Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2251344

EP2251344 - FORMULATION OF BORONIC ACID COMPOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2010/46]Formulation of boronic acid compounds
[2016/03]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  26.02.2016
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.11.2019Change - representative 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, represented by THE SECRETARY, DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
National Institutes of Health, Office of Technology Transfer, Suite 325
6011 Executive Boulevard, Rockville, MD 20852 / US
[2016/13]
Former [2010/46]For all designated states
THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, represented by THE SECRETARY, DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
National Institutes of Health, Office of Technology Transfer, Suite 325
6011 Executive Boulevard, Rockville, MD 20852 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Gupta, Shanker
14620 Pommel Drive
Rockville MD 20850 / US
 [2010/46]
Representative(s)Mathys & Squire
The Shard
32 London Bridge Street
London SE1 9SG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2016/13]Adams, Harvey Vaughan John , et al
Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard
32 London Bridge Street
London SE1 9SG / GB
Former [2012/44]Adams, Harvey Vaughan John , et al
Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London
EC1N 2SQ / GB
Former [2010/46]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
Application number, filing date10006835.225.01.2002
[2010/46]
Priority number, dateUS20010264160P25.01.2001         Original published format: US 264160 P
[2010/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2251344
Date:17.11.2010
Language:EN
[2010/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2251344
Date:30.03.2016
Language:EN
[2016/13]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.10.2010
ClassificationInternational:C07F5/02, C07F5/04, C07C7/00, C07K5/06, C07K5/08, C07K5/078, A61K38/00, A61K38/05, A61K31/69, A61P35/00, A61P29/00, C07K7/02
[2015/44]
Former International [2010/46]C07F5/02, C07F5/04, C07K5/078, A61K38/05, A61K31/69, A61P35/00, A61P29/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2016/13]
Former [2010/46]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:FORMULIERUNGEN VON BORONSÄUREVERBINDUNGEN[2018/52]
English:FORMULATION OF BORONIC ACID COMPOUNDS[2016/03]
French:Formulation des composes d'acide boronique[2018/52]
Former [2010/46]Formulierung von Boronsäureverbindungen
Former [2010/46]Formulation of boronic acid compounds
Former [2010/46]Formulation des composes d'acide boronique
Examination procedure01.07.2010Examination requested  [2010/46]
12.05.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
28.07.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.12.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.02.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M16)
18.07.2014Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
29.09.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.02.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.07.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.12.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.12.2015Fee for grant paid
23.12.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
23.12.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
11.01.2016Observations by third parties
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP02709145.3  / EP1355910
Divisional application(s)EP16157001.5  / EP3078667
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20020709145) is  17.01.2007
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  21.12.2016  02.01.2017  ADMISSIBLE
HGF Limited
1 City Walk
Leeds Yorkshire LS11 9DX / GB
Opponent's representative
HGF Limited, et al
1 City Walk
Leeds LS11 9DX / GB
 02  21.12.2016  03.01.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Pfizer Inc.
235 East 42nd Street
New York, NY 10017 / US
Opponent's representative
Elkington and Fife LLP
Prospect House
8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
 03  22.12.2016  09.01.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Accord Healthcare Ltd
Sage House
319 Pinner Road
North Harrow Middlesex
HA1 4HF / GB
Opponent's representative
Hoffmann Eitle, et al
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
 04  23.12.2016  09.01.2017  ADMISSIBLE
LEK Pharmaceuticals d.d.
Verovskova 57
1526 Ljubljana / SI
Opponent's representative
Best, Michael, et al
Lederer & Keller
Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Unsöldstrasse 2
80538 München / DE
 05  23.12.2016  09.01.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Synthon B.V.
Microweg 22
6545 CM Nijmegen / NL
Opponent's representative
Prins, Hendrik Willem, et al
Arnold & Siedsma
Bezuidenhoutseweg 57
2594 AC The Hague / NL
 06  27.12.2016  15.05.2017  DEEMED NOT TO HAVE BEEN FILED
Fresenius Kabi Deutschland GmbH
Else-Krömer-Strasse 1
61352 Bad Homburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Fresenius Kabi Deutschland GmbH, et al
Patent Department
Pharmaceuticals Division
Borkenberg 14
61440 Oberursel / DE
 07  27.12.2016  11.01.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Pentafarma Sociedade Técnico-Medicinal S.A.
Rua da Tapada Grande, n. 2
2710-089 Abrunheira / PT
Opponent's representative
Hoffmann Eitle, et al
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
 08  30.12.2016  12.01.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Generics (U.K.) Limited
Station Close
Potters Bar
Hertfordshire EN6 1TL / GB
Opponent's representative
Elkington and Fife LLP
Prospect House
8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
 09  30.12.2016  12.01.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Teva Pharmaceuticals Inc.
5 Basel St.
49131 Petach Tikva / IL
Opponent's representative
Hamm&Wittkopp Patentanwälte PartmbB
Jungfernstieg 38
20354 Hamburg / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2019/22]
Opponent(s)01  21.12.2016  02.01.2017  ADMISSIBLE
HGF Limited
1 City Walk
Leeds Yorkshire LS11 9DX / GB
Opponent's representative
HGF Limited, et al
1 City Walk
Leeds LS11 9DX / GB
 02  21.12.2016  03.01.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Pfizer Inc.
235 East 42nd Street
New York, NY 10017 / US
Opponent's representative
Elkington and Fife LLP
Prospect House
8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
 03  22.12.2016  09.01.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Accord Healthcare Ltd
Sage House
319 Pinner Road
North Harrow Middlesex
HA1 4HF / GB
Opponent's representative
Hoffmann Eitle, et al
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
 04  23.12.2016  09.01.2017  ADMISSIBLE
LEK Pharmaceuticals d.d.
Verovskova 57
1526 Ljubljana / SI
Opponent's representative
Best, Michael, et al
Lederer & Keller
Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Unsöldstrasse 2
80538 München / DE
 05  23.12.2016  09.01.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Synthon B.V.
Microweg 22
6545 CM Nijmegen / NL
Opponent's representative
Prins, Hendrik Willem, et al
Arnold & Siedsma
Bezuidenhoutseweg 57
2594 AC The Hague / NL
 06  27.12.2016  15.05.2017  DEEMED NOT TO HAVE BEEN FILED
Fresenius Kabi Deutschland GmbH
Else-Krömer-Strasse 1
61352 Bad Homburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Fresenius Kabi Deutschland GmbH, et al
Patent Department
Pharmaceuticals Division
Borkenberg 14
61440 Oberursel / DE
 07  27.12.2016  11.01.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Pentafarma Sociedade Técnico-Medicinal S.A.
Rua da Tapada Grande, n. 2
2710-089 Abrunheira / PT
Opponent's representative
Hoffmann Eitle, et al
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
 08  30.12.2016  12.01.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Generics (U.K.) Limited
Station Close
Potters Bar
Hertfordshire EN6 1TL / GB
Opponent's representative
Elkington and Fife LLP
Prospect House
8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
 09  30.12.2016  12.01.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Teva Pharmaceuticals Inc.
5 Basel St.
49131 Petach Tikva / IL
Opponent's representative
Hamm&Wittkopp Patentanwälte PartmbB
Jungfernstieg 38
20354 Hamburg / DE
Former [2019/17]
Opponent(s)01  21.12.2016  02.01.2017  ADMISSIBLE
HGF Limited
1 City Walk
Leeds Yorkshire LS11 9DX / GB
Opponent's representative
HGF Limited, et al
1 City Walk
Leeds LS11 9DX / GB
 02  21.12.2016  03.01.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Pfizer Inc.
235 East 42nd Street
New York, NY 10017 / US
Opponent's representative
Elkington and Fife LLP
Prospect House
8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
 03  22.12.2016  09.01.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Accord Healthcare Ltd
Sage House
319 Pinner Road
North Harrow Middlesex
HA1 4HF / GB
Opponent's representative
Hoffmann Eitle, et al
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
 04  23.12.2016  09.01.2017  ADMISSIBLE
LEK Pharmaceuticals d.d.
Verovskova 57
1526 Ljubljana / SI
Opponent's representative
Prüfer & Partner mbB Patentanwälte · Rechtsanwälte, et al
Sohnckestraße 12
81479 München / DE
 05  23.12.2016  09.01.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Synthon B.V.
Microweg 22
6545 CM Nijmegen / NL
Opponent's representative
Prins, Hendrik Willem, et al
Arnold & Siedsma
Bezuidenhoutseweg 57
2594 AC The Hague / NL
 06  27.12.2016  15.05.2017  DEEMED NOT TO HAVE BEEN FILED
Fresenius Kabi Deutschland GmbH
Else-Krömer-Strasse 1
61352 Bad Homburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Fresenius Kabi Deutschland GmbH, et al
Patent Department
Pharmaceuticals Division
Borkenberg 14
61440 Oberursel / DE
 07  27.12.2016  11.01.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Pentafarma Sociedade Técnico-Medicinal S.A.
Rua da Tapada Grande, n. 2
2710-089 Abrunheira / PT
Opponent's representative
Hoffmann Eitle, et al
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
 08  30.12.2016  12.01.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Generics (U.K.) Limited
Station Close
Potters Bar
Hertfordshire EN6 1TL / GB
Opponent's representative
Elkington and Fife LLP
Prospect House
8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
 09  30.12.2016  12.01.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Teva Pharmaceuticals Inc.
5 Basel St.
49131 Petach Tikva / IL
Opponent's representative
Hamm&Wittkopp Patentanwälte PartmbB
Jungfernstieg 38
20354 Hamburg / DE
Former [2019/04]
Opponent(s)01  21.12.2016  02.01.2017  ADMISSIBLE
HGF Limited
1 City Walk
Leeds Yorkshire LS11 9DX / GB
Opponent's representative
HGF Limited, et al
1 City Walk
Leeds LS11 9DX / GB
 02  21.12.2016  03.01.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Pfizer Inc.
235 East 42nd Street
New York, NY 10017 / US
Opponent's representative
Elkington & Fife LLP
Prospect House
8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
 03  22.12.2016  09.01.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Accord Healthcare Ltd
Sage House
319 Pinner Road
North Harrow Middlesex
HA1 4HF / GB
Opponent's representative
Hoffmann Eitle, et al
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
 04  23.12.2016  09.01.2017  ADMISSIBLE
LEK Pharmaceuticals d.d.
Verovskova 57
1526 Ljubljana / SI
Opponent's representative
Prüfer & Partner mbB Patentanwälte · Rechtsanwälte, et al
Sohnckestraße 12
81479 München / DE
 05  23.12.2016  09.01.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Synthon B.V.
Microweg 22
6545 CM Nijmegen / NL
Opponent's representative
Prins, Hendrik Willem, et al
Arnold & Siedsma
Bezuidenhoutseweg 57
2594 AC The Hague / NL
 06  27.12.2016  15.05.2017  DEEMED NOT TO HAVE BEEN FILED
Fresenius Kabi Deutschland GmbH
Else-Krömer-Strasse 1
61352 Bad Homburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Fresenius Kabi Deutschland GmbH, et al
Patent Department
Pharmaceuticals Division
Borkenberg 14
61440 Oberursel / DE
 07  27.12.2016  11.01.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Pentafarma Sociedade Técnico-Medicinal S.A.
Rua da Tapada Grande, n. 2
2710-089 Abrunheira / PT
Opponent's representative
Hoffmann Eitle, et al
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
 08  30.12.2016  12.01.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Generics (U.K.) Limited
Station Close
Potters Bar
Hertfordshire EN6 1TL / GB
Opponent's representative
FRKelly
27 Clyde Road
Dublin D04 F838 / IE
 09  30.12.2016  12.01.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Teva Pharmaceuticals Inc.
5 Basel St.
49131 Petach Tikva / IL
Opponent's representative
Hamm&Wittkopp Patentanwälte PartmbB
Jungfernstieg 38
20354 Hamburg / DE
Former [2018/03]
Opponent(s)01  21.12.2016  02.01.2017  ADMISSIBLE
HGF Limited
1 City Walk
Leeds Yorkshire LS11 9DX / GB
Opponent's representative
HGF Limited, et al
1 City Walk
Leeds LS11 9DX / GB
 02  21.12.2016  03.01.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Pfizer Inc.
235 East 42nd Street
New York, NY 10017 / US
Opponent's representative
Royle, Matthew Charles James, et al
Taylor Wessing LLP 5 New Street Square
London EC4A 3TW / GB
 03  22.12.2016  09.01.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Accord Healthcare Ltd
Sage House
319 Pinner Road
North Harrow Middlesex
HA1 4HF / GB
Opponent's representative
Hoffmann Eitle, et al
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
 04  23.12.2016  09.01.2017  ADMISSIBLE
LEK Pharmaceuticals d.d.
Verovskova 57
1526 Ljubljana / SI
Opponent's representative
Prüfer & Partner mbB Patentanwälte · Rechtsanwälte, et al
Sohnckestraße 12
81479 München / DE
 05  23.12.2016  09.01.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Synthon B.V.
Microweg 22
6545 CM Nijmegen / NL
Opponent's representative
Prins, Hendrik Willem, et al
Arnold & Siedsma
Bezuidenhoutseweg 57
2594 AC The Hague / NL
 06  27.12.2016  15.05.2017  DEEMED NOT TO HAVE BEEN FILED
Fresenius Kabi Deutschland GmbH
Else-Krömer-Strasse 1
61352 Bad Homburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Fresenius Kabi Deutschland GmbH, et al
Patent Department
Pharmaceuticals Division
Borkenberg 14
61440 Oberursel / DE
 07  27.12.2016  11.01.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Pentafarma Sociedade Técnico-Medicinal S.A.
Rua da Tapada Grande, n. 2
2710-089 Abrunheira / PT
Opponent's representative
Hoffmann Eitle, et al
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
 08  30.12.2016  12.01.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Generics (U.K.) Limited
Station Close
Potters Bar
Hertfordshire EN6 1TL / GB
Opponent's representative
FRKelly
27 Clyde Road
Dublin D04 F838 / IE
 09  30.12.2016  12.01.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Teva Pharmaceuticals Inc.
5 Basel St.
49131 Petach Tikva / IL
Opponent's representative
Hamm&Wittkopp Patentanwälte PartmbB
Jungfernstieg 38
20354 Hamburg / DE
Former [2017/40]
Opponent(s)01  21.12.2016  02.01.2017  ADMISSIBLE
HGF Limited
1 City Walk
Leeds Yorkshire LS11 9DX / GB
Opponent's representative
HGF Limited, et al
1 City Walk
Leeds LS11 9DX / GB
 02  21.12.2016  03.01.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Pfizer Inc.
235 East 42nd Street
New York, NY 10017 / US
Opponent's representative
Royle, Matthew Charles James, et al
Taylor Wessing LLP 5 New Street Square
London EC4A 3TW / GB
 03  22.12.2016  09.01.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Accord Healthcare Ltd
Sage House
319 Pinner Road
North Harrow Middlesex
HA1 4HF / GB
Opponent's representative
Hoffmann Eitle, et al
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
 04  23.12.2016  09.01.2017  ADMISSIBLE
LEK Pharmaceuticals d.d.
Verovskova 57
1526 Ljubljana / SI
Opponent's representative
Prüfer & Partner mbB Patentanwälte · Rechtsanwälte, et al
Sohnckestraße 12
81479 München / DE
 05  23.12.2016  09.01.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Synthon Biopharmaceuticals B.V.
Microweg 22
6545 CM Nijmegen / NL
Opponent's representative
Prins, Hendrik Willem, et al
Arnold & Siedsma
Bezuidenhoutseweg 57
2594 AC The Hague / NL
 06  27.12.2016  15.05.2017  DEEMED NOT TO HAVE BEEN FILED
Fresenius Kabi Deutschland GmbH
Else-Krömer-Strasse 1
61352 Bad Homburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Fresenius Kabi Deutschland GmbH, et al
Patent Department
Pharmaceuticals Division
Borkenberg 14
61440 Oberursel / DE
 07  27.12.2016  11.01.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Pentafarma Sociedade Técnico-Medicinal S.A.
Rua da Tapada Grande, n. 2
2710-089 Abrunheira / PT
Opponent's representative
Hoffmann Eitle, et al
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
 08  30.12.2016  12.01.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Generics (U.K.) Limited
Station Close
Potters Bar
Hertfordshire EN6 1TL / GB
Opponent's representative
FRKelly
27 Clyde Road
Dublin D04 F838 / IE
 09  30.12.2016  12.01.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Teva Pharmaceuticals Inc.
5 Basel St.
49131 Petach Tikva / IL
Opponent's representative
Hamm & Wittkopp Patentanwälte PartmbB
Jungfernstieg 38
20354 Hamburg / DE
Former [2017/30]
Opponent(s)01  21.12.2016  02.01.2017  ADMISSIBLE
HGF Limited
1 City Walk
Leeds Yorkshire LS11 9DX / GB
Opponent's representative
HGF Limited, et al
1 City Walk
Leeds LS11 9DX / GB
 02  21.12.2016  03.01.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Pfizer Inc.
235 East 42nd Street
New York, NY 10017 / US
Opponent's representative
Royle, Matthew Charles James, et al
Taylor Wessing LLP 5 New Street Square
London EC4A 3TW / GB
 03  22.12.2016  09.01.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Accord Healthcare Ltd
Sage House
319 Pinner Road
North Harrow Middlesex
HA1 4HF / GB
Opponent's representative
Hoffmann Eitle, et al
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
 04  23.12.2016  09.01.2017  ADMISSIBLE
LEK Pharmaceuticals d.d.
Verovskova 57
1526 Ljubljana / SI
Opponent's representative
Prüfer & Partner mbB Patentanwälte · Rechtsanwälte, et al
Sohnckestraße 12
81479 München / DE
 05  23.12.2016  09.01.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Synthon Biopharmaceuticals B.V.
Microweg 22
6545 CM Nijmegen / NL
Opponent's representative
Prins, Hendrik Willem, et al
Arnold & Siedsma
Bezuidenhoutseweg 57
2594 AC The Hague / NL
 06  27.12.2016  15.05.2017  DEEMED NOT TO HAVE BEEN FILED
Fresenius Kabi Deutschland GmbH
Else-Krömer-Strasse 1
61352 Bad Homburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Fresenius Kabi Deutschland GmbH, et al
Patent Department
Pharmaceuticals Division
Borkenberg 14
61440 Oberursel / DE
 07  27.12.2016  11.01.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Pentafarma Sociedade Técnico-Medicinal S.A.
Rua da Tapada Grande, n. 2
2710-089 Abrunheira / PT
Opponent's representative
Hoffmann Eitle, et al
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
 08  30.12.2016  12.01.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Generics (U.K.) Limited
Station Close
Potters Bar
Hertfordshire EN6 1TL / GB
Opponent's representative
McNally, Roisin, et al
FRKelly
4 Mount Charles
Belfast Antrim BT7 1NZ / GB
 09  30.12.2016  12.01.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Teva Pharmaceuticals Inc.
5 Basel St.
49131 Petach Tikva / IL
Opponent's representative
Hamm & Wittkopp Patentanwälte PartmbB
Jungfernstieg 38
20354 Hamburg / DE
Former [2017/27]
Opponent(s)01  21.12.2016  02.01.2017  ADMISSIBLE
HGF Limited
1 City Walk
Leeds Yorkshire LS11 9DX / GB
Opponent's representative
HGF Limited, et al
1 City Walk
Leeds LS11 9DX / GB
 02  21.12.2016  03.01.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Pfizer Inc.
235 East 42nd Street
New York, NY 10017 / US
Opponent's representative
Royle, Matthew Charles James, et al
Taylor Wessing LLP 5 New Street Square
London EC4A 3TW / GB
 03  22.12.2016  09.01.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Accord Healthcare Ltd
Sage House
319 Pinner Road
North Harrow Middlesex
HA1 4HF / GB
Opponent's representative
Hoffmann Eitle, et al
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
 04  23.12.2016  09.01.2017  ADMISSIBLE
LEK Pharmaceuticals d.d.
Verovskova 57
1526 Ljubljana / SI
Opponent's representative
Prüfer & Partner mbB Patentanwälte · Rechtsanwälte, et al
Sohnckestraße 12
81479 München / DE
 05  23.12.2016  09.01.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Synthon Biopharmaceuticals B.V.
Microweg 22
6545 CM Nijmegen / NL
Opponent's representative
Prins, Hendrik Willem, et al
Arnold & Siedsma
Bezuidenhoutseweg 57
2594 AC The Hague / NL
 06  27.12.2016  15.05.2017  DEEMED NOT TO HAVE BEEN FILED
Fresenius Kabi Deutschland GmbH
Else-Krömer-Strasse 1
61352 Bad Homburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Fresenius Kabi Deutschland GmbH, et al
Patent Department
Pharmaceuticals Division
Borkenberg 14
61440 Oberursel / DE
 07  27.12.2016  11.01.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Pentafarma Sociedade Técnico-Medicinal S.A.
Rua da Tapada Grande, n. 2
2710-089 Abrunheira / PT
Opponent's representative
Hoffmann Eitle, et al
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
 08  30.12.2016  12.01.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Generics (U.K.) Limited
Station Close
Potters Bar
Hertfordshire EN6 1TL / GB
Opponent's representative
McNally, Roisin, et al
FRKelly
4 Mount Charles
Belfast Antrim BT7 1NZ / GB
 09  30.12.2016  12.01.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Teva Pharmaceuticals Inc.
5 Basel St.
49131 Petach Tikva / IL
Opponent's representative
Hamm, Volker, et al
Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH
Jungfernstieg 38
20354 Hamburg / DE
Former [2017/15]
Opponent(s)01  21.12.2016  02.01.2017  ADMISSIBLE
HGF Limited
1 City Walk
Leeds Yorkshire LS11 9DX / GB
Opponent's representative
HGF Limited, et al
1 City Walk
Leeds LS11 9DX / GB
 02  21.12.2016  03.01.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Pfizer Inc.
235 East 42nd Street
New York, NY 10017 / US
Opponent's representative
Royle, Matthew Charles James, et al
Taylor Wessing LLP 5 New Street Square
London EC4A 3TW / GB
 03  22.12.2016  09.01.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Accord Healthcare Ltd
Sage House
319 Pinner Road
North Harrow Middlesex
HA1 4HF / GB
Opponent's representative
Hoffmann Eitle, et al
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
 04  23.12.2016  09.01.2017  ADMISSIBLE
LEK Pharmaceuticals d.d.
Verovskova 57
1526 Ljubljana / SI
Opponent's representative
Prüfer & Partner mbB Patentanwälte · Rechtsanwälte, et al
Sohnckestraße 12
81479 München / DE
 05  23.12.2016  09.01.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Synthon Biopharmaceuticals B.V.
Microweg 22
6545 CM Nijmegen / NL
Opponent's representative
Prins, Hendrik Willem, et al
Arnold & Siedsma
Bezuidenhoutseweg 57
2594 AC The Hague / NL
 06  27.12.2016   
Fresenius Kabi Deutschland GmbH
Else-Krömer-Strasse 1
61352 Bad Homburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Fresenius Kabi Deutschland GmbH, et al
Patent Department
Pharmaceuticals Division
Borkenberg 14
61440 Oberursel / DE
 07  27.12.2016  11.01.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Pentafarma Sociedade Técnico-Medicinal S.A.
Rua da Tapada Grande, n. 2
2710-089 Abrunheira / PT
Opponent's representative
Hoffmann Eitle, et al
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
 08  30.12.2016  12.01.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Generics (U.K.) Limited
Station Close
Potters Bar
Hertfordshire EN6 1TL / GB
Opponent's representative
McNally, Roisin, et al
FRKelly
4 Mount Charles
Belfast Antrim BT7 1NZ / GB
 09  30.12.2016  12.01.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Teva Pharmaceuticals Inc.
5 Basel St.
49131 Petach Tikva / IL
Opponent's representative
Hamm, Volker, et al
Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH
Jungfernstieg 38
20354 Hamburg / DE
Former [2017/07]
Opponent(s)01  21.12.2016  02.01.2017  ADMISSIBLE
HGF Limited
1 City Walk
Leeds Yorkshire LS11 9DX / GB
Opponent's representative
Atkinson, Jonathan David Mark, et al
HGF Limited
1 City Walk
Leeds LS11 9DX / GB
 02  21.12.2016  03.01.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Pfizer Inc.
235 East 42nd Street
New York, NY 10017 / US
Opponent's representative
Royle, Matthew Charles James, et al
Taylor Wessing LLP 5 New Street Square
London EC4A 3TW / GB
 03  22.12.2016  09.01.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Accord Healthcare Ltd
Sage House
319 Pinner Road
North Harrow Middlesex
HA1 4HF / GB
Opponent's representative
Hoffmann Eitle, et al
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
 04  23.12.2016  09.01.2017  ADMISSIBLE
LEK Pharmaceuticals d.d.
Verovskova 57
1526 Ljubljana / SI
Opponent's representative
Prüfer & Partner mbB Patentanwälte · Rechtsanwälte, et al
Sohnckestraße 12
81479 München / DE
 05  23.12.2016  09.01.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Synthon Biopharmaceuticals B.V.
Microweg 22
6545 CM Nijmegen / NL
Opponent's representative
Prins, Hendrik Willem, et al
Arnold & Siedsma
Bezuidenhoutseweg 57
2594 AC The Hague / NL
 06  27.12.2016   
Fresenius Kabi Deutschland GmbH
Else-Krömer-Strasse 1
61352 Bad Homburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Fresenius Kabi Deutschland GmbH, et al
Patent Department
Pharmaceuticals Division
Borkenberg 14
61440 Oberursel / DE
 07  27.12.2016  11.01.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Pentafarma Sociedade Técnico-Medicinal S.A.
Rua da Tapada Grande, n. 2
2710-089 Abrunheira / PT
Opponent's representative
Hoffmann Eitle, et al
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
 08  30.12.2016  12.01.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Generics (U.K.) Limited
Station Close
Potters Bar
Hertfordshire EN6 1TL / GB
Opponent's representative
McNally, Roisin, et al
FRKelly
4 Mount Charles
Belfast Antrim BT7 1NZ / GB
 09  30.12.2016  12.01.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Teva Pharmaceuticals Inc.
5 Basel St.
49131 Petach Tikva / IL
Opponent's representative
Hamm, Volker, et al
Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH
Jungfernstieg 38
20354 Hamburg / DE
Former [2017/06]
Opponent(s)01  21.12.2016  02.01.2017  ADMISSIBLE
HGF Limited
1 City Walk
Leeds Yorkshire LS11 9DX / GB
Opponent's representative
Atkinson, Jonathan David Mark, et al
HGF Limited
1 City Walk
Leeds LS11 9DX / GB
 02  21.12.2016  03.01.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Pfizer Inc.
235 East 42nd Street
New York, NY 10017 / US
Opponent's representative
Royle, Matthew Charles James, et al
Taylor Wessing LLP 5 New Street Square
London EC4A 3TW / GB
 03  23.12.2016  04.01.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Synthon Biopharmaceuticals B.V.
Microweg 22
6545 CM Nijmegen / NL
Opponent's representative
Prins, Hendrik Willem, et al
Arnold & Siedsma
Bezuidenhoutseweg 57
2594 AC The Hague / NL
 04  23.12.2016  04.01.2017  ADMISSIBLE
LEK Pharmaceuticals d.d.
Verovskova 57
1526 Ljubljana / SI
Opponent's representative
Prüfer & Partner mbB Patentanwälte · Rechtsanwälte, et al
Sohnckestraße 12
81479 München / DE
 05  30.12.2016   
Generics (U.K.) Limited
Station Close
Potters Bar
Hertfordshire EN6 1TL / GB
Opponent's representative
McNally, Roisin, et al
FRKelly
4 Mount Charles
Belfast Antrim BT7 1NZ / GB
 06  30.12.2016   
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd
5 Basel Street
P.O. Box 3190
49131 Petah Tiqva / IL
Opponent's representative
Hamm & Wittkopp Patentanwälte PartmbB, et al
Jungfernstieg 38
20354 Hamburg / DE
 07  22.12.2016  04.01.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Accord Healthcare
Sage House, 319 Pinner Road
North Harrow Middlesex HA1 4HF / GB
Opponent's representative
Hoffmann Eitle, et al
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
 08  27.12.2016   
Fresenius Medical Care AG & Co. KGaA
Else-Kröner-Strasse 1
61352 Bad Homburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Heimann, Axel Colin, et al
Fresenius Kabi Deutschland GmbH
Patent Department
Else-Kröner-Strasse 1
61352 Bad Homburg / DE
 09  27.12.2016   
PENTAFARMA, Sociedade Técnico-Medicinal, SA
Rua da Tapada Grande, n° 2
Abrunheira
2710-089 Sintra / PT
Opponent's representative
Hoffmann Eitle, et al
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
Former [2017/05]
Opponent(s)01  21.12.2016   
HGF Limited
1 City Walk
Leeds Yorkshire LS11 9DX / GB
Opponent's representative
Atkinson, Jonathan David Mark, et al
HGF Limited
1 City Walk
Leeds LS11 9DX / GB
 02  21.12.2016   
Pfizer Inc.
235 East 42nd Street
New York, NY 10017 / US
Opponent's representative
Royle, Matthew Charles James, et al
Taylor Wessing LLP 5 New Street Square
London EC4A 3TW / GB
 03  23.12.2016   
Synthon Biopharmaceuticals B.V.
Microweg 22
6545 CM Nijmegen / NL
Opponent's representative
Prins, Hendrik Willem, et al
Arnold & Siedsma
Bezuidenhoutseweg 57
2594 AC The Hague / NL
Former [2017/04]
Opponent(s)01  21.12.2016   
HGF Limited
1 City Walk
Leeds Yorkshire LS11 9DX / GB
Opponent's representative
Atkinson, Jonathan David Mark, et al
HGF Limited
1 City Walk
Leeds LS11 9DX / GB
 02  21.12.2016   
Pfizer Inc.
235 East 42nd Street
New York, NY 10017 / US
Opponent's representative
Royle, Matthew Charles James, et al
Taylor Wessing LLP 5 New Street Square
London EC4A 3TW / GB
02.02.2017Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Opposition is deemed not to be filed 06
07.02.2017Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
12.02.2017Despatch of communication of loss of particular right
17.08.2017Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
17.10.2018Date of oral proceedings
07.03.2019Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
07.03.2019Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition10.05.2019Appeal received No.  T0980/19
17.07.2019Statement of grounds filed
23.04.2019Appeal received No.  T0980/19
17.07.2019Statement of grounds filed
09.04.2019Appeal received No.  T0980/19
17.07.2019Statement of grounds filed
08.04.2019Appeal received No.  T0980/19
16.07.2019Statement of grounds filed
03.04.2019Appeal received No.  T0980/19
16.07.2019Statement of grounds filed
06.05.2019Appeal received No.  T0980/19
12.07.2019Statement of grounds filed
28.03.2019Appeal received No.  T0980/19
12.07.2019Statement of grounds filed
29.04.2019Appeal received No.  T0980/19
08.07.2019Statement of grounds filed
15.04.2019Appeal received No.  T0980/19
29.05.2019Statement of grounds filed
10.12.2020Date of oral proceedings
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
29.09.2014Request for further processing filed
29.09.2014Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
13.10.2014Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.07.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
01.07.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
01.07.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
01.07.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
01.07.2010Renewal fee patent year 07
01.07.2010Renewal fee patent year 08
01.07.2010Renewal fee patent year 09
25.04.2011Renewal fee patent year 10
25.01.2012Renewal fee patent year 11
25.01.2013Renewal fee patent year 12
27.01.2014Renewal fee patent year 13
27.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 14
27.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 15
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.201110   M06   Fee paid on   25.04.2011
Documents cited:Search[ID]US5780454  (ADAMS JULIAN [US], et al) [ID] 1-40 * column 63, line 36 - line 43 *;
 [AD]US6066730  (ADAMS JULIAN [US], et al) [AD] 1-40 * column 64, line 6 - line 12 *;
 [AD]US6083903  (ADAMS JULIAN [US], et al) [AD] 1-40 * column 58, line 46 - line 51 *
ExaminationWO0057887
    - WU S ET AL, "DEGRADATION PATHWAYS OF A PEPTIDE BORONIC ACID DERIVATIVE, 2-PYZ-(CO)-PHE-LEU-B(OH)2", JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICAL SCIENCES, AMERICAN PHARMACEUTICAL ASSOCIATION, WASHINGTON, US, (20000601), vol. 89, no. 6, doi:10.1002/(SICI)1520-6017(200006)89:6<758::AID-JPS7>3.0.CO;2-L, ISSN 0022-3549, pages 758 - 765, XP001197158

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1520-6017(200006)89:6<758::AID-JPS7>3.0.CO;2-L
by applicantUS4499082
 US5187157
 US5242904
 US5250720
 US5169841
 US5106948
 US5780454
 US6066730
 US6083903
 US6297217
 WO9835691
 WO9915183
    - SNYDER ET AL., J AM. CHEM. SOC., (1958), page 3611
    - KORCEK ET AL., J CHEM. SOC., PERKIN TRANS., (1972), page 2 242
otherEP1355910
    - WU S ET AL, "DEGRADATION PATHWAYS OF A PEPTIDE BORONIC ACID DERIVATIVE, 2-PYZ-(CO)-PHE-LEU-B(OH)2", JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICAL SCIENCES, AMERICAN PHARMACEUTICAL ASSOCIATION, WASHINGTON, US, vol. 89, no. 6, (06010020), pages 758 - 765, XP001197158

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1520-6017(200006)89:6<758::AID-JPS7>3.0.CO;2-L
    - Pikal, M.J., "Freeze Drying", Pikal, M.J., James Swarbrick et al, Encyclopedia of Pharmaceutical Technology, Marcel Dekker, (19940000), pages 275 - 303, XP055248792
    - Chapter 4, "Parenteral Preparations", Chapter 4, Joseph P Remington, Alfonso R Gennaro et al, Remington's Pharmaceutical Sciences, Eighteenth Edition, Mack Publishing Co., (19900000), pages 1500 - 1567, XP055248815
    - Technologische Grundoperationen, Technologische Grundoperationen, Rudolf Voigt et al, Pharmazeutische Technologie: Für Studium und Beruf, 9. Auflage, Stuttgart, Deutscher Apotheker Verlag, (20000000), pages 23 - 24, ISBN 3-7692-2649-6, XP055248877
    - Product Formulation, Product Formulation, Thomas A. Jennings, Lyophilization: Introduction and Basic Principles 1st Edition, CRC Press, (19990000), pages 29 - 33, ISBN 978-1574910810, XP055248887
    - Kim Alexandra I., Akers Michael J., Nail Steven L., "The Physical State of Mannitol after Freeze-Drying: Effects of Mannitol Concentration, Freezing Rate, and a Noncrystallizing Cosolute", Journal of Pharmaceutical Sciences, vol. 87, no. 8, (19980800), pages 931 - 935, XP055248890

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/js980001d
OppositionWO9613266
 EP0308238
 US4360694
 WO0057887
 US5985842
 US5780454
 US5962049
 US5505953
 US4670262
 EP1355910
 WO02059130
 EP2251344
    - WU et al., "Degradation pathways of a peptide boronic acid derivative, 2-Pyz-(CO)-Phe-Leu- B(OH)(2", J Pharm Sci., (20000600), vol. 89, no. 6, pages 758 - 65, XP001197158

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1520-6017(200006)89:6<758::AID-JPS7>3.0.CO;2-L
    - PIKAL M., "Freeze drying", PIKAL M., James Swarbrick Et Al, Encyclopedia of Pharmaceutical Technology, Volume 6, (19920000), vol. 6, pages 275 - 303, ISSN 055248792X, XP055248792
    - "Parenteral Preparations - Freeze Drying", Alfonso R Gennaro et al, Remington's Pharmaceutical Sciences, (19900000), page 1500, 1585, 1567, XP055335885
    - "Kapitel 5 - Allgemeine Verfarhen, Grundoperationen", K H BAUER et al., Pharmazeutische Technologie, (19910000), pages 126 - 129, ISBN 3136925033, XP055335903
    - R VOIGT, Pharmazeutische Technologie, Stuttgart, (20000000), pages 23 - 24, ISBN 3769226496, XP055335911
    - KIM A. et al., "The physical state of mannitol after freeze-drying: Effects of Mannitol concentration, Freezing Rate, and a Non-crystalline cosolute", Journal of Pharmaceutical Sciences;, (19980800), vol. 87, no. 8, pages 931 - 935, XP055248890

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/js980001d
    - MORI A. et al., "Complex formation of p-Boronophenylalanine with some monosaccharides", Pigm. Cell Res. Sup.;, (19890000), vol. 2, no. 4, pages 273 - 277, XP009006877

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1600-0749.1989.tb00203.x
    - KUIVILA et al., "Arenoboronates from diol and polyols'';", Journal of Organic chemistry, (19540000), vol. 19, no. 5, pages 780 - 783, XP055335924

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo01370a013
    - YOSHINO;, "Improvement of solubility of p-boronophenylalanine by complex formation with monosaccharides", Strahlenther Onkol;, (19890000), vol. 165, no. 2-3, pages 127 - 129, XP055335941
    - FERRIER, "Carbohydrate boronates", Advances in Carbohydrate Chemistry and Biochemistry, (19780000), vol. 35, pages 31 - 80, XP055335949

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0065-2318(08)60218-8
    - A.K. Ganguly, "Characterization of Pharmaceuticals and Natural Products by Electrospray Ionization Mas Spectrometry", A.K. Ganguly, PRAMANIK B. N. et al., Applied Electrospray Mass Spectrometry, Marcel Dekker, (20020000), ISBN 0-8247-0618-8, XP055338563
    - WU S. et al., "DEGRADATION PATHWAYS OF A PEPTIDE BORONIC ACID DERIVATIVE, 2-PYZ-(CO)-PHE-LEU-B(OH)2", Journal of Pharmaceutical Science, (20000600), vol. 89, no. 6, pages 758 - 765, XP001197158

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1520-6017(200006)89:6<758::AID-JPS7>3.0.CO;2-L
    - MORI Y. et al., "COMPLEX FORMATION OF P-BORONOPHENYLALANINE WITH SOME MONOSACCHARIDES", Pigment Cell Research, (19890000), vol. 2, no. 4, pages 273 - 277, XP009006877

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1600-0749.1989.tb00203.x
    - PIKAL, M., "Freeze drying", PIKAL, M., James Swarbick et al.,, Encyclopedia of pharmaceutical technology, Marcel Dekker, (19940000), vol. 6, pages 275 - 303, XP055248792
    - "Parental Preparations", Joseph P Remington; Alfonso R Gennaro Et Al, Remington's Pharmaceutical Sciences, Mack Publishing Co, (19900000), page 1500, 1565, 1567, XP055248815
    - R. VOIGT, Pharmaceutische Technologie, Deutscher Apotheker Verlag, pages 23 - 24, ISBN 3769226496, XP055335911
    - FERRIER, R.J., "Carbohydrate Boronates", Advances in Carbohydrate Chemistry and Biochemistry, (19780000), pages 31 - 80, XP055335949

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0065-2318(08)60218-8
    - "Mannitol", WADE. A. et al., Handbook of Pharmaceutical Excipients, second edition, The Pharmaceutical Press, (19940000), pages 294 - 298, XP055336531
    - S. WU et al., "DEGRADATION PATHWAYS OF A PEPTIDE BORONIC ACID DERIVATIVE, 2-PYZ-(CO)-PHE-LEU-B(OH)2", Journal of Pharmaceutical Sciences, (20000600), vol. 89, no. 6, pages 758 - 765, XP001197158

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1520-6017(200006)89:6<758::AID-JPS7>3.0.CO;2-L
    - Dr. Klemen Naversnik, "Report on Reconstitution and Accelerated Stability Studies", (20150126), pages 1 - 7, XP055340825
    - Dr. Klemen Naversnik, "REport on Stability Studies", (20161223), pages 1 - 5, XP055340829
    - Y. MORI et al., "COMPLEX FORMATION OF P-BORONOPHENYLALANINE WITH SOME MONOSACCHARIDES", Pigm. Cell Res. Sup., (19890000), vol. 2, no. 4, pages 273 - 277, XP009006877

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1600-0749.1989.tb00203.x
    - R.J. FERRIER, "Carbohydrate Boronates", Advances in Carbohydrate Chemistry and Biochemistry, (19780000), pages 31 - 80, XP055335949

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0065-2318(08)60218-8
    - M. PIKAL, "Freeze Drying", M. PIKAL, James Swarbick et al.,, Encyclopedia of Pharmaceutical Technology, Marcel Dekker, (19940000), vol. 6, pages 275 - 303, XP055248792
    - "Kapitel 5- Allgemeine Verfahren, Grundoperationen", K.H. BAUER et al., Pharmazeutische Technologie 3. neubearbeitete Auflage, Georg Thieme Verlag, (19910000), pages 126 - 129, XP055335903
    - R. VOIGT, Pharmazeutische Technologie, Deutscher Apotheker Verlag, (20000000), pages 23 - 24, ISBN 3769226496, XP055335911
    - "Parenteral Preparations- Freeze Drying", ALFONSO R GENNARO ET AL, Remington's Pharmaceutical Sciences, Mack Publishing Co, (19900000), page 1500, 1565, 1567, XP055335885
    - "Mannitol", Ainley Wade, Paul J. Weller, Handbook of Pharmaceutical Excipients, second edition, The Pharmaceutical Press, (19940000), pages 294 - 298, XP055336531
    - A.I. KIM et al., "The Physical State of Mannitol after Freeze-Drying: Effects of Mannitol Concentration, Freezing Rate, and a Noncrystallizing Cosolute", Journal of Pharmaceutical Sciences, (19980800), vol. 87, no. 8, pages 931 - 935, XP055248890

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/js980001d
    - S. WITTAYA-AREEKUL et al., "FREEZE-DRYING OF TERT-BUTYL ALCOHOL/WATER COSOLVENT SYSTEMS: EFFECTS OF FORMULATION AND PROCESS VARIABLES ON RESIDUAL SOLVENTS", J. Pharm. Sci., (19980400), vol. 87, no. 4, pages 491 - 495, XP000739682

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/js9702832
    - B. NUIJEN et al., "Pharmaceutical Development of a Parenteral Lyophilized Formulation of the Novel Antitumor Agent Aplidine", PDA Journal of Pharmaceutical Science & Technology, (20000500), vol. 54, no. 3, pages 193 - 208, XP055338550
    - "Product Formulation", T.A. JENNINGS, Lyophilization: Introduction and Basic Principles, CRC Press, (19990831), pages 29 - 33, ISBN 9781574910810, XP055248887
    - SARA WU et al., "Degradation Pathways of a Peptide Boronic Acid Derivative, 2-Pyz-(CO)- Phe-Leu-B(OH)2", Journal of Pharmaceutical Sciences, (20000600), vol. 89, no. 6, pages 758 - 765, XP001197158

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1520-6017(200006)89:6<758::AID-JPS7>3.0.CO;2-L
    - A. I. KIM et al., "The Physical State of Mannitol after Freeze-Drying: Effects of Mannitol Concentration, Freezing Rate, and a Noncrystallizing Cosolute;", J. Pharm. Sci., (19980000), vol. 87, no. 8, pages 931 - 935, XP055248890

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/js980001d
    - K H BAUER et al., "Kapitel 5- Allgemeine Verfahren, Grundoperationen", K H BAUER et al., K.H. BAUER et al., Pharmazeutische Technologie 3. neubearbeitete Auflage, Georg Thieme Verlag, (19910000), pages 126 - 129, XP055335903
    - R VOIGT, Pharmazeutische Technologie, Deutscher Apotheker Verlag, (20000000), pages 23 - 24, ISBN 3769226496, XP055335911
    - TANAKA et al., "Cryoprotective Effect of Saccharides on Denaturation of Catalase by Freeze-Drying", Chemical & Pharmaceutical Bulletin, (19910500), vol. 39, no. 5, pages 1091 - 1094, XP055338596
    - CAPPOLA, "Freeze-Drying", CAPPOLA, Eugene J. McNally, Protein Formulation and Delivery, Marcel Dekker, (20000000), vol. 99, pages 181 - 182, ISBN 0-8247-7883-9, XP055338605
    - K. YOSHINO et al., "Improvement of solubility of p-boronophenylalanine by complex formation with monosaccharides", Strahlenther. Onkol., (19890000), vol. 165, no. 2-3, pages 127 - 129, XP055335941
    - H. G. KUIVILA et al., "Areneboronates from Diols and Polyols", J. Org. Chem., (19540000), vol. 19, no. 5, pages 780 - 783, XP055335920

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo01370a013
    - Y. MORI et al., "Complex formation of p-Boronophenylalanine with some monosaccharides", Pigm. Cell Res. Sup., (19890000), vol. 2, no. 4, pages 273 - 277, XP009006877

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1600-0749.1989.tb00203.x
    - NEMOTO et al., "Synthesis and Biological Properties of Water-Soluble p-Boronophenylalanine Derivatives. Relationship between Water Solubility, Cytotoxicity, and Cellular Uptake .", J. Med. Chem., (19950000), vol. 38, no. 10, pages 1673 - 1678, XP002294784

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm00010a012
    - M PIKAL, "Freeze Drying", M PIKAL, James Swarbick et al.,, Encyclopedia of Pharmaceutical Technology, Marcel Dekker, (19940000), vol. 6, pages 275 - 303, XP055248792
    - "Parenteral Preparations", ALFONSO R GENNARO ET AL, Remington's Pharmaceutical Sciences, Mack Publishing Co, (19900000), page 1500, 1565, 1567, XP055335885
    - "Product Formulation", T. A. JENNINGS, Lyophilisation: Introduction and Basic Principles, CRC Press, (19990831), pages 29 - 33, ISBN 9781574910810, XP055248887
    - "Mannitol", SCOGS, (19720000), Database accession no. 69-65-8, XP055341446
    - R. J. FERRIER, "Carbohydrate Boronates", Advances in Carbohydrate Chemistry and Biochemistry, pages 31 - 80, XP055335949

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0065-2318(08)60218-8
    - Y MORI et al., Pigm. Cell Res. Sup., (19890000), vol. 2, pages 273 - 277, XP009006877

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1600-0749.1989.tb00203.x
    - KIM et al., "The Physical State of Mannitol after Freeze-Drying: Effects of Mannitol Concentration, Freezing Rate, and a Noncrystallizing Cosolute.", J Pharm Sci., (19980800), vol. 87, no. 8, pages 931 - 935, XP055248890

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/js980001d
    - S WU et al., J. Pharm. Sci., (20000600), vol. 89, no. 6, pages 758 - 765, XP001197158

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1520-6017(200006)89:6<758::AID-JPS7>3.0.CO;2-L
    - M PIKAL, "Freeze Drying", Encyclopedia of Pharmaceutical Technology, New York, (19940000), vol. 6, pages 275 - 303, XP055248792
    - R J FERRIER, "Carbohydrate Boronates", Advances in Carbohydrate Chemistry and Biochemistry, (19780000), vol. 35, pages 31 - 80, XP055335949

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0065-2318(08)60218-8
    - "Chapter 8.4 Parenteral Preparations", Remington's Pharmaceutical Sciences, (19900000), pages 1565 - 1567, XP055248815
    - R VOIGT, Pharmazeutische Technologie, Stuttgart, (20000000), pages 23 - 24, XP055335911
    - KIM et al., "The Physical State of Mannitol after Freeze-Drying: Effects of Mannitol Concentration, Freezing Rate, and a Noncrystallizing Cosolute", Journal of Pharmaceutical Sciences, (19980800), vol. 87, no. 8, pages 931 - 935, XP055248890

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/js980001d
    - WU et al., "Degradation Pathways of a Peptide Boronic Acid Derivative, 2-Pyz-(CO)-Phe-Leu-B(OH)2", Journal of Pharmaceutical Sciences, (20000600), vol. 89, no. 6, pages 758 - 765, XP001197158

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1520-6017(200006)89:6<758::AID-JPS7>3.0.CO;2-L
    - Pikal M., "Freeze Drying", Encyclopedia of Pharmaceutical Technology, vol. 6, pages 275 - 303, XP055248792
    - "Mannitol", Wade et al., Handbook of Pharmaceutical Excipients, 2nd ed., (19940000), pages 294 - 298, XP055336204
    - "Freeze-Drying", Pharmaceutical Sciences, (19900000), pages 1565 - 1567, XP055248815
    - MORI et al., "Complex Formation of p-Boronophenylalanine With Some Monosaccharides", Pigment Cell Research, (19890000), vol. 2, pages 273 - 277, XP009006877

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1600-0749.1989.tb00203.x
    - ROBERT J. FERRIER, "Carbohydrate Boronates", Advances in Carbohydrate Chemistry and Biochemistry, (19780000), pages 31 - 80, XP055335949

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0065-2318(08)60218-8
    - Y MORI et al., "COMPLEX FORMATION OF P-BORONOPHENYLALANINE WITH SOME MONOSACCHARIDES", Pigment Cell Res. Sup., (19890000), vol. 2, no. 4, pages 273 - 277, XP009006877

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1600-0749.1989.tb00203.x
    - A.I. KIM et al., "The Physical State of Mannitol after Freeze-Drying: Effects of Mannitol Concentration, Freezing Rate, and a Noncrystallizing Cosolute", Journal of Pharmaceutical Sciences, (19980000), vol. 87, no. 8, pages 931 - 935, XP055248890

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/js980001d
    - S WITTAYA-AREEKUL et al., "FREEZE-DRYING OF TERT-BUTYL ALCOHOL/WATER COSOLVENT SYSTEMS: EFFECTS OF FORMULATION AND PROCESS VARIABLES ON RESIDUAL SOLVENTS", J. Pharm. Sci., (19980000), vol. 87, no. 4, pages 491 - 495, XP000739682

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/js9702832
    - S WU et al., "DEGRADATION PATHWAYS OF A PEPTIDE BORONIC ACID DERIVATIVE, 2-PYZ-(CO)-PHE-LEU-B(OH)2", Journal of Pharmaceutical Sciences, (20000600), vol. 89, no. 6, pages 758 - 765, XP001197158

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1520-6017(200006)89:6<758::AID-JPS7>3.0.CO;2-L
    - R J FERRIER, "Carbohydrate Boronates", Advances in Carbohydrate Chemistry and Biochemistry, (19780000), pages 31 - 80, XP055335949

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0065-2318(08)60218-8
    - "Parenteral Preparations- Freeze Drying", ALFONSO R GENNARO ET AL, Remington's Pharmaceutical Sciences, Mack Publishing Co, (19900000), page 1500, 1585, 1567, XP055335885
    - J ZHANG et al., "Complexation of polysaccharide and monosaccharide with thiolate boronic acid capped on silver nanoparticle", Anal. Biochem., (20040000), vol. 332, pages 253 - 260, XP003012736

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ab.2004.05.051
    - "Product Formulation", JENNINGS, T.A., Lyophilization: Introduction and Basic Principles, CRC Press, (19990831), pages 29 - 33, XP055248887
    - KIM, A. I. et al., "The Physical State of Mannitol after Freeze-Drying: Effects of Mannitol Concentration, Freezing Rate and a Noncrystallizing Cosolute", JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICAL SCIENCES, (19980800), vol. 87, no. 8, pages 931 - 935, XP055248890

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/js980001d
    - WU, S. et al., "Degradation Pathways of a Peptide Boronic Acid Derivative, 2- Pyz-(CO)-Phe-Leu-B(OH)2", JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICAL SCIENCES, (20000600), vol. 89, no. 6, pages 758 - 765, XP001197158

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1520-6017(200006)89:6<758::AID-JPS7>3.0.CO;2-L
    - PIKAL, M., "Freeze Drying", PIKAL, M., JAMES SWARBICK ET AL.,, Encyclopedia of Pharmaceutical Technology, Marcel Dekker, (19940000), vol. 6, pages 275 - 303, XP055248792
    - "Mannitol", AINLEY WADE, PAUL J. WELLER, Handbook of Pharmaceutical Excipients, second edition, THE PHARMACEUTICAL PRESS, (19940000), pages 294 - 298, XP055336531
    - "Carbohydrate Boronates", FERRIER, R.J., Advances in Carbohydrate Chemistry and Biochemistry, (19780000), pages 31 - 80, XP055335949

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0065-2318(08)60218-8
    - ALFONSO R GENNARO ET AL.,, Remington's Pharmaceutical Sciences, MACK PUBLISHING CO,, (19900000), page 1500, 1565, 1567, XP055335885
    - VOIGHT, R., Pharmazeutische Technologie, DEUTSCHER APOTHEKER VERLAG, (20000000), pages 23 - 24, XP055335911
    - S. WU et al., "Degradation Pathways of a Peptide Boronic Acid Derivative, 2-Pyz-(CO)- Phe-Leu-B(OH)2", Journal of Pharmaceutical Sciences, (20000600), vol. 89, no. 6, pages 758 - 765, XP001197158

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1520-6017(200006)89:6<758::AID-JPS7>3.0.CO;2-L
    - A. I. KIM et al., "The Physical State of Mannitol after Freeze-Drying: Effects of Mannitol Concentration, Freezing Rate, and a Noncrystallizing Cosolute", Journal of Pharmaceutical Sciences, (19980800), vol. 87, no. 8, pages 931 - 935, XP055248890

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/js980001d
    - Dr Klemen Naversnik, Report on Reconstitution and Accelerated Stability Studies, (20150126), XP055340825
    - Y. MORI et al., "Complex Formation of p-Boronophenylalanine With Some Monosaccharides", Pigment Cell Research, (19890000), vol. 2, pages 273 - 277, XP009006877

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1600-0749.1989.tb00203.x
    - "Kapitel 5 Allgemeine Verfahren, Grundoperationen", K. H. BAUER et al., Pharmazeutische Technologie, (19910000), pages 126 - 129, XP055335903
    - R. J. FERRIER, "Carbohydrate Boronates", Advances in Carbohydrate Chemistry and Biochemistry, (19780000), vol. 35, pages 31 - 80, XP055335949

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0065-2318(08)60218-8