Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2295004

EP2295004 - Method for fabricating a plurality of dental incremental position adjustment appliances [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2011/11]Method and system for incrementally moving teeth
[2011/33]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  20.01.2012
Database last updated on 10.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip10.08.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GB
published on 12.09.2018  [2018/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Align Technology, Inc.
2820 Orchard Parkway
San Jose, CA 95134 / US
[2018/03]
Former [2011/11]For all designated states
Align Technology, Inc.
2560 Orchard Parkway
San Jose, CA 95131 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Chishti, Muhammad
Align Technology, inc.
2560 Orchard Parkway
San Jose CA 95131 / US
02 / Lerios, Apostolos
Align Technology, inc.
2560 Orchard Parkway
San Jose CA 95131 / US
03 / Freyburger, Brian
Align Technology, inc.
2560 Orchard Parkway
San Jose CA 95131 / US
04 / Wirth, Kelsey
Align Technology, inc.
2560 Orchard Parkway
San Jose CA 95131 / US
05 / Ridgley, Richard
Align Technology, inc.
2560 Orchard Parkway
San Jose CA 95131 / US
 [2012/08]
Former [2011/11]01 / Chishti, Muhammad
Align Technology, inc. 2560 Orchard Parkway
San Jose CA 95131 / US
02 / Lerios, Apostolos
Align Technology, inc. 2560 Orchard Parkway
San Jose CA 95131 / US
03 / Freyburger, Brian
Align Technology, inc. 2560 Orchard Parkway
San Jose CA 95131 / US
04 / Wirth, Kelsey
Align Technology, inc. 2560 Orchard Parkway
San Jose CA 95131 / US
05 / Ridgley, Richard
Align Technology, inc. 2560 Orchard Parkway
San Jose CA 95131 / US
Representative(s)Small, Gary James , et al
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2012/08]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser
Anwaltssozietät
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
Former [2011/11]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
Application number, filing date10010227.619.06.1998
[2011/11]
Priority number, dateUS19970050342P20.06.1997         Original published format: US 50342 P
US1997094708008.10.1997         Original published format: US 947080
[2011/11]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2295004
Date:16.03.2011
Language:EN
[2011/11]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2295004
Date:22.02.2012
Language:EN
[2012/08]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.02.2011
ClassificationInternational:A61C7/00, A61C7/08
[2016/52]
Former International [2011/11]A61C7/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2011/11]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und System zur inkrementellen Bewegung von Zähnen[2016/52]
English:Method for fabricating a plurality of dental incremental position adjustment appliances[2011/33]
French:Procédé et système d'accroissement du mouvement des dents[2016/52]
Former [2011/11]Verfahren und System zur inkrementellen Bewegung von Zähnen
Former [2011/11]Method and system for incrementally moving teeth
Former [2011/11]Procédé et système d'accroissement du mouvement des dents
Examination procedure22.09.2010Examination requested  [2011/11]
11.04.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.09.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.01.2012Fee for grant paid
10.01.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
25.01.2012Observations by third parties
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP03012114.9  / EP1369091
EP08101273.4  / EP1929974
EP98931428.1  / EP0989828
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP19980931428) is  26.02.2003
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  07.11.2012  14.03.2017  WITHDRAWN
Ortho Caps GmbH
An der Bewer 5
59069 Hamm / DE
Opponent's representative
Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB, et al
Speditionstraße 21
40221 Düsseldorf / DE
 02  21.11.2012  14.03.2017  WITHDRAWN
RKSOrtho GmbH
Wilhelmshaver Strasse 35
26180 Rastede / DE
Opponent's representative
Kayser, Christoph
Kayser & Cobet
Patentanwälte Partnerschaft
Am Borsigturm 9
13507 Berlin / DE
 [2017/18]
Former [2013/10]
Opponent(s)01  07.11.2012  10.01.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Ortho Caps GmbH
An der Bewer 5
59069 Hamm / DE
Opponent's representative
Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte, et al
Hafenspitze
Speditionstrasse 21
40221 Düsseldorf / DE
 02  21.11.2012  10.01.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Rasteder KFO Spezial-Labor GmbH / Volker Hinrichs
Wilhelmshavener Strasse 35
26180 Rastede / DE
Opponent's representative
Kayser, Christoph
Kayser & Cobet Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Am Borsigturm 53
13507 Berlin / DE
Former [2013/01]
Opponent(s)01  07.11.2012   
Ortho Caps GmbH
An der Bewer 5
59069 Hamm / DE
Opponent's representative
Storz, Ulrich, et al
Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte Neuer Zollhof 2
40221 Düsseldorf / DE
 02  21.11.2012   
Rasteder KFO Spezial-Labor GmbH / Volker Hinrichs
Wilhelmshavener Strasse 35
26180 Rastede / DE
Opponent's representative
Kayser, Christoph
Kayser & Cobet Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Am Borsigturm 53
13507 Berlin / DE
Former [2012/51]
Opponent(s)01  07.11.2012   
Ortho Caps GmbH
An der Bewer 5
59069 Hamm / DE
Opponent's representative
Storz, Ulrich, et al
Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte Neuer Zollhof 2
40221 Düsseldorf / DE
15.01.2013Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
27.05.2013Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
15.11.2016Date of oral proceedings
19.12.2016Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
19.12.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition15.02.2017Appeal received No.  T0417/17
28.04.2017Statement of grounds filed
17.02.2017Appeal received No.  T0417/17
09.02.2017Appeal received No.  T0417/17
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
22.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
22.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
22.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
22.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 07
22.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 08
22.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 09
22.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 10
22.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 11
22.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 12
22.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 13
22.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 14
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT22.02.2012
BE22.02.2012
CY22.02.2012
DK22.02.2012
FI22.02.2012
NL22.02.2012
SE22.02.2012
GR23.05.2012
IE19.06.2012
LU19.06.2012
PT22.06.2012
CH30.06.2012
LI30.06.2012
MC30.06.2012
GB18.06.2018
[2018/37]
Former [2014/27]AT22.02.2012
BE22.02.2012
CY22.02.2012
DK22.02.2012
FI22.02.2012
NL22.02.2012
SE22.02.2012
GR23.05.2012
IE19.06.2012
LU19.06.2012
PT22.06.2012
CH30.06.2012
LI30.06.2012
MC30.06.2012
Former [2012/49]BE22.02.2012
CY22.02.2012
DK22.02.2012
FI22.02.2012
NL22.02.2012
SE22.02.2012
GR23.05.2012
PT22.06.2012
Former [2012/48]BE22.02.2012
CY22.02.2012
FI22.02.2012
NL22.02.2012
SE22.02.2012
GR23.05.2012
PT22.06.2012
Former [2012/41]BE22.02.2012
CY22.02.2012
FI22.02.2012
NL22.02.2012
GR23.05.2012
PT22.06.2012
Former [2012/37]BE22.02.2012
FI22.02.2012
NL22.02.2012
GR23.05.2012
PT22.06.2012
Former [2012/36]NL22.02.2012
GR23.05.2012
Former [2012/35]NL22.02.2012
Documents cited:Search[XA]FR2369828  (SUYEHIRO HITO [US]) [X] 1 * page 1, lines 19-27 * * page 2, lines 28-31 * * page 4, line 4 - page 5, line 1 * * page 5, lines 19-20 * * page 7, lines 18-26 * * page 12, lines 7-17 * * page 16, lines 1-4 * * page 17, line 28 - page 18, line 2 * [A] 7;
 [A]WO9410935  (ORMCO CORP [US]) [A] 1,7 * the whole document *
by applicantUS5186623
 US5059118
 US5055039
 US5035613
 US4856991
 US4798534
 US4755139
 US5605459
 US5533895
 US5474448
 US5454717
 US5447432
 US5431562
 US5395238
 US5368478
 US5139419
 US5011405
 US5338198
 US5452219
 US5607305
 US5587912
 US5342202
 US5340309
 US5549476
 US5382164
 US5273429
 US4936862
 US3860803
 US3660900
 US5645421
    - KESLING, AM. J. ORTHOD. ORAL. SURG., (1945), vol. 31, pages 297 - 304
    - AM. J. ORTHOD. ORAL. SURG., (1946), vol. 32, pages 285 - 293
    - WARUNEK ET AL., J. CLIN. ORTHOD., (1989), vol. 23, pages 694 - 700
    - KLEEMANN; JANSSEN, J. CLIN. ORTHODON., (1996), vol. 30, pages 673 - 680
    - CURETON, J. CLIN. ORTHODON., (1996), vol. 30, pages 390 - 395
    - CHIAPPONE, J. CLIN. ORTHODON., (1980), vol. 14, pages 121 - 133
    - SHILLIDAY, AM. J. ORTHODONTICS, (1971), vol. 59, pages 596 - 599
    - WELLS, AM. J. ORTHODONTICS, (1970), vol. 58, pages 351 - 366
    - COTTINGHAM, AM. J. ORTHODONTICS, (1969), vol. 55, pages 23 - 31
    - KURODA ET AL., AM. J. ORTHODONTICS, (1996), vol. 110, pages 365 - 369
    - GRABER, Orthodontics: Principle and Practice, Second Edition,, vol. 1969, pages 401 - 415
    - "Manipulation of General Subdivisions and the Computation of Voronoi Diagrams", ACM TRANSACTIONS OF GRAPHICS, (198504), vol. 4, no. 2, pages 74 - 123
otherUS5368478
    - MCNAMARA J.A. ET AL, Orthodontic and Orthopedic Treatment in the Mixed Dentition, (199301), pages 347 - 353, XP003028610
    - NAHOUM H.I., "The vacuum formed dental contour appliance", (196411), vol. 30, pages 385 - 390, XP003028611