EP2275637 - Door leaf [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.02.2015 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Noblesse Türfüllungen GmbH & Co. KG Ludwigstrasse 32 76768 Berg/Pfalz / DE | [2011/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Berizzi, Hans Heinrich Ludwigstrasse 32 76768 Berg / DE | [2011/11] |
Former [2011/03] | 01 /
Berizzi, Heinz Heinrich Ludwigstrasse 32 76768 Berg / DE | Representative(s) | Wagner Albiger & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Siegfried-Leopold-Straße 27 53225 Bonn / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/14] | Müller-Gerbes Wagner Albiger Patentanwälte Friedrich-Breuer-Strasse 72-78 53225 Bonn / DE | ||
Former [2011/03] | Müller-Gerbes Wagner Albiger Patentanwälte Friedrich-Breuer-Strasse 72-78 53225 Bonn / DE | Application number, filing date | 10007127.3 | 09.07.2010 | [2011/03] | Priority number, date | DE20091032312 | 09.07.2009 Original published format: DE102009032312 | [2011/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2275637 | Date: | 19.01.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2275637 | Date: | 16.11.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2275637 | Date: | 02.04.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.10.2011 | Classification | IPC: | E06B1/02, E06B3/06, B29C70/76, E06B3/88, E06B3/964 | [2011/46] | CPC: |
B29C70/865 (EP,US);
E06B1/30 (EP);
E06B3/26345 (EP);
E06B3/822 (EP);
E06B3/9612 (EP);
B29C70/18 (EP);
B29C70/30 (EP,US);
B29C70/46 (EP,US);
B29K2075/00 (EP);
B29K2105/04 (EP);
B29L2031/005 (EP);
B29L2031/724 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2011/03] | E06B1/02, E06B3/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/03] | Extension states | BA | 26.04.2012 | ME | 26.04.2012 | RS | 26.04.2012 | Title | German: | Türblatt | [2011/03] | English: | Door leaf | [2011/03] | French: | Vantail | [2011/03] | Examination procedure | 20.04.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.04.2012 | Examination requested [2012/23] | 14.08.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.10.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.02.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 21.02.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.08.2013 | Opposition(s) | 06.01.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.07.2010 | AL | 02.04.2014 | CY | 02.04.2014 | CZ | 02.04.2014 | DK | 02.04.2014 | EE | 02.04.2014 | ES | 02.04.2014 | FI | 02.04.2014 | HR | 02.04.2014 | IT | 02.04.2014 | LT | 02.04.2014 | LV | 02.04.2014 | MC | 02.04.2014 | MK | 02.04.2014 | MT | 02.04.2014 | PL | 02.04.2014 | RO | 02.04.2014 | SE | 02.04.2014 | SI | 02.04.2014 | SK | 02.04.2014 | SM | 02.04.2014 | TR | 02.04.2014 | BG | 02.07.2014 | NO | 02.07.2014 | GR | 03.07.2014 | GB | 09.07.2014 | IE | 09.07.2014 | LU | 09.07.2014 | IS | 02.08.2014 | PT | 04.08.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/30] | HU | 09.07.2010 | |
CY | 02.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
DK | 02.04.2014 | ||
EE | 02.04.2014 | ||
ES | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
HR | 02.04.2014 | ||
IT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LV | 02.04.2014 | ||
MC | 02.04.2014 | ||
MK | 02.04.2014 | ||
MT | 02.04.2014 | ||
PL | 02.04.2014 | ||
RO | 02.04.2014 | ||
SE | 02.04.2014 | ||
SI | 02.04.2014 | ||
SK | 02.04.2014 | ||
SM | 02.04.2014 | ||
TR | 02.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
NO | 02.07.2014 | ||
GR | 03.07.2014 | ||
GB | 09.07.2014 | ||
IE | 09.07.2014 | ||
LU | 09.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
PT | 04.08.2014 | ||
Former [2016/33] | HU | 09.07.2010 | |
CY | 02.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
DK | 02.04.2014 | ||
EE | 02.04.2014 | ||
ES | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
HR | 02.04.2014 | ||
IT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LV | 02.04.2014 | ||
MC | 02.04.2014 | ||
MT | 02.04.2014 | ||
PL | 02.04.2014 | ||
RO | 02.04.2014 | ||
SE | 02.04.2014 | ||
SI | 02.04.2014 | ||
SK | 02.04.2014 | ||
SM | 02.04.2014 | ||
TR | 02.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
NO | 02.07.2014 | ||
GR | 03.07.2014 | ||
GB | 09.07.2014 | ||
IE | 09.07.2014 | ||
LU | 09.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
PT | 04.08.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 09.07.2010 | |
CY | 02.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
DK | 02.04.2014 | ||
EE | 02.04.2014 | ||
ES | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
HR | 02.04.2014 | ||
IT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LV | 02.04.2014 | ||
MC | 02.04.2014 | ||
MT | 02.04.2014 | ||
PL | 02.04.2014 | ||
RO | 02.04.2014 | ||
SE | 02.04.2014 | ||
SI | 02.04.2014 | ||
SK | 02.04.2014 | ||
SM | 02.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
NO | 02.07.2014 | ||
GR | 03.07.2014 | ||
GB | 09.07.2014 | ||
IE | 09.07.2014 | ||
LU | 09.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
PT | 04.08.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | CY | 02.04.2014 | |
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
DK | 02.04.2014 | ||
EE | 02.04.2014 | ||
ES | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
HR | 02.04.2014 | ||
IT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LV | 02.04.2014 | ||
MC | 02.04.2014 | ||
MT | 02.04.2014 | ||
PL | 02.04.2014 | ||
RO | 02.04.2014 | ||
SE | 02.04.2014 | ||
SI | 02.04.2014 | ||
SK | 02.04.2014 | ||
SM | 02.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
NO | 02.07.2014 | ||
GR | 03.07.2014 | ||
GB | 09.07.2014 | ||
IE | 09.07.2014 | ||
LU | 09.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
PT | 04.08.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CY | 02.04.2014 | |
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
DK | 02.04.2014 | ||
EE | 02.04.2014 | ||
ES | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
HR | 02.04.2014 | ||
IT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LV | 02.04.2014 | ||
MC | 02.04.2014 | ||
PL | 02.04.2014 | ||
RO | 02.04.2014 | ||
SE | 02.04.2014 | ||
SI | 02.04.2014 | ||
SK | 02.04.2014 | ||
SM | 02.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
NO | 02.07.2014 | ||
GR | 03.07.2014 | ||
GB | 09.07.2014 | ||
IE | 09.07.2014 | ||
LU | 09.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
PT | 04.08.2014 | ||
Former [2016/21] | CY | 02.04.2014 | |
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
DK | 02.04.2014 | ||
EE | 02.04.2014 | ||
ES | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
HR | 02.04.2014 | ||
IT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LV | 02.04.2014 | ||
MC | 02.04.2014 | ||
PL | 02.04.2014 | ||
RO | 02.04.2014 | ||
SE | 02.04.2014 | ||
SI | 02.04.2014 | ||
SK | 02.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
NO | 02.07.2014 | ||
GR | 03.07.2014 | ||
GB | 09.07.2014 | ||
IE | 09.07.2014 | ||
LU | 09.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
PT | 04.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/37] | CY | 02.04.2014 | |
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
DK | 02.04.2014 | ||
EE | 02.04.2014 | ||
ES | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
HR | 02.04.2014 | ||
IT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LV | 02.04.2014 | ||
PL | 02.04.2014 | ||
RO | 02.04.2014 | ||
SE | 02.04.2014 | ||
SI | 02.04.2014 | ||
SK | 02.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
NO | 02.07.2014 | ||
GR | 03.07.2014 | ||
GB | 09.07.2014 | ||
IE | 09.07.2014 | ||
LU | 09.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
PT | 04.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | CY | 02.04.2014 | |
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
DK | 02.04.2014 | ||
EE | 02.04.2014 | ||
ES | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
HR | 02.04.2014 | ||
IT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LV | 02.04.2014 | ||
PL | 02.04.2014 | ||
RO | 02.04.2014 | ||
SE | 02.04.2014 | ||
SI | 02.04.2014 | ||
SK | 02.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
NO | 02.07.2014 | ||
GR | 03.07.2014 | ||
GB | 09.07.2014 | ||
LU | 09.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
PT | 04.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | CY | 02.04.2014 | |
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
DK | 02.04.2014 | ||
EE | 02.04.2014 | ||
ES | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
HR | 02.04.2014 | ||
IT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LV | 02.04.2014 | ||
PL | 02.04.2014 | ||
RO | 02.04.2014 | ||
SE | 02.04.2014 | ||
SK | 02.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
NO | 02.07.2014 | ||
GR | 03.07.2014 | ||
GB | 09.07.2014 | ||
LU | 09.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
PT | 04.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/18] | CY | 02.04.2014 | |
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
DK | 02.04.2014 | ||
EE | 02.04.2014 | ||
ES | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
HR | 02.04.2014 | ||
IT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LV | 02.04.2014 | ||
PL | 02.04.2014 | ||
RO | 02.04.2014 | ||
SE | 02.04.2014 | ||
SK | 02.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
NO | 02.07.2014 | ||
GR | 03.07.2014 | ||
LU | 09.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
PT | 04.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/13] | CY | 02.04.2014 | |
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
DK | 02.04.2014 | ||
EE | 02.04.2014 | ||
ES | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
HR | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LV | 02.04.2014 | ||
PL | 02.04.2014 | ||
RO | 02.04.2014 | ||
SE | 02.04.2014 | ||
SK | 02.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
NO | 02.07.2014 | ||
GR | 03.07.2014 | ||
LU | 09.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
PT | 04.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 02.04.2014 | |
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
DK | 02.04.2014 | ||
EE | 02.04.2014 | ||
ES | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
HR | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LV | 02.04.2014 | ||
PL | 02.04.2014 | ||
RO | 02.04.2014 | ||
SE | 02.04.2014 | ||
SK | 02.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
NO | 02.07.2014 | ||
GR | 03.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
PT | 04.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | CY | 02.04.2014 | |
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
DK | 02.04.2014 | ||
EE | 02.04.2014 | ||
ES | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
HR | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LV | 02.04.2014 | ||
PL | 02.04.2014 | ||
SE | 02.04.2014 | ||
SK | 02.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
NO | 02.07.2014 | ||
GR | 03.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
PT | 04.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | CY | 02.04.2014 | |
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
DK | 02.04.2014 | ||
ES | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
HR | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LV | 02.04.2014 | ||
PL | 02.04.2014 | ||
SE | 02.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
NO | 02.07.2014 | ||
GR | 03.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
PT | 04.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | CY | 02.04.2014 | |
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
ES | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
HR | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LV | 02.04.2014 | ||
PL | 02.04.2014 | ||
SE | 02.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
NO | 02.07.2014 | ||
GR | 03.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
PT | 04.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 02.04.2014 | |
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
ES | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
HR | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LV | 02.04.2014 | ||
PL | 02.04.2014 | ||
SE | 02.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
NO | 02.07.2014 | ||
GR | 03.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 02.04.2014 | |
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
NO | 02.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 02.04.2014 | |
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | CY | 02.04.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2278140 (SHAPLAND & PETTER LTD [GB]) [A] 1-15 * figure 2 *; | [A]GB2343476 (AUTO PLAS INTERNATIONAL LIMITE [GB]) [A] 1-15* figure 1 *; | [XI]AT9351U (REINEX TUEREN GMBH [AT]) [X] 10,11 * the whole document * [I] 1-9,12-15 | by applicant | DE202009003483U |