Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2290546

EP2290546 - Enrollment processing [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  21.12.2012
Database last updated on 10.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.07.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Accenture Global Services Limited
3 Grand Canal Plaza
Grand Canal Street Upper
Dublin 4 / IE
[N/P]
Former [2011/16]For all designated states
Accenture Global Services Limited
3 Grand Canal Plaza Grand Canal Street Upper
Dublin 4 / IE
Former [2011/09]For all designated states
Accenture Global Services GmbH
Herrenacker 15
8200 Schaffhausen / CH
Inventor(s)01 / Meda, Sushil R.
1105 Balllington Drive
Cumming, GA 30041 / US
02 / Dusek, Ginger
2801 N. Wolcott Avenue unit B
Chicago, IL 60657 / US
03 / Holobinko, Nathaniel M.
25 Juniper Drive
Avon, CT 06001 / US
04 / Tank, Rishi
9005 Brockham Way
Alpharetta, GA 30022 / US
05 / Solan, Rahul
816 Marsh Trail Circle NE
Sandy Springs, GA 30328 / US
06 / Wright, Keith
10032 Shetland Lane
Charlotte, NC 28278 / US
 [2011/09]
Representative(s)Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Friedenheimer Brücke 21
80639 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2011/09]Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte
Grafinger Straße 2
81671 München / DE
Application number, filing date10007588.621.07.2010
[2011/09]
Priority number, dateUS2009055081331.08.2009         Original published format: US 550813
[2011/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2290546
Date:02.03.2011
Language:EN
[2011/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.12.2010
ClassificationInternational:G06F11/34
[2011/09]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2011/09]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:Anmeldungsverarbeitung[2011/09]
English:Enrollment processing[2011/09]
French:Traitement d'inscription[2011/09]
Examination procedure05.08.2010Examination requested  [2011/09]
31.05.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
14.09.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.12.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.09.2015Date of oral proceedings
09.10.2015Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
09.10.2015Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Appeal following examination13.11.2015Appeal received No.  T0594/16
18.01.2016Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  14.09.2012
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
10.07.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
14.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
10.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
11.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
12.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 08
11.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 09
15.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 10
Documents cited:Search[I]US2006242648  (GUCCIONE FRANCESCA [IT] ET AL) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] - [0013] - [0024] , [0027] , [0030] , [0032] - [0034]; figures 1a,2,3 * * paragraphs [0000] , [0040] - [0044] - [0046] , [0050] *;
 [I]US2005256826  (HAMBRICK GEOFFREY M [US] ET AL) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] , [0006] - [0009] * * paragraphs [0026] , [0038] - [0039] - [0046] , [0050] - [0052] - [0057] , [0061] * * paragraphs [0063] , [0065] , [0068] , [0069] , [0071] , [0073] , [0077] - [0079] * * paragraph [0083] *;
 [I]US2009193421  (BENEDETTI FABIO [IT] ET AL) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0002] , [0004] , [0005] , [0012] , [0014]; claim 2 *;
 [I]US2005132167  (LONGOBARDI GIUSEPPE [IT]) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0002] - [0003] - [0005] - [0006] - [0008] - [0015] - [0024] - [0026] - [0028] - [0032] - [0049] , [0052] , [0058] , [0073] , [0076] - [0077] *;
 [A]US2008140675  (SAITO SHIGEMI [JP]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0008] - [0012] - [0014] , [0017] , [0019] - [0024] - [0027] , [0045] - [0046] - [0049] , [0051] , [0052] , [0074] , [0086] , [0089] - [0098] - [0103] * * paragraphs [0105] , [0116] , [0117] , [0136] , [0140] *
 [I]  - GIACHETTA M; PUGNI G L, CRIPPA G, POGLIANO P, "CATCHER (CArico baTCH alEatoRio) Un sistema basato sulla conoscenza per la gestione del carico batch aleatorio", RIVISTA DI INFORMATICA, (199506), pages 109 - 136, URL: http://direct.bl.uk/bld/PlaceOrder.do?UIN=030333755&ETOC=EN&from=searchengine, (20101215), XP008130604 [I] 1-15 * the whole document *
 [I]  - FERSTL F, "Job-and resource-management systems in heterogeneous clusters", FUTURE GENERATIONS COMPUTER SYSTEMS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS. AMSTERDAM, NL, (19960501), vol. 12, no. 1, doi:DOI:10.1016/0167-739X(96)84677-2, ISSN 0167-739X, pages 39 - 51, XP004018256 [I] 1-15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0167-739X(96)84677-2