Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2243383

EP2243383 - A method and composition for nutritionally improving glucose control and insulin action [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  09.01.2015
Database last updated on 23.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip09.01.2015Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 11.02.2015  [2015/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nestec S.A.
Avenue Nestlé 55
1800 Vevey / CH
[2010/43]
Inventor(s)01 / Hayes, Kenneth C.
68 Washburn Avenue
Wellesley MA 02481 / US
02 / Greenberg, Norman Alan
3516 Flag Avenue North
New Hope MN 55427 / US
03 / Troup, John P.
16905 40th Avenue No.
Plymouth MN 55446 / US
04 / Falk, Anne L.
4100 Upton Avenue So.
Minneapolis MN 55410 / US
05 / Biolo, Gianni
Via Di Scorcola 4
34100 Trieste / IT
 [2010/43]
Representative(s)Chautard, Cécile , et al
Nestec S.A.
Centre de Recherche Nestlé
Vers-chez-les-Blanc
Case Postale 44
1000 Lausanne 26 / CH
[N/P]
Former [2014/19]Chautard, Cécile , et al
Nestec S.A.
CT-IAM
Avenue Nestlé 55
1800 Vevey / CH
Former [2012/40]Rupp, Christian , et al
Mitscherlich & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstraße 33
80331 München / DE
Former [2010/43]Richards, Michèle E. , et al
Fry Heath & Spence LLP The Gables Massetts Road Horley
Surrey RH6 7DQ / GB
Application number, filing date10004584.804.04.2006
[2010/43]
Priority number, dateUS20050668633P06.04.2005         Original published format: US 668633 P
[2010/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2243383
Date:27.10.2010
Language:EN
[2010/43]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2243383
Date:16.02.2011
[2011/07]
International and Supplementary
search report(s)
Supplementary European search report -
dispatched on:
EP19.01.2011
ClassificationInternational:A23L1/29, A23L1/30, A61K36/48, // A61P3/10, A61P3/02, A61P9/10
[2010/43]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/43]
TitleGerman:METHODE UND ZUBEREITUNG ZUR VERBESSERUNG DER KONTROLLE DES GLUKOSESPIEGELS UND DER WIRKSAMMKEIT INSULINS DURCH ERNÄHRUNG[2011/07]
English:A method and composition for nutritionally improving glucose control and insulin action[2010/43]
French:Méthode et composition diététiques pour améliorer le contrôle de la glycémie et de l'action de l'insuline[2010/43]
Former [2010/43]Methode und Zubereitung zur Verbesserung der Kontrolle des Glukosespiegels und der Wirksammkeit Insulins durch Ernährung
Examination procedure30.04.2010Examination requested  [2010/43]
19.05.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
08.01.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.04.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.05.2014Observations by third parties
05.01.2015Application withdrawn by applicant  [2015/07]
09.02.2015Date of oral proceedings
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP06749290.0  / EP1868454
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20060749290) is  10.10.2008
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.05.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
07.05.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
07.05.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
12.04.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
28.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
12.04.2013Renewal fee patent year 08
25.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search[Y]US2005002988  (MIZUMOTO KENJI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-5 * paragraphs [0005] - [0012] *;
 [Y]EP1310173  (NESTLE SA [CH]) [Y] 1-5 * paragraphs [0001] , [0005] , [0011] - [0012] *;
 [Y]US6140304  (SEARS BARRY D [US]) [Y] 1-5 * column 1, lines 19-34 * * column 2, lines 39-45,59-66 * * column 3, lines 10-16 * * column 4, lines 30-43 * * column 9, lines 37-50 * * column 10, lines 1-15 * * examples 1-3,7,13 * * claim 1 *;
 [A]US2003108657  (VAN OORSCHOT GIJSBERTUS JOHANN [NL], et al) [A] 1-5 * paragraphs [0001] , [0012] - [0019] *
 [Y]  - FUJITA HIROYUKI ET AL, "Fermented soybean-derived water-soluble Touchi extract inhibits alpha-glucosidase and is antiglycemic in rats and humans after single oral treatments", JOURNAL OF NUTRITION, WISTAR INSTITUTE OF ANATOMY AND BIOLOGY, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US, (20010401), vol. 131, no. 4, ISSN 0022-3166, pages 1211 - 1213, XP002458928 [Y] 1-5 * abstract * * page 1211 *
 [XY]  - FUJITA HIROYUKI ET AL, "Long-term ingestion of a fermented soybean-derived Touchi-extract with alpha-glucosidase inhibitory activity is safe and effective in humans with borderline and mild type-2 diabetes", JOURNAL OF NUTRITION, WISTAR INSTITUTE OF ANATOMY AND BIOLOGY, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US, (20010801), vol. 131, no. 8, ISSN 0022-3166, pages 2105 - 2108, XP002458926 [X] 1-5 * abstract * * page 2105 * * page 2108 * [Y] 1-5
 [XY]  - FUJITA HIROYUKI ET AL, "Fermented soybean-derived Touchi-extract with anti-diabetic effect via alpha-glucosidase inhibitory action in a long-term administration study with KKAy mice", LIFE SCIENCES, PERGAMON PRESS, OXFORD, GB LNKD- DOI:10.1016/S0024-3205(01)01381-9, (20011130), vol. 70, no. 2, ISSN 0024-3205, pages 219 - 227, XP002458925 [X] 1-5 * abstract * * page 220 * * table 1 * * figures 2-4 * * page 226 * [Y] 1-5

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0024-3205(01)01381-9
 [Y]  - "Glucose transport expression promoter for preventing and improving diabetes, insulinemia and insulin resistance, comprises catechin as active ingredient", DERWENT, (2003), XP002350707 [Y] 1-5 * abstract *
 [Y]  - QIN B ET AL, "CINNAMON EXTRACT PREVENTS THE INSULIN RESISTANCE INDUCED BY A HIGH-FRUCTOSE DIET", HORMONE AND METABOLIC RESEARCH, THIEME-STRATTON, STUTTGART, DE, (200402), vol. 36, no. 2, ISSN 0018-5043, pages 119 - 125, XP008062361 [Y] 1-5 * abstract * * figure 1 * * pages 123-124 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1055/s-2004-814223
 [Y]  - CEFALU WT, WANG ZQ, ZHANG XH, BALDOR LC, RUSSELL JC, "Oral chromium picolinate improves carbohydrate and lipid metabolism and enhances skeletal muscle Glut-4 translocation in obese, hyperinsulinemic (JCR-LA Corpulent) rats", J. NUTR., (2002), vol. 132, pages 1107 - 1114, XP002405841 [Y] 1-5 * page 1107, paragraphs 1,3 * * figures 2-4 * * table 3 *
 [Y]  - MCCARTY M F, "A chlorogenic acid-induced increase in GLP-1 production may mediate the impact of heavy coffee consumption on diabetes risk", MEDICAL HYPOTHESES, EDEN PRESS, PENRITH, US LNKD- DOI:10.1016/J.MEHY.2004.03.037, (20050101), vol. 64, no. 4, ISSN 0306-9877, pages 848 - 853, XP004732713 [Y] 1-5 * abstract * * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.mehy.2004.03.037
 [Y]  - JACOB S ET AL, "ENHANCEMENT OF GLUCOSE DISPOSAL IN PATIENTS WITH TYPE 2 DIABETES BY ALPHA-LIPOIC ACID", ARZNEIMITTEL FORSCHUNG. DRUG RESEARCH, ECV EDITIO CANTOR VERLAG, AULENDORF, DE, (19950801), vol. 45, no. 8, ISSN 0004-4172, pages 872 - 874, XP001179899 [Y] 1-5 * the whole document *
 [Y]  - GREENE E L ET AL, "ALPHA-LIPOIC ACID PREVENTS THE DEVELOPMENT OF GLUCOSE-INDUCED INSULIN RESISTANCE IN 3T3-L1 ADIPOCYTES AND ACCELERATES THE DECLINE IN IMMUNOREACTIVE INSULIN DURING CELL INCUBATION", METABOLISM, CLINICAL AND EXPERIMENTAL, W.B. SAUNDERS CO., PHILADELPHIA, PA, US, (200109), vol. 50, no. 9, ISSN 0026-0495, pages 1063 - 1069, XP008065513 [Y] 1-5 * the whole document * * figures 1-4 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1053/meta.2001.25601
 [Y]  - HEINE R J ET AL, "LINOLEIC-ACID-ENRICHED DIET: LONG-TERM EFFECTS ON SERUM LIPOPROTEIN AND APOLIPOPROTEIN CONCENTRATIONS AND INSULIN SENSITIVITY IN NONINSULIN-DEPENDENT DIABETIC PATIENTS", AM J. CLIN. NUTR., (19890301), vol. 49, no. 3, pages 448 - 456, XP000671172 [Y] 1-5 * the whole document *
 [Y]  - CLARKE SD, "Polyunsaturated fatty acid regulation of gene transcription: a molecular mechanism to improve the metabolic syndrome", J. NUTR., (2001), vol. 131, pages 1129 - 1132, XP002405842 [Y] 1-5 * abstract * * page 1129 *
 [Y]  - TSUNODA ET AL, "Extract of banaba leaf, its use and antidiabetic agent", JPODB, (19931122), XP002960648 [Y] 1-5 * abstract *
 [Y]  - MARCHESINI G ET AL, "Insulin resistance in aged man: relationship between impaired glucose tolerance and decreased insulin activity on branched-chain amino acids", MEDLINE, (200711), XP002415984 [Y] 1-5 * abstract *
 [YP]  - HANNA LEONTOWICZ ET AL, "Bioactive properties of Snake fruit (Salacca edulis Reinw) and Mangosteen (Garcinia mangostana) and their influence on plasma lipid profile and antioxidant activity in rats fed cholesterol", EUROPEAN FOOD RESEARCH AND TECHNOLOGY ; ZEITSCHRIFT FÜR LEBENSMITTELUNTERSUCHUNG UND -FORSCHUNG A, SPRINGER, BERLIN, DE LNKD- DOI:10.1007/S00217-006-0255-7, (20060304), vol. 223, no. 5, ISSN 1438-2385, pages 697 - 703, XP019420496 [YP] 1-5 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00217-006-0255-7
 [T]  - MUNTNER P ET AL, "Prevalence of non-traditional cardiovascular disease risk factors among persons with impaired fasting glucose, impaired glucose tolerance, diabetes, and the metabolic syndrome: analysis of the Third National Health and Nutrition Examination Survey (NHANES III)", ANNALS OF EPIDEMIOLOGY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHING, NEW YORK, NY, US LNKD- DOI:10.1016/J.ANNEPIDEM.2004.01.002, (20041001), vol. 14, no. 9, ISSN 1047-2797, pages 686 - 695, XP004571052 [T] 1-5 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.annepidem.2004.01.002
 [T]  - HOWARD G, O'LEARY DH, ZACCARO D, HAFFNER S, ET AL, "Insulin sensitivity and atherosclerosis", CIRCULATION, (1996), vol. 93, pages 1809 - 1817, XP002405843 [T] 1-5 * the whole document *
 [T]  - ZAVARONI I ET AL, "Hyperinsulinemia in a normal population as a predictor of non-insulin-dependent diabetes mellitus, hypertension, and coronary heart disease: The barilla factory revisited", METABOLISM, CLINICAL AND EXPERIMENTAL, W.B. SAUNDERS CO., PHILADELPHIA, PA, US LNKD- DOI:10.1016/S0026-0495(99)90195-6, (19990801), vol. 48, no. 8, ISSN 0026-0495, pages 989 - 994, XP004538571 [T] 1-5 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0026-0495(99)90195-6
 [T]  - DANSINGER ML, GLEASON JA, GRIFFITH JL, SELKER HP, SCHAEFER EJ, "Comparison of the Atkins, Ornish, Weight Watchers, and Zone diets for weight loss and heart disease risk reduction", JAMA, (20050105), vol. 293, no. 1, pages 43 - 53, XP009069903 [T] 1-5 * tables 3,4 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1001/jama.293.1.43
 [T]  - CHEUVRONT SN, "The zone diet phenomenon: a closer look at the science behind the claims", J. AM. COLL. NUTR., (2003), vol. 22, no. 1, pages 9 - 17, XP002391670 [T] 1-5 * page 10 * * page 11, column 2 * * page 12, column 1 *
by applicant   - YANG ET AL., AJCN, (2003), vol. 77, page 1426,
    - DANSINGER, M. ET AL., JAMA, (2005), vol. 293, pages 45 - 53,
other   - "KANATHENNAI", DATABASE TKDL, Database accession no. GR02/54, XP003029023
    - AGASTHIYAR, AGATHIAR VAITHIA RATNA CHRUKKAM, pages 78 - 79,
    - "MAJOON SUQRAAT", DATABASE TKDL, Database accession no. MH1/429, XP003034045
    - MOHAMMAD SHAREEF KHAN, ILAAJ-AL-AMRAAZ, page 50,
    - "KADHALI NEI", DATABASE TKDL, Database accession no. AM05/2066, XP003034046
    - KANDASAMY MUDALIAR, ATHMARAKSHAAMIRTHAM, page 509,
    - "MUSAL NEI", DATABASE TKDL, Database accession no. PD04/58, XP003034047
    - AGASTHIYAR, AGASTHIYAR VAITHYAM, pages 43 - 44,
    - "POOSANIKKAAI NEI", DATABASE TKDL, Database accession no. SR09/154A, XP003034048
    - ABDULLA SAHIB, ANUBOGA VAITHYA NAVANEETHAM, pages 99 - 100,
    - "VS/939", DATABASE TKDL, Database accession no. VS/939, XP003034049
    - RASAYOGA SAGARA, HARIPRAPANNA JI, vol. II, page 284,
    - "KHADIRARÄDIKASÄYAH", DATABASE TKDL, Database accession no. AB/1048, XP003027260
    - BHARATA BHAISAJYA RATNAKARA, vol. I, page 32,
    - "TALAMARANAM", DATABASE TKDL, Database accession no. BP/1573, XP003034050
    - BHARATA BHAISAJYA RATNAKARA, vol. II, page 459,
    - "LOHARISTHA", DATABASE TKDL, Database accession no. KS1/95, XP003034051
    - SWAMI HARISARANANANDA VAIDYA, ASAVA VIJNAN, page 107,
    - "DAWA-UL- MALIK SAGHEER", DATABASE TKDL, Database accession no. MH5/1439, XP003028869
    - MOHAMMAD AKBAR ARZANI, QARAABAADEEN QAADRI, page 208,