Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2282117

EP2282117 - Connection channel [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  25.07.2014
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.07.2014Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 27.08.2014  [2014/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Dome Holding GmbH
Robert-Bosch-Strasse 4
78080 Dauchingen / DE
[2011/06]
Inventor(s)01 / Rütten, Thomas
St.-Maternus-Strasse 14
41844 Wegberg / DE
 [2011/06]
Representative(s)Mussgnug, Bernd
Patentanwälte
Westphal, Mussgnug & Partner
Am Riettor 5
78048 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2011/06]Mussgnug, Bernd
Patentanwälte Westphal, Mussgnug & Partner Am Riettor 5
78048 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE
Application number, filing date10008031.602.08.2010
[2011/06]
Priority number, dateDE20092010689U07.08.2009         Original published format: DE 202009010689 U
[2011/06]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2282117
Date:09.02.2011
Language:DE
[2011/06]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2282117
Date:17.10.2012
Language:DE
[2012/42]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.09.2012
ClassificationInternational:F23D14/36, F23D11/00, F23C7/00, F23L5/02
[2011/06]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2011/06]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:Verbindungskanal[2011/06]
English:Connection channel[2011/06]
French:Canal de raccordement[2011/06]
Examination procedure12.04.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.04.2013Examination requested  [2013/21]
15.05.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.08.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.01.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.07.2014Application withdrawn by applicant  [2014/35]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  15.05.2013
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.08.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
19.08.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[XAI]DE29803416U  (GIERSCH GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2,4-6,11,12 * page 3, line 8 - line 36; figures 1-4 * [A] 9 [I] 7,13;
 [XY]DE9404776U  (KOEHNE HEINRICH PROF DR ING [DE]; SCHMITZ TORSTEN DIPL ING [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,11,12,14 * page 6, line 20 - line 22 * * page 8, line 28 - page 9, line 16; figures 2-5 * [Y] 10;
 [Y]FR2492054  (PAQUET THERMIQUE [FR]) [Y] 10 * page 3, line 36 - page 4, line 4; figure 1 *;
 [XI]EP0797047  (F I M FONDERIA IND MECCANICHE [IT]) [X] 1,2,4-6,11,12,14 * column 5, line 13 - column 8, line 10; figures 1-4 * [I] 3;
 [A]DE3011287  (HEISLER & LEINS THERMOSTAR [DE]) [A] 8 * page 4, paragraph 3; figure 1 *