Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2208773

EP2208773 - Liquid crystalline medium [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  27.07.2012
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip24.07.2019Change - representative 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Merck Patent GmbH
Frankfurter Strasse 250
64293 Darmstadt / DE
[2010/29]
Inventor(s)01 / Klasen-Memmer, Melanie, Dr.
Donnersbergstrasse 3
67259 Heuchelheim / DE
02 / Schoen, Sabine, Dr.
August-Schmidt-Strasse 35
45701 Herten / DE
 [2010/29]
Representative(s)Lelkes, Robert
Patent Attorney
Habenschadenstraße 16
82049 Pullach im Isartal / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/35](deleted)
...
Application number, filing date10004670.501.07.2005
[2010/29]
Priority number, dateDE2004103232602.07.2004         Original published format: DE102004032326
[2010/29]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2208773
Date:21.07.2010
Language:DE
[2010/29]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2208773
Date:08.12.2010
[2010/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2208773
Date:29.08.2012
Language:DE
[2012/35]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.11.2010
ClassificationInternational:C09K19/02, C09K19/30, G02F1/13, C09K19/12, C09K19/44
[2012/07]
Former International [2010/29]C09K19/02, C09K19/30, G02F1/13
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/29]
TitleGerman:Flüssigkristallines Medium[2010/29]
English:Liquid crystalline medium[2010/29]
French:Milieu cristallin liquide[2010/29]
Examination procedure04.05.2010Examination requested  [2010/29]
08.06.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.03.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.05.2012Fee for grant paid
24.05.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP05755652.4  / EP1763570
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20050755652) is  14.08.2007
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  29.05.2013  06.06.2013  ADMISSIBLE
DIC Corporation
7 - 20, Nihonbashi 3 - chome Chuo-ku
Tokyo 103-8233 / JP
Opponent's representative
Adam, Holger
Kraus & Weisert
Patentanwälte PartGmbB
Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
 [2016/07]
Former [2014/38]
Opponent(s)01  29.05.2013  06.06.2013  ADMISSIBLE
DIC Corporation
Waterras Tower
101, Kanda Awajicho 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 101-0063 / JP
Opponent's representative
Adam, Holger
Kraus & Weisert
Patentanwälte PartGmbB
Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
Former [2013/28]
Opponent(s)01  29.05.2013  06.06.2013  ADMISSIBLE
DIC Corporation
Waterras Tower
101, Kanda Awajicho 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 101-0063 / JP
Opponent's representative
Albrecht, Thomas
Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
D-80539 München / DE
05.07.2013Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
15.01.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
17.09.2015Date of oral proceedings
21.10.2015Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
23.10.2015Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
Appeal following opposition23.12.2015Appeal received No.  T0041/16
02.03.2016Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.05.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
04.05.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
04.05.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
14.07.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
12.07.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
13.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU01.07.2005
CY29.08.2012
CZ29.08.2012
DK29.08.2012
EE29.08.2012
FI29.08.2012
IT29.08.2012
LT29.08.2012
LV29.08.2012
MC29.08.2012
NL29.08.2012
PL29.08.2012
RO29.08.2012
SE29.08.2012
SI29.08.2012
SK29.08.2012
TR29.08.2012
BG29.11.2012
GR30.11.2012
ES10.12.2012
IS29.12.2012
PT31.12.2012
AT01.07.2013
IE01.07.2013
LU01.07.2013
BE31.07.2013
CH31.07.2013
FR31.07.2013
LI31.07.2013
[2015/34]
Former [2015/32]CY29.08.2012
CZ29.08.2012
DK29.08.2012
EE29.08.2012
FI29.08.2012
IT29.08.2012
LT29.08.2012
LV29.08.2012
MC29.08.2012
NL29.08.2012
PL29.08.2012
RO29.08.2012
SE29.08.2012
SI29.08.2012
SK29.08.2012
TR29.08.2012
BG29.11.2012
GR30.11.2012
ES10.12.2012
IS29.12.2012
PT31.12.2012
AT01.07.2013
IE01.07.2013
BE31.07.2013
CH31.07.2013
FR31.07.2013
LI31.07.2013
Former [2014/51]CY29.08.2012
CZ29.08.2012
DK29.08.2012
EE29.08.2012
FI29.08.2012
IT29.08.2012
LT29.08.2012
LV29.08.2012
MC29.08.2012
NL29.08.2012
PL29.08.2012
RO29.08.2012
SE29.08.2012
SI29.08.2012
SK29.08.2012
BG29.11.2012
GR30.11.2012
ES10.12.2012
IS29.12.2012
PT31.12.2012
AT01.07.2013
IE01.07.2013
BE31.07.2013
CH31.07.2013
FR31.07.2013
LI31.07.2013
Former [2014/33]CY29.08.2012
CZ29.08.2012
DK29.08.2012
EE29.08.2012
FI29.08.2012
IT29.08.2012
LT29.08.2012
LV29.08.2012
MC29.08.2012
NL29.08.2012
PL29.08.2012
RO29.08.2012
SE29.08.2012
SI29.08.2012
SK29.08.2012
BG29.11.2012
GR30.11.2012
ES10.12.2012
IS29.12.2012
PT31.12.2012
IE01.07.2013
BE31.07.2013
CH31.07.2013
FR31.07.2013
LI31.07.2013
Former [2014/24]CY29.08.2012
CZ29.08.2012
DK29.08.2012
EE29.08.2012
FI29.08.2012
IT29.08.2012
LT29.08.2012
LV29.08.2012
MC29.08.2012
NL29.08.2012
PL29.08.2012
RO29.08.2012
SE29.08.2012
SI29.08.2012
SK29.08.2012
BG29.11.2012
GR30.11.2012
ES10.12.2012
IS29.12.2012
PT31.12.2012
BE31.07.2013
CH31.07.2013
FR31.07.2013
LI31.07.2013
Former [2014/23]CY29.08.2012
CZ29.08.2012
DK29.08.2012
EE29.08.2012
FI29.08.2012
IT29.08.2012
LT29.08.2012
LV29.08.2012
MC29.08.2012
NL29.08.2012
PL29.08.2012
RO29.08.2012
SE29.08.2012
SI29.08.2012
SK29.08.2012
BG29.11.2012
GR30.11.2012
ES10.12.2012
IS29.12.2012
PT31.12.2012
BE31.07.2013
CH31.07.2013
LI31.07.2013
Former [2014/20]CY29.08.2012
CZ29.08.2012
DK29.08.2012
EE29.08.2012
FI29.08.2012
IT29.08.2012
LT29.08.2012
LV29.08.2012
MC29.08.2012
NL29.08.2012
PL29.08.2012
RO29.08.2012
SE29.08.2012
SI29.08.2012
SK29.08.2012
BG29.11.2012
GR30.11.2012
ES10.12.2012
IS29.12.2012
PT31.12.2012
CH31.07.2013
LI31.07.2013
Former [2014/14]CY29.08.2012
CZ29.08.2012
DK29.08.2012
EE29.08.2012
FI29.08.2012
IT29.08.2012
LT29.08.2012
LV29.08.2012
MC29.08.2012
NL29.08.2012
PL29.08.2012
RO29.08.2012
SE29.08.2012
SI29.08.2012
SK29.08.2012
BG29.11.2012
GR30.11.2012
ES10.12.2012
IS29.12.2012
PT31.12.2012
Former [2013/34]CY29.08.2012
CZ29.08.2012
DK29.08.2012
EE29.08.2012
FI29.08.2012
IT29.08.2012
LT29.08.2012
LV29.08.2012
NL29.08.2012
PL29.08.2012
RO29.08.2012
SE29.08.2012
SI29.08.2012
SK29.08.2012
BG29.11.2012
GR30.11.2012
ES10.12.2012
IS29.12.2012
PT31.12.2012
Former [2013/23]CY29.08.2012
CZ29.08.2012
DK29.08.2012
EE29.08.2012
FI29.08.2012
IT29.08.2012
LT29.08.2012
LV29.08.2012
NL29.08.2012
PL29.08.2012
RO29.08.2012
SE29.08.2012
SI29.08.2012
SK29.08.2012
GR30.11.2012
ES10.12.2012
IS29.12.2012
PT31.12.2012
Former [2013/22]CY29.08.2012
CZ29.08.2012
DK29.08.2012
EE29.08.2012
FI29.08.2012
LT29.08.2012
LV29.08.2012
NL29.08.2012
SE29.08.2012
SI29.08.2012
GR30.11.2012
ES10.12.2012
IS29.12.2012
PT31.12.2012
Former [2013/21]CY29.08.2012
DK29.08.2012
FI29.08.2012
LT29.08.2012
LV29.08.2012
SE29.08.2012
SI29.08.2012
GR30.11.2012
IS29.12.2012
PT31.12.2012
Former [2013/13]CY29.08.2012
FI29.08.2012
LT29.08.2012
LV29.08.2012
SE29.08.2012
SI29.08.2012
GR30.11.2012
IS29.12.2012
PT31.12.2012
Former [2013/12]CY29.08.2012
FI29.08.2012
LT29.08.2012
LV29.08.2012
SE29.08.2012
SI29.08.2012
GR30.11.2012
IS29.12.2012
Former [2013/11]CY29.08.2012
FI29.08.2012
LT29.08.2012
LV29.08.2012
SI29.08.2012
GR30.11.2012
IS29.12.2012
Former [2013/10]CY29.08.2012
FI29.08.2012
LT29.08.2012
IS29.12.2012
Former [2013/09]FI29.08.2012
LT29.08.2012
Former [2013/08]LT29.08.2012
Documents cited:Search[I]DE10218976  (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE]) [I] 1-19 * examples 3,5,8-12 * * example 6; compound CC.3.V * * claim - *;
 [A]US2002014613  (KLASEN MELANIE [DE], et al) [A] 1-19 * examples 1-20; claims 1-3,14 *;
 [A]DE10112955  (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-19 * examples 1-9,11-15; claims 1,2,13 *;
 [A]US5599480  (TARUMI KAZUAKI [DE], et al) [A] 1-19 * examples 1-7; claims 1-11 *;
 [A]US6217953  (HECKMEIER MICHAEL [DE], et al) [A] 1-19 * example 1; claims 1-3,14 *;
 [A]US2001010366  (HECKMEIER MICHAEL [DE], et al) [A] 1-19 * examples 1-4; claims 1,2,6,15 *;
 [A]US2002084443  (HECKMEIER MICHAEL [DE], et al) [A] 1-19 * examples 1-5 *;
 [A]US2003006399  (REUTER MARCUS [DE], et al) [A] 1-19 * examples M1,M3,M4,M5 *;
 [AP]WO2004104137  (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE], et al) [AP] 1-19 * example M15; claim -; compound CC.3.V *
by applicantEP0240379
 DE2209127
 DE2240864
 DE2321632
 DE2338281
 DE2450088
 DE2637430
 DE2853728
    - M.F. SCHIECKEL; K. FAHRENSCHON, "Deformation of nematic liquid crystals with vertical orientation in electrical fields", APPL. PHYS. LETT., (1971), vol. 19, page 3912
    - J.F. KAHN, APPL. PHYS. LETT., (1972), vol. 20, page 1193
    - G. LABRUNIE; J. ROBERT, J. APPL. PHYS., (1973), vol. 44, page 4869
    - J. ROBERT; F. CLERC, SID 80 DIGEST TECHN. PAPERS, (1980), page 30
    - J. DUCHENE, DISPLAYS, (1986), vol. 7, page 3
    - H. SCHAD, SID 82 DIGEST TECHN. PAPERS, (1982), page 244
    - HALLER ET AL., MOL. CRYST. LIQ. CRYST., (1973), vol. 24, pages 249 - 258