Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2273279

EP2273279 - Apparatus for testing electronic devices [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  23.11.2012
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip23.11.2012Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 26.12.2012  [2012/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AEHR TEST SYSTEMS, INC.
400 Kato Terrace
Fremont, CA 94539 / US
[2011/02]
Inventor(s)01 / Richmond, Donald P II
743 Montrose Avenue
Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US
02 / Burke, Paul W.
23102 Glenn Ellen Drive
Hayward, CA 94541 / US
03 / Cao, Doan D.
557 Toyon Avenue
San Jose, CA 95127 / US
04 / Tomic, James F.
760 60th Street
Oakland, CA 94609 / US
05 / Vu, Long V.
2709 Britt Way
San Jose, CA 95148 / US
06 / Deboe, Kenneth W.
400 Kato Terrace
Fremont, CA 94539 / US
07 / Uher, Frank O.
1221 Rochardson Avenue
Los Altos, CA 94024 / US
08 / Jovanovic, Jovan
53 Linden Drive
Santa Clara, CA 95050 / US
09 / Lindsey, Scott E.
724 Brooks Street
Brentwood, CA 94513 / US
10 / Maenner, Thomas T.
176 Arvada Court
San Ramon, CA 94583 / US
11 / Shepherd, Patrick M.
1576 Inverness Circle
San Jose, CA 95124 / US
12 / Tyson, Jeffrey L.
1532 Todd Street
Mountain View, CA 94040 / US
13 / Carbone, Mark C.
17599 Montebello Road
Cupertino, CA 95014 / US
 [2011/02]
Representative(s)advotec.
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Widenmayerstrasse 4
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2011/02]advotec.
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Widenmayerstrasse 4
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date10012371.027.04.2006
[2011/02]
Priority number, dateUS20050675546P27.04.2005         Original published format: US 675546 P
US20050682989P19.05.2005         Original published format: US 682989 P
US20050687502P03.06.2005         Original published format: US 687502 P
[2011/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2273279
Date:12.01.2011
Language:EN
[2011/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.12.2010
ClassificationInternational:G01R31/28
[2011/02]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   IT [2011/02]
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zur Prüfung elektronischer Vorrichtungen[2011/02]
English:Apparatus for testing electronic devices[2011/02]
French:Appareil pour tester des dispositifs électroniques[2011/02]
Examination procedure12.07.2011Examination requested  [2011/34]
13.07.2011Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2012/52]
31.07.2012Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time  [2012/52]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP06752021.3  / EP1894027
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20060752021) is  05.08.2008
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.10.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
21.10.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
21.10.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
12.04.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.201207   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XA]US2004113640  (COOPER TIMOTHY E [US] ET AL) [X] 1,22 * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0024] * [A] 2-21;
 [XA]US6340895  (UHER FRANK OTTO [US] ET AL) [X] 21 * column 3, line 58 - column 12, line 41 * [A] 1-20,22;
 [A]US6040700  (BERAR ANDREI [US]) [A] 1-22 * column 1, line 8 - column 3, line 65; claim 1 *;
 [A]US2004113645  (RICHMOND DONALD PAUL [US] ET AL RICHMOND II DONALD PAUL [US] ET AL) [A] 1-22 * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0039] *