Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2420803

EP2420803 - Device for recording the torsion angle of a shaft and/or the torque of a shaft and method for operating the device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  17.03.2017
Database last updated on 20.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip17.03.2017Refusal of applicationpublished on 19.04.2017  [2017/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BALLUFF GmbH
Schurwaldstrasse 9
73765 Neuhausen / DE
[2012/08]
Inventor(s)01 / Fericean, Sorin
Giemseckstrasse 34
71229 Leonberg / DE
02 / Hiller-Brod, Andrea
Silvanerweg 23
73235 Weilheim / DE
03 / Droxler, Reinhard
Lange-Acker-Strasse 10
72800 Eningen / DE
04 / Fritton, Markus
Haldenweg 4
73765 Neuhausen / DE
05 / Kräter, Daniel
Kreutstrasse 6A
75056 Sulzfeld / DE
 [2012/28]
Former [2012/08]01 / Fericean, Sorin
Giemseckstr. 34
71229 Leonberg / DE
02 / Hiller-Brod, Andrea
Silvanerweg 23
73235 Weilheim / DE
03 / Droxler, Reinhard
Lange-Acker-Str. 10
72800 Eningen / DE
04 / Fritton, Markus
Haldenweg 4
73765 Neuhausen / DE
05 / Kräter, Daniel
Kreutstr. 6A
75056 Sulzfeld / DE
Representative(s)Jakelski & Althoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Patentanwälte
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft
Mollenbachstraße 37
71229 Leonberg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/08]Jakelski, Joachim
Otte & Jakelski, Patentanwaltskanzlei Mollenbachstrasse 37
71229 Leonberg / DE
Application number, filing date10008468.013.08.2010
[2012/08]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2420803
Date:22.02.2012
Language:DE
[2012/08]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP25.07.2011
ClassificationInternational:G01D5/20
[2012/08]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/08]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zum Erfassen des Verdrehwinkels einer Welle und /oder eines an der Welle auftretenden Drehmoments und Verfahren zum Betreiben der Vorrichtung[2012/08]
English:Device for recording the torsion angle of a shaft and/or the torque of a shaft and method for operating the device[2012/08]
French:Dispositif de saisie de l'angle de distorsion d'un arbre et/ou d'un couple situé sur l'arbre et procédé de fonctionnement du dispositif[2012/08]
Examination procedure23.05.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.05.2012Examination requested  [2012/28]
27.05.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.09.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.04.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.05.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.10.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.01.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.10.2016Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 17.10.2016
17.10.2016Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
29.11.2016Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2017/16]
09.12.2016Application refused, date of legal effect [2017/16]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  27.05.2014
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
26.06.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
02.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
21.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
22.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0341412  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1-26 * figures 3,4,5; claim 1 *;
 [X]EP0446969  (S G KK [JP]) [X] 1-26 * figures 24,25,26,42,43; claim 1 *;
 [A]DE19738836  (HELLA KG HUECK & CO [DE]) [A] 1-26 * figures 3,4; claim 1 *
by applicantDE19818799
 DE19932965
 DE60201226T
 DE69732355T
 DE102007023537
 EP1315954