Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2221315

EP2221315 - Methods of generating variant proteins with increased host string content and compositions thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  16.03.2012
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip16.03.2012Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 18.04.2012  [2012/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Xencor, Inc.
111 W. Lemon Avenue
Monrovia, CA 91016 / US
[2010/34]
Inventor(s)01 / Lazar, Gregory Alan
750 Arcadia Avenue No. 6
Arcadia, CA 91007 / US
02 / Desjarlais, John R.
1030 North Michigan Avenue
Pasadena, CA 91104 / US
03 / Hammond, Philip W.
421 Crestvale Drive
Sierra Madre, CA 91024 / US
 [2010/34]
Representative(s)Tollervey, Rebecca Marie , et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
[N/P]
Former [2010/34]Tollervey, Rebecca Marie , et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London
EC2V 8AS / GB
Application number, filing date10004410.603.12.2004
[2010/34]
Priority number, dateUS20030527167P04.12.2003         Original published format: US 527167 P
US20040581613P21.06.2004         Original published format: US 581613 P
US20040601665P13.08.2004         Original published format: US 601665 P
US20040619483P16.10.2004         Original published format: US 619483 P
[2010/34]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2221315
Date:25.08.2010
Language:EN
[2010/34]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.07.2010
ClassificationInternational:C07K16/00, C07K16/28
[2010/34]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/34]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Erzeugung von Proteinvarianten mit erhöhtem Wirtsstranginhalt und Zusammensetzungen davon[2010/34]
English:Methods of generating variant proteins with increased host string content and compositions thereof[2010/34]
French:Procédés de génération de protéines variantes avec un contenu amélioré de fil hôte et compositions associées[2010/34]
Examination procedure14.05.2010Examination requested  [2010/34]
24.02.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.04.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.10.2011Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2012/16]
29.11.2011Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2012/16]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP04813075.1  / EP1697741
Divisional application(s)EP10185665.6   Application deemed to be withdrawn  : 02.11.2010
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20040813075) is  02.06.2008
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.05.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
14.05.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
14.05.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
14.05.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
06.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.201007   M06   Fee paid on   06.01.2011
31.12.201108   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]WO03043583  (SEATTLE GENETICS INC [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * page 8 - page 10; examples 1-5; sequences 2,9 *;
 [L]EP1951757  (XENCOR INC [US]) [L] 1-8 * figures 1-27; examples 1-4; sequences 1-11,19,20 *;
 [T]  - LAZAR ET AL, "A molecular immunology approach to antibody humanization and functional optimization", MOLECULAR IMMUNOLOGY, PERGAMON, GB LNKD- DOI:10.1016/J.MOLIMM.2006.09.029, (20061201), vol. 44, no. 8, ISSN 0161-5890, pages 1986 - 1998, XP005792736 [T] 1-8 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.molimm.2006.09.029
by applicantUS5225539
 US5530101
 US5585089
 US5693761
 US5693762
 US6180370
 US5859205
 US5821337
 US6054297
 US6407213
 US5712120
 US2003153043
 US6737056
 US2004132101
 US2004002587
 WO2004063351
 US6602684
 WO0061739
 WO0129246
 WO0231140
 WO0230954
 US6188965
 US6269312
 US6403312
 US6708120
 US6804611
 US6792356
 WO9807254
 WO9924229
 WO0140091
 WO0225588
 WO9852976
 WO02079232
 WO0034317
 WO0121823
 WO0200165
 WO9859244
 WO02069232
 WO02077187
 WO0022906
 WO0149058
 WO0204852
 WO0204853
 WO0208023
 WO0128702
 WO0207466
 WO0042561
 WO0170947
 US6365377
 US6376246
 WO0206469
 US6352842
 US6361974
 US6358709
 US5824514
 US5817483
 US5814476
 US5763192
 US5723323
 US4943533
 WO9640210
 WO9520045
    - RITTER ET AL., CANCER RESEARCH, (2001), vol. 61, pages 6851 - 6859
    - CLARK, IMMUNOLOGY TODAY, (2000), vol. 21, pages 397 - 402
    - MACCALLUM ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1996), vol. 262, pages 732 - 745
    - CHOTHIA; LESK, J. MOL. BIOL., (1987), vol. 196, pages 901 - 917
    - CHOTHIA ET AL., NATURE, (1989), vol. 342, pages 877 - 883
    - AI-LAZIKANI ET AL., J. MOL. BLOL, (1997), vol. 273, pages 927 - 948
    - BRUGGEMANN ET AL., CURR OPIN BIOTECHNOL, (1997), vol. 8, pages 455 - 458
    - GRIFFITHS ET AL., CURR OPIN BIOTECHNOL, (1998), vol. 9, pages 102 - 108
    - CLARK, LMMUNOL TODAY, (2000), vol. 21, pages 397 - 402
    - IDUSOGIE ET AL., J. IMMUNOLOGY, (2001), vol. 166, pages 2571 - 2572
    - HINTON ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (2004), vol. 279, no. 8, pages 6213 - 6216
    - UMANA ET AL., NAT BLOTECHNOL, (1999), vol. 17, pages 176 - 180
    - DAVIES ET AL., BIOTECHNOL BIOENG, (2001), vol. 74, pages 288 - 294
    - SHIELDS ET AL., J BIOL CHEM, (2002), vol. 277, pages 26733 - 26740
    - SHINKAWA ET AL., J BIOL CHEM, (2003), vol. 278, pages 3466 - 3473
    - JOHNSON; WU, NUCLEIC ACIDS RES, (2001), vol. 29, pages 205 - 206
    - JOHNSON; WU, NUCLEIC ACIDS RES, (2000), vol. 28, pages 214 - 218
    - LEFRANC ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES, (1999), vol. 27, pages 209 - 212
    - RUIZ ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RE., (2000), vol. 28, pages 219 - 221
    - LEFRANC ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES, (2001), vol. 29, pages 207 - 209
    - LEFRANC ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES, (2003), vol. 31, pages 307 - 310
    - AI-LAZIKANI ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1997), vol. 273, pages 927 - 948
    - MATSUDA ET AL., J EXP MED, (1998), vol. 188, pages 2151 - 2162
    - ZACHAU, BIOL CHEM, (2000), vol. 381, pages 951 - 954
    - PALLARES ET AL., EXP CLIN IMMUNOGENET, (1999), vol. 16, no. 1, pages 36 - 60
    - BARBIE; LEFRANC, EXP CLIN IMMUNOGENET, (1998), vol. 15, no. 3, pages 171 - 83
    - COX ET AL., EUR J LMMUNOL., (199404), vol. 24, no. 4, pages 827 - 36
    - LEHMANN; WYSS, CURROPIN BIOTECHNO, (2001), vol. 12, no. 4, pages 371 - 5
    - LEHMANN ET AL., BIOCHIM BIOPHYS ACTA, (2000), vol. 1543, no. 2, pages 408 - 415
    - RATH; DAVIDSON, PROTEIN SCI, (2000), vol. 9, no. 12, pages 2457 - 69
    - LEHMANN, PROTEIN ENG, (2000), vol. 13, no. 1, pages 49 - 57
    - DESJARLAIS; BERG, PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (1993), vol. 90, no. 6, pages 2256 - 60
    - DESJARLAIS; BERG, PROTEINS, (1992), vol. 12, no. 2, pages 101 - 4
    - HENIKOFF; HENIKOFF, ADV PROTEIN CHEM, (2000), vol. 54, pages 73 - 97
    - HENIKOFF; HENIKOFF, J MOL BIOL, (1994), vol. 243, no. 4, pages 574 - 8
    - ARNOLD ET AL., J IMMUNOLOGY, (2002), vol. 169, no. 2, pages 739 - 49
    - RAHA ET AL., PROTEIN SCI, (2000), vol. 9, pages 1106 - 1119
    - BOWIE, SCIENCE, (1990), vol. 247, pages 1306 - 1310
    - BOWIE; SAUER, PROC. NAT. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1989), vol. 86, pages 2152 - 2156
    - REIDHAAR-OLSON; SAUER, PROTEINS, (1990), vol. 7, pages 306 - 316
    - LIM ET AL., BIOCHEM., (1992), vol. 31, pages 4324 - 4333
    - TOPHAM ET AL., PROTO ENG., (1997), vol. 10, pages 7 - 21
    - ADENOT ET AL., J. MOL. GRAPH. MODEL., (1999), vol. 17, pages 292 - 309
    - HENIKOFF; HENIKOFF, PROC. NAT. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1992), vol. 89, page 10917
    - HENIKOFF, CURR. OPIN. STRUCT. BIOL., (1996), vol. 6, pages 353 - 360
    - HENIKOFF; HENIKOFF, COMPUT. APPL. BIOSCI., (1996), vol. 12, pages 135 - 143
    - MALLIOS, BIOINFORMATICS, (1999), vol. 15, pages 432 - 439
    - MALLIOS, BIOINFORMATICS, (2001), vol. 17, pages 942 - 948
    - STUMIOLO ET AL., NATURE BIOTECH, (1999), vol. 17, pages 555 - 561
    - MARSHALL ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1995), vol. 154, pages 5927 - 5933
    - HAMMER ET AL., J. EXP. MED., (1994), vol. 180, pages 2353 - 2358
    - STUMIOLO, NATURE BIOTECH, (1999), vol. 17, pages 555 - 561
    - MARSHALL, J. IMMUNOL., (1995), vol. 154, pages 5927 - 5933
    - CLARK, IMMUNOL TODAY, (2000), vol. 21, pages 397 - 402
    - GRIFFITHS ET AL., CURR OPIN BIOTECHNOL, (1998), vol. 9, page 102.108
    - HAYHURST; GEORGIOU, CURR OPIN CHEM BIOL, (2001), vol. 5, pages 683 - 689
    - MAYNARD; GEORGIOU, ANNU REV BIOMED ENG, (2000), vol. 2, pages 339 - 76
    - WITRRUP, CURR OPIN , BIOTECHNOL, (2001), vol. 12, pages 395 - 399
    - LOWMAN ET AL., BIOCHEMISTRY, (1991), vol. 30, pages 10832 - 10838
    - SMITH, SCIENCE, (1985), vol. 228, pages 1315 - 1317
    - MALMBORG ET AL., J MOL BIOL, (1997), vol. 273, pages 544 - 551
    - KREBBER ET AL., J MOL BIOL, (1997), vol. 268, pages 619 - 630
    - BENHAR ET AL., J MOL BIOL, (2000), vol. 301, pages 893 - 904
    - WITRRUP, CURR OPIN BIOTECHNOL, (2001), vol. 12, pages 395 - 399
    - GEORGIOU ET AL., NAT BIOTECHNOL, (1997), vol. 15, pages 29 - 34
    - GEORGIOU ET AL., TRENDS BIOTECHNOL, (1993), vol. 11, pages 6 - 10
    - LEE ET AL., NAT BIOTECHNOL, (2000), vol. 18, pages 645 - 648
    - JUN ET AL., NAT BIOTECHNOL, (1998), vol. 16, pages 576 - 80
    - BODER; WITTRUP, METHODS ENZYMOL, (2000), vol. 328, pages 430 - 44
    - BODER; WITTRUP, NAT BIOTECHNOL, (1997), vol. 15, pages 553 - 557
    - WHITEHOM ET AL., BIOLTECHNOLOGY, (1995), vol. 13, pages 1215 - 1219
    - AMSTUTZ ET AL., CURR OPIN BIOTECHNOL, (2001), vol. 12, pages 400 - 405
    - MATTHEAKIS ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (1994), vol. 91, pages 9022 - 9026
    - HANES ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (1997), vol. 94, pages 4937 - 4942
    - ROBERTS; SZOSTAK, PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (1997), vol. 94, pages 12297 - 12302
    - NEMOTO ET AL., FEBS LETT, (1997), vol. 414, pages 405 - 408
    - ZHOU ET AL., J AM CHEM SOC, (2002), vol. 124, pages 538 - 543
    - CHEN ET AL., NAT BIOTECHNOL, (2001), vol. 19, pages 537 - 542
    - JOHNSSON; VARSHAVSKY, PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (1994), vol. 91, pages 10340 - 10344
    - PELLETIER ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, vol. 95, pages 12141 - 12146
    - FIELDS; SONG, NATURE, (1989), vol. 340, pages 245 - 246
    - VISINTIN, PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (1999), vol. 96, pages 11723 - 11728
    - KOLKMAN; STEMMER, NAT BIOTECHNOL, (2001), vol. 19, pages 423 - 428
    - CRAMERI ET AL., NATURE, (1998), vol. 391, pages 288 - 291
    - COCO ET AL., NAT BIOTECHNOL, (2001), vol. 19, pages 354 - 359
    - ZHAO ET AL., NAT BIOTECHNOL, (1998), vol. 16, pages 258 - 261
    - SHAO ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES, (1998), vol. 26, pages 681 - 683
    - LUTZ ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (2001), vol. 98, pages 11248 - 11253
    - KIKUCHI ET AL., GENE, vol. 236, pages 159 - 167
    - KIKUCHI ET AL., GENE, (2000), vol. 243, pages 133 - 137
    - SCHMITTEL, J. IMMUNOL. MEFH., (2000), vol. 24, pages 17 - 24
    - MEIDENBAUER ET AL., PROSTATE, (2000), vol. 43, pages 88 - 100
    - SCHULTES; WHITESIDE, J. LMMUNOL. METHODS, (2003), vol. 279, pages 1 - 15
    - STICKLER ET AL., 200, J. IMMUNOTHERAPY, vol. 23, pages 654 - 660
    - SONDERSTRUP ET AL., IMMUNOL. REV, (1999), vol. 172, pages 335 - 343
    - FORSTHUBER ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (2001), vol. 167, pages 119 - 125
    - BOWEN ET AL., JOUMAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, (1993), vol. 151, page 5896
    - MICHAELSEN ET AL., MOLECULAR IMMUNOLOGY, (1992), vol. 29, no. 3, pages 319 - 326
    - CANFIELD; MORRISON, J. EXP. MED., (1991), vol. 173, pages 1483 - 1491
    - CHAPPEL ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1991), vol. 88, no. 20, pages 9036 - 9040
    - CHAPPEL ET AL., JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (1993), vol. 268, pages 25124 - 25131
    - TAO ET AL., J . EXP. MED., (1991), vol. 173, pages 1025 - 1028
    - TAO ET AL., J. EXP. MED., (1993), vol. 178, pages 661 - 667
    - REDPATH ET AL., HUMAN IMMUNOLOGY, (1998), vol. 59, pages 720 - 727
    - SKERRA, GENE, (1994), vol. 141, pages 79 - 84
    - MODJTAHEDI ET AL., J. CELL BIOPHYS., (1993), vol. 22, no. 1-3, pages 129 - 46
    - MODJTAHEDI ET AL., BRJ CANCER, (1993), vol. 67, no. 2, pages 247 - 53
    - MODJTAHEDI ET AL., BR J CANCER, (1996), vol. 73, no. 2, pages 228 - 35
    - MODJTAHEDI ET AL., INT J CANCER, (2003), vol. 105, no. 2, pages 273 - 80
 US20030672280
 WO2003US30249
 US20040822231
 US20040627774
 WO2004US00643
 US20030370749
 WO2004US05112
 US20020277370
 US20020113929
 US20030528229
 US20040602566
 US20010782004
 US20010812034
 US20010927790
 US20020218102
 US20010101499
 US20030666311
 US20030665307
 US20040888748
 US20010877695
 US20020071859
 US20030339788
 US20010903378
 US20020039170
 US20000222697
 US20020080376
 US20010792630
 US20010023208
 US20020082671
 US20010953351
 US20020097100
 US20060366658
 US20040614944
 US20040619409
 US20040621387
 US20040629068