Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2229894

EP2229894 - Surgical stapler with universal articulation and tissue pre-clamp [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  16.12.2011
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.10.2016New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of an appeal 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Covidien LP
15 Hampshire Street
Mansfield, MA 02048 / US
[2012/52]
Former [2012/01]For all designated states
Tyco Healthcare Group LP
Mailstop 8 N-1 555 Long Wharf Drive
New Haven, CT 06511 / US
Former [2010/38]For all designated states
Tyco Healthcare Group LP
60 Middletown Avenue
North Haven, CT 06473 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Olson, Lee Ann
125 South Elm Street
Wallingford, CT 06492 / US
02 / Stearns, Ralph A.
38 South Road
Bozrah, CT 06334 / US
03 / Emmons, Clifford L.
17 Morin Street
Oakville, CT 06779 / US
04 / Roy, Philip
263 Bittersweet Road
Orange, CT 06477 / US
05 / Beardsley, John W.
14 Kilen Road
Wallingford, CT 06492 / US
06 / Racenet, David C.
157 Northfield Road
Litchfield, CT 06759 / US
 [2010/38]
Representative(s)Soames, Candida Jane , et al
Maschio & Soames IP Limited
30 Carlton Crescent
Southampton SO15 2EW / GB
[N/P]
Former [2011/45]Soames, Candida Jane , et al
Edwards Wildman Innovations LLP
10 Carlton Crescent
Southampton SO15 2EZ / GB
Former [2010/38]Soames, Candida Jane
Edwards Angell Palmer & Dodge Innovations LLP 10 Carlton Crescent
Southampton SO15 2EZ / GB
Application number, filing date10006462.506.10.2003
[2010/38]
Priority number, dateUS20020416372P04.10.2002         Original published format: US 416372 P
[2010/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2229894
Date:22.09.2010
Language:EN
[2010/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2229894
Date:18.01.2012
Language:EN
[2012/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.08.2010
ClassificationInternational:A61B17/072, // A61B17/32
[2016/22]
Former International [2010/38]A61B17/072
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IE,   IT [2010/38]
TitleGerman:Universell schwenkbares chirurgisches Klammergerät und Gewebe-Vorklemme[2010/38]
English:Surgical stapler with universal articulation and tissue pre-clamp[2010/38]
French:Agrafeur chirurgical doté d'une articulation universelle et pré-clampage des tissus[2010/38]
Examination procedure22.03.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.03.2011Examination requested  [2011/17]
11.10.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.11.2011Fee for grant paid
30.11.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP03774605.4  / EP1545334
EP06013920.1  / EP1702568
EP08001812.0  / EP1915955
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20030774605) is  30.11.2005
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  10.10.2012  18.10.2012  ADMISSIBLE
ETHICON ENDO-SURGERY, INC.
4545 Creek Road Cincinnati
Ohio 45242-2839 / US
Opponent's representative
Tunstall, Christopher Stephen, et al
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
 [N/P]
Former [2012/47]
Opponent(s)01  10.10.2012  18.10.2012  ADMISSIBLE
ETHICON ENDO-SURGERY, INC.
4545 Creek Road Cincinnati
Ohio 45242-2839 / US
Opponent's representative
Tunstall, Christopher Stephen, et al
Carpmaels & Ransford One Southampton Row London
WC1B 5HA / GB
30.11.2012Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
04.06.2013Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
15.04.2016Date of oral proceedings
03.06.2016Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
03.06.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition12.08.2016Appeal received No.  T1794/16
13.10.2016Statement of grounds filed
26.07.2016Appeal received No.  T1794/16
06.10.2016Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.07.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
09.07.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
09.07.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
09.07.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
09.07.2010Renewal fee patent year 07
25.10.2010Renewal fee patent year 08
25.10.2011Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT06.10.2013
[2014/38]
Documents cited:Search[X]US4520817  (GREEN DAVID T [US]) [X] 1-4,6-8,10-13,15-19 * column 4, line 57 - column 12, line 47 * * figure - *;
 [X]US5954259  (VIOLA FRANK J [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7,8,10,11,13,14 * column 5, line 44 - column 7, line 12 * * column 7, line 56 - column 8, line 16 * * figures 5,9,10 *;
 [A]EP0741996  (ETHICON ENDO SURGERY INC [US]) [A] 9 * column 5, line 53 - column 7, line 21 * * figures 1-4 *
by applicantUS6250532
 US6330965
 US20030479379