Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2248665

EP2248665 - Thermoplastic planks [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2010/45]Thermoplastic planks and methods for making the same
[2016/24]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  19.08.2016
Database last updated on 26.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip19.08.2016Patent maintained (B2 publication)published on 21.09.2016  [2016/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Välinge Innovation AB
Prästavägen 513
263 65 Viken / SE
[2014/42]
Former [2010/45]For all designated states
Mannington Mills, Inc.
75 Mannington Mills Road P.O. Box 30, Route 45
Salem, NJ 08079-0030 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Chen, Hao A.
40 Blue Stone Road
Chadds Ford, PA 19317 / US
02 / Judd, Richard
208 Jaymar Boulevard
Newark, DE 19702 / US
 [2010/45]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[2016/38]
Former [2013/04]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
Former [2010/45]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
Application number, filing date10007691.812.12.2000
[2010/45]
Priority number, dateUS1999046092814.12.1999         Original published format: US 460928
US2000063012101.08.2000         Original published format: US 630121
[2010/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2248665
Date:10.11.2010
Language:EN
[2010/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2248665
Date:23.01.2013
Language:EN
[2013/04]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP2248665
Date:21.09.2016
Language:EN
[2016/38]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.10.2010
ClassificationInternational:B29C47/06, B32B27/06, E04F15/10
[2016/24]
Former International [2011/46]B29C47/06
Former International [2010/45]B32B27/06, E04F15/10
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2016/38]
Former [2010/45]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Thermoplastiche Platten[2016/24]
English:Thermoplastic planks[2016/24]
French:Planches thermoplastiques[2016/24]
Former [2010/45]Thermoplastiche Platten und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung
Former [2010/45]Thermoplastic planks and methods for making the same
Former [2010/45]Planches thermoplastiques et procédé pour leur production
Examination procedure29.04.2011Examination requested  [2011/24]
22.07.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.09.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.07.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.11.2012Fee for grant paid
19.11.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
15.10.2015Observations by third parties
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP00127179.0  / EP1108529
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20000127179) is  20.10.2005
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  23.10.2013  04.12.2015  WITHDRAWN
Flooring Industries Limited, SARL
10b, Rue des Mérovingiens (ZI Bourmicht)
8070 Bertrange / LU
Opponent's representative
Valea AB
Box 1098
405 23 Göteborg / SE
 [2016/02]
Former [2013/48]
Opponent(s)01  23.10.2013   
Flooring Industries Limited, SARL
10b, Rue des Mérovingiens (ZI Bourmicht)
8070 Bertrange / LU
Opponent's representative
Valea AB
Box 1098
405 23 Göteborg / SE
05.12.2013Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
13.06.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
17.12.2015Date of oral proceedings
25.01.2016Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
25.01.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
04.02.2016Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
20.05.2016Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
08.08.2016Fee for printing new specification paid
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.07.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
23.07.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
23.07.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
23.07.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
23.07.2010Renewal fee patent year 07
23.07.2010Renewal fee patent year 08
23.07.2010Renewal fee patent year 09
23.07.2010Renewal fee patent year 10
15.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 11
12.12.2011Renewal fee patent year 12
11.12.2012Renewal fee patent year 13
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT23.01.2013
CY23.01.2013
DK23.01.2013
FI23.01.2013
IT23.01.2013
MC23.01.2013
NL23.01.2013
SE23.01.2013
TR23.01.2013
GR24.04.2013
ES04.05.2013
PT23.05.2013
[2015/32]
Former [2014/33]AT23.01.2013
CY23.01.2013
DK23.01.2013
FI23.01.2013
IT23.01.2013
MC23.01.2013
NL23.01.2013
SE23.01.2013
GR24.04.2013
ES04.05.2013
PT23.05.2013
Former [2014/03]AT23.01.2013
CY23.01.2013
DK23.01.2013
FI23.01.2013
IT23.01.2013
NL23.01.2013
SE23.01.2013
GR24.04.2013
ES04.05.2013
PT23.05.2013
Former [2013/52]AT23.01.2013
CY23.01.2013
DK23.01.2013
FI23.01.2013
NL23.01.2013
SE23.01.2013
GR24.04.2013
ES04.05.2013
PT23.05.2013
Former [2013/48]AT23.01.2013
DK23.01.2013
FI23.01.2013
NL23.01.2013
SE23.01.2013
GR24.04.2013
ES04.05.2013
PT23.05.2013
Former [2013/40]AT23.01.2013
FI23.01.2013
NL23.01.2013
SE23.01.2013
GR24.04.2013
ES04.05.2013
PT23.05.2013
Former [2013/37]AT23.01.2013
FI23.01.2013
NL23.01.2013
SE23.01.2013
GR24.04.2013
ES04.05.2013
Former [2013/36]AT23.01.2013
SE23.01.2013
ES04.05.2013
Former [2013/34]SE23.01.2013
Documents cited:Search[A]WO9511333  (AMTICO CO ;HARWOOD IVOR CHARLES (GB); JONES KEITH MELVIN (GB); WIL) [A] 1-13 * page 3, line 15 - page 5, line 22 * * example . *;
 [A]US4724187  (SIMON ALICE M ET AL) [A] 1-13 * column 2, line 58 - column 3, line 68 * * example - *;
 [A]FR2557905  (GERLAND) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *
OppositionCA2252791
 DE19854475
 WO0047841
 WO9917930
 JPH03169967
 JPH07180333
 CN2301491Y
 US4312686
 US5112671
 JPS60255843
 GB1520964
    - Translation of D4 into English
    - Translation of D5 into English
    - CN 2301491 Y and its automatic translation into English, & CN2301491Y Y 00000000
    - Translation of D9 into English
    - Laminat Forum, "Lamintfußböden - Technik und Technologien", pp. 23-24, undated
    - V. Kettler in Mobiloil / Holzwerkdstoff-Symposium, "Laminatböden - Markt, Produktion und Verlegung", Stuttgart 1998, pp. 1-24
    - H. HORST ET AL., Ullmann's Encyclopedia of Industrial Chemistry, WEINHEIM, VCH VERLAGSGESELLSCHAFT, (1996), vol. A28, pages 345 - 350
    - H. SOINÉ, Holzwerkstoffe - Herstellung und Verarbeitung, Platten, Beschichtungsstoffe Formteile, Türen, Möbel, LEINFELDEN-ECHTERDINGEN, DRW - VERLAG, (1995), pages 5-14 - 86-122
    - "Polyvinyl chloride" in Wikipedia, undated
    - "Overlays" in Römpp Chemie Lexikon, April 2007
    - "Overlays" in Webster's New Universal Unabridged Dictionary, NEW YORK, BARNES & NOBLE BOOKS, (1992), page 1028
    - ASTM F 1700-96, Standard Specification for Solid Vinyl Floor Tile
    - AZROCK Commercial Flooring, Luxury Vinyl Tile, April 1998
    - L. I. NASS, Encyclopedia of PVC, NEW YORK, MARCEL DEKKER, INC., (1976), vol. 1, pages 212 - 215