Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2306352

EP2306352 - Diabetes therapy device enabling shifting of parameter profiles [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.11.2013
Database last updated on 16.11.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For:DE 
Roche Diagnostics GmbH
Sandhoferstrasse 116
68305 Mannheim / DE
For:AL  AT  BE  BG  CH  CY  CZ  DK  EE  ES  FI  FR  GB  GR  HR  HU  IE  IS  IT  LI  LT  LU  LV  MC  MK  MT  NL  NO  PL  PT  RO  SE  SI  SK  SM  TR 
F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG
Grenzacherstrasse 124
4070 Basel / CH
[N/P]
Former [2013/02]For:DE 
Roche Diagnostics GmbH
Sandhoferstrasse 116
68305 Mannheim / DE
For:AL  AT  BE  BG  CH  CY  CZ  DK  EE  ES  FI  FR  GB  GR  HR  HU  IE  IS  IT  LI  LT  LU  LV  MC  MK  MT  NL  NO  PL  PT  RO  SE  SI  SK  SM  TR 
F.Hoffmann-La Roche AG
Grenzacherstrasse 124
4070 Basel / CH
Former [2011/14]For:DE 
Roche Diagnostics GmbH
Sandhofer Sr. 116
68305 Mannheim / DE
For:AL  AT  BE  BG  CH  CY  CZ  DK  EE  ES  FI  FR  GB  GR  HR  HU  IE  IS  IT  LI  LT  LU  LV  MC  MK  MT  NL  NO  PL  PT  RO  SE  SI  SK  SM  TR 
F.Hoffmann-La Roche AG
Grenzacherstrasse 124
4070 Basel / CH
Inventor(s)01 / Prod'hom, Gilles
Vereinsweg 23
3012 Bern / CH
02 / Prudhomme, Thierry
Pleerweg 9C
3400 Burgdorf / CH
03 / Hellwig, Robert
Muristrasse 33
3006 Bern / CH
04 / Teupe, Dr. med. Bernhard
Diabetes-Dorf Althausen
Im Brunnental 10-18
97980 Bd. Mergentheim / DE
 [2013/02]
Former [2011/27]01 / Prod'hom, Gilles
Vereinsweg 23
3012 Bern / CH
02 / Prudhomme, Thierry
Pleerweg 9C
3400 Burgdorf / CH
03 / Hellwig, Robert
Muristrasse 33
3006 Bern / CH
04 / Teupe, Dr. med. Bernhard
Diabetes-Dorf Althausen Im Brunnental 10-18
97980 Bd. Mergentheim / DE
Former [2011/14]01 / Prod'hom, Gilles
Vereinsweg 23
3012 Bern / CH
02 / Prudhomme, Thierry
Pleerweg 9C
3400 Burgdorf / CH
03 / Hellwig, Robert
Längassstrasse 70C
3012 Bern / CH
04 / Teupe, Dr. med. Bernhard
Diabetes-Dorf Althausen Im Brunnental 10-18
97980 Bd. Mergentheim / DE
Representative(s)Rentsch Partner AG
Bellerivestrasse 203
Postfach
8034 Zürich / CH
[N/P]
Former [2013/02]Rentsch Partner AG
Rechtsanwälte und Patentanwälte
Fraumünsterstrasse 9
Postfach 2441
8022 Zürich / CH
Former [2012/16]Rentsch Partner AG
Assoc. No. 254
Fraumünsterstrasse 9
Postfach 9 P.O. Box 2441
8022 Zürich / CH
Former [2012/07]Rentsch Partner AG
Rechtsanwälte und Patentanwälte Fraumünsterstrasse 9 Postfach 2441
8022 Zürich / CH
Former [2011/14]Poredda, Andreas
c/o Roche Diabetes Care AG Patent Department Kirchbergstrasse 190
3401 Burgdorf / CH
Application number, filing date10009697.316.09.2010
[2011/14]
Priority number, dateEP2009001218225.09.2009         Original published format: EP 09012182
[2011/14]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2306352
Date:06.04.2011
Language:EN
[2011/14]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2306352
Date:09.01.2013
Language:EN
[2013/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.01.2011
ClassificationInternational:G06F19/00
[2011/14]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2011/14]
TitleGerman:Diabetestherapievorrichtung, die eine Verschiebung von Parameterprofilen ermöglicht[2011/14]
English:Diabetes therapy device enabling shifting of parameter profiles[2011/14]
French:Dispositif de thérapie contre les diabètes permettant une commutation de profils de paramètres[2011/14]
Examination procedure20.05.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.05.2011Examination requested  [2011/28]
01.06.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.07.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.07.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.11.2012Fee for grant paid
20.11.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  01.06.2012
Opposition(s)10.10.2013No opposition filed within time limit [2013/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.09.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU16.09.2010
AL09.01.2013
AT09.01.2013
BE09.01.2013
CY09.01.2013
CZ09.01.2013
EE09.01.2013
FI09.01.2013
HR09.01.2013
IT09.01.2013
LT09.01.2013
LV09.01.2013
MC09.01.2013
MK09.01.2013
MT09.01.2013
PL09.01.2013
RO09.01.2013
SE09.01.2013
SI09.01.2013
SK09.01.2013
SM09.01.2013
TR09.01.2013
BG09.04.2013
NO09.04.2013
GR10.04.2013
ES20.04.2013
IS09.05.2013
PT09.05.2013
IE16.09.2013
LU16.09.2013
[2018/46]
Former [2015/34]HU16.09.2010
AT09.01.2013
BE09.01.2013
CY09.01.2013
CZ09.01.2013
EE09.01.2013
FI09.01.2013
HR09.01.2013
IT09.01.2013
LT09.01.2013
LV09.01.2013
MC09.01.2013
MK09.01.2013
MT09.01.2013
PL09.01.2013
RO09.01.2013
SE09.01.2013
SI09.01.2013
SK09.01.2013
SM09.01.2013
TR09.01.2013
BG09.04.2013
NO09.04.2013
GR10.04.2013
ES20.04.2013
IS09.05.2013
PT09.05.2013
IE16.09.2013
LU16.09.2013
Former [2015/32]AT09.01.2013
BE09.01.2013
CY09.01.2013
CZ09.01.2013
EE09.01.2013
FI09.01.2013
HR09.01.2013
IT09.01.2013
LT09.01.2013
LV09.01.2013
MC09.01.2013
MK09.01.2013
MT09.01.2013
PL09.01.2013
RO09.01.2013
SE09.01.2013
SI09.01.2013
SK09.01.2013
SM09.01.2013
TR09.01.2013
BG09.04.2013
NO09.04.2013
GR10.04.2013
ES20.04.2013
IS09.05.2013
PT09.05.2013
IE16.09.2013
Former [2015/24]AT09.01.2013
BE09.01.2013
CY09.01.2013
CZ09.01.2013
EE09.01.2013
FI09.01.2013
HR09.01.2013
IT09.01.2013
LT09.01.2013
LV09.01.2013
MC09.01.2013
PL09.01.2013
RO09.01.2013
SE09.01.2013
SI09.01.2013
SK09.01.2013
SM09.01.2013
BG09.04.2013
NO09.04.2013
GR10.04.2013
ES20.04.2013
IS09.05.2013
PT09.05.2013
IE16.09.2013
Former [2014/33]AT09.01.2013
BE09.01.2013
CY09.01.2013
CZ09.01.2013
EE09.01.2013
FI09.01.2013
HR09.01.2013
IT09.01.2013
LT09.01.2013
LV09.01.2013
MC09.01.2013
PL09.01.2013
RO09.01.2013
SE09.01.2013
SI09.01.2013
SK09.01.2013
BG09.04.2013
NO09.04.2013
GR10.04.2013
ES20.04.2013
IS09.05.2013
PT09.05.2013
IE16.09.2013
Former [2014/20]AT09.01.2013
BE09.01.2013
CY09.01.2013
CZ09.01.2013
EE09.01.2013
FI09.01.2013
HR09.01.2013
IT09.01.2013
LT09.01.2013
LV09.01.2013
MC09.01.2013
PL09.01.2013
RO09.01.2013
SE09.01.2013
SI09.01.2013
SK09.01.2013
BG09.04.2013
NO09.04.2013
GR10.04.2013
ES20.04.2013
IS09.05.2013
PT09.05.2013
Former [2014/03]AT09.01.2013
BE09.01.2013
CY09.01.2013
CZ09.01.2013
EE09.01.2013
FI09.01.2013
HR09.01.2013
IT09.01.2013
LT09.01.2013
LV09.01.2013
PL09.01.2013
RO09.01.2013
SE09.01.2013
SI09.01.2013
SK09.01.2013
BG09.04.2013
NO09.04.2013
GR10.04.2013
ES20.04.2013
IS09.05.2013
PT09.05.2013
Former [2013/52]AT09.01.2013
BE09.01.2013
CY09.01.2013
CZ09.01.2013
EE09.01.2013
FI09.01.2013
HR09.01.2013
LT09.01.2013
LV09.01.2013
PL09.01.2013
RO09.01.2013
SE09.01.2013
SI09.01.2013
SK09.01.2013
BG09.04.2013
NO09.04.2013
GR10.04.2013
ES20.04.2013
IS09.05.2013
PT09.05.2013
Former [2013/49]AT09.01.2013
BE09.01.2013
CZ09.01.2013
EE09.01.2013
FI09.01.2013
HR09.01.2013
LT09.01.2013
LV09.01.2013
PL09.01.2013
RO09.01.2013
SE09.01.2013
SI09.01.2013
SK09.01.2013
BG09.04.2013
NO09.04.2013
GR10.04.2013
ES20.04.2013
IS09.05.2013
PT09.05.2013
Former [2013/41]AT09.01.2013
BE09.01.2013
FI09.01.2013
HR09.01.2013
LT09.01.2013
LV09.01.2013
PL09.01.2013
SE09.01.2013
SI09.01.2013
BG09.04.2013
NO09.04.2013
GR10.04.2013
ES20.04.2013
IS09.05.2013
PT09.05.2013
Former [2013/40]AT09.01.2013
BE09.01.2013
FI09.01.2013
LT09.01.2013
LV09.01.2013
PL09.01.2013
SE09.01.2013
SI09.01.2013
BG09.04.2013
NO09.04.2013
GR10.04.2013
ES20.04.2013
IS09.05.2013
PT09.05.2013
Former [2013/38]AT09.01.2013
BE09.01.2013
FI09.01.2013
LT09.01.2013
LV09.01.2013
PL09.01.2013
SE09.01.2013
SI09.01.2013
BG09.04.2013
NO09.04.2013
GR10.04.2013
ES20.04.2013
IS09.05.2013
Former [2013/37]AT09.01.2013
BE09.01.2013
FI09.01.2013
LT09.01.2013
PL09.01.2013
SE09.01.2013
SI09.01.2013
BG09.04.2013
NO09.04.2013
GR10.04.2013
ES20.04.2013
IS09.05.2013
Former [2013/36]AT09.01.2013
BE09.01.2013
LT09.01.2013
PL09.01.2013
SE09.01.2013
SI09.01.2013
BG09.04.2013
NO09.04.2013
ES20.04.2013
IS09.05.2013
Former [2013/35]BE09.01.2013
LT09.01.2013
SE09.01.2013
SI09.01.2013
BG09.04.2013
NO09.04.2013
IS09.05.2013
Former [2013/34]LT09.01.2013
SE09.01.2013
SI09.01.2013
BG09.04.2013
NO09.04.2013
IS09.05.2013
Former [2013/33]LT09.01.2013
SI09.01.2013
NO09.04.2013
Former [2013/26]SI09.01.2013
Documents cited:Search[X]US2009177147  (BLOMQUIST MICHAEL [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0055] * * paragraph [0090] - paragraph [0099] * * figures 1-19 *;
 [X]US2007142822  (REMDE AXEL [CH]) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0046] * * figures 1-6 *;
 [X]US2008106431  (BLOMQUIST MICHAEL L [US]) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0111] - paragraph [0127] * * paragraph [0161] - paragraph [0218] * * paragraph [0219] - paragraph [0231] * * figures 1-27 *;
 [A]EP1458435  (MEDTRONIC MINIMED INC [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0059] - paragraph [0060] *;
 [A]US2002065509  (LEBEL RONALD J [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0160] * * paragraph [0165] - paragraph [0174] *;
 [A]WO2009106299  (ROCHE DIAGNOSTICS GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0048] *
by applicantWO03053498
 US2009177147
 US2007142822
 EP2108393
 WO2006066926