Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2278836

EP2278836 - Method and apparatus for handling inter-RAT handover [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  26.10.2012
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Innovative Sonic Corporation
14F, No. 30
Beiping E. Rd.
Zhongzheng Dist.
Taipei City
10049 / TW
[2013/12]
Former [2011/04]For all designated states
Innovative Sonic Corporation
3F, No.58 Jhouzih St. Neihu District
Taipei City / TW
Inventor(s)01 / Ou, Meng-Hui
4F, No. 150, Li-Te Rd.
Peitou Taipei City / TW
 [2011/04]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/03]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
Former [2012/48]Görz, Ingo
Hoefer & Partner
Patentanwälte
Pilgersheimer Strasse 20
81543 München / DE
Former [2011/04]Görz, Ingo
Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte Pilgersheimer Strasse 20
81543 München / DE
Application number, filing date10006713.129.06.2010
[2011/04]
Priority number, dateUS20090221093P29.06.2009         Original published format: US 221093 P
[2011/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2278836
Date:26.01.2011
Language:EN
[2011/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2278836
Date:28.11.2012
Language:EN
[2012/48]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.10.2010
ClassificationInternational:H04W36/00
[2011/04]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2011/04]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Handhabung der Übergabe zwischen Funkzugangstechnologien[2011/04]
English:Method and apparatus for handling inter-RAT handover[2011/04]
French:Procédé et appareil pour traiter un transfert inter-rat[2011/04]
Examination procedure29.06.2010Examination requested  [2011/04]
27.06.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.12.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03)
16.03.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.06.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.10.2012Fee for grant paid
15.10.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  07.12.2011
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  23.08.2013   
Telefonaktiebolaget L M Ericsson (publ)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
Opponent's representative
Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2013/40]
Opponent(s)01  23.08.2013   
Telefonaktiebolaget L M Ericsson (publ)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
Opponent's representative
HOFFMANN EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
02.10.2013Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
14.04.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
06.10.2015Date of oral proceedings
30.11.2015Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
30.11.2015Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition10.02.2016Appeal received No.  T0443/16
11.04.2016Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.06.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU29.06.2010
AL28.11.2012
AT28.11.2012
BE28.11.2012
CY28.11.2012
CZ28.11.2012
DK28.11.2012
EE28.11.2012
HR28.11.2012
IS28.11.2012
LT28.11.2012
LV28.11.2012
MC28.11.2012
MK28.11.2012
MT28.11.2012
PL28.11.2012
RO28.11.2012
SI28.11.2012
SK28.11.2012
SM28.11.2012
TR28.11.2012
BG28.02.2013
NO28.02.2013
GR01.03.2013
PT28.03.2013
IE29.06.2013
LU29.06.2013
CH30.06.2014
LI30.06.2014
[2018/46]
Former [2016/32]HU29.06.2010
AT28.11.2012
BE28.11.2012
CY28.11.2012
CZ28.11.2012
DK28.11.2012
EE28.11.2012
HR28.11.2012
IS28.11.2012
LT28.11.2012
LV28.11.2012
MC28.11.2012
MK28.11.2012
MT28.11.2012
PL28.11.2012
RO28.11.2012
SI28.11.2012
SK28.11.2012
SM28.11.2012
TR28.11.2012
BG28.02.2013
NO28.02.2013
GR01.03.2013
PT28.03.2013
IE29.06.2013
LU29.06.2013
CH30.06.2014
LI30.06.2014
Former [2015/34]HU29.06.2010
AT28.11.2012
BE28.11.2012
CY28.11.2012
CZ28.11.2012
DK28.11.2012
EE28.11.2012
HR28.11.2012
LT28.11.2012
LV28.11.2012
MC28.11.2012
MK28.11.2012
MT28.11.2012
PL28.11.2012
RO28.11.2012
SI28.11.2012
SK28.11.2012
SM28.11.2012
TR28.11.2012
BG28.02.2013
NO28.02.2013
GR01.03.2013
PT28.03.2013
IE29.06.2013
LU29.06.2013
CH30.06.2014
LI30.06.2014
Former [2015/32]AT28.11.2012
BE28.11.2012
CY28.11.2012
CZ28.11.2012
DK28.11.2012
EE28.11.2012
HR28.11.2012
LT28.11.2012
LV28.11.2012
MC28.11.2012
MK28.11.2012
MT28.11.2012
PL28.11.2012
RO28.11.2012
SI28.11.2012
SK28.11.2012
SM28.11.2012
TR28.11.2012
BG28.02.2013
NO28.02.2013
GR01.03.2013
PT28.03.2013
IE29.06.2013
CH30.06.2014
LI30.06.2014
Former [2015/24]AT28.11.2012
BE28.11.2012
CY28.11.2012
CZ28.11.2012
DK28.11.2012
EE28.11.2012
HR28.11.2012
LT28.11.2012
LV28.11.2012
MC28.11.2012
MT28.11.2012
PL28.11.2012
RO28.11.2012
SI28.11.2012
SK28.11.2012
SM28.11.2012
BG28.02.2013
NO28.02.2013
GR01.03.2013
PT28.03.2013
IE29.06.2013
CH30.06.2014
LI30.06.2014
Former [2015/20]AT28.11.2012
BE28.11.2012
CY28.11.2012
CZ28.11.2012
DK28.11.2012
EE28.11.2012
HR28.11.2012
LT28.11.2012
LV28.11.2012
MC28.11.2012
MT28.11.2012
PL28.11.2012
RO28.11.2012
SI28.11.2012
SK28.11.2012
BG28.02.2013
NO28.02.2013
GR01.03.2013
PT28.03.2013
IE29.06.2013
CH30.06.2014
LI30.06.2014
Former [2015/13]AT28.11.2012
BE28.11.2012
CY28.11.2012
CZ28.11.2012
DK28.11.2012
EE28.11.2012
HR28.11.2012
LT28.11.2012
LV28.11.2012
MC28.11.2012
MT28.11.2012
PL28.11.2012
RO28.11.2012
SI28.11.2012
SK28.11.2012
BG28.02.2013
NO28.02.2013
GR01.03.2013
PT28.03.2013
IE29.06.2013
Former [2014/20]AT28.11.2012
BE28.11.2012
CY28.11.2012
CZ28.11.2012
DK28.11.2012
EE28.11.2012
HR28.11.2012
LT28.11.2012
LV28.11.2012
MC28.11.2012
PL28.11.2012
RO28.11.2012
SI28.11.2012
SK28.11.2012
BG28.02.2013
NO28.02.2013
GR01.03.2013
PT28.03.2013
IE29.06.2013
Former [2014/08]AT28.11.2012
BE28.11.2012
CY28.11.2012
CZ28.11.2012
DK28.11.2012
EE28.11.2012
HR28.11.2012
LT28.11.2012
LV28.11.2012
MC28.11.2012
PL28.11.2012
RO28.11.2012
SI28.11.2012
SK28.11.2012
BG28.02.2013
NO28.02.2013
GR01.03.2013
PT28.03.2013
Former [2013/52]AT28.11.2012
BE28.11.2012
CY28.11.2012
CZ28.11.2012
DK28.11.2012
EE28.11.2012
HR28.11.2012
LT28.11.2012
LV28.11.2012
PL28.11.2012
RO28.11.2012
SI28.11.2012
SK28.11.2012
BG28.02.2013
NO28.02.2013
GR01.03.2013
PT28.03.2013
Former [2013/37]AT28.11.2012
BE28.11.2012
CZ28.11.2012
DK28.11.2012
EE28.11.2012
HR28.11.2012
LT28.11.2012
LV28.11.2012
PL28.11.2012
RO28.11.2012
SI28.11.2012
SK28.11.2012
BG28.02.2013
NO28.02.2013
GR01.03.2013
PT28.03.2013
Former [2013/35]AT28.11.2012
BE28.11.2012
CZ28.11.2012
DK28.11.2012
EE28.11.2012
HR28.11.2012
LT28.11.2012
LV28.11.2012
PL28.11.2012
SI28.11.2012
SK28.11.2012
BG28.02.2013
NO28.02.2013
GR01.03.2013
PT28.03.2013
Former [2013/34]AT28.11.2012
BE28.11.2012
DK28.11.2012
HR28.11.2012
LT28.11.2012
LV28.11.2012
PL28.11.2012
SI28.11.2012
BG28.02.2013
NO28.02.2013
GR01.03.2013
PT28.03.2013
Former [2013/31]AT28.11.2012
BE28.11.2012
HR28.11.2012
LT28.11.2012
LV28.11.2012
PL28.11.2012
SI28.11.2012
NO28.02.2013
GR01.03.2013
PT28.03.2013
Former [2013/28]BE28.11.2012
HR28.11.2012
LT28.11.2012
LV28.11.2012
PL28.11.2012
SI28.11.2012
NO28.02.2013
GR01.03.2013
PT28.03.2013
Former [2013/27]BE28.11.2012
HR28.11.2012
LT28.11.2012
LV28.11.2012
PL28.11.2012
SI28.11.2012
NO28.02.2013
GR01.03.2013
Former [2013/26]HR28.11.2012
LT28.11.2012
LV28.11.2012
PL28.11.2012
SI28.11.2012
NO28.02.2013
GR01.03.2013
Former [2013/24]HR28.11.2012
LT28.11.2012
LV28.11.2012
PL28.11.2012
NO28.02.2013
GR01.03.2013
Former [2013/23]HR28.11.2012
LT28.11.2012
LV28.11.2012
PL28.11.2012
NO28.02.2013
Former [2013/20]LT28.11.2012
NO28.02.2013
Documents cited:Search[XI]  - PANASONIC, "Timers and constants values used during handover to E-UTRA", 3GPP DRAFT; R2-090097, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20090106), no. Ljubljana; 20090106, XP050322138 [X] 1,2 * paragraphs [0001] - [0003] * [I] 3-8
 [A]  - DAS D ET AL, "Evaluation of mobile handset recovery from radio link failure in a multi-RATS environment", INTERNET MULTIMEDIA SERVICES ARCHITECTURE AND APPLICATIONS, 2008. IMSAA 2008. 2ND INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20081210), ISBN 978-1-4244-2684-3, pages 1 - 6, XP031408578 [A] 1-8 * page 5, column r, paragraph IV *
 [AD]  - ERICSSON ET AL, "Providing per QCI radio link failure timers", 3GPP DRAFT; R2-093802 PER QCI RADIO-LINK FAILURE TIMERS-V1, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20090623), no. Los Angeles, USA; 20090623, XP050352019 [AD] 1-8 * the whole document *
 [AD]  - ERICSSON ET AL, "Dedicated signalling of Radio Link Failure timers/counters", 3GPP DRAFT; R2-093803 DEDICATED RLF TIMERS CR R1, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20090623), no. Los Angeles, USA; 20090623, XP050352020 [AD] 1-8 * the whole document *