blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2213725

EP2213725 - Animal protein-free media for cultivation of cells [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  12.01.2024
Database last updated on 17.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip12.01.2024Patent maintained (B2 publication)published on 14.02.2024  [2024/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Baxalta Incorporated
1200 Lakeside Drive
Bannockburn, IL 60015 / US
For all designated states
Baxalta GmbH
Thurgauerstrasse 130
8152 Glattpark (Opfikon) / CH
[2020/17]
Former [2017/47]For all designated states
Baxalta Incorporated
1200 Lakeside Drive
Bannockburn, IL 60015 / US
For all designated states
Baxalta GmbH
Zählerweg 4
6300 Zug / CH
Former [2017/08]For all designated states
Baxalta Incorporated
1200 Lakeside Drive
Bannockburn, IL 60015 / US
For all designated states
Baxalta GmbH
Thurgauerstrasse 130
8152 Glattpark, Opfikon / CH
Former [2012/34]For all designated states
Baxter International Inc.
One Baxter Parkway
Deerfield, IL 60015 / US
For all designated states
Baxter Healthcare S.A.
Thurgauerstrasse 130
8152 Glattpark (Opfikon) / CH
Former [2010/31]For all designated states
Baxter International Inc.
One Baxter Parkway
Deerfield, IL 60015 / US
For all designated states
Baxter Healthcare S.A.
Thurgauerstrasse 130
8152 Glattpark (Opfikon) / CH
Inventor(s)01 / Grillberger, Leopold
Finsterergasse 1a
1220 Vienna / AT
02 / Reiter, Manfred
Gebrueder-Lang-Gasse 11/17
1150 Vienna / AT
03 / Mundt, Wolfgang
Florianigasse 57/1/2/6
1080 Vienna / AT
04 / Dorner, Friedrich
Peterlinigasse 17
1230 Vienna / AT
 [2010/31]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
[2024/07]
Former [2012/34]HOFFMANN EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Former [2012/24]HOFFMANN EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Arabellastraße 4
81925 München / DE
Former [2010/52]Taormino, Joseph Paul, et al
Hoffmann - Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Former [2010/31]Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte
Grafinger Strasse 2
81671 München / DE
Application number, filing date10004393.412.10.2005
[2010/31]
Priority number, dateUS2004097639929.10.2004         Original published format: US 976399
[2010/31]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2213725
Date:04.08.2010
Language:EN
[2010/31]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2213725
Date:22.08.2012
Language:EN
[2012/34]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP2213725
Date:14.02.2024
Language:EN
[2024/07]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.07.2010
ClassificationIPC:C12N5/02, C12N7/02, C12N1/16, C12N1/20
[2010/31]
CPC:
C12N5/0043 (EP,US); C12N5/00 (KR); C12N1/00 (KR);
C12N5/04 (KR); C12N5/0682 (US); C12N2500/46 (EP,US);
C12N2500/74 (EP,US); C12N2500/76 (EP,US); C12N2500/92 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2024/07]
Former [2010/31]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:TIERPROTEINFREIES ZELLKULTURMEDIUM[2015/23]
English:Animal protein-free media for cultivation of cells[2010/31]
French:Milieu exempt de proteines animales pour la culture de cellules[2015/23]
Former [2010/31]Tierproteinfreies Zellkulturmedium
Former [2010/31]Milieu exempt de protéines animales pour la culture de cellules
Examination procedure25.01.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.01.2011Examination requested  [2011/11]
24.02.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.06.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.07.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.11.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.01.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.03.2012Fee for grant paid
27.03.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP05798575.6  / EP1805298
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20050798575) is  02.06.2008
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  22.05.2013    ADMISSIBLE
F.Hoffmann-La Roche AG
124 Grenzacherstrasse
4070 Basel / CH
Opponent's representative
Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB, et al, et al
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2013/26]
Opponent(s)01  22.05.2013    ADMISSIBLE
F.Hoffmann-La Roche AG
124 Grenzacherstrasse
4070 Basel / CH
Opponent's representative
Vossius & Partner, et al, et al
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
26.06.2013Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
06.03.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
17.03.2015Date of oral proceedings
13.05.2015Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
21.02.2022Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04)
25.05.2022Reply to a communication from the opposition division
14.11.2022Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02)
05.06.2023Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
15.06.2023Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
04.10.2023Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
04.01.2024Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition23.07.2015Appeal received No.  T1483/15
22.09.2015Statement of grounds filed
01.07.2021Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form
17.11.2021Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal
23.07.2015Appeal received No.  T1483/15
01.07.2021Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form
17.11.2021Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal
01.07.2021Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.05.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
06.05.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
06.05.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
25.10.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
25.10.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY22.08.2012
MC31.10.2012
LT12.10.2020
LV12.10.2020
RO12.10.2020
SK12.10.2020
HU13.10.2020
SI13.10.2020
EE31.10.2020
BG30.04.2021
GR10.05.2021
[2023/24]
Former [2022/49]CY22.08.2012
MC31.10.2012
LT12.10.2020
LV12.10.2020
RO12.10.2020
SK12.10.2020
SI13.10.2020
EE31.10.2020
BG30.04.2021
GR10.05.2021
HU13.10.2021
Former [2021/46]CY22.08.2012
MC31.10.2012
LT12.10.2020
LV12.10.2020
RO12.10.2020
SK12.10.2020
SI13.10.2020
EE31.10.2020
BG30.04.2021
GR10.05.2021
Former [2021/38]CY22.08.2012
MC31.10.2012
LV12.10.2020
RO12.10.2020
SK12.10.2020
SI13.10.2020
EE31.10.2020
BG30.04.2021
GR10.05.2021
Former [2021/36]CY22.08.2012
MC31.10.2012
RO12.10.2020
SK12.10.2020
SI13.10.2020
EE31.10.2020
BG30.04.2021
GR10.05.2021
Former [2021/35]CY22.08.2012
MC31.10.2012
RO12.10.2020
SK12.10.2020
Former [2013/24]CY22.08.2012
MC31.10.2012
Former [2013/10]CY22.08.2012
Documents cited:Search[A]FR2196386  (CUDENNEC ALAIN [FR]) [A] 1-15 * page 8, line 28 - page 9, line 2 * * claim 7 *;
 [A]EP0481791  (WELLCOME FOUND [GB]) [A] 1-15 * page 3, line 9 - page 7, line 14 * * page 7, line 32 - line 40 * * examples 1,2,4,5 *;
 [A]WO0111021  (BAXTER AG [AT], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 7, paragraph 4 - page 8, paragraph 2 * * page 9, paragraphs 3,6 * * page 10, paragraph 4 - page 11, paragraph 1 * * page 11, paragraph 4 * * page 13, paragraph 3 * * claims 21-34 *;
 [AD]WO0123527  (BAXTER AG [AT]) [AD] 1-15 * page 4, line 15 - page 5, line 38 * * page 8, line 9 - line 22 * * page 9, line 1 - line 11 * * page 11, line 31 - page 12, line 16 * * page 13, line 1 - line 14 * * examples 4,8 *;
 [A]WO0224876  (POLYMUN SCIENT IMMUNBIO FORSCH [AT], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 7, line 16 - page 8, line 4 ** page 9, line 23 - line 34 *;
 [A]WO2004005493  (BAXTER INT [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document, especially page 8 paragraph 29 - page 9 paragraph 32 and examples *
by applicantEP0481791
 WO9615231
 WO9626266
 WO9808934
 WO9815614
 US5741705
 WO0003000
 WO0123527
    - FRANEK ET AL., BIOTECHNOLOGY PROGRESS, (2000), vol. 16, pages 688 - 692
    - SCHäRFE ET AL., BIOTECHNOLOGIE IN LABORPRAXIS, (1988), vol. 10, pages 1096 - 1103
Opposition   - Schlaeger el al, 'SF-1 A Low Cost Culture Medium for the Production of Recombinant Proteins in Baculovirus Infected Insect Cells', Biotechnology Techniques, Chapman & Hall, vol. 7, no. 3, 01 March 1993, pages 183-188
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.