blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2390661

EP2390661 - An anchoring/capturing means for selecting or analyzing a CHO cell according to a product secreted by the CHO cell [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  29.04.2016
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip19.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL, MT
published on 21.11.2018  [2018/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Miltenyi Biotec GmbH
Friedrich-Ebert-Strasse 68
51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE
[2011/48]
Inventor(s)01 / Miltenyi, Stefan
Friedrich-Ebert-Strasse 68
51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE
02 / Höher-Peters, Susanne
Dr.-Lautz-Weg 19
51427 Bergisch Gladbach / DE
03 / Winkels, Monika
Röntgenstrasse 7
51789 Lindlar / DE
 [2011/48]
Representative(s)Hoppe, Georg Johannes
Darani Anwaltskanzlei
Hohenzollerndamm 117
14199 Berlin / DE
[N/P]
Former [2015/26]Hoppe, Georg Johannes
Darani Anwaltskanzlei
Beuckestrasse 20
14163 Berlin / DE
Former [2011/48]Hoppe, Georg Johannes
darani Anwaltskanzlei Beuckestrasse 20
14163 Berlin / DE
Application number, filing date10004611.902.05.2010
[2011/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2390661
Date:30.11.2011
Language:EN
[2011/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2390661
Date:24.06.2015
Language:EN
[2015/26]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.11.2010
ClassificationIPC:G01N33/50, G01N33/569, G01N33/68, G01N33/543
[2015/03]
CPC:
G01N33/54306 (EP,US)
Former IPC [2011/48]G01N33/50, G01N33/569, G01N33/68
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/26]
Former [2011/48]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verankerungs-/Erfassungsmittel zum Auswählen oder Analysieren einer CHO-Zelle entsprechend einem Produkt, das von der CHO-Zelle sezerniert wird[2011/48]
English:An anchoring/capturing means for selecting or analyzing a CHO cell according to a product secreted by the CHO cell[2011/48]
French:Supports d'ancrage/capture pour sélectionner ou analyser une cellule CHO en fonction d'un produit sécrété par la cellule CHO[2011/48]
Biological materialThis application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details
Examination procedure23.04.2012Examination requested  [2012/23]
25.05.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.06.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.12.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.01.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.05.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.08.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
25.09.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.01.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.03.2015Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
14.04.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.05.2015Fee for grant paid
04.05.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
04.05.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  18.06.2012
Opposition(s)29.03.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/22]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
10.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
27.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
12.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU02.05.2010
AL24.06.2015
AT24.06.2015
BE24.06.2015
CY24.06.2015
CZ24.06.2015
DK24.06.2015
EE24.06.2015
ES24.06.2015
FI24.06.2015
HR24.06.2015
IT24.06.2015
LT24.06.2015
LV24.06.2015
MC24.06.2015
MK24.06.2015
MT24.06.2015
NL24.06.2015
PL24.06.2015
RO24.06.2015
SE24.06.2015
SI24.06.2015
SK24.06.2015
SM24.06.2015
TR24.06.2015
BG24.09.2015
NO24.09.2015
GR25.09.2015
IS24.10.2015
PT26.10.2015
[2018/47]
Former [2018/29]HU02.05.2010
AT24.06.2015
BE24.06.2015
CY24.06.2015
CZ24.06.2015
DK24.06.2015
EE24.06.2015
ES24.06.2015
FI24.06.2015
HR24.06.2015
IT24.06.2015
LT24.06.2015
LV24.06.2015
MC24.06.2015
MK24.06.2015
NL24.06.2015
PL24.06.2015
RO24.06.2015
SE24.06.2015
SI24.06.2015
SK24.06.2015
SM24.06.2015
TR24.06.2015
BG24.09.2015
NO24.09.2015
GR25.09.2015
IS24.10.2015
PT26.10.2015
Former [2018/28]HU02.05.2010
AT24.06.2015
BE24.06.2015
CY24.06.2015
CZ24.06.2015
DK24.06.2015
EE24.06.2015
ES24.06.2015
FI24.06.2015
HR24.06.2015
IT24.06.2015
LT24.06.2015
LV24.06.2015
MC24.06.2015
MK24.06.2015
NL24.06.2015
PL24.06.2015
RO24.06.2015
SE24.06.2015
SI24.06.2015
SK24.06.2015
SM24.06.2015
BG24.09.2015
NO24.09.2015
GR25.09.2015
IS24.10.2015
PT26.10.2015
Former [2017/40]AT24.06.2015
BE24.06.2015
CZ24.06.2015
DK24.06.2015
EE24.06.2015
ES24.06.2015
FI24.06.2015
HR24.06.2015
IT24.06.2015
LT24.06.2015
LV24.06.2015
NL24.06.2015
PL24.06.2015
RO24.06.2015
SE24.06.2015
SI24.06.2015
SK24.06.2015
BG24.09.2015
NO24.09.2015
GR25.09.2015
IS24.10.2015
PT26.10.2015
Former [2017/03]AT24.06.2015
BE24.06.2015
CZ24.06.2015
DK24.06.2015
EE24.06.2015
ES24.06.2015
FI24.06.2015
HR24.06.2015
IT24.06.2015
LT24.06.2015
LV24.06.2015
PL24.06.2015
RO24.06.2015
SI24.06.2015
SK24.06.2015
BG24.09.2015
NO24.09.2015
GR25.09.2015
IS24.10.2015
PT26.10.2015
Former [2016/36]AT24.06.2015
CZ24.06.2015
DK24.06.2015
EE24.06.2015
ES24.06.2015
FI24.06.2015
HR24.06.2015
IT24.06.2015
LT24.06.2015
LV24.06.2015
PL24.06.2015
RO24.06.2015
SI24.06.2015
SK24.06.2015
BG24.09.2015
NO24.09.2015
GR25.09.2015
IS24.10.2015
PT26.10.2015
Former [2016/21]AT24.06.2015
CZ24.06.2015
DK24.06.2015
EE24.06.2015
ES24.06.2015
FI24.06.2015
HR24.06.2015
IT24.06.2015
LT24.06.2015
LV24.06.2015
PL24.06.2015
RO24.06.2015
SK24.06.2015
BG24.09.2015
NO24.09.2015
GR25.09.2015
IS24.10.2015
PT26.10.2015
Former [2016/20]AT24.06.2015
CZ24.06.2015
DK24.06.2015
EE24.06.2015
ES24.06.2015
FI24.06.2015
HR24.06.2015
LT24.06.2015
LV24.06.2015
PL24.06.2015
RO24.06.2015
SK24.06.2015
BG24.09.2015
NO24.09.2015
GR25.09.2015
IS24.10.2015
PT26.10.2015
Former [2016/11]AT24.06.2015
CZ24.06.2015
EE24.06.2015
ES24.06.2015
FI24.06.2015
HR24.06.2015
LT24.06.2015
LV24.06.2015
PL24.06.2015
RO24.06.2015
SK24.06.2015
BG24.09.2015
NO24.09.2015
GR25.09.2015
IS24.10.2015
PT26.10.2015
Former [2016/10]CZ24.06.2015
EE24.06.2015
ES24.06.2015
FI24.06.2015
HR24.06.2015
LT24.06.2015
LV24.06.2015
PL24.06.2015
RO24.06.2015
SK24.06.2015
BG24.09.2015
NO24.09.2015
GR25.09.2015
IS24.10.2015
PT26.10.2015
Former [2016/09]EE24.06.2015
FI24.06.2015
HR24.06.2015
LT24.06.2015
LV24.06.2015
BG24.09.2015
NO24.09.2015
GR25.09.2015
Former [2015/50]FI24.06.2015
HR24.06.2015
LT24.06.2015
LV24.06.2015
BG24.09.2015
NO24.09.2015
GR25.09.2015
Former [2015/49]FI24.06.2015
HR24.06.2015
LT24.06.2015
LV24.06.2015
NO24.09.2015
GR25.09.2015
Documents cited:Search[A]DE19900635  (DEUTSCHES KREBSFORSCH [DE]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO02057423  (REGENERON PHARMA [US], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document *;
 [Y]WO03012449  (LONZA BIOLOGICS PLC [GB], et al) [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * page 3, lines 27-29 * * page 3, lines 15-19 *;
 [Y]US6576428  (ASSENMACHER MARIO [DE], et al) [Y] 1-15 * column 18, lines 16-35 * * column 18, lines 57-67 * * column 19, lines 2-4 * * claims 4,5,7,8,14,15,17,18 *;
 [Y]WO03099996  (BIOGEN INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * page 2, lines 10-16 * * page 2, lines 5-8 * * page 3, line 24 * * page 4, line 29 * * page 3, lines 19-20 * * page 4, lines 25-26 * * page 15, lines 20-22 *;
 [Y]US7166423  (MILTENYI STEFAN [DE], et al) [Y] 1-15 * column 5, lines 15-23 * * column 5, lines 27-31 * * column 5, lines 40-43 * * column 5, lines 48-51 * * column 6, lines 55-56 * * column 6, lines 4-6 * * column 6, line 67 - column 7, line 3 * * column 8, line 10 * * column 11, lines 39-40 *;
 [XP]  - A.S.H. HOCH, "Entwicklung eines Expressionssystems für rekombinante Antikörper in mammalischen Zellen", (20100520), URL: HTTP://WWW.DIGIBIB.TU-BS.DE/?DOCID=00033488, (20100924), XP002602569 [XP] 1-15 * pages 94-96 *
 [A]  - MANZ R ET AL, "Analysis and sorting of live cells according to secreted molecules, relocated to a cell-surface affinity matrix", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE UNITED STATES (PNAS), NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE, US LNKD- DOI:10.1073/PNAS.92.6.1921, (19950314), vol. 92, no. 6, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 1921 - 1925, XP002007404 [A] 1-15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.92.6.1921
 [A]  - MANZ R A ET AL, "Flow cytometric analysis of antibody-secreting cells", CYTOMETRY, ALAN LISS, NEW YORK, US, (19980101), no. suppl. 9, ISSN 0196-4763, pages 43 - 44, XP009139131 [A] 1-15 * the whole document *
 [A]  - BROSTERHUS H ET AL, "ENRICHMENT AND DETECTION OF LIVE ANTIGEN-SPECIFIC CD4+ AND CD8+ T CELLS BASED ON CYTOKINE SECRETION", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, WILEY - V C H VERLAG GMBH & CO. KGAA, DE LNKD- DOI:10.1002/(SICI)1521-4141(199912)29:12<4053::AID-IMMU4053>3.3.CO;2-3, (19991201), vol. 29, no. 12, ISSN 0014-2980, pages 4053 - 4059, XP000971503 [A] 1-15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1521-4141(199912)29:12<4053::AID-IMMU4053>3.3.CO;2-3
 [A]  - AKSELBAND YEVGENYA ET AL, "Isolation of rare isotype switch variants in hybridoma cell lines using an agarose gel microdrop-based protein secretion assay.", ASSAY AND DRUG DEVELOPMENT TECHNOLOGIES OCT 2003 LNKD- PUBMED:15090234, (200310), vol. 1, no. 5, ISSN 1540-658X, pages 619 - 626, XP002602570 [A] 1-15 * the whole document *
 [A]  - BREZINSKY S C G ET AL, "A simple method for enriching populations of transfected CHO cells for cells of higher specific productivity", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGICAL METHODS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V.,AMSTERDAM, NL LNKD- DOI:10.1016/S0022-1759(03)00108-X, (20030601), vol. 277, no. 1-2, ISSN 0022-1759, pages 141 - 155, XP004430554 [A] 1-15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0022-1759(03)00108-X
 [A]  - CARON ANTOINE W ET AL, "Fluorescent labeling in semi-solid medium for selection of mammalian cells secreting high-levels of recombinant proteins", BMC BIOTECHNOLOGY, BIOMED CENTRAL LTD. LONDON, GB LNKD- DOI:10.1186/1472-6750-9-42, (20090511), vol. 9, no. 1, ISSN 1472-6750, page 42, XP021058100 [A] 1-15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1472-6750-9-42
 [A]  - HOLMES P ET AL, "Improved cell line development by a high throughput affinity capture surface display technique to select for high secretors", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGICAL METHODS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V.,AMSTERDAM, NL LNKD- DOI:10.1016/S0022-1759(99)00181-7, (19991119), vol. 230, no. 1-2, ISSN 0022-1759, pages 141 - 147, XP002250983 [A] 1-15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0022-1759(99)00181-7
 [A]  - HANANIA ELIE G ET AL, "Automated in situ measurement of cell-specific antibody secretion and laser-mediated purification for rapid cloning of highly-secreting producers", BIOTECHNOLOGY AND BIOENGINEERING, (200509), vol. 91, no. 7, ISSN 0006-3592, pages 872 - 876, XP002602571 [A] 1-15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/BIT.20559
 [A]  - DZIONEK A ET AL, "BDCA-2, BDCA-3, AND BDCA-4: THREE MARKERS FOR DISTINCT SUBSETS OF DENDRITIC CELLS IN HUMAN PERIPHERAL BLOOD", IMMUNOLOGY, BLACKWELL PUBLISHING, OXFORD, GB, (20001201), vol. 165, no. 11, ISSN 0019-2805, pages 6037 - 6046, XP000986292 [A] 1-15 * the whole document *
by applicantUS4230685
 US4452773
 WO8504330
 US4770183
 US5385707
 US5411863
 US5543289
 US5693539
    - BORTH ET AL., BIOTECHNOLOGY AND BIOENGENEERING, (2001), vol. 71, pages 266 - 273
    - DZIONEK, A. ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (2000), vol. 165, pages 6037 - 46
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.