Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2402396

EP2402396 - Oxygen scavenging plastic material [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  25.06.2017
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.12.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
04.12.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Clariant Masterbatches (Italia) S.p.A.
Via Lainate, 26
20010 Pogliano Milanese / IT
[2012/01]
Inventor(s)01 / Fava, Flavio
Via del Monastero 6
20015 Parabiago (MI) / IT
 [2012/01]
Representative(s)Mikulecky, Klaus , et al
Clariant Produkte (Deutschland) GmbH
Patent & License Management Chemicals
Industriepark Höchst, G 860
65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE
[N/P]
Former [2015/09]Hütter, Klaus , et al
Clariant Produkte (Deutschland) GmbH
Patent Management
Industriepark Höchst, G 860
65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE
Former [2012/01]Hütter, Klaus , et al
Clariant Produkte (Deutschland) GmbH Group Intellectual Property Am Unisys-Park 1
65843 Sulzbach / DE
Application number, filing date10006748.730.06.2010
[2012/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2402396
Date:04.01.2012
Language:EN
[2012/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2402396
Date:25.02.2015
Language:EN
[2015/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.02.2011
ClassificationInternational:C08L67/00, C08K5/00, B65D81/00, C08G63/00
[2012/01]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   HU,   IT,   LI,   NL,   NO,   PL,   SE,   TR [2015/03]
Former [2012/01]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Sauerstoffaufnehmendes Kunststofmaterial[2012/01]
English:Oxygen scavenging plastic material[2012/01]
French:Matériau plastique désoxygénant[2012/01]
Examination procedure26.05.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.07.2012Examination requested  [2012/33]
08.03.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.04.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.09.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.12.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
05.01.2015Fee for grant paid
05.01.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  08.03.2013
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  25.11.2015  02.12.2015  ADMISSIBLE
ColorMatrix Europe Limited, ColorMatrix Europe BV, PolyOne Corporation
9-15 Unity Grove, Knowsley Business Park
Hastelweg 269-273, 33587 Walker Road
Knowsley, 5652 Eindhoven, Avon Lake OH 44012
Merseyside L34 9GT / GB
Opponent's representative
Appleyard Lees IP LLP
15 Clare Road
Halifax HX1 2HY / GB
 02  25.11.2015  30.11.2015  ADMISSIBLE
M&G USA Corporation
State Route 2
Apple Grove, WV 25502 / US
Opponent's representative
Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2016/01]
Opponent(s)01  25.11.2015  02.12.2015  ADMISSIBLE
ColorMatrix Europe Limited, ColorMatrix Europe BV, PolyOne Corporation
9-15 Unity Grove, Knowsley Business Park
Hastelweg 269-273, 33587 Walker Road
Knowsley, 5652 Eindhoven, Avon Lake OH 44012
Merseyside L34 9GT / GB
Opponent's representative
Appleyard Lees
15 Clare Road
Halifax HX1 2HY / GB
 02  25.11.2015  30.11.2015  ADMISSIBLE
M&G USA Corporation
State Route 2
Apple Grove, WV 25502 / US
Opponent's representative
Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
08.01.2016Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
23.06.2016Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
14.06.2017Date of oral proceedings
26.06.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
26.06.2017Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition21.08.2017Appeal received No.  T1878/17
21.08.2017Statement of grounds filed
09.12.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
01.07.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
30.06.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[X]WO2006063032  (CONSTAR INT INC [US], et al) [X] 1-6,8-15 * paragraphs [0162] - [0164]; table 7 *;
 [X]WO0110945  (EASTMAN CHEM CO [US]) [X] 1-15 * page 14, paragraph 3; claims 1,14,16 * * example 1 *;
 [A]EP1655238  (TOYO SEIKAN KAISHA LTD [JP]) [A] 1-15 * claims 1,3,4,5,6 * * paragraphs [0078] , [0080] , [0081] * * paragraphs [0048] - [0058] *;
 [Y]EP0507207  (GRACE W R & CO [US]) [Y] 1,2,4-15 * claims 1,10 * * examples 5-18 * * page 4, lines 49-54 *;
 [Y]US5700554  (SPEER DREW V [US], et al) [Y] 1,2,4-15 * claims 1,4,18 * * column 5, lines 16,17 * * examples 3-30 *;
 [Y]WO9915433  (AMOCO CORP [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * claims 1,4,6,13,14 * * pages 16-24 * * pages 33-34; table 3 *;
 [X]WO2005023530  (INVISTA TECH SARL [CH], et al) [X] 1-3,6-14 * claims 1,8 *;
 [Y]WO0110947  (EASTMAN CHEM CO [US]) [Y] 1-15 * claims 1,2-7,13,18,19,29-33,41,44 * * pages 10-11 * * examples 1-8 *;
 [X]WO2009029479  (VALSPAR SOURCING INC [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * claims 1,3,4 *
by applicantUS5021515
 US5639815
 US5955527
 US5302430
 EP0527903
 US5310497
 US5211875
 US5346644
 US5350622
 WO0233024
 US5811027
 US6500895
OppositionUS5021515
 EP2128197
 WO2007089517
 US2004234797
 JP2000319408
 JP2003128151
 EP1769845