Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2213724

EP2213724 - Animal protein-free media for cultivation of cells [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  24.08.2012
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.10.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
25.10.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Baxalta Incorporated
1200 Lakeside Drive
Bannockburn, IL 60015 / US
For all designated states
Baxalta GmbH
Zählerweg 4
6300 Zug / CH
[2017/47]
Former [2017/08]For all designated states
Baxalta Incorporated
1200 Lakeside Drive
Bannockburn, IL 60015 / US
For all designated states
Baxalta GmbH
Thurgauerstrasse 130
8152 Glattpark, Opfikon / CH
Former [2012/39]For all designated states
Baxter International Inc.
One Baxter Parkway
Deerfield, IL 60015 / US
For all designated states
Baxter Healthcare S.A.
Thurgauerstrasse 130
8152 Glattpark (Opfikon) / CH
Former [2010/31]For all designated states
Baxter International Inc.
One Baxter Parkway
Deerfield, IL 60015 / US
For all designated states
Baxter Healthcare S.A.
Thurgauerstrasse 130
8152 Glattpark (Opfikon) / CH
Inventor(s)01 / Grillberger, Leopold
Finsterergasse 1a
1220 Vienna / AT
02 / Reiter, Manfred
Gebrueder-Lang-Gasse 11/17
1150 Vienna / AT
03 / Mundt, Wolfgang
Florianigasse 57/1/2/6
1080 Vienna / AT
04 / Dorner, Friedrich
Peterlinigasse 17
1230 Vienna / AT
 [2010/31]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/39]HOFFMANN EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Former [2012/24]HOFFMANN EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Arabellastraße 4
81925 München / DE
Former [2010/52]Taormino, Joseph Paul , et al
Hoffmann - Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Former [2010/31]Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte
Grafinger Strasse 2
81671 München / DE
Application number, filing date10004392.612.10.2005
[2010/31]
Priority number, dateUS2004097639929.10.2004         Original published format: US 976399
[2010/31]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2213724
Date:04.08.2010
Language:EN
[2010/31]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2213724
Date:26.09.2012
Language:EN
[2012/39]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.06.2010
ClassificationInternational:C12N5/02, C12N7/02, C12N1/16, C12N1/20
[2010/31]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/31]
TitleGerman:Tierproteinfreies Zellkulturmedium[2010/31]
English:Animal protein-free media for cultivation of cells[2010/31]
French:Milieu exempt de protéines animales pour la culture de cellules[2010/31]
Examination procedure25.01.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.01.2011Examination requested  [2011/11]
21.03.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.07.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.07.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.11.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.04.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.08.2012Fee for grant paid
14.08.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP05798575.6  / EP1805298
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20050798575) is  02.06.2008
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  14.06.2013  19.06.2013  ADMISSIBLE
F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG
Grenzacherstr. 124
4070 Basel / CH
Opponent's representative
Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB, et al
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
 02  25.06.2013  28.06.2013  ADMISSIBLE
GE Healthcare Bio-Sciences AB
Patent Department
Björkgatan 30
751 84 Uppsala / SE
Opponent's representative
O'Brien, Dominic Paul, et al
GE Healthcare Limited
Pollards Wood
Nightingales Lane
Chalfont St Giles
Buckinghamshire HP8 4SP / GB
 [N/P]
Former [2015/09]
Opponent(s)01  14.06.2013  19.06.2013  ADMISSIBLE
F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG
Grenzacherstr. 124
4070 Basel / CH
Opponent's representative
Vossius & Partner, et al
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
 02  25.06.2013  28.06.2013  ADMISSIBLE
GE Healthcare Bio-Sciences AB
Patent Department
Björkgatan 30
751 84 Uppsala / SE
Opponent's representative
O'Brien, Dominic Paul, et al
GE Healthcare Limited
Pollards Wood
Nightingales Lane
Chalfont St Giles
Buckinghamshire HP8 4SP / GB
Former [2013/31]
Opponent(s)01  14.06.2013  19.06.2013  ADMISSIBLE
F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG
Grenzacherstr. 124
4070 Basel / CH
Opponent's representative
Jaenichen, Hans-Rainer, et al
Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
 02  25.06.2013   
GE Healthcare Bio-Sciences AB
Patent Department Björkgatan 30
SE-751 84 Uppsala / SE
Opponent's representative
Aldenbäck, Ulla Christina, et al
GE Healthcare Bio-Sciences AB Patent Department Björkgatan 30
751 84 Uppsala / SE
Former [2013/30]
Opponent(s)01  14.06.2013  19.06.2013  ADMISSIBLE
F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG
Grenzacherstr. 124
4070 Basel / CH
Opponent's representative
Jaenichen, Hans-Rainer, et al
Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
01.08.2013Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
31.03.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
16.03.2015Date of oral proceedings
12.05.2015Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
12.05.2015Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition17.07.2015Appeal received No.  T1465/15
22.09.2015Statement of grounds filed
04.03.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.05.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
06.05.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
06.05.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
25.10.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
25.10.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY26.09.2012
MC31.10.2012
[2013/52]
Former [2013/24]MC31.10.2012
Documents cited:Search[A]WO2004005493  (BAXTER INT [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * the whole document, especially page 8 paragraph 29 - page 9 paragraph 32 and examples *;
 [A]WO0111021  (BAXTER AG [AT], et al) [A] 1-13 * page 7, paragraph 4 - page 8, paragraph 2 * * page 9, paragraphs 3,6 * * page 10, paragraph 4 - page 11, paragraph 1 * * page 11, paragraph 4 * * page 13, paragraph 3 * * claims 21-34 *;
 [AD]WO0123527  (BAXTER AG [AT]) [AD] 1-13 * page 4, line 15 - page 5, line 38 * * page 8, line 9 - line 22 * * page 9, line 1 - line 11 * * page 11, line 31 - page 12, line 16 * * page 13, line 1 - line 14 * * examples 4,8 *;
 [A]FR2196386  (CUDENNEC ALAIN [FR]) [A] 1-13 * page 8, line 28 - page 9, line 2 * * claim 7 *;
 [A]EP0481791  (WELLCOME FOUND [GB]) [A] 1-13 * page 3, line 9 - page 7, line 14 * * page 7, line 32 - line 40 * * examples 1,2,4,5 *;
 [A]WO0224876  (POLYMUN SCIENT IMMUNBIO FORSCH [AT], et al) [A] 1-13 * page 7, line 16 - page 8, line 4 * * page 9, line 23 - line 34 *
by applicantWO9626266
 WO9615231
 WO9815614
 WO0123527
 WO0003000
 EP0481791
 WO9808934
 US5741705
    - FRANEK ET AL., BIOTECHNOLOGY PROGRESS, (2000), vol. 16, pages 688 - 692
    - SCHäRFE ET AL., BIOTECHNOLOGIE IN LABORPRAXIS, (1988), vol. 10, pages 1096 - 1103