.02.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 13
28.02.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
28.02.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 31
28.02.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
28.02.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
28.02.2013 Payment of fees and costs Opposition 1
07.05.2012 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
16.04.2012 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
16.04.2012 French translation of claims Search / examination 4
16.04.2012 German translation of the claims Search / examination 4
16.04.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
05.04.2012 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
05.04.2012 French translation of claims Search / examination 4
05.04.2012 German translation of the claims Search / examination 4
05.04.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
05.04.2012 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
30.12.2011 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
30.12.2011 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
30.12.2011 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
30.12.2011 Text intended for grant Search / examination 19
19.11.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
19.11.2011 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
16.11.2011 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
16.11.2011 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
16.11.2011 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 4
16.11.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
07.11.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
07.11.2011 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
04.11.2011 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
04.11.2011 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
04.11.2011 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 4
04.11.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
24.10.2011 Information about publication, reminder payment of designation fee, response to extended European search report, if applicable Search / examination 2
19.10.2011 Refund order of filing/examination fee Search / examination 1
14.10.2011 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 2
04.10.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
04.10.2011 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
04.10.2011 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
21.09.2011 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
27.01.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
01.10.2010 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
01.10.2010 European search opinion Search / examination 3
01.10.2010 European search report Search / examination 3
02.07.2010 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 2
25.06.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
25.06.2010 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 1
11.06.2010 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
06.05.2010 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 2
27.04.2010 Abstract Search / examination 1
27.04.2010 Claims Search / examination 4
27.04.2010 Description Search / examination 14
27.04.2010 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
27.04.2010 Drawings Search / examination 1
27.04.2010 General authorisation Search / examination 1
27.04.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
27.04.2010 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
27.04.2010 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 8
26.04.2010 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
19.04.2010 Annex Search / examination 23
19.04.2010 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 8