Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2314655

EP2314655 - Use, as a refrigerant, of a composition comprising 1,3,3,3-tetrafluoropropene (HFO-1234ze) in an automotive air-conditioning system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2011/17]Compositions containing fluorine substituted olefins
[2014/25]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  12.10.2017
Database last updated on 10.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.02.2019Change: Appeal number 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Honeywell International Inc.
115 Tabor Road
Morris Plains, NJ 07950 / US
[2015/51]
Former [2014/39]For all designated states
Honeywell International Inc.
101 Columbia Road
P.O. Box 2245
Morristown, NJ 07962-2245 / US
Former [2011/17]For all designated states
Honeywell International Inc.
101 Columbia Road P.O. Box 2245
Morristown, NJ 07962-2245 / US
Inventor(s)01 / PHAM, Hang T.
c/o Honeywell International Inc.
101 Columbia Road
PO Box 2245
Morristown, NJ 07962-2245 / US
02 / SINGH, Rajiv R.
c/o Honeywell International Inc.
101 Columbia Road
PO Box 2245
Morristown, NJ 07962-2245 / US
03 / SHANKLAND, Ian Robert
6 Horizon Court
Randolph
New Jersey 07869 / US
 [2014/33]
Former [2013/34]01 / Pham, Hang T.
c/o Honeywell International Inc.
101 Columbia Road
PO Box 2245
Morristown, NJ 07962-2245 / US
02 / Singh, Rajiv R.
c/o Honeywell International Inc.
101 Columbia Road
PO Box 2245
Morristown, NJ 07962-2245 / US
Former [2011/17]01 / Pham, Hang T.
c/o Honeywell International Inc. 101 Columbia Road PO box 2245
Morristown, NJ 07962-2245 / US
02 / Singh, Rajiv, R.
c/o Honeywell International Inc. 101 Columbia Road PO box 2245
Morristown, NJ 07962-2245 / US
Representative(s)Crooks, Elizabeth Caroline , et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
Lacon London
84 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8NL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/39]Hucker, Charlotte Jane , et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
20 Red Lion Street
London
WC1R 4PJ / GB
Former [2011/17]Hucker, Charlotte Jane , et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London
WC1R 4PJ / GB
Application number, filing date10011471.929.04.2005
[2011/17]
Priority number, dateUS2004083752529.04.2004         Original published format: US 837525
[2011/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2314655
Date:27.04.2011
Language:EN
[2011/17]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2314655
Date:09.10.2013
Language:EN
[2013/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2314655
Date:24.09.2014
Language:EN
[2014/39]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.09.2013
ClassificationInternational:B60H1/32, C09K5/04
[2014/25]
Former International [2011/17]C09K5/04
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2011/17]
TitleGerman:Verwendung einer 1,3,3,3-tetrafluoropropene (HFO-1234ze) enthaltenden Zusammensetzung als Kühlmittel in einer Autoklimaanlage[2014/25]
English:Use, as a refrigerant, of a composition comprising 1,3,3,3-tetrafluoropropene (HFO-1234ze) in an automotive air-conditioning system[2014/25]
French:Utilisation d'une composition comprenant du 1,3,3,3-tetrafluoropropene (HFO-1234ze) comme réfrigérant dans un système de climatisation d'air d'automobile[2014/25]
Former [2011/17]Zusammensetzungen mit fluorsubstituierten Olefinen
Former [2011/17]Compositions containing fluorine substituted olefins
Former [2011/17]Compositions contenant des oléfines substituées par du fluor
Examination procedure18.07.2013Examination requested  [2013/35]
03.10.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.01.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.01.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.06.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.07.2014Fee for grant paid
04.07.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
04.07.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP05744161.0  / EP1716216
EP09160311.8  / EP2085422
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20050744161) is  15.02.2007
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  19.06.2015  26.06.2015  ADMISSIBLE
ARKEMA FRANCE
Département Propriété Industrielle
420, rue d'Estienne d'Orves
92700 Colombes / FR
Opponent's representative
Dang, Doris
ARKEMA France
Département Propriété Industrielle
420, rue d'Estienne d'Orves
92705 Colombes Cedex / FR
 02  22.06.2015  26.06.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Mexichem Fluor S.A. de C.V.
Eje 106 (sin número)
Zona Industrial
C.P. 78395
San Luis Potosi, S.L.P. / MX
Opponent's representative
Potter Clarkson
The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
 03  23.06.2015  01.07.2015  ADMISSIBLE
ACEA European Automobile Manufacturers Association
Avenue des Nerviens 85
B-1040 Brussels / BE
Opponent's representative
Wallinger, Michael
Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Tostmann
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Zweibrückenstrasse 5-7
80331 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2018/52]
Opponent(s)01  19.06.2015  26.06.2015  ADMISSIBLE
ARKEMA FRANCE
Département Propriété Industrielle
420, rue d'Estienne d'Orves
92700 Colombes / FR
Opponent's representative
Dang, Doris
ARKEMA France
Département Propriété Industrielle
420, rue d'Estienne d'Orves
92705 Colombes Cedex / FR
 02  22.06.2015  26.06.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Mexichem Fluor S.A. de C.V.
Eje 106 (sin número)
Zona Industrial
C.P. 78395
San Luis Potosi, S.L.P. / MX
Opponent's representative
Potter Clarkson LLP
The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
 03  23.06.2015  01.07.2015  ADMISSIBLE
ACEA European Automobile Manufacturers Association
Avenue des Nerviens 85
B-1040 Brussels / BE
Opponent's representative
Wallinger, Michael
Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Tostmann
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Zweibrückenstrasse 5-7
80331 München / DE
Former [2016/04]
Opponent(s)01  19.06.2015  26.06.2015  ADMISSIBLE
ARKEMA FRANCE
Département Propriété Industrielle
420, rue d'Estienne d'Orves
92700 Colombes / FR
Opponent's representative
Bandpay & Greuter
30, rue Notre-Dame des Victoires
75002 Paris / FR
 02  22.06.2015  26.06.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Mexichem Fluor S.A. de C.V.
Eje 106 (sin número)
Zona Industrial
C.P. 78395
San Luis Potosi, S.L.P.
San Luis Potosi / MX
Opponent's representative
Potter Clarkson LLP
The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
 03  23.06.2015  01.07.2015  ADMISSIBLE
ACEA European Automobile Manufacturers Association
Avenue des Nerviens 85
B-1040 Brussels / BE
Opponent's representative
Wallinger, Michael
Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Foerstl
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Zweibrückenstraße 5-7
80331 München / DE
Former [2015/32]
Opponent(s)01  19.06.2015  26.06.2015  ADMISSIBLE
ARKEMA FRANCE
Département Propriété Industrielle
420, rue d'Estienne d'Orves
92700 Colombes / FR
Opponent's representative
Dang, Doris
ARKEMA FRANCE
Département Propriété Industrielle
420, rue d'Estienne d'Orves
92705 Colombes Cedex / FR
 02  22.06.2015  26.06.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Mexichem Fluor S.A. de C.V.
Eje 106 (sin número)
Zona Industrial
C.P. 78395
San Luis Potosi, S.L.P.
San Luis Potosi / MX
Opponent's representative
Potter Clarkson LLP
The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham, NG1 5GG / GB
 03  23.06.2015  01.07.2015  ADMISSIBLE
ACEA European Automobile Manufacturers Association
Avenue des Nerviens 85
B-1040 Brussels / BE
Opponent's representative
Wallinger, Michael
Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Foerstl
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Zweibrückenstraße 5-7
80331 München / DE
Former [2015/31]
Opponent(s)01  19.06.2015   
ARKEMA FRANCE
Département Propriété Industrielle
420, rue d'Estienne d'Orves
92700 Colombes / FR
Opponent's representative
Dang, Doris
ARKEMA FRANCE
Département Propriété Industrielle
420, rue d'Estienne d'Orves
92705 Colombes Cedex / FR
 02  22.06.2015   
Mexichem Fluor S.A. de C.V.
Eje 106 (sin número)
Zona Industrial
C.P. 78395
San Luis Potosi, S.L.P.
San Luis Potosi / MX
Opponent's representative
Potter Clarkson LLP
The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham, NG1 5GG / GB
03.08.2015Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
15.02.2016Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
28.09.2017Date of oral proceedings
12.10.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
13.10.2017Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition12.12.2017Appeal received No.  T2753/17
23.02.2018Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.10.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
21.10.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
21.10.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
21.10.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
06.04.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
21.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 08
26.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 09
26.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 10
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY24.09.2014
IS24.01.2015
GB29.04.2015
[2016/21]
Former [2016/07]CY24.09.2014
IS24.01.2015
GB29.04.2015
DE03.11.2015
Former [2015/23]CY24.09.2014
IS24.01.2015
Former [2015/11]CY24.09.2014
Documents cited:Search[X]JPH04110388  ;
 [X]US3723318  (BUTLER A) [X] 1-4,10-12,14,15,19,21,22 * column 2, lines 7-44 * * example 4; claim - *;
 [X]US6111150  (SAKYU FUYUHIKO [JP], et al) [X] 1-6,10-12 * column 1, lines 47-51 *;
 [X]US5714083  (TURNER DONALD E [US]) [X] 1-3,14,16,21 * the whole document *;
 [X]US6258292  (TURNER DONALD E [US]) [X] 1-3,14,16,19-21,24,26 * the whole document *;
 [XP]WO2004037913  (HONEYWELL INT INC [US], et al) [XP] 1-12,14-26 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0974571  (ATOCHEM NORTH AMERICA ELF [US]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *
 [X]  - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1992, no. 21, Database accession no. 1992-172539, XP002343594 & JPH04110388 A 19920410 (DAIKIN KOGYO KK) [X] 1-6,10-12,14-16,18,19,21-23 * abstract *
ExaminationUS5001287
    - "Current and projected use of refrigerants in europe", ASHRAE/NIST REFRIGERANTS CONFERENCE, (199710), pages 38 - 43
    - AIR-CONDITIONING & REFRIGERATION INSTITUTE, "2006 Standard for Specifications for Fluorocarbon Refrigerants,ARI Standard 700-2006"
    - JONES ET AL, "nearly azeotropic mixtures to replace refrigerant 12", NASA TECH BRIEF, (199208), vol. 16, no. 8, page 1-39, XP055218827
    - KOPKO, "beyond CFCs: extending the search for new refrigerants", (1998), page 39-46
by applicantUS4788352
 US2889379
 US4798818
 US4465786
 EP0974571
 US6516837
 US2834748
 US2917480
 US2846458
 US6589355
    - SAUNDERS; FRISCH, Poiyurethanes Chemistry and Technology, JOHN WILEY AND SONS, (1962), vol. I, II