blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2284241

EP2284241 - Compositions comprising a fluoroolefin [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  28.02.2014
Database last updated on 19.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip28.02.2014Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 02.04.2014  [2014/14]
28.02.2014Change - inventorpublished on 02.04.2014  [2014/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company
1007 Market Street
Wilmington, DE 19898 / US
[2011/07]
Inventor(s)01 / Minor, Barbara Haviland
233 Greenhaven Drive
Elkton, Maryland 21921 / US
02 / Rao, Velliyur Nott Mallikarjuna
1 Georgetown Avenue
Wilmington, Delaware 19809 / US
03 / Bivens, Donald Bernard
210 West Locust Lane
Kennett Square, Pennsylvania 19348 / US
 [2014/14]
Former [2011/07]01 / Minor, Barbara, Haviland
233 Greenhaven Drive
Elkton, Maryland 21921 / US
02 / Rao, Velliyur, Nott, Mallikarjuna
1 Georgetown Avenue
Wilmington, Delaware 19809 / US
03 / Bivens, Donald, Bernard
210 West Locust Lane
Kennett Square, Pennsylvania 19348 / US
Representative(s)Matthews, Derek Peter
Dehns
St Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2011/07]Matthews, Derek Peter
Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London
EC4Y 8JD / GB
Application number, filing date10010792.903.03.2006
[2011/07]
Priority number, dateUS20050658543P04.03.2005         Original published format: US 658543 P
US20050710439P23.08.2005         Original published format: US 710439 P
US20050732769P01.11.2005         Original published format: US 732769 P
[2011/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2284241
Date:16.02.2011
Language:EN
[2011/07]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2284241
Date:10.04.2013
Language:EN
[2013/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.03.2013
ClassificationIPC:C09K5/04, C09K3/30, C08J9/14, C10M171/00
[2013/15]
CPC:
C10M171/008 (EP); C08J9/146 (EP); C08J9/149 (EP);
C09K5/045 (EP); C08J2203/12 (EP); C08J2203/14 (EP);
C08J2203/162 (EP); C08J2203/182 (EP); C08J2207/04 (EP);
C08J2375/04 (EP); C09K2205/126 (EP); C09K2205/22 (EP);
C09K2205/32 (EP); C09K2205/40 (EP); C10M2203/065 (EP);
C10M2203/1006 (EP); C10M2205/0206 (EP); C10M2207/2835 (EP);
C10M2209/043 (EP); C10M2209/1033 (EP); C10N2020/101 (EP);
C10N2020/103 (EP) (-)
Former IPC [2011/07]C09K5/04, C09K3/30, C08J9/14
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2011/07]
TitleGerman:Zusammensetzungen mit einem Fluorolefin[2011/07]
English:Compositions comprising a fluoroolefin[2011/07]
French:Compositions comprenant une fluorooléfine[2011/07]
Examination procedure11.10.2013Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2014/14]
18.11.2013Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2014/14]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP06737345.6  / EP1853679
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20060737345) is  03.03.2008
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
18.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
18.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
15.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
14.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
11.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 08
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]JPH04110388  ;
 [Y]US3723318  (BUTLER A);
 [A]US2004089839  (THOMAS RAYMOND H [US], et al);
 [Y]US2004127383  (PHAM HANG T [US], et al);
 [A]US2004256594  (SINGH RAJIV R [US], et al);
by applicantUS20040910495
 US20050062044
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.