Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2413045

EP2413045 - Heat exchange unit [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  01.01.2017
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.02.2019Change - representative 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Grundfos Management A/S
Poul Due Jensens Vej 7 - 11
8850 Bjerringbro / DK
[2012/05]
Inventor(s)01 / Jensen, Olav
Egeskovvej 41
8800 Viborg / DK
 [2012/05]
Representative(s)Patentanwälte Vollmann Hemmer Lindfeld Partnerschaft mbB
Wallstraße 33a
23560 Lübeck / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/05]Hemmer, Arnd , et al
Patentanwälte Vollmann & Hemmer Wallstrasse 33a
23560 Lübeck / DE
Application number, filing date10007976.330.07.2010
[2012/05]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2413045
Date:01.02.2012
Language:DE
[2012/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2413045
Date:26.02.2014
Language:DE
[2014/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.12.2010
ClassificationInternational:F28F9/02, F24D3/10, F24H9/14, F28D9/00
[2013/15]
Former International [2012/05]F24D3/10, F24H9/14, F28D9/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/05]
TitleGerman:Wärmetauschereinheit[2012/05]
English:Heat exchange unit[2012/05]
French:Unité d'échange thermique[2012/05]
Examination procedure27.07.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.07.2012Examination requested  [2012/37]
10.09.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.01.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.09.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.01.2014Fee for grant paid
07.01.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  10.09.2012
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  25.11.2014   
Robert Bosch GmbH
Postfach 30 02 20
70442 Stuttgart / DE
 [2015/01]
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
09.01.2015Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
13.07.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
06.12.2016Date of oral proceedings
02.01.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
02.01.2017Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Appeal following opposition20.01.2017Appeal received No.  T0209/17
12.05.2017Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
08.07.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU30.07.2010
AL26.02.2014
BG26.02.2014
CY26.02.2014
CZ26.02.2014
DK26.02.2014
EE26.02.2014
ES26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
HR26.02.2014
LT26.02.2014
LV26.02.2014
MC26.02.2014
MK26.02.2014
MT26.02.2014
NL26.02.2014
PL26.02.2014
RO26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
SI26.02.2014
SK26.02.2014
SM26.02.2014
TR26.02.2014
NO26.05.2014
GR27.05.2014
IS26.06.2014
PT26.06.2014
IE30.07.2014
LU30.07.2014
BE31.07.2014
CH31.07.2014
LI31.07.2014
AT30.07.2015
[2018/46]
Former [2018/30]HU30.07.2010
BG26.02.2014
CY26.02.2014
CZ26.02.2014
DK26.02.2014
EE26.02.2014
ES26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
HR26.02.2014
LT26.02.2014
LV26.02.2014
MC26.02.2014
MK26.02.2014
MT26.02.2014
NL26.02.2014
PL26.02.2014
RO26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
SI26.02.2014
SK26.02.2014
SM26.02.2014
TR26.02.2014
NO26.05.2014
GR27.05.2014
IS26.06.2014
PT26.06.2014
IE30.07.2014
LU30.07.2014
BE31.07.2014
CH31.07.2014
LI31.07.2014
AT30.07.2015
Former [2016/50]HU30.07.2010
BG26.02.2014
CY26.02.2014
CZ26.02.2014
DK26.02.2014
EE26.02.2014
ES26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
HR26.02.2014
LT26.02.2014
LV26.02.2014
MC26.02.2014
MT26.02.2014
NL26.02.2014
PL26.02.2014
RO26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
SI26.02.2014
SK26.02.2014
SM26.02.2014
TR26.02.2014
NO26.05.2014
GR27.05.2014
IS26.06.2014
PT26.06.2014
IE30.07.2014
LU30.07.2014
BE31.07.2014
CH31.07.2014
LI31.07.2014
AT30.07.2015
Former [2016/33]HU30.07.2010
BG26.02.2014
CY26.02.2014
CZ26.02.2014
DK26.02.2014
EE26.02.2014
ES26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
HR26.02.2014
LT26.02.2014
LV26.02.2014
MC26.02.2014
MT26.02.2014
NL26.02.2014
PL26.02.2014
RO26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
SI26.02.2014
SK26.02.2014
SM26.02.2014
TR26.02.2014
NO26.05.2014
GR27.05.2014
IS26.06.2014
PT26.06.2014
IE30.07.2014
LU30.07.2014
BE31.07.2014
CH31.07.2014
LI31.07.2014
Former [2016/32]HU30.07.2010
BG26.02.2014
CY26.02.2014
CZ26.02.2014
DK26.02.2014
EE26.02.2014
ES26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
HR26.02.2014
LT26.02.2014
LV26.02.2014
MC26.02.2014
MT26.02.2014
NL26.02.2014
PL26.02.2014
RO26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
SI26.02.2014
SK26.02.2014
SM26.02.2014
NO26.05.2014
GR27.05.2014
IS26.06.2014
PT26.06.2014
IE30.07.2014
LU30.07.2014
BE31.07.2014
CH31.07.2014
LI31.07.2014
Former [2016/28]BG26.02.2014
CY26.02.2014
CZ26.02.2014
DK26.02.2014
EE26.02.2014
ES26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
HR26.02.2014
LT26.02.2014
LV26.02.2014
MC26.02.2014
MT26.02.2014
NL26.02.2014
PL26.02.2014
RO26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
SI26.02.2014
SK26.02.2014
SM26.02.2014
NO26.05.2014
GR27.05.2014
IS26.06.2014
PT26.06.2014
IE30.07.2014
LU30.07.2014
CH31.07.2014
LI31.07.2014
Former [2016/22]CY26.02.2014
CZ26.02.2014
DK26.02.2014
EE26.02.2014
ES26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
HR26.02.2014
LT26.02.2014
LV26.02.2014
MC26.02.2014
NL26.02.2014
PL26.02.2014
RO26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
SI26.02.2014
SK26.02.2014
SM26.02.2014
NO26.05.2014
IS26.06.2014
PT26.06.2014
IE30.07.2014
LU30.07.2014
CH31.07.2014
LI31.07.2014
Former [2016/21]CY26.02.2014
CZ26.02.2014
DK26.02.2014
EE26.02.2014
ES26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
HR26.02.2014
LT26.02.2014
LV26.02.2014
MC26.02.2014
NL26.02.2014
PL26.02.2014
RO26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
SI26.02.2014
SK26.02.2014
NO26.05.2014
IS26.06.2014
PT26.06.2014
IE30.07.2014
LU30.07.2014
CH31.07.2014
LI31.07.2014
Former [2015/37]CY26.02.2014
CZ26.02.2014
DK26.02.2014
EE26.02.2014
ES26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
HR26.02.2014
LT26.02.2014
LV26.02.2014
NL26.02.2014
PL26.02.2014
RO26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
SI26.02.2014
SK26.02.2014
NO26.05.2014
IS26.06.2014
PT26.06.2014
IE30.07.2014
LU30.07.2014
CH31.07.2014
LI31.07.2014
Former [2015/24]CY26.02.2014
CZ26.02.2014
DK26.02.2014
EE26.02.2014
ES26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
HR26.02.2014
LT26.02.2014
LV26.02.2014
NL26.02.2014
PL26.02.2014
RO26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
SI26.02.2014
SK26.02.2014
NO26.05.2014
IS26.06.2014
PT26.06.2014
LU30.07.2014
CH31.07.2014
LI31.07.2014
Former [2015/20]CY26.02.2014
CZ26.02.2014
DK26.02.2014
EE26.02.2014
ES26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
HR26.02.2014
LT26.02.2014
LV26.02.2014
NL26.02.2014
PL26.02.2014
RO26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
SK26.02.2014
NO26.05.2014
IS26.06.2014
PT26.06.2014
LU30.07.2014
CH31.07.2014
LI31.07.2014
Former [2015/13]CY26.02.2014
CZ26.02.2014
DK26.02.2014
EE26.02.2014
ES26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
HR26.02.2014
LT26.02.2014
LV26.02.2014
NL26.02.2014
PL26.02.2014
RO26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
SK26.02.2014
NO26.05.2014
IS26.06.2014
PT26.06.2014
LU30.07.2014
Former [2014/50]CY26.02.2014
CZ26.02.2014
DK26.02.2014
EE26.02.2014
ES26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
HR26.02.2014
LT26.02.2014
LV26.02.2014
NL26.02.2014
PL26.02.2014
RO26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
SK26.02.2014
NO26.05.2014
IS26.06.2014
PT26.06.2014
Former [2014/49]CY26.02.2014
CZ26.02.2014
DK26.02.2014
EE26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
HR26.02.2014
LT26.02.2014
LV26.02.2014
NL26.02.2014
RO26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
NO26.05.2014
IS26.06.2014
PT26.06.2014
Former [2014/48]CY26.02.2014
CZ26.02.2014
DK26.02.2014
EE26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
HR26.02.2014
LT26.02.2014
LV26.02.2014
NL26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
NO26.05.2014
IS26.06.2014
PT26.06.2014
Former [2014/41]CY26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
HR26.02.2014
LT26.02.2014
LV26.02.2014
NL26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
NO26.05.2014
IS26.06.2014
PT26.06.2014
Former [2014/39]CY26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
LT26.02.2014
NL26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
NO26.05.2014
IS26.06.2014
PT26.06.2014
Former [2014/37]CY26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
LT26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
NO26.05.2014
IS26.06.2014
PT26.06.2014
Former [2014/36]LT26.02.2014
NO26.05.2014
IS26.06.2014
Documents cited:Search[I]DE202006009322U  (F W OVENTROP GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [I] 1-4,9,10,14,16 * abstract * * page 3 *;
 [I]DE202009009218U  (VIESSMANN WERKE KG [DE]) [I] 1 * abstract * * pages 2-3 *