blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2264663

EP2264663 - M-Commerce virtual cash system, method and apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  26.05.2017
Database last updated on 17.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip26.05.2017Refusal of applicationpublished on 28.06.2017  [2017/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Qualcomm Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
[2010/51]
Inventor(s)01 / Waltman, Joan T.
c/o Qualcomm Incorporated International IP Administration 5775 Morehouse Drove
San Diego California 92121 / US
 [2010/51]
Representative(s)Dunlop, Hugh Christopher, et al
Maucher Jenkins
Seventh Floor Offices
Artillery House
11-19 Artillery Row
London SW1P 1RT / GB
[N/P]
Former [2013/51]Dunlop, Hugh Christopher, et al
R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
Former [2010/51]Condon, Neil, et al
R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
Application number, filing date10004409.815.03.2007
[2010/51]
Priority number, dateUS2006037698115.03.2006         Original published format: US 376981
[2010/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2264663
Date:22.12.2010
Language:EN
[2010/51]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.11.2010
ClassificationIPC:G06Q30/00, G06Q20/00
[2010/51]
CPC:
G06Q20/10 (EP,US); G06Q20/36 (KR); G06Q20/065 (US);
G06Q20/102 (EP,US); G06Q20/105 (EP,US); G06Q20/12 (EP,US);
G06Q20/322 (EP,US); G06Q20/3274 (EP,US); G06Q20/40 (EP,US);
G06Q30/04 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/51]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:Virtuelles Mobilkommerz-Bezahlsystem, Verfahren und Vorrichtung[2010/51]
English:M-Commerce virtual cash system, method and apparatus[2010/51]
French:Système, procédé et appareil d'argent virtuel pour commerce mobile[2010/51]
Examination procedure21.06.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.06.2011Examination requested  [2011/31]
01.08.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.12.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.10.2012Date of oral proceedings
15.11.2012Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2017/26]
15.11.2012Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
02.03.2017Application refused, date of legal effect [2017/26]
Appeal following examination17.01.2013Appeal received No.  T0930/13
21.03.2013Statement of grounds filed
02.03.2017Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected
02.03.2017Date of oral proceedings
13.03.2017Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP07758644.4  / EP1994498
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20070758644) is  22.01.2009
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.05.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
27.05.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
10.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
07.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
08.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
10.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
06.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 09
08.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 10
07.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 11
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]US2001051915  (UENO TOSHIHIKO [JP], et al) [A] 1-15* paragraphs [0089] , [0090] *;
 [X]WO03023674  (UM KI-MUN [KR]) [X] 1-15 * page 2, line 17 - page 4, line 9 * * page 5, line 2 - page 8, line 6 *;
 [X]WO03048881  (DIGITAL SERVICE CO LTD [KR], et al) [X] 1-15 * page 5, lines 10-28 * * page 7, line 16 - page 8, line 14 *;
 [X]US2005107067  (REDECKER BERND [DE]) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [0003] , [0009] * * paragraphs [0010] - [0017] *;
 [A]US2005211771  (ONOZU TAKAYUKI [JP]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0015] * * paragraphs [0108] - [0119] *
by applicantUS5598475
 US6980635
 US6999569
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.