Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2284773

EP2284773 - Chip card [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  30.12.2011
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.07.2017Change - applicantpublished on 23.08.2017  [2017/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Giesecke+Devrient Mobile Security GmbH
Prinzregentenstraße 159
81677 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2017/34]For all designated states
Giesecke+Devrient Mobile Security GmbH
Prinzregentenstraße 159
81677 München / DE
Former [2011/07]For all designated states
Giesecke & Devrient GmbH
Prinzregentenstrasse 159
81677 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Finkenzeller, Klaus
Ahornstrasse 19
85774 Unterföhring / DE
 [2011/07]
Representative(s)(deleted)
...
[2012/05]
Application number, filing date10011624.327.06.2005
[2011/07]
Priority number, dateDE2004103109228.06.2004         Original published format: DE102004031092
[2011/07]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2284773
Date:16.02.2011
Language:DE
[2011/07]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2284773
Date:23.02.2011
[2011/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2284773
Date:01.02.2012
Language:DE
[2012/05]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.01.2011
ClassificationInternational:G06K19/07, G06K7/00
[2011/07]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2011/07]
TitleGerman:Chipkarte[2011/07]
English:Chip card[2011/07]
French:Carte à puce[2011/07]
Examination procedure09.05.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.08.2011Examination requested  [2011/40]
10.11.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.12.2011Fee for grant paid
13.12.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP05755698.7  / EP1763820
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20050755698) is  12.11.2008
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  30.10.2012  08.11.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Lang/Tomerius, Friedrich/Isabel
c/o Lang & Tomerius
Rosa-Bavarese-Str. 5
80639 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2012/50]
Opponent(s)01  30.10.2012  08.11.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Lang/Tomerius, Friedrich/Isabel
c/o Lang & Tomerius
Landsberger Strasse 300
80687 München / DE
06.12.2012Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
09.04.2013Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
17.10.2014Date of oral proceedings
28.10.2014Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02)
11.12.2014Reply to a communication from the opposition division
26.01.2015Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02)
26.03.2015Reply to a communication from the opposition division
27.05.2015Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
27.05.2015Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition27.07.2015Appeal received No.  T1501/15
28.09.2015Statement of grounds filed
22.07.2015Appeal received No.  T1501/15
25.09.2015Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
31.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
31.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
31.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
30.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU27.06.2005
CY01.02.2012
CZ01.02.2012
DK01.02.2012
EE01.02.2012
FI01.02.2012
IE01.02.2012
LT01.02.2012
NL01.02.2012
PL01.02.2012
RO01.02.2012
SE01.02.2012
SK01.02.2012
TR01.02.2012
BG01.05.2012
GR02.05.2012
IS01.06.2012
PT01.06.2012
LU27.06.2012
BE30.06.2012
CH30.06.2012
LI30.06.2012
MC30.06.2012
[2014/34]
Former [2014/27]CY01.02.2012
CZ01.02.2012
DK01.02.2012
EE01.02.2012
FI01.02.2012
IE01.02.2012
LT01.02.2012
NL01.02.2012
PL01.02.2012
RO01.02.2012
SE01.02.2012
SK01.02.2012
TR01.02.2012
BG01.05.2012
GR02.05.2012
IS01.06.2012
PT01.06.2012
LU27.06.2012
BE30.06.2012
CH30.06.2012
LI30.06.2012
MC30.06.2012
Former [2014/21]CY01.02.2012
CZ01.02.2012
DK01.02.2012
EE01.02.2012
FI01.02.2012
IE01.02.2012
LT01.02.2012
NL01.02.2012
PL01.02.2012
RO01.02.2012
SE01.02.2012
SK01.02.2012
TR01.02.2012
BG01.05.2012
GR02.05.2012
IS01.06.2012
PT01.06.2012
BE30.06.2012
CH30.06.2012
LI30.06.2012
MC30.06.2012
Former [2013/33]CY01.02.2012
CZ01.02.2012
DK01.02.2012
EE01.02.2012
FI01.02.2012
IE01.02.2012
LT01.02.2012
NL01.02.2012
PL01.02.2012
RO01.02.2012
SE01.02.2012
SK01.02.2012
BG01.05.2012
GR02.05.2012
IS01.06.2012
PT01.06.2012
BE30.06.2012
CH30.06.2012
LI30.06.2012
MC30.06.2012
Former [2012/50]CY01.02.2012
CZ01.02.2012
DK01.02.2012
EE01.02.2012
FI01.02.2012
IE01.02.2012
LT01.02.2012
NL01.02.2012
PL01.02.2012
RO01.02.2012
SE01.02.2012
SK01.02.2012
GR02.05.2012
IS01.06.2012
PT01.06.2012
Former [2012/49]CY01.02.2012
CZ01.02.2012
DK01.02.2012
EE01.02.2012
FI01.02.2012
IE01.02.2012
LT01.02.2012
NL01.02.2012
PL01.02.2012
RO01.02.2012
SE01.02.2012
GR02.05.2012
IS01.06.2012
PT01.06.2012
Former [2012/48]CY01.02.2012
EE01.02.2012
FI01.02.2012
IE01.02.2012
LT01.02.2012
NL01.02.2012
PL01.02.2012
SE01.02.2012
GR02.05.2012
IS01.06.2012
PT01.06.2012
Former [2012/47]CY01.02.2012
FI01.02.2012
IE01.02.2012
LT01.02.2012
NL01.02.2012
PL01.02.2012
GR02.05.2012
IS01.06.2012
PT01.06.2012
Former [2012/41]CY01.02.2012
FI01.02.2012
LT01.02.2012
NL01.02.2012
PL01.02.2012
GR02.05.2012
IS01.06.2012
PT01.06.2012
Former [2012/37]FI01.02.2012
LT01.02.2012
NL01.02.2012
PL01.02.2012
GR02.05.2012
IS01.06.2012
PT01.06.2012
Former [2012/36]LT01.02.2012
NL01.02.2012
GR02.05.2012
IS01.06.2012
Former [2012/35]LT01.02.2012
NL01.02.2012
IS01.06.2012
Former [2012/34]LT01.02.2012
IS01.06.2012
Documents cited:Search[A]EP1280099  (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE19800565  (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-14 * column 1, line 7 - column 2, line 50 *;
 [A]WO0233644  (INSIDE TECHNOLOGIES [FR], et al) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *;
 [IP]US2004176032  (KOTOLA SAKARI [FI], et al) [IP] 1,11 * paragraphs [0055] - [0103] *
 [IP]  - Bruno Charrat, "Reader to Reader technology", (20040630), URL: http://www.smartcard.co.uk/articles/R2R%20Technology%201_0.pdf, (20110105), XP002615806 [IP] 1,11 * the whole document *
by applicantEP1280099
 DE19800565
 US2003169152