Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2305294

EP2305294 - Immunogenic composition for use in vaccination against staphylococcei [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  19.10.2017
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.03.2018New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of an appeal 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GlaxoSmithKline Biologicals SA
Rue de l'Institut 89
1330 Rixensart / BE
[2011/14]
Inventor(s)01 / Castado, Cindy
c/o GlaxoSmithKline Biologicals SA
Rue de l`Institut 89
1330 Rixensart / BE
02 / Lecrenier, Nicolas Piere Fernand
c/o GlaxoSmithKline Biologicals SA
Rue de l`Institut 89
1330 Rixensart / BE
03 / Neyt, Cecile Anne
c/o GlaxoSmithKline Biologicals SA
Rue de l`Institut 89
1330 Rixensart / BE
04 / Poolman, Jan
c/o GlaxoSmithKline Biologicals SA
Rue de l`Institut 89
1330 Rixensart / BE
 [2015/14]
Former [2011/14]01 / Castado, Cindy
c/o GlaxoSmithKline Biologicals SA Rue de l`Institut 89
1330 Rixensart / BE
02 / Lecrenier, Nicolas Piere Fernand
c/o GlaxoSmithKline Biologicals SA Rue de l`Institut 89
1330 Rixensart / BE
03 / Neyt, Cecile Anne
c/o GlaxoSmithKline Biologicals SA Rue de l`Institut 89
1330 Rixensart / BE
04 / Poolman, Jan
c/o GlaxoSmithKline Biologicals SA Rue de l`Institut 89
1330 Rixensart / BE
Representative(s)Johnston, Caroline Louise
GlaxoSmithKline
Global Patents (CN925.1)
980 Great West Road
Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB
[N/P]
Former [2015/14]Woods, Geoffrey Corlett
J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
Former [2011/14]Woods, Geoffrey Corlett
J.A. Kemp & Co 14 South Square Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
Application number, filing date10010648.320.09.2005
[2011/14]
Priority number, dateGB2004002108222.09.2004         Original published format: GB 0421082
GB2004002107822.09.2004         Original published format: GB 0421078
GB2004002108122.09.2004         Original published format: GB 0421081
GB2004002107922.09.2004         Original published format: GB 0421079
GB2005000314315.02.2005         Original published format: GB 0503143
[2011/14]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2305294
Date:06.04.2011
Language:EN
[2011/14]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2305294
Date:01.04.2015
Language:EN
[2015/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.02.2011
ClassificationInternational:A61K39/085, A61K39/116, A61P31/04
[2014/44]
Former International [2011/14]A61K39/085, A61K39/116, A61P31/04, C07K16/12
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2011/14]
TitleGerman:Immunogene Zusammensetzung zur Verwendung zur Impfung gegen Staphylokokken[2011/14]
English:Immunogenic composition for use in vaccination against staphylococcei[2011/14]
French:Composition immunogène pour la vaccination contre des staphylocoques[2011/14]
Examination procedure06.10.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
06.10.2011Examination requested  [2011/46]
28.11.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.07.2012Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
26.09.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.09.2014Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 30.09.2014
30.09.2014Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
31.10.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.02.2015Fee for grant paid
23.02.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
23.02.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP05786195.7  / EP1793849
EP10000300.3  / EP2181714
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20050786195) is  29.08.2007
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  04.01.2016   
Pfizer Inc.
235 East 42nd Street
New York, NY 10017 / US
Opponent's representative
Pfizer
European Patent Department
23-25 avenue du Docteur Lannelongue
75668 Paris Cedex 14 / FR
 [2016/07]
08.02.2016Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
12.08.2016Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
28.09.2017Date of oral proceedings
20.10.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
20.10.2017Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition20.12.2017Appeal received No.  T0020/18
28.02.2018Statement of grounds filed
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
26.09.2012Request for further processing filed
26.09.2012Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
10.10.2012Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
23.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
23.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
23.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
08.09.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
26.09.2012Renewal fee patent year 08
09.09.2013Renewal fee patent year 09
08.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 10
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU20.09.2005
AT01.04.2015
BG01.04.2015
CY01.04.2015
CZ01.04.2015
DK01.04.2015
EE01.04.2015
FI01.04.2015
LT01.04.2015
LV01.04.2015
MC01.04.2015
PL01.04.2015
RO01.04.2015
SE01.04.2015
SI01.04.2015
SK01.04.2015
TR01.04.2015
GR02.07.2015
IS01.08.2015
PT03.08.2015
LU20.09.2015
CH30.09.2015
LI30.09.2015
[2017/39]
Former [2016/34]AT01.04.2015
CZ01.04.2015
DK01.04.2015
EE01.04.2015
FI01.04.2015
LT01.04.2015
LV01.04.2015
MC01.04.2015
PL01.04.2015
RO01.04.2015
SI01.04.2015
SK01.04.2015
GR02.07.2015
IS01.08.2015
PT03.08.2015
LU20.09.2015
CH30.09.2015
LI30.09.2015
Former [2016/24]AT01.04.2015
CZ01.04.2015
DK01.04.2015
EE01.04.2015
FI01.04.2015
LT01.04.2015
LV01.04.2015
MC01.04.2015
PL01.04.2015
RO01.04.2015
SI01.04.2015
SK01.04.2015
GR02.07.2015
IS01.08.2015
PT03.08.2015
LU20.09.2015
Former [2016/23]AT01.04.2015
CZ01.04.2015
DK01.04.2015
EE01.04.2015
FI01.04.2015
LT01.04.2015
LV01.04.2015
MC01.04.2015
PL01.04.2015
RO01.04.2015
SK01.04.2015
GR02.07.2015
IS01.08.2015
PT03.08.2015
LU20.09.2015
Former [2016/21]AT01.04.2015
CZ01.04.2015
DK01.04.2015
EE01.04.2015
FI01.04.2015
LT01.04.2015
LV01.04.2015
PL01.04.2015
RO01.04.2015
SK01.04.2015
GR02.07.2015
IS01.08.2015
PT03.08.2015
LU20.09.2015
Former [2016/10]AT01.04.2015
CZ01.04.2015
DK01.04.2015
EE01.04.2015
FI01.04.2015
LT01.04.2015
LV01.04.2015
PL01.04.2015
RO01.04.2015
SK01.04.2015
GR02.07.2015
IS01.08.2015
PT03.08.2015
Former [2016/09]AT01.04.2015
CZ01.04.2015
DK01.04.2015
EE01.04.2015
FI01.04.2015
LT01.04.2015
LV01.04.2015
GR02.07.2015
IS01.08.2015
PT03.08.2015
Former [2016/07]AT01.04.2015
CZ01.04.2015
DK01.04.2015
FI01.04.2015
LT01.04.2015
LV01.04.2015
GR02.07.2015
IS01.08.2015
PT03.08.2015
Former [2015/51]AT01.04.2015
CZ01.04.2015
FI01.04.2015
LT01.04.2015
LV01.04.2015
GR02.07.2015
IS01.08.2015
PT03.08.2015
Former [2015/50]CZ01.04.2015
FI01.04.2015
LT01.04.2015
LV01.04.2015
GR02.07.2015
IS01.08.2015
PT03.08.2015
Former [2015/49]CZ01.04.2015
FI01.04.2015
LT01.04.2015
LV01.04.2015
GR02.07.2015
PT03.08.2015
Documents cited:Search[I]US6703025  (PATTI JOSEPH M [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * column 6, line 64 - column 39, line 41 *;
 [A]WO02094868  (CHIRON SPA [IT], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 23, line 1 - page 24, line 16 * * claims 1,11,13 * * SEQ ID Nos. 682, 1096, 1168, 1170 *;
 [A]WO0245742  (US ARMY MED RES MAT COMMAND [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * example 7 * * claims 1,4,9-12 *
by applicantWO0015238
 WO0012132
 WO9857994
 US5840846
 US5648240
 US6008341
 US2002169288
 US6288214
 WO0012689
 WO0002523
 WO0160852
 EP0786519
 WO02094868
 WO0134809
 WO0198499
 WO02059148
 US5801234
 US6054572
 WO9714799
 WO9927109
 WO9748727
 WO03076470
 US5320951
 WO9418327
 WO03011899
 WO2004043407
 WO03053462
 EP0497524
 EP0497525
 WO2004043405
 US6294177
 US4197290
 EP0594610
 US4372945
 US4474757
 US4356170
 WO9508348
 US5219740
 US5173414
 US5139941
 WO9201070
 WO9303769
 WO9112882
 WO8903429
 WO9203545
 US5843723
 US6015686
 US6008035
 US6015694
 US5505947
 US5643576
 US4603112
 US4769330
 US5017487
 WO8901973
 US4777127
 GB2200651
 EP0345242
 WO9102805
 US5846796
 US6010478
 US5865796
 US5584807
 EP0500799
 US4790824
 US5064413
 US5312335
 US5383851
 US5399163
 US5520639
 US5993412
 GB2220211
 EP0689454
 WO9400153
 WO9633739
 WO9517210
 WO9602555
 WO9216556
 US4235877
 WO9934850
 EP1092444
 WO0113977
 US5480381
 US5599302
 US5334144
 US5649912
 US5569189
 US5704911
 US5893397
 US5466220
 US5339163
 US5503627
 US4596556
 US4941880
 US4940460
 WO9737705
 WO9713537
 WO9927961
 WO9748440
 WO9828037
 WO9820734
 WO9319780
 WO9216231
 US5750110
    - EMORI; GAYNES, CLIN. MICROBIOL. REV., (1993), vol. 6, page 428
    - ROMERO-VIVAS ET AL., INFECT. DIS., (1995), vol. 21, page 1417
    - PANLILO ET AL., INFECT.CONTROL. HOSP. EPIDEMIOL., (1992), vol. 13, page 582
    - LEE, TRENDS MICROBIOL., (1996), vol. 4, page 162
    - NAIDU ET AL., J. MED. MICROBIOL., (1992), vol. 36, page 177
    - WILTSHIRE; FOSTER, INFEC. IMMUN., (2001), vol. 69, page 5198
    - WILLIAMS ET AL., INFECT. IMMUN., (2002), vol. 70, page 6805
    - PARK ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1999), vol. 274, page 2845
    - FLOCK, J. CLIN. MICROBIOL., (1995), vol. 33, page 2347
    - ZHANG ET AL., FEMS IMMUN. MED. MICROBIOL., (2000), vol. 28, page 211
    - RUPP ET AL., J. INFECT. DIS., (2001), vol. 183, page 1038
    - MCDEVITT ET AL., MOL. MICROBIOL., (1994), vol. 11, page 237
    - MCCREA ET AL., MICROBIOLOGY, (2000), vol. 146, page 1535
    - FLOCK ET AL., MOL MICROBIOL., (1994), vol. 12, page 599
    - BOOTH ET AL., INFEC. IMMUN., (2001), vol. 69, page 345
    - VISAI ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (2000), vol. 275, page 39837
    - PHONIMDAENG ET AL., J. GEN MICROBIOL., (1988), vol. 134, page 75
    - FLOCK, J. BACTERIOL., (2001), vol. 183, page 3999
    - LONENZ ET AL., FEMS IMMUNO. MED. MICROBIOL., (2000), vol. 29, page 145
    - LANG ET AL., FEMS IMMUNOL. MED. MICROBIOL., (2000), vol. 29, page 213
    - VEENSTRA ET AL., J. BACTERIOL., (1996), vol. 178, page 537
    - FALLGREN ET AL., J. MED. MICROBIOL., (2001), vol. 50, page 547
    - LI ET AL., CURR. MICROBIOL., (2001), vol. 42, page 361
    - COCKAYNE ET AL., INFECT. IMMUN., (1998), vol. 66, page 3767
    - PHONIMDAENG ET AL., J. GEN. MICROBIO., (1988), vol. 134, pages 75 - 83
    - PHONIMDAENG ET AL., MOL MICROBIOL, (1990), vol. 4, pages 393 - 404
    - CHEUNG ET AL., INFECT IMMUN, (1995), vol. 63, pages 1914 - 1920
    - SHOPSIN ET AL., J. CLIN. MICROBIOL., (2000), vol. 38, pages 3453 - 3456
    - NILSSON ET AL., INFECT. IMMUN., (1998), vol. 66, page 2666
    - PEI; FLOCK, J. INFECT. DIS., (2001), vol. 184, page 52
    - CLARKE; FOSTER, INFECT. IMMUN., (2002), vol. 70, page 6680
    - WILLIAMS ET AL., INFECT. IMMUN., (2002), vol. 20, page 6805
    - KURODA ET AL., LANCET, (2001), vol. 357, pages 1225 - 1240
    - CLARKE ET AL., INFECTION AND IMMUNITY, (2002), vol. 70, pages 6680 - 6687
    - DOWNER ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (2002), vol. 277, page 243
    - PARK ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1996), vol. 271, page 15803
    - LOPES ET AL., SCIENCE, (1985), vol. 229, page 275
    - ZHANG ET AL., MICROBIOLOGY, (1998), vol. 144, page 985
    - YVASTFELT; FLOCK, J. CLIN. MICROBIOL., (1995), vol. 33, page 2347
    - LORENZ ET AL., FEMS IMMUNOL. MED. MICROB., (2000), vol. 29, page 145
    - SCHENNINGS ET AL., MICROB. PATHOG., (1993), vol. 15, page 227
    - BURNIE ET AL., INFECT. IMUN., (2000), vol. 68, page 3200
    - MAZMANIAN ET AL., PNAS, (2002), vol. 99, page 2293
    - WILTSHIRE; FOSTER, INFECT. IMMUN., (2001), vol. 69, page 5198
    - MEI ET AL., MOL. MICROBIOL., (1997), vol. 26, page 399
    - BURNIE ET AL., INFECT. IMMUN., (2000), vol. 68, page 3200
    - MAZMANIAN ET AL., SCIENCE, (2003), vol. 299, page 906
    - MORRISSEY ET AL., INFECT. IMMUN., (2002), vol. 70, page 2399
    - ADLAM ET AL., INFECT. IMMUN., (1977), vol. 17, page 250
    - MENZIES; KERNODLE, INFECT. IMMUN., (1996), vol. 64, page 1839
    - HUSSAIN ET AL., INFECT. IMMUN., (1997), vol. 65, page 519
    - BOOTH ET AL., INFECT IMMUN., (2001), vol. 69, no. 1, pages 345 - 52
    - PEACOCK ET AL., INFECT IMMUN., (2002), vol. 70, no. 9, pages 4987 - 96
    - FEIL ET AL., J BACTERIOL., (2003), vol. 185, no. 11, pages 3307 - 16
    - ROCHE ET AL., MICROBIOLOGY, (2003), vol. 149, page 643
    - LORENZ ET AL., FEMS IMMUNO. MED. MICROB., (2000), vol. 29, page 145
    - MAIRA-LITRAN ET AL., VACCINE, (2004), vol. 22, pages 872 - 879
    - JOYCE ET AL., CARBOHYDRATE RESEARCH, (2003), vol. 338, page 903
    - MAIRA-LITRAN ET AL., INFECT. IMUN., (2002), vol. 70, page 4433
    - MOREAU ET AL., CARBOHYDRATE RES., (1990), vol. 201, page 285
    - FOURNIER ET AL., INFECT. IMMUN., (1984), vol. 45, page 87
    - JONES, CARBOHYDRATE RESEARCH, (2005), vol. 340, pages 1097 - 1106
    - ICHIMAN; YOSHIDA, J. APPL. BACTERIOL., (1981), vol. 51, page 229
    - ICHIMAN ET AL., J. APPL. BACTERIOL., (1991), vol. 71, page 176
    - WOLFF, SCIENCE, (1990), vol. 247, pages 1465 - 1468
    - CORR, J. EXP. MED., (1996), vol. 184, pages 1555 - 1560
    - DOE, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI., (1996), vol. 93, pages 8578 - 8583
    - FROHMAN ET AL., PNAS USA, (1988), vol. 85, pages 8998 - 9002
    - MILLER; ROSMAN, BIOTECHNIQUES, (1989), vol. 7, pages 980 - 990
    - MILLER, A. D., HUMAN GENE THERAPY, (1990), vol. 1, pages 5 - 14
    - SCARPA ET AL., VIROLOGY, (1991), vol. 180, pages 849 - 852
    - BURNS ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1993), vol. 90, pages 8033 - 8037
    - BORIS-LAWRIE; TEMIN, CUR. OPIN. GENET. DEVELOP., (1993), vol. 3, pages 102 - 109
    - HAJ-AHMAD; GRAHAM, J. VIROL., (1986), vol. 57, pages 267 - 274
    - BETT ET AL., J. VIROL., (1993), vol. 67, pages 5911 - 5921
    - MITTEREDER ET AL., HUMAN GENE THERAPY, (1994), vol. 5, pages 717 - 729
    - SETH ET AL., J. VIROL., (1994), vol. 68, pages 933 - 940
    - BARR ET AL., GENE THERAPY, (1994), vol. 1, pages 51 - 58
    - BERKNER, K. L., BIOTECHNIQUES, (1988), vol. 6, pages 616 - 629
    - RICH ET AL., HUMAN GENE THERAPY, (1993), vol. 4, pages 461 - 476
    - LEBKOWSKI ET AL., MOLEC. CELL. BIOL., (1988), vol. 8, pages 3988 - 3996
    - VINCENT ET AL., Vaccines, COLD SPRING HARBOR LABORATORY PRESS, (1990), vol. 90
    - CARTER, B. J., CURRENT OPINION IN BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1992), vol. 3, pages 533 - 539
    - MUZYCZKA, N., CURRENT TOPICS IN MICROBIOL. AND IMMUNOL., (1992), vol. 158, pages 97 - 129
    - KOTIN, R. M., HUMAN GENE THERAPY, (1994), vol. 5, pages 793 - 801
    - SHELLING; SMITH, GENE THERAPY, (1994), vol. 1, pages 165 - 169
    - ZHOU ET AL., J. EXP. MED., (1994), vol. 179, pages 1867 - 1875
    - ELROY-STEIN; MOSS, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1990), vol. 87, pages 6743 - 6747
    - FUERST ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1986), vol. 83, pages 8122 - 8126
    - MICHAEL ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1993), vol. 268, pages 6866 - 6869
    - WAGNER ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1992), vol. 89, pages 6099 - 6103
    - FISHER-HOCH ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1989), vol. 86, pages 317 - 321
    - FLEXNER ET AL., ANN. N. Y. ACAD. SCI., (1989), vol. 569, pages 86 - 103
    - FLEXNER ET AL., VACCINE, (1990), vol. 8, pages 17 - 21
    - BERKNER, BIOTECHNIQUES, (1988), vol. 6, pages 616 - 627
    - ROSENFELD ET AL., SCIENCE, (1991), vol. 252, pages 431 - 434
    - KOLLS ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1994), vol. 91, pages 215 - 219
    - KASS-EISLER ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1993), vol. 90, pages 11498 - 11502
    - GUZMAN ET AL., CIRCULATION, (1993), vol. 88, pages 2838 - 2848
    - GUZMAN ET AL., CIR. RES., (1993), vol. 73, pages 1202 - 1207
    - ULMER ET AL., SCIENCE, (1993), vol. 259, pages 1745 - 1749
    - COHEN, SCIENCE, (1993), vol. 259, pages 1691 - 1692
    - MOSMANN, T.R.; COFFMAN, R.L., "TH1 and TH2 cells: different patterns of lymphokine secretion lead to different functional properties", ANNUAL REVIEW OF IMMUNOLOGY, (1989), vol. 7, doi:doi:10.1146/annurev.iy.07.040189.001045, pages 145 - 173, XP008013278

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1146/annurev.iy.07.040189.001045
    - THOELEN ET AL., VACCINE, (1998), vol. 16, pages 708 - 14
    - KOHLER; MILSTEIN, NATURE, (1975), vol. 256, page 495
    - VAUGHAN TJ ET AL., NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1998), vol. 16, page 535
    - JOYCE ET AL., CARBOHYDRATE RESEARCH, (2003), vol. 338, pages 903 - 922
    - INFECTION AND IMMUNITY, vol. 58, no. 7, page 2367
    - XU ET AL., INFECT. IMMUN., (1992), vol. 60, page 1358
    - KOKAI-KUN ET AL., ANTIMICROB.AGENTS.CHEMOTHER., (2003), vol. 47, pages 1589 - 1597
OppositionWO2006032472
 EP2181714
 US6008341
 US5801234
 US6703025
 WO2010151544
 WO2012085872
    - JOSEFSSON E et al., J Infect Dis., (20010000), vol. 184, no. 12, pages 1572 - 1580
    - COCKAYNE A et al., "Molecular cloning of a 32-kilodalton lipoprotein component of a novel iron-regulated Staphylococcus epidermis ABC transporter", Infect. Immun., (19980800), vol. 66, no. 8, pages 3767 - 3774, XP002205876
    - LEE J;, "Development of antistaphylococcal vaccines", Curr Infect Dis Rep., (20011200), vol. 3, no. 6, pages 517 - 524, XP009117862

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s11908-001-0088-2
    - ANDERSON AS et al., "Development of a multicomponent Staphylococcus aureus vaccine designed to counter multiple bacterial virulence factors", Hum Vaccin Immunother., (20011100), vol. 8, no. 11, pages 1585 - 1594, XP055269355

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.4161/hv.21872