Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2278762

EP2278762 - Apparatus and method for optical modulation [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.08.2017
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip04.08.2017No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 06.09.2017  [2017/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Oclaro Technology Limited
Caswell Towcester
Northamptonshire NN12 8EQ / GB
[2015/09]
Former [2011/04]For all designated states
Oclaro Technology PLC
Caswell Towcester
Northamptonshire NN12 8EQ / GB
Inventor(s)01 / Griffin, Robert
4 Kensington Close
Towcenter
Northants NN12 6JL / GB
 [2016/39]
Former [2011/04]01 / Griffin, Robert
4 Kensington Close Towcenter
Northants NN12 6JL / GB
Representative(s)HGF Limited
1 City Walk
Leeds LS11 9DX / GB
[2016/39]
Former [2011/23]Harrison Goddard Foote
Belgrave Hall Belgrave Street Leeds
LS2 8DD / GB
Former [2011/04]Townsend, Victoria Jayne
Fry Heath & Spence LLP 25 Southampton Buildings London
WC2A 1AL / GB
Application number, filing date10011560.918.12.2001
[2011/04]
Priority number, dateGB2000003138621.12.2000         Original published format: GB 0031386
[2011/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2278762
Date:26.01.2011
Language:EN
[2011/04]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2278762
Date:26.09.2012
Language:EN
[2012/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2278762
Date:28.09.2016
Language:EN
[2016/39]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.08.2012
ClassificationInternational:H04L25/03, H04B10/556
[2015/44]
Former International [2011/04]H04L25/03, H04B10/18, H04B10/155, H04L27/22
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   NL [2016/39]
Former [2011/04]DE,  FR,  GB,  NL 
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR OPTISCHEN MODULATION[2015/44]
English:Apparatus and method for optical modulation[2011/04]
French:Dispositif et procédé de modulation optique[2011/04]
Former [2011/04]Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur optischen Modulation
Examination procedure22.03.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.03.2013Examination requested  [2013/18]
14.04.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.08.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.11.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.03.2016Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
22.04.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.08.2016Fee for grant paid
15.08.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
15.08.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP01271709.6  / EP1344362
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20010271709) is  17.04.2007
Opposition(s)29.06.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
13.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
13.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
13.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
13.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 07
13.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 08
13.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 09
13.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 10
12.12.2011Renewal fee patent year 11
11.12.2012Renewal fee patent year 12
12.12.2013Renewal fee patent year 13
11.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 14
10.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 15
Lapses during opposition  TooltipNL28.09.2016
[2017/21]
Documents cited:Search[A]US6137604  (BERGANO NEAL S [US]) [A] 1-21 * abstract * * figure 1 *;
 [A]US4893352  (WELFORD DAVID [US]) [A] 1-21 * column 5, line 4 - line 19 *;
 [A]EP0898389  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-21 * paragraphs [0009] , [0133] , [0138] , [0144] - [0150]; figures 4-6,11 *
 [A]  - JOYCE G R ET AL, "Fiber distribution for 80 compressed digital video channels using differential QPSK", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMMUNICATIONS (ICC). GENEVA, MAY 23 - 26, 1993, NEW YORK, IEEE, US, (19930523), vol. 3, ISBN 0-7803-0950-2, pages 1583 - 1585, XP010137150 [A] 1-21 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICC.1993.397550
 [A]  - LIMA M J N ET AL, "Optimization of apodized fiber grating filters for WDM systems", LEOS '99. IEEE LASERS AND ELECTRO-OPTICS SOCIETY 1999 12TH ANNUAL MEETING SAN FRANCISCO, CA, USA 8-11 NOV. 1999, PISCATAWAY, USA, (19991108), ISBN 0-7803-5634-9, pages 876 - 877, XP010361154 [A] 1-21 * Introduction *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/LEOS.1999.812014
 [A]  - GROSS R ET AL, "OPTICAL DQPSK VIDEO SYSTEM WITH HETERODYNE DETECTION", IEEE PHOTONICS TECHNOLOGY LETTERS, IEEE INC. NEW YORK, US, (199103), vol. 3, no. 3, ISSN 1041-1135, pages 262 - 264, XP000202945 [A] 1-21 * figure 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/68.79774
 [A]  - BIERNACKI P D ET AL, "A TWO-CHANNEL OPTICAL DOWNCONVERTER FOR PHASE DETECTION", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON MICROWAVE THEORY AND TECHNIQUES, IEEE INC. NEW YORK, US, (199811), vol. 46, no. 11, PART 1, ISSN 0018-9480, pages 1784 - 1787, XP000785812 [A] 1-21 * page 1785, column L *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/22.734580
by applicant   - S. YAMAZAKI; K. EMURA, "Feasibility study on QPSK optical heterodyne detection system", J. LIGHTWAVE TECHNOL., (1990), vol. 8, doi:doi:10.1109/50.60560, pages 1646 - 1653, XP000174434

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/50.60560
    - M. ROHDE ET AL., "Robustness of DPSK direct detection transmission format in standard fibre WDM systems", ELECTRON. LETT., (2000), vol. 36, doi:doi:10.1049/el:20000981, XP006015582

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1049/el:20000981