blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2924498 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2924498



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 391
05.06.2019 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 2
18.03.2019 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 2
08.03.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
08.03.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
08.03.2019 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
29.10.2018 Annex to a communication Search / examination 3
29.10.2018 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
29.10.2018 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
05.07.2018 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
06.06.2018 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
06.06.2018 Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments Search / examination 1
23.02.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
23.02.2018 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
23.02.2018 Claims Search / examination 2
23.02.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
23.02.2018 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
17.10.2017 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
17.10.2017 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
08.06.2017 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
31.01.2017 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
31.01.2017 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
06.09.2016 Examination started Search / examination 1
17.03.2016 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
17.03.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
17.03.2016 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 4
17.03.2016 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
17.03.2016 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
05.10.2015 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
02.09.2015 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
18.06.2015 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
18.06.2015 European search opinion Search / examination 3
18.06.2015 European search report Search / examination 3
11.06.2015 Modified abstract Search / examination 1
24.02.2015 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
15.07.2013 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
12.07.2013 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
11.07.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
11.07.2013 Decision Search / examination 6
25.03.2013 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 6
08.02.2013 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 3
15.01.2013 Note on telephone consultation Search / examination 1
18.01.2012 Matter currently under investigation Search / examination 1
15.11.2011 Annex Search / examination 3
15.11.2011 Request for a decision Search / examination 11
22.09.2011 Note on telephone consultation Search / examination 1
15.09.2011 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no processing as European divisional application) Search / examination 1
04.10.2010 Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document Search / examination 1
22.09.2010 Abstract Search / examination 1
22.09.2010 Claims Search / examination 2
22.09.2010 Description Search / examination 140
22.09.2010 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
22.09.2010 Drawings Search / examination 34
22.09.2010 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 2
22.09.2010 Request for grant of a European patent (divisional application) Search / examination 8
29.03.2007 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 96