blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2213448

EP2213448 - Method and installation for guiding a steel band in a continuously operating press [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.08.2012
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip18.07.2014Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 20.08.2014  [2014/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Dieffenbacher GmbH Maschinen- und Anlagenbau
Heilbronner Strasse 20
75031 Eppingen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2011/36]For all designated states
Dieffenbacher GmbH Maschinen- und Anlagenbau
Heilbronner Strasse 20
75031 Eppingen / DE
Former [2010/31]For all designated states
Dieffenbacher GmbH + Co. KG
Heilbronnerstr. 1
75031 Eppingen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Graf, Matthias
Dr.-Alfred-Neff-Strasse 2/1
75015 Bretten / DE
 [2010/31]
Representative(s)Hartdegen, Anton
Angerfeldstrasse 12
82205 Gilching / DE
[2011/41]
Former [2010/31]Hartdegen, Anton
Angerfeldstrasse 12
82205 Gilching / DE
Application number, filing date10004172.218.05.2004
[2010/31]
Priority number, dateDE200312222718.05.2003         Original published format: DE 10322227
[2010/31]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2213448
Date:04.08.2010
Language:DE
[2010/31]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2213448
Date:12.10.2011
Language:DE
[2011/41]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.06.2010
ClassificationIPC:B30B5/06, B27N3/24, B29C43/48
[2010/31]
CPC:
B29C43/228 (EP); B29C43/48 (EP); B30B5/06 (EP);
B29K2311/14 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/31]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Regelung des Stahlbandlaufes in einer kontinuierlich arbeitenden Presse und eine Anlage zur Durchführung des Verfahrens[2010/31]
English:Method and installation for guiding a steel band in a continuously operating press[2010/31]
French:Procédé et installation pour le guidage d'une bande d'acier dans une presse à travail en continu[2010/31]
Examination procedure04.02.2011Examination requested  [2011/11]
14.04.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.07.2011Fee for grant paid
21.07.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP04011805.1  / EP1479510
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20040011805) is  11.08.2008
Opposition(s)13.07.2012No opposition filed within time limit [2012/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
20.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
20.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
20.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
20.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 07
31.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 08
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU18.05.2004
CY12.10.2011
CZ12.10.2011
DK12.10.2011
EE12.10.2011
FI12.10.2011
IE12.10.2011
NL12.10.2011
PL12.10.2011
RO12.10.2011
SE12.10.2011
SI12.10.2011
SK12.10.2011
TR12.10.2011
BG12.01.2012
GR13.01.2012
ES23.01.2012
PT13.02.2012
LU18.05.2012
BE31.05.2012
CH31.05.2012
LI31.05.2012
MC31.05.2012
[2014/34]
Former [2014/27]CY12.10.2011
CZ12.10.2011
DK12.10.2011
EE12.10.2011
FI12.10.2011
IE12.10.2011
NL12.10.2011
PL12.10.2011
RO12.10.2011
SE12.10.2011
SI12.10.2011
SK12.10.2011
TR12.10.2011
BG12.01.2012
GR13.01.2012
ES23.01.2012
PT13.02.2012
LU18.05.2012
BE31.05.2012
CH31.05.2012
LI31.05.2012
MC31.05.2012
Former [2014/21]CY12.10.2011
CZ12.10.2011
DK12.10.2011
EE12.10.2011
FI12.10.2011
IE12.10.2011
NL12.10.2011
PL12.10.2011
RO12.10.2011
SE12.10.2011
SI12.10.2011
SK12.10.2011
TR12.10.2011
BG12.01.2012
GR13.01.2012
ES23.01.2012
PT13.02.2012
BE31.05.2012
CH31.05.2012
LI31.05.2012
MC31.05.2012
Former [2013/29]CY12.10.2011
CZ12.10.2011
DK12.10.2011
EE12.10.2011
FI12.10.2011
IE12.10.2011
NL12.10.2011
PL12.10.2011
RO12.10.2011
SE12.10.2011
SI12.10.2011
SK12.10.2011
BG12.01.2012
GR13.01.2012
ES23.01.2012
PT13.02.2012
BE31.05.2012
CH31.05.2012
LI31.05.2012
MC31.05.2012
Former [2013/22]CY12.10.2011
CZ12.10.2011
DK12.10.2011
EE12.10.2011
IE12.10.2011
NL12.10.2011
PL12.10.2011
RO12.10.2011
SE12.10.2011
SI12.10.2011
SK12.10.2011
BG12.01.2012
GR13.01.2012
ES23.01.2012
PT13.02.2012
BE31.05.2012
CH31.05.2012
LI31.05.2012
MC31.05.2012
Former [2013/12]CY12.10.2011
CZ12.10.2011
DK12.10.2011
EE12.10.2011
IE12.10.2011
NL12.10.2011
PL12.10.2011
RO12.10.2011
SE12.10.2011
SI12.10.2011
SK12.10.2011
BG12.01.2012
GR13.01.2012
PT13.02.2012
BE31.05.2012
CH31.05.2012
LI31.05.2012
MC31.05.2012
Former [2013/07]CY12.10.2011
CZ12.10.2011
DK12.10.2011
EE12.10.2011
IE12.10.2011
NL12.10.2011
PL12.10.2011
RO12.10.2011
SE12.10.2011
SI12.10.2011
SK12.10.2011
BG12.01.2012
GR13.01.2012
PT13.02.2012
CH31.05.2012
LI31.05.2012
MC31.05.2012
Former [2013/03]CY12.10.2011
CZ12.10.2011
DK12.10.2011
EE12.10.2011
IE12.10.2011
NL12.10.2011
PL12.10.2011
RO12.10.2011
SE12.10.2011
SI12.10.2011
SK12.10.2011
BG12.01.2012
GR13.01.2012
PT13.02.2012
MC31.05.2012
Former [2012/37]CY12.10.2011
CZ12.10.2011
DK12.10.2011
EE12.10.2011
IE12.10.2011
NL12.10.2011
PL12.10.2011
RO12.10.2011
SE12.10.2011
SI12.10.2011
SK12.10.2011
BG12.01.2012
GR13.01.2012
PT13.02.2012
Former [2012/36]CY12.10.2011
CZ12.10.2011
DK12.10.2011
EE12.10.2011
IE12.10.2011
NL12.10.2011
RO12.10.2011
SE12.10.2011
SI12.10.2011
SK12.10.2011
BG12.01.2012
GR13.01.2012
PT13.02.2012
Former [2012/35]CY12.10.2011
CZ12.10.2011
DK12.10.2011
EE12.10.2011
IE12.10.2011
NL12.10.2011
SE12.10.2011
SI12.10.2011
BG12.01.2012
GR13.01.2012
PT13.02.2012
Former [2012/34]CY12.10.2011
CZ12.10.2011
NL12.10.2011
SE12.10.2011
SI12.10.2011
GR13.01.2012
PT13.02.2012
Former [2012/28]CY12.10.2011
NL12.10.2011
SE12.10.2011
SI12.10.2011
GR13.01.2012
PT13.02.2012
Former [2012/24]NL12.10.2011
SE12.10.2011
SI12.10.2011
GR13.01.2012
PT13.02.2012
Former [2012/23]NL12.10.2011
GR13.01.2012
PT13.02.2012
Documents cited:Search[A]DE2643346  (KUESTERS EDUARD) [A] 1-9 * page 16, line 1 - page 17, line 16; figure 2 *;
 [A]US4527686  (SATOH TSUMORI [JP]) [A] 1-9 * abstract *;
 [A]DE4017791  (DIEFFENBACHER GMBH MASCHF [DE]) [A] 1-9* abstract *;
 [A]DE4234213  (DIEFFENBACHER GMBH MASCHF [DE]) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *;
 [A]GB2350095  (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) [A] 1-9 * abstract *;
 [A]DE19931176  (DIEFFENBACHER GMBH MASCHF [DE]) [A] 1-9 * abstract *
by applicantDE4017791
 DE19810553
 DE19931176
 DE4301594
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.