Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2275914

EP2275914 - Non-volatile memory control [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.05.2019
Database last updated on 19.08.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  01.06.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  23.01.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip10.05.2019No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 12.06.2019  [2019/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LEXAR MEDIA, INC.
47421 Bayside Parkway
Fremont, CA 94538 / US
[2011/03]
Inventor(s)01 / Gorobets, Sergey Anatolievich
16 East Mayfield
Edinburgh EH9 1SE / GB
 [2011/03]
Representative(s)Gill Jennings & Every LLP
The Broadgate Tower
20 Primrose Street
London EC2A 2ES / GB
[N/P]
Former [2018/27]Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis , et al
Beresford Crump LLP
16 High Holborn
London WC1V 6BX / GB
Former [2011/03]Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis , et al
Beresford & Co. 16 High Holborn London
WC1V 6BX / GB
Application number, filing date10012010.427.09.2002
[2011/03]
Priority number, dateGB2001002341628.09.2001         Original published format: GB 0123416
[2011/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2275914
Date:19.01.2011
Language:EN
[2011/03]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2275914
Date:11.05.2011
[2011/19]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2275914
Date:04.07.2018
Language:EN
[2018/27]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.04.2011
ClassificationInternational:G06F3/06, // G06F13/16, G06F13/42, G11C7/10
[2018/01]
Former International [2011/03]G06F3/06
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2018/27]
Former [2011/03]DE,  FR,  GB 
TitleGerman:Nichtflüchtige Speichersteuerung[2011/03]
English:Non-volatile memory control[2011/03]
French:Contrôle de mémoire non-volatile[2011/03]
Examination procedure10.11.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.11.2011Examination requested  [2011/51]
17.04.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.10.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.06.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.12.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.01.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.05.2018Fee for grant paid
23.05.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
23.05.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP02762590.4  / EP1451673
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20020762590) is  12.06.2008
Opposition(s)05.04.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/24]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.10.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
28.10.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
28.10.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
28.10.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
28.10.2010Renewal fee patent year 07
28.10.2010Renewal fee patent year 08
28.10.2010Renewal fee patent year 09
29.09.2011Renewal fee patent year 10
12.09.2012Renewal fee patent year 11
12.09.2013Renewal fee patent year 12
12.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 13
11.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 14
13.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 15
12.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 16
Documents cited:Search[XI]EP0878755  (OKI ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2,4-8,14,15 * the whole document * [I] 3,9-13;
 [A]US6278633  (WONG SAU C [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * column 5, line 15 - column 6, line 23 * * column 12, line 3 - line 20 *;
 [AD]WO0049488  (MEMORY CORP PLC [GB], et al) [AD] 1-5 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5724592  (GARNER RICHARD P [US]) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO9518407  (MEMORY CORP PLC [GB], et al) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5644531  (KUO TIAO HUA [US], et al) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5969986  (WONG SAU C [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * column 3, line 29 - column 4, line 15 * * column 5, line 3 - line 13 * * column 6, line 26 - line 42 * * column 7, line 19 - line 51; figures 1-3 *
by applicantWO0049488