Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2236623

EP2236623 - Assessment of risk for colorectal cancer [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  03.01.2014
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip03.01.2014Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 05.02.2014  [2014/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Cancer Care Ontario
620 University Avenue
Toronto ON M5G 2L7 / CA
For all designated states
McGill University
845 Sherbrooke Street West
Montreal, QC H3A 2T5 / CA
[2010/40]
Inventor(s)01 / Cotterchio, Michelle
499 St. Clements Avenue
Toronto, Ontario M5N 1M3 / CA
02 / Gallinger, Steven
11 Chiltern Hill Road
Toronto, Ontario M6C 3B4 / CA
03 / Greenwood, Celia
4340 Draper Avenue
Montreal, Quebec Canada H4A 2P2 / CA
04 / Hudson, Thomas J.
47 Elm Avenue
Toronto, Ontario M4S 1T4 / CA
05 / Zanke, Brent W.
388 Mariposa Avenue
Ottawa, Ontario K1M 0S9 / CA
06 / Phillips, Michael
108 Mayfair Street
Hudson, Québec J0P 1H0 / CA
07 / Sundararajan, Saravanan
3553, Dorion
Montréal, Québec H2K 4B7 / CA
08 / Montpetit, Alexandre
8383 de Gaspe
Montréal, Québec H2P 2K2 / CA
09 / Laflamme, Philippe
8343 Clark
Montreal, Québec H2P 2N6 / CA
10 / Ferretti, Vincent
256 Trenton
Mont-Royal, Québec H3P 1Z7 / CA
 [2011/14]
Former [2010/40]01 / Cotterchio, Michelle
499 St. Clements Avenue
Toronto, Ontario M5N 1M3 / CA
02 / Gallinger, Steven
11 Chiltern Hill Road
Toronto, Ontario M6C 3B4 / CA
03 / Greenwood, Celia
47 Robin Hood Road
Toronto, Ontario M9A 2W6 / CA
04 / Hudson, Thomas J.
47 Elm Avenue
Toronto, Ontario M4S 1T4 / CA
05 / Zanke, Brent W.
388 Mariposa Avenue
Ottawa, Ontario K1M 0S9 / CA
06 / Phillips, Michael
108 Mayfair Street
Hudson, Québec J0P 1H0 / CA
07 / Sundararajan, Saravanan
3553, Dorion
Montréal, Québec H2K 4B7 / CA
08 / Montpetit, Alexandre
8383 de Gaspe
Montréal, Québec H2P 2K2 / CA
09 / Laflamme, Philippe
8343 Clark
Montreal, Québec H2P 2N6 / CA
10 / Ferretti, Vincent
256 Trenton
Mont-Royal, Québec H3P 1Z7 / CA
Representative(s)Zwicker, Jörk , et al
ZSP Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Hansastraße 32
80686 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2010/40]Zwicker, Jörk , et al
Dr. Volker Vossius Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft Geibelstrasse 6
81679 München / DE
Application number, filing date10007610.805.06.2007
[2010/40]
Priority number, dateCA2006254782405.06.2006         Original published format: CA 2547824
CA2006254837513.06.2006         Original published format: CA 2548375
CA2007257958821.02.2007         Original published format: CA 2579588
[2010/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2236623
Date:06.10.2010
Language:EN
[2010/40]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.08.2010
ClassificationInternational:C12Q1/68
[2010/40]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/40]
TitleGerman:Feststellung des Risikos für Kolorektalkrebs[2010/40]
English:Assessment of risk for colorectal cancer[2010/40]
French:Evaluation du risque dans le cancer colorectal[2010/40]
Examination procedure06.04.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
06.04.2011Examination requested  [2011/20]
14.02.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
27.08.2013Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2014/06]
24.09.2013Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2014/06]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP07719909.9  / EP2035439
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20070719909) is  18.03.2010
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.07.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
21.07.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
13.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
14.06.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.201307   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]WO03070082  (IDGENE PHARMACEUTICALS LTD [IL], et al) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2005047996  (VOGELSTEIN BERT [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *
 [A]  - LEAH B SANSBURY ET AL, "COX-2 Polymorphism, Use of Nonsteroidal Anti-Inflammatory Drugs, and Risk of Colon Cancer in African Americans (United States)", CANCER CAUSES AND CONTROL, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS, DO, (20060401), vol. 17, no. 3, ISSN 1573-7225, pages 257 - 266, XP019233675 [A] 1-13 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s10552-005-0417-0
 [XP]  - ZANKE BRENT W ET AL, "Genome-wide association scan identifies a colorectal cancer susceptibility locus on chromosome 8q24", NATURE GENETICS, (200708), vol. 39, no. 8, ISSN 1061-4036, pages 989 - 994, XP002595320 [XP] 1-13 * figure 3; tables 1,2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/NG2089
 [XP]  - POYNTER JENNY N ET AL, "Variants on 9p24 and 8q24 are associated with risk of colorectal cancer: results from the Colon Cancer Family Registry.", CANCER RESEARCH 1 DEC 2007 LNKD- PUBMED:18056436, (20071201), vol. 67, no. 23, ISSN 1538-7445, pages 11128 - 11132, XP002595321 [XP] 1-13 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/0008-5472.CAN-07-3239
 [A]  - BUFFART T E ET AL, "DNA copy number changes at 8q11-24 in metastasized colorectal cancer", CELLULAR ONCOLOGY, IOS PRESS, LONDON, GB, (20050101), vol. 27, no. 1, ISSN 1570-5870, pages 57 - 65, XP009089420 [A] 1-13 * the whole document *
by applicantUS5679524
 US5952174
 WO0127326
 US5851770
 US5958692
 US6110684
 US6183958
 US5891625
 US6013499
 US4683195
 US4683202
 US4965188
 US5656493
 US5998143
 US6140054
 WO0127327
 WO0127329
 US4656127
 US4851331
 US5834189
 US5876934
 US5908755
 US5912118
 US5976802
 US5981186
 US6004744
 US6013431
 US6017702
 US6046005
 US6087095
 US6210891
 WO0120039
 US5547835
 US5605798
 US5691141
 US5849542
 US5869242
 US5928906
 US6043031
 US6194144
 US5492806
 US5525464
 US5589330
 US5695940
 US5849483
 US6018041
 US6045996
 US6136541
 US6142681
 US6156501
 US6197506
 US6223127
 US6225625
 US6229911
 US6239273
 WO0052625
 WO0125485
 WO0129259
 US4889818
 US6077664
 US4873316
 EP0264166
 US5272071
 WO9106667
 US4179337
 EP0401384
 US5223409
 US5093246
 US4987071
 US5116742
 US6506559
 WO0175164
 WO03010180
 WO8809810
 WO8910134
 US5854033
 US5866336
 US5876930
 EP0184187
 EP0171496
 EP0173494
 WO8601533
 US4816567
 EP0125023
 US5225539
 US5625126
 US5633425
 US5569825
 US5661016
 US5545806
 US4676980
 US5631169
 US4868103
 US6022688
 US6261776
 US5900481
 US6133436
 WO0118234
 US5283317
 WO9410300
 US4109496
 US4522811
 US5328470
 US4873191
 US4736866
    - HYRUP, BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (1996), vol. 4, no. 1, pages 5 - 23
    - VAN DER PUTTEN ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1985), vol. 82, pages 6148 - 6152
    - THOMPSON ET AL., CELL, (1989), vol. 56, pages 313 - 321
    - LASKO ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1992), vol. 89, pages 6232 - 6236
    - ABDERRAHMANI A; STEINMANN M; NIEDERHAUSER G; HAEFLIGER J A; MOOSER V; BONNY C; NICOD P; WAEBER G, "The Transcriptional Repressor REST Determines the Cell-Specific Expression of the Human MAPKBIP I Gene Encoding IB 1 (JIP-l)", MOL CELL BIOL, (2001), vol. 21, pages 7256 - 7267
    - ABECASIS GR; NOGUCHI E; HEINZMANN A; TRAHERNE J A; BHATTACHARYYA S; LEAVES N I; ANDERSON G G; ZHANG Y; LENCH N J; CAREY A, "Extent and Distribution of Linkage Disequilibrium in Three Genomic Regions", AM J HUM GENET, (2001), vol. 68, pages 191 - 197
    - AGRESTI A, "Exact Inference for Categorical Data: Recent Advances and Continuing Controversies", STAT MED, (2001), vol. 20, pages 2709 - 2722
    - ANSELL RJ; KRIZ D; MOSBACH K, "Molecularly Imprinted Polymers for Bioanalysis: Chromatography, Binding Assays and Biomimetic Sensors", CURR OPIN BIOTECHNOL, (1996), vol. 7, doi:doi:10.1016/S0958-1669(96)80101-7, pages 89 - 94, XP001155329

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0958-1669(96)80101-7
    - BANERJI J; OLSON L; SCHAFFNER W, "A Lymphocyte-Specific Cellular Enhancer Is Located Downstream of the Joining Region in Immunoglobulin Heavy Chain Genes", CELL, (1983), vol. 33, doi:doi:10.1016/0092-8674(83)90015-6, pages 729 - 740, XP027462708

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0092-8674(83)90015-6
    - BARTEL DP; SZOSTAK J W, "Isolation of New Ribozymes From a Large Pool of Random Sequences", SCIENCE, (1993), vol. 261, doi:doi:10.1126/science.7690155, pages 1411 - 1418, XP000563737

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.7690155
    - BARTEL P; CHIEN C T; STERNGLANZ R; FIELDS S, "Elimination of False Positives That Arise in Using the Two-Hybrid System", BIOTECHNIQUES, (1993), vol. 14, pages 920 - 924
    - BEIDLER CB; LUDWIG J R; CARDENAS J; PHELPS J; PAPWORTH C G; MELCHER E; SIERZEGA M; MYERS L J; UNGER B W; FISHER M, "Cloning and High Level Expression of a Chimeric Antibody With Specificity for Human Carcinoembryonic Antigen", JLMMUNOL, (1988), vol. 141, pages 4053 - 4060, XP000653161
    - BETTER M; CHANG C P; ROBINSON R R; HORWITZ A H, "Escherichia Coli Secretion of an Active Chimeric Antibody Fragment", SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 240, doi:doi:10.1126/science.3285471, pages 1041 - 1043, XP002006896

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.3285471
    - BHATTACHARYA-CHATTERJEE M; FOON K A, "Anti-Idiotype Antibody Vaccine Therapies of Cancer", CANCER TREAT RES, (1998), vol. 94, pages 51 - 68
    - BOSHER JM; LABOUESSE M, "RNA Interference: Genetic Wand and Genetic Watchdog", NAT CELL BIOL, (2000), vol. 2, doi:doi:10.1038/35000102, pages E31 - E36, XP001106960

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/35000102
    - BYRNE GW; RUDDLE F H, "Multiplex Gene Regulation: a Two-Tiered Approach to Transgene Regulation in Transgenic Mice", PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (1989), vol. 86, doi:doi:10.1073/pnas.86.14.5473, pages 5473 - 5477, XP009061337

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.86.14.5473
    - CALAME K; EATON S, "Transcriptional Controlling Elements in the Immunoglobulin and T Cell Receptor Loci", ADV IMMUNOL, (1988), vol. 43, pages 235 - 275, XP009061324
    - CAMPER SA; TILGHMAN S M, "Postnatal Repression of the Alpha-Fetoprotein Gene Is Enhancer Independent", GENES DEV, (1989), vol. 3, pages 537 - 546
    - CAPLEN NJ; PARRISH S; IMANI F; FIRE A; MORGAN R A, "Specific Inhibition of Gene Expression by Small Double-Stranded RNAs in Invertebrate and Vertebrate Systems", PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (2001), vol. 98, doi:doi:10.1073/pnas.171251798, pages 9742 - 9747, XP002232936

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.171251798
    - CAPLEN NJ; PARRISH S; IMANI F; FIRE A; MORGAN R A, "Specific Inhibition of Gene Expression by Small Double-Stranded RNAs in Invertebrate and Vertebrate Systems", PROC NATL ACAD SCI US A, (2001), vol. 98, doi:doi:10.1073/pnas.171251798, pages 9742 - 9747, XP002232936

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.171251798
    - CARSTENSEN B; SOLL-JOHANNING H; VILLADSEN E; SONDERGAARD J O; LYNGE E, "Familial Aggregation ofColorectal Cancer in the General Population", INT J CANCER, (1996), vol. 68, pages 428 - 435
    - CHEN SH; SHINE H D; GOODMAN J C; GROSSMAN R G; WOO S L, "Gene Therapy for Brain Tumors: Regression of Experimental Gliomas by Adenovirus-Mediated Gene Transfer in Vivo", PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (1994), vol. 91, doi:doi:10.1073/pnas.91.8.3054, pages 3054 - 3057, XP002002601

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.91.8.3054
    - CHO CY; MORAN E J; CHERRY S R; STEPHANS J C; FODOR S P; ADAMS C L; SUNDARAM A; JACOBS J W; SCHULTZ P G, "An Unnatural Biopolymer", SCIENCE, (1993), vol. 261, pages 1303 - 1305
    - CLARK AG; WEISS K M; NICKERSON D A; TAYLOR S L; BUCHANAN A; STENGARD J; SALOMAA V; VARTIAINEN E; PEROLA M; BOERWINKLE E, "Haplotype Structure and Population Genetic Inferences From Nucleotide-Sequence Variation in Human Lipoprotein Lipase", AM J HUM GENET, (1998), vol. 63, pages 595 - 612
    - COLCHER D; PAVLINKOVA G; BERESFORD G; BOOTH B J; BATRA S K, "Single-Chain Antibodies in Pancreatic Cancer", ANN N YACAD SCI, (1999), vol. 880, doi:doi:10.1111/j.1749-6632.1999.tb09531.x, pages 263 - 280, XP000995150

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1749-6632.1999.tb09531.x
    - COLLINS FS; BROOKS L D; CHAKRAVARTI A, "A DNA Polymorphism Discovery Resource for Research on Human Genetic Variation", GENOME RES, (1998), vol. 8, pages 1229 - 1231, XP002177106
    - COTTON RG; RODRIGUES N R; CAMPBELL R D, "Reactivity of Cytosine and Thymine in Single-Base-Pair Mismatches With Hydroxylamine and Osmium Tetroxide and Its Application to the Study of Mutations", PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (1988), vol. 85, doi:doi:10.1073/pnas.85.12.4397, pages 4397 - 4401, XP002086182

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.85.12.4397
    - CRONIN MT; FUCINI R V; KIM S M; MASINO R S; WESPI R M; MIYADA C G, "Cystic Fibrosis Mutation Detection by Hybridization to Light-Generated DNA Probe Arrays", HUM MUTAT, (1996), vol. 7, doi:doi:10.1002/(SICI)1098-1004(1996)7:3<244::AID-HUMU9>3.0.CO;2-A, pages 244 - 255, XP008030268

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1098-1004(1996)7:3<244::AID-HUMU9>3.0.CO;2-A
    - CROW JF, "Spontaneous Mutation As a Risk Factor", EXP CLIN IMMUNOGENET, (1995), vol. 12, pages 121 - 128
    - CRUIKSHANK WW; DOCTROW S R; FALVO M S; HUFFMAN K; MACIASZEK J; VIGLIANTI G; RAINA J; KORNFELD H; MALFROY B, "A Lipidated Anti-Tat Antibody Enters Living Cells and Blocks HIV-1 Viral Replication", JACQUIR IMMUNE DEFIC SYNDR HUM RETROVIROL, (1997), vol. 14, pages 193 - 203, XP009110735
    - CULL MG; MILLER J F; SCHATZ P J, "Screening for Receptor Ligands Using Large Libraries ofPeptides Linked to the C Terminus of the Lac Repressor", PROC NATL ACAD SCI US A, (1992), vol. 89, doi:doi:10.1073/pnas.89.5.1865, pages 1865 - 1869, XP002043736

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.89.5.1865
    - CWIRLA SE; PETERS E A; BARRETT R W; DOWER W J, "Peptides on Phage: a Vast Library ofPeptides for Identifying Ligands", PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (1990), vol. 87, pages 6378 - 6382
    - DALY MJ; RIOUX J D; SCHAFFNER S F; HUDSON T J; LANDER E S, "High-Resolution Haplotype Structure in the Human Genome", NAT GENET, (2001), vol. 29, doi:doi:10.1038/ng1001-229, pages 229 - 232, XP002281357

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/ng1001-229
    - DAWSON E; ABECASIS G R; BUMPSTEAD S; CHEN Y; HUNT S; BEARE D M; PABIAL J; DIBLING T; TINSLEY E; KIRBY S, "A First-Generation Linkage Disequilibrium Map of Human Chromosome 22", NATURE, (2002), vol. 418, pages 544 - 548
    - DE LEON MP; PEDRONI M; BENATTI P; PERCESEPE A; DI GREGORIO C; FORONI M; ROSSI G; GENUARDI M; NERI G; LEONARDI F, "Hereditary Colorectal Cancer in the General Population: From Cancer Registration to Molecular Diagnosis", GUT, (1999), vol. 45, pages 32 - 38
    - DEVLIN JJ; PANGANIBAN L C; DEVLIN P E, "Random Peptide Libraries: a Source of Specific Protein Binding Molecules", SCIENCE, (1990), vol. 249, doi:doi:10.1126/science.2143033, pages 404 - 406, XP000616029

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.2143033
    - DEWITT SH; KIELY J S; STANKOVIC C J; SCHROEDER M C; CODY D M; PAVIA M R, ""Diversomers": an Approach to Nonpeptide, Nonoligomeric Chemical Diversity", PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (1993), vol. 90, pages 6909 - 6913
    - DUNNING AM; DUROCHER F; HEALEY C S; TEARE M D; MCBRIDE S E; CARLOMAGNO F; XU C F; DAWSON E; RHODES S; UEDA S, "The Extent of Linkage Disequilibrium in Four Populations With Distinct Demographic Histories", AM J HUM GENET, (2000), vol. 67, pages 1544 - 1554
    - EDLUND T; WALKER M D; BARR P J; RUTTER W J, "Cell-Specific Expression of the Rat Insulin Gene: Evidence for Role of Two Distinct 5' Flanking Elements", SCIENCE, (1985), vol. 230, doi:doi:10.1126/science.3904002, pages 912 - 916, XP009061325

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.3904002
    - ELBASHIR SM; HARBORTH J; WEBER K; TUSCHL T, "Analysis of Gene Function in Somatic Mammalian Cells Using Small Interfering RNAs", METHODS, (2002), vol. 26, pages 199 - 213
    - ERB E; JANDA K D; BRENNER S, "Recursive Deconvolution of Combinatorial Chemical Libraries", PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (1994), vol. 91, doi:doi:10.1073/pnas.91.24.11422, pages 11422 - 11426, XP055182884

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.91.24.11422
    - FELICI F; CASTAGNOLI L; MUSACCHIO A; JAPPELLI R; CESARENI G, "Selection of Antibody Ligands From a Large Library of Oligopeptides Expressed on a Multivalent Exposition Vector", J MOL BIOL, (1991), vol. 222, doi:doi:10.1016/0022-2836(91)90213-P, pages 301 - 310, XP024018234

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0022-2836(91)90213-P
    - FODOR SP; RAVA R P; HUANG X C; PEASE A C; HOLMES C P; ADAMS C L, "Multiplexed Biochemical Assays With Biological Chips", NATURE, (1993), vol. 364, doi:doi:10.1038/364555a0, pages 555 - 556, XP001019280

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/364555a0
    - GABRIEL SB; SCHAFFNER S F; NGUYEN H; MOORE J M; ROY J; BLUMENSTIEL B; HIGGINS J; DEFELICE M; LOCHNER A; FAGGART M, "The Structure of Haplotype Blocks in the Human Genome", SCIENCE, (2002), vol. 296, doi:doi:10.1126/science.1069424, pages 2225 - 2229, XP002317923

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1069424
    - GALLOP MA; BARRETT R W; DOWER W J; FODOR S P; GORDON E M, "Applications of Combinatorial Technologies to Drug Discovery. 1. Background and Peptide Combinatorial Libraries", JMED CHEM, (1994), vol. 37, pages 1233 - 1251
    - GAUTIER C; MORVAN F; RAYNER B; HUYNH-DINH T; IGOLEN J; IMBACH J L; PAOLETTI C; PAOLETTI J, "Alpha-DNA. IV: Alpha-Anomeric and Beta-Anomeric Tetrathymidylates Covalently Linked to Intercalating Oxazolopyridocarbazole. Synthesis, Physicochemical Properties and Poly (RA) Binding", NUCLEIC ACIDS RES, (1987), vol. 15, pages 6625 - 6641
    - GOEDDEL DV, "Systems for Heterologous Gene Expression", METHODS ENZYMOL, (1990), vol. 185, no. 3-7, pages 3 - 7
    - GOTTESMAN S, "Minimizing Proteolysis in Escherichia Coli: Genetic Solutions", METHODS ENZYMOL, (1990), vol. 185, pages 119 - 29
    - HAGE DS; TWEED S A, "Recent Advances in Chromatographic and Electrophoretic Methods for the Study of Drug-Protein Interactions", J CHROMATOGR B BIOMED SCI APPL, (1997), vol. 699, doi:doi:10.1016/S0378-4347(97)00178-3, pages 499 - 525, XP004095011

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0378-4347(97)00178-3
    - HASELOFF J; GERLACH W L, "Simple RNA Enzymes With New and Highly Specific Endoribonuclease Activities", NATURE, (1988), vol. 334, doi:doi:10.1038/334585a0, pages 585 - 591, XP002029776

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/334585a0
    - HEEGAARD NH, "Capillary Electrophoresis for the Study of Affinity Interactions", J MOL RECOGNIT, (1998), vol. 11, pages 141 - 148
    - HELENE C, "The Anti-Gene Strategy: Control of Gene Expression by Triplex-Forming-Oligonucleotides", ANTICANCER DRUG DES, (1991), vol. 6, pages 569 - 584
    - HELENE C; THUONG N T; HAREL-BELLAN A, "Control of Gene Expression by Triple Helix-Forming Oligonucleotides. The Antigene Strategy", ANN N Y ACAD SCI, (1992), vol. 660, pages 27 - 36
    - HERLYN D; BIREBENT B, "Advances in Cancer Vaccine Development.", ANN MED, (1999), vol. 31, pages 66 - 78
    - HERZOG TJ, "New approaches for the management of cervical cancer", GYNECOL ONCOL., (2003), pages 22 - 7
    - HOUGHTEN RA; APPEL J R; BLONDELLE S E; CUERVO J H; DOOLEY C T; PINILLA C, "The Use of Synthetic Peptide Combinatorial Libraries for the Identification of Bioactive Peptides", BIOTECHNIQUES, (1992), vol. 13, pages 412 - 421
    - HYRUP B; NIELSEN P E, "Peptide Nucleic Acids (PNA): Synthesis, Properties and Potential Applications", BIOORG MED CHEM, (1996), vol. 4, doi:doi:10.1016/0968-0896(95)00171-9, pages 5 - 23, XP000602327

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0968-0896(95)00171-9
    - INOUE H; HAYASE Y; IMURA A; IWAI S; MIURA K; OHTSUKA E, "Synthesis and Hybridization Studies on Two Complementary Nona (2'-O-Methyl)Ribonucleotides", NUCLEIC ACIDS RES, (1987), vol. 15, pages 6131 - 6148
    - INOUE H; HAYASE Y; IWAI S; OHTSUKA E, "Sequence-Dependent Hydrolysis of RNA Using Modified Oligonucleotide Splints and RNase H", FEBS LETT, (1987), vol. 215, doi:doi:10.1016/0014-5793(87)80171-0, pages 327 - 330, XP025599437

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0014-5793(87)80171-0
    - IWABUCHI K; LI B; BARTEL P; FIELDS S, "Use of the Two-Hybrid System to Identify the Domain ofP53 Involved in Oligomerization", ONCOGENE, (1993), vol. 8, pages 1693 - 1696, XP000674780
    - JESPERS LS; ROBERTS A; MAHLER S M; WINTER G; HOOGENBOOM H R, "Guiding the Selection of Human Antibodies From Phage Display Repertoires to a Single Epitope of an Antigen", BIOTECHNOLOGY (N Y), (1994), vol. 12, doi:doi:10.1038/nbt0994-899, pages 899 - 903, XP002155177

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt0994-899
    - KESSEL M; GRUSS P, "Murine Developmental Control Genes", SCIENCE, (1990), vol. 249, pages 374 - 379
    - KIKUCHI T; DAIGO Y; KATAGIRI T; TSUNODA T; OKADA K; KAKIUCHI S; ZEMBUTSU H; FURUKAWA Y; KAWAMURA M; KOBAYASHI K, "Expression Profiles of Non-Small Cell Lung Cancers on CDNA Microarrays: Identification of Genes for Prediction of Lymph-Node Metastasis and Sensitivity to Anti-Cancer Drugs", ONCOGENE, (2003), vol. 22, pages 2192 - 2205
    - KONDRASHOV AS, "Contamination of the Genome by Very Slightly Deleterious Mutations: Why Have We Not Died 100 Times Over?", J THEOR BIOL, (1995), vol. 175, pages 583 - 594
    - KOZAL MJ; SHAH N; SHEN N; YANG R; FUCINI R; MERIGAN T C; RICHMAN D D; MORRIS D; HUBBELL E; CHEE M, "Extensive Polymorphisms Observed in HIV-1 I Clade B Protease Gene Using High-Density Oligonucleotide Arrays", NAT MED, (1996), vol. 2, doi:doi:10.1038/nm0796-753, pages 753 - 759, XP002936062

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nm0796-753
    - LAM KS, "Application of Combinatorial Library Methods in Cancer Research and Drug Discovery", ANTICANCER DRUG DES, (1997), vol. 12, pages 145 - 167, XP000945295
    - LAM KS; SALMON S E; HERSH E M; HRUBY V J; KAZMIERSKI W M; KNAPP R J, "A New Type of Synthetic Peptide Library for Identifying Ligand-Binding Activity", NATURE, (1991), vol. 354, pages 82 - 84
    - LEMAITRE M; BAYARD B; LEBLEU B, "Specific Antiviral Activity of a Poly (L-Lysine)-Conjugated Oligodeoxyribonucleotide Sequence Complementary to Vesicular Stomatitis Virus N Protein MRNA Initiation Site", PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (1987), vol. 84, doi:doi:10.1073/pnas.84.3.648, pages 648 - 652, XP002924015

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.84.3.648
    - LETSINGER RL; ZHANG G R; SUN D K; IKEUCHI T; SARIN P S, "Cholesteryl-Conjugated Oligonucleotides: Synthesis, Properties, and Activity As Inhibitors of Replication of Human Immunodeficiency Virus in Cell Culture", PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (1989), vol. 86, pages 6553 - 6556
    - LIU AY; ROBINSON R R; HELLSTROM K E; MURRAY E D, JR.; CHANG C P; HELLSTROM I, "Chimeric Mouse-Human IgG I Antibody That Can Mediate Lysis of Cancer Cells", PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (1987), vol. 84, pages 3439 - 3443
    - LIU AY; ROBINSON R R; MURRAY E D, JR.; LEDBETTER J A; HELLSTROM I; HELLSTROM K E, "Production of a Mouse-Human Chimeric Monoclonal Antibody to CD20 With Potent Fc-Dependent Biologic Activity", JLMMUNOL, (1987), vol. 139, pages 3521 - 3526, XP002010074
    - LIU N; SAWYER S L; MUKHERJEE N; PAKSTIS A J; KIDD J R; KIDD K K; BROOKES A J; ZHAO H, "Haplotype Block Structures Show Significant Variation Among Populations", GENET EPIDEMIOL, (2004), vol. 27, pages 385 - 400
    - LONBERG N; HUSZAR D, "Human Antibodies From Transgenic Mice", INT REV IMMUNOL, (1995), vol. 13, pages 65 - 93, XP000944265
    - LYNCH HT; DE LA C A, "Hereditary Colorectal Cancer", N ENGL J MED, (2003), vol. 348, pages 919 - 932
    - MADURA K; DOHMEN R J; VARSHAVSKY A, "N-Recognin/Ubc2 Interactions in the N-End Rule Pathway", JBIOL CHEM, (1993), vol. 268, pages 12046 - 12054, XP055007125
    - MAHER LJ, III, "DNA Triple-Helix Formation: an Approach to Artificial Gene Repressors?", BIOESSAYS, (1992), vol. 14, pages 807 - 815
    - MALIK F; DELGADO C; KNUSLI C; IRVINE A E; FISHER D; FRANCIS G E, "Polyethylene Glycol (PEG)-Modified Granulocyte-Macrophage Colony-Stimulating Factor (GM-CSF) With Conserved Biological Activity", EXP HEMATOL, (1992), vol. 20, pages 1028 - 1035, XP002138685
    - MARASCO WA; HASELTINE W A; CHEN S Y, "Design, Intracellular Expression, and Activity of a Human Anti-Human Immunodeficiency Virus Type 1 Gp120 Single-Chain Antibody", PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (1993), vol. 90, doi:doi:10.1073/pnas.90.16.7889, pages 7889 - 7893, XP000389696

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.90.16.7889
    - MCCONNELL HM; OWICKI J C; PARCE J W; MILLER D L; BAXTER G T; WADA H G; PITCHFORD S, "The Cytosensor Microphysiometer: Biological Applications of Silicon Technology", SCIENCE, (1992), vol. 257, pages 1906 - 1912
    - MORRISON SL, "Transfectomas Provide Novel Chimeric Antibodies", SCIENCE, (1985), vol. 229, doi:doi:10.1126/science.3929380, pages 1202 - 1207, XP001030113

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.3929380
    - MYERS RM; LARIN Z; MANIATIS T, "Detection of Single Base Substitutions by Ribonuclease Cleavage at Mismatches in RNA:DNA Duplexes", SCIENCE, (1985), vol. 230, doi:doi:10.1126/science.4071043, pages 1242 - 1246, XP001022204

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.4071043
    - NISHIMURA Y; YOKOYAMA M; ARAKI K; UEDA R; KUDO A; WATANABE T, "Recombinant Human-Mouse Chimeric Monoclonal Antibody Specific for Common Acute Lymphocytic Leukemia Antigen", CANCER RES, (1987), vol. 47, pages 999 - 1005
    - OSBORNE SE; MATSUMURA I; ELLINGTON A D, "Aptamers As Therapeutic and Diagnostic Reagents: Problems and Prospects", CURR OPIN CHEM BIOL, (1997), vol. 1, doi:doi:10.1016/S1367-5931(97)80102-0, pages 5 - 9, XP002280742

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1367-5931(97)80102-0
    - PATEL DJ, "Structural Analysis of Nucleic Acid Aptamers", CURR OPIN CHEM BIOL, (1997), vol. 1, doi:doi:10.1016/S1367-5931(97)80106-8, pages 32 - 46, XP003010637

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1367-5931(97)80106-8
    - PERRY-O'KEEFE H; YAO X W; COULL J M; FUCHS M; EGHOLM M, "Peptide Nucleic Acid Pre-Gel Hybridization: an Alternative to Southern Hybridization", PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (1996), vol. 93, doi:doi:10.1073/pnas.93.25.14670, pages 14670 - 14675, XP002308181

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.93.25.14670
    - PINKERT CA; ORNITZ D M; BRINSTER R L; PALMITER R D, "An Albumin Enhancer Located 10 Kb Upstream Functions Along With Its Promoter to Direct Efficient, Liver-Specific Expression in Transgenic Mice", GENES DEV, (1987), vol. 1, pages 268 - 276, XP000618715
    - QUEEN C; BALTIMORE D, "Immunoglobulin Gene Transcription Is Activated by Downstream Sequence Elements", CELL, (1983), vol. 33, doi:doi:10.1016/0092-8674(83)90016-8, pages 741 - 748, XP027462709

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0092-8674(83)90016-8
    - REICH DE; CARGILL M; BOLK S; IRELAND J; SABETI P C; RICHTER D J; LAVERY T; KOUYOUMJIAN R; FARHADIAN S F; WARD R, "Linkage Disequilibrium in the Human Genome", NATURE, (2001), vol. 411, doi:doi:10.1038/35075590, pages 199 - 204, XP001026202

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/35075590
    - REITER Y; PASTAN I, "Antibody Engineering of Recombinant Fv Immunotoxins for Improved Targeting of Cancer: Disulfide-Stabilized Fv Immunotoxins", CLIN CANCER RES, (1996), vol. 2, pages 245 - 252
    - RIOUX JD; DALY M J; SILVERBERG M S; LINDBLAD K; STEINHART H; COHEN Z; DELMONTE T; KOCHER K; MILLER K; GUSCHWAN S, "Genetic Variation in the 5q31 Cytokine Gene Cluster Confers Susceptibility to Crohn Disease", NAT GENET, (2001), vol. 29, pages 223 - 228
    - RIVAS G; MINTON A P, "New Developments in the Study of Biomolecular Associations Via Sedimentation Equilibrium", TRENDS BIOCHEM SCI, (1993), vol. 18, doi:doi:10.1016/0968-0004(93)90035-L, pages 284 - 287, XP026026251

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0968-0004(93)90035-L
    - SACHIDANANDAM R; WEISSMAN D; SCHMIDT S C; KAKOL J M; STEIN L D; MARTH G; SHERRY S; MULLIKIN J C; MORTIMORE B J; WILLEY D L, "A Map of Human Genome Sequence Variation Containing 1.42 Million Single Nucleotide Polymorphisms", NATURE, (2001), vol. 409, doi:doi:10.1038/35057149, pages 928 - 933, XP002237162

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/35057149
    - SAIKI RK; BUGAWAN T L; HORN G T; MULLIS K B; ERLICH H A, "Analysis of Enzymatically Amplified Beta-Globin and HLA-DQ Alpha DNA With Allele-Specific Oligonucleotide Probes", NATURE, (1986), vol. 324, pages 163 - 166
    - SASIENI D P, "From Genotypes to Genes: Doubling the Sample Size", BIOMETRICS, (1997), vol. 53, no. 4, doi:doi:10.2307/2533494, pages 1253 - 1261, XP002391332

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.2307/2533494
    - SCOTT JK; SMITH G P, "Searching for Peptide Ligands With an Epitope Library", SCIENCE, (1990), vol. 249, doi:doi:10.1126/science.1696028, pages 386 - 390, XP000571645

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1696028
    - SHAW DR; KHAZAELI M B; LOBUGLIO A F, "Mouse/Human Chimeric Antibodies to a Tumor-Associated Antigen: Biologic Activity of the Four Human IgG Subclasses", JNATL CANCER INST, (1988), vol. 80, pages 1553 - 1559
    - SJOLANDER S; URBANICZKY C, "Integrated Fluid Handling System for Biomolecular Interaction Analysis", ANAL CHEM, (1991), vol. 63, doi:doi:10.1021/ac00020a025, pages 2338 - 2345, XP000275479

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ac00020a025
    - SMITH; JOHNSON, "Single-step purification of polypeptides expressed in Escherichia coli as fusions with glutathione S-transferase", GENE, (1988), vol. 67, doi:doi:10.1016/0378-1119(88)90005-4, pages 31 - 40, XP023544179

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0378-1119(88)90005-4
    - SUN LK; CURTIS P; RAKOWICZ-SZULCZYNSKA E; GHRAYEB J; CHANG N; MORRISON S L; KOPROWSKI H, "Chimeric Antibody With Human Constant Regions and Mouse Variable Regions Directed Against Carcinoma-Associated Antigen 17-1 A", PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (1987), vol. 84, doi:doi:10.1073/pnas.84.1.214, pages 214 - 218, XP002184598

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.84.1.214
    - SZABO A; STOLZ L; GRANZOW R, "Surface Plasmon Resonance and Its Use in Biomolecular Interaction Analysis (BIA)", CURR OPIN STRUCT BIOL, (1995), vol. 5, pages 699 - 705
    - TAILLON-MILLER P; PIERNOT E E; KWOK P Y, "Efficient Approach to Unique Single-Nucleotide Polymorphism Discovery", GENOME RES, (1999), vol. 9, pages 499 - 505
    - VAN DER KROL AR; MOL J N; STUITJE A R, "Modulation of Eukaryotic Gene Expression by Complementary RNA or DNA Sequences", BIOTECHNIQUES, (1988), vol. 6, pages 958 - 976, XP000609850
    - VERHOEYEN M; MILSTEIN C; WINTER G, "Reshaping Human Antibodies: Grafting an Antilysozyme Activity", SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 239, doi:doi:10.1126/science.2451287, pages 1534 - 1536, XP002949269

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.2451287
    - VLATAKIS G; ANDERSSON L I; MULLER R; MOSBACH K, "Drug Assay Using Antibody Mimics Made by Molecular Imprinting", NATURE, (1993), vol. 361, pages 645 - 647
    - WADA K; WADA Y; ISHIBASHI F; GOJOBORI T; IKEMURA T, "Codon Usage Tabulated From the GenBank Genetic Sequence Data", NUCLEIC ACIDS RES, (1992), vol. 20
    - WANG DG; FAN J B; SIAO C J; BERNO A; YOUNG P; SAPOLSKY R; GHANDOUR G; PERKINS N; WINCHESTER E; SPENCER J, "Large-Scale Identification, Mapping, and Genotyping of Single-Nucleotide Polymorphisms in the Human Genome", SCIENCE, (1998), vol. 280, pages 1077 - 1082
    - WINOTO A; BALTIMORE D, "A Novel, Inducible and T Cell-Specific Enhancer Located at the 3' End of the T Cell Receptor Alpha Locus", EMBO J, (1989), vol. 8, pages 729 - 733, XP009061335
    - WOOD CR; BOSS M A; KENTEN J H; CALVERT J E; ROBERTS N A; EMTAGE J S, "The Synthesis and in Vivo Assembly of Functional Antibodies in Yeast", NATURE, (1985), vol. 314, pages 446 - 449, XP001313333
    - ZERVOS AS; GYURIS J; BRENT R, "Mxi 1, a Protein That Specifically Interacts With Max to Bind Myc-Max Recognition Sites", CELL, (1993), vol. 72, doi:doi:10.1016/0092-8674(93)90662-A, pages 223 - 232, XP023908564

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0092-8674(93)90662-A
    - ZON G, "Oligonucleotide Analogues As Potential Chemotherapeutic Agents", PHARM RES, (1988), vol. 5, doi:doi:10.1023/A:1015985728434, pages 539 - 549, XP002008915

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1015985728434
    - ZUCKERMANN RN; MARTIN E J; SPELLMEYER D C; STAUBER G B; SHOEMAKER K R; KERR J M; FIGLIOZZI G M; GOFF D A; SIANI M A; SIMON R J, "Ligands for 7-Transmembrane G-Protein-Coupled Receptors From a Diverse N-(Substituted)Glycine Peptoid Library", JMED CHEM, (1994), vol. 37, doi:doi:10.1021/jm00043a007, pages 2678 - 2685, XP000608720

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm00043a007
 WO1986US02269