Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2269598

EP2269598 - Curcuminoid compositions exhibiting synergistic inhibition of the expression and/or activity of cyclooxygenase-2 [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  25.07.2014
Database last updated on 22.08.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip25.07.2014Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 27.08.2014  [2014/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Metaproteomics, LLC
100 Avenida La Pata
San Clemente, CA 92673 / US
[2011/01]
Inventor(s)01 / Babish, John G.
508 White Church Road
Brooktondale, NY 14817 / US
02 / Howell, Terrence
44 Gortland Street, Unit 1
Jamaica Plain, MA 02130 / US
03 / Pacioretty, Linda
508 White Church Road
Brooktondale, NY 14817 / US
 [2011/24]
Former [2011/01]01 / Babish, John G.
508 White Church Road
Brooktondale, NY 14817 / US
02 / Howell, Terrence
60 Southworth Road
Dryden, NY 13053 / US
03 / Pacioretty, Linda
508 White Church Road
Brooktondale, NY 14817 / US
Representative(s)Weber, Martin
Jones Day
Rechtsanwälte Attorneys-at-Law Patentanwälte
Prinzregentenstrasse 11
80538 München / DE
[2012/46]
Former [2011/01]UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG
Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4
22607 Hamburg / DE
Application number, filing date10012635.817.07.2002
[2011/01]
Priority number, dateUS20010306055P17.07.2001         Original published format: US 306055 P
US2002019827716.07.2002         Original published format: US 198277
[2011/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2269598
Date:05.01.2011
Language:EN
[2011/01]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2269598
Date:22.06.2011
[2011/25]
International and Supplementary
search report(s)
Supplementary European search report -
dispatched on:
EP23.05.2011
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/047, A61K31/075, A61K31/12, A61K31/19, A61K31/365, A61K31/56, A61K31/704, A61K36/00, A61K45/06, A61P29/00
[2011/01]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   SK,   TR [2011/01]
TitleGerman:Curcuminoidzusammensetzungen, die eine synergistische Hemmung der Expression und/oder Aktivität von Cyclooxygenase-2 aufweisen[2011/01]
English:Curcuminoid compositions exhibiting synergistic inhibition of the expression and/or activity of cyclooxygenase-2[2011/01]
French:Compositions curcuminoïdes présentant une inhibition synergique de l'expression et/ou activité de la cyclo-oxygénase-2[2011/01]
Examination procedure28.02.2011Observations by third parties
22.12.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.12.2011Examination requested  [2012/05]
12.10.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.04.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.02.2014Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2014/35]
17.03.2014Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2014/35]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP02748188.6  / EP1411959
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20020748188) is  19.08.2008
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
13.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
13.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
13.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
13.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 07
13.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 08
13.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 09
12.07.2011Renewal fee patent year 10
04.06.2012Renewal fee patent year 11
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.201312   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]CN1125124  (GUANGXI ZHONGSHOU PHARMACEUTIC [CN]) [X] 1-7 * abstract * * claims 1-2 *;
 [X]WO9702831  (CATHAY HERBAL LAB PTY LTD [AU], et al) [X] 1,2,4-10 * page 2, lines 10-11 * * table 1 *;
 [X]WO0000186  (AMERICAN MEDICAL RESEARCH INC [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-10 * page 7, paragraphs 4-5 * * examples 13-14 *;
 [X]US6210701  (DARLAND GARY K [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-10 * column 6, lines 42-49 * * table 3 * * column 10, lines 8-18; table 7 *;
 [Y]WO9942094  (HENG MADALENE C Y [US]) [Y] 1-10 * examples 7-8; tables 8-9 * * claims 1-24 *;
 [Y]EP0776666  (NIPPON MEKTRON KK [JP]) [Y] 1,2,4-10 * claims 1-5 *;
 [Y]GB843137  (BIOREX LABORATORIES LTD) [Y] 1,2,4-10 * page 1, lines 21-64 * * page 2, lines 54-119 * * examples 1-2 *;
 [XP]US6264995  (NEWMARK THOMAS [US], et al) [XP] 1-10 * claim -; table . *;
 [E]WO02096447  (WEBER & WEBER GMBH & CO KG [DE], et al) [E] 1,2,4-10 * claims 1, 8, 18 *;
 [X]  - "Haridrà dilepah 01", DATABASE TKDL, Database accession no. HG/1393, XP003024376 [X] 1,2,4-10 * abstract *
    [] - KÄLI DÄSA, Vaidyamanoramä, page 54, [ ] * the whole document *
 [X]  - "Mà 1/4 rvà dyaghrtam", DATABASE TKDL, Database accession no. AK/1099, XP003024377 [X] 1-10 * abstract *
    [] - CAKRAPÄNIDATTAH, Cakradattah, page 83, [ ] * the whole document *
 [X]  - "Tiktakaghrtam", DATABASE TKDL, Database accession no. AK/2960, XP003024378 [X] 1-10 * abstract *
    [] - MÄDHAVAH, Vrndamädhava, page 504, [ ] * the whole document *
 [X]  - "Mà 1/4 rvà dyaghrtam", DATABASE TKDL, Database accession no. VS/3826, XP003024379 [X] 1-10 * abstract *
    [] - GOVT OF INDIA, Sahastrayoga, page 330, [ ] * the whole document *
 [X]  - "Takmeed Bara-e-taskeen", DATABASE TKDL, Database accession no. JA6/1040E, XP003024374 [X] 1,2,4-10 * abstract *
    [] - MOHAMMAD NAJMUL GHANI KHAN, Khazaain-al-Advia, page 1050, [ ] * the whole document *
 [X]  - "Habb-e-Taaoghon", DATABASE TKDL, Database accession no. MH1/3756, XP003024380 [X] 1,2,4-10 * abstract *
    [] - MOHAMMAD SHAREEF KHAN, ILaaj-al-Amraaz, page 328, [ ] * the whole document *
 [X]  - "Raughane-e-Surkh", DATABASE TKDL, Database accession no. AH5/504, XP003024382 [X] 1,2,4-10 * abstract *
    [] - MOHAMMAD AKMAL KHAN, Qaraabaadeen Azam wa Akmal, pages 399 - 400, [ ] * the whole document *
 [Y]  - DENG W NIE R LIU J, "Comparison of pharmacological effect of four andrographolides", DATABASE CAPLUS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 1982:555926, XP002958755 [Y] 1-3,5-10 * abstract *
 [Y]  - "Zimaad-e-Seb", DATABASE TKDL, Database accession no. JA7/150Z, XP003024375 [Y] 1,2,4-10 * abstract *
    [] - MOHAMMAD AZAM KHAN, Muheet-e-Azam, page 86, [ ] * the whole document *
 [Y]  - "Bhà 1/4 nimbà dicà 1/4 rnam (tridosajasothe)", DATABASE TKDL, Database accession no. AK/2467B, XP003024381 [Y] 1-3,5-10 * abstract *
    [] - MADHAVAH, Vrndarnädhava, page 418, [ ] * the whole document *
 [A]  - OHKURA T ET AL, "A GC/MS SPECTROMETRIC STUDY ON CONSTITUENTS ISOLATED FROM CURCUMA WENYUJIN", JAPANESE JOURNAL OF PHARMACOGNOSY (SHOYAKUGAKU ZASSHI), JAPANESE SOCIETY OF PHARMACOGNOSY, (19900901), vol. 44, no. 3, ISSN 0037-4377, pages 171 - 175, XP008003377 [A] 1-10 * page 171, paragraph 1 *
 [A]  - PARMAR V S ET AL, "OCCURRENCE OF PONGAMOL AS THE ENOL STRUCTURE IN TEPHROSIA-PURPUREA", PHYTOCHEMISTRY, (OXFORD), (1989), vol. 28, no. 2, ISSN 0031-9422, pages 591 - 593, XP002633565 [A] 1,2,4-10 * abstract * * page 591, column l, paragraph 2 *
by applicant   - CURR. MED RES OPIN., (1982), vol. 8, pages 145 - 149,
    - NOREEN, Y. ET AL., J. NAT. PROD., (1998), vol. 61, pages 2 - 7,
    - HAMBERG, M.; SAMUELSSON, B., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1971), vol. 246, pages 6713 - 6721,
    - T-C CHOU; P. TALALY, TRENDS PHARMACOL. SCI., vol. 4, pages 450 - 454,
    - CHOU, T.-C.; TALALAY, P., "A simple generalized equation for the analysis of multiple inhibitions of Michaelis-Menten kinetic systems", J. BIOL. CHEM., (1977), vol. 252, pages 6438 - 6442,
    - CHO; TALALAY, TRENDS PHARMACOL. SCI., (1983), vol. 4, pages 450 - 454,
other   - "Takmeed Bara-e-taskeen", DATABASE TKDL, Database accession no. JA6/1040E, XP003024374
    - MOHAMMAD NAJMUL GHANI KHAN, Khazaain-al-Advia, page 1050,
    - "Zimaad-e-Seb", DATABASE TKDL, Database accession no. JA7/150Z, XP003024375
    - MOHAMMAD AZAM KHAN, Muheet-e-Azam, page 86,
    - "Haridrädilepah 01", DATABASE TKDL, Database accession no. HG/1393, XP003024376
    - KÄLI DÄSA, Vaidyamanoramä, page 54,
    - "Mürvädyaghrtam", DATABASE TKDL, Database accession no. AK/1099, XP003024377
    - CAKRAPÄNIDATTAH, Cakradattah, page 83,
    - "Tiktakaghrtam", DATABASE TKDL, Database accession no. AK/2960, XP003024378
    - MÄDHAVAH, Vrndamädhava, page 504,
    - "Mürvädyaghrtam", DATABASE TKDL, Database accession no. VS/3826, XP003024379
    - GOVT OF INDIA, Sahastrayoga, page 330,
    - "Habb-e-Taaoghon", DATABASE TKDL, Database accession no. MH1/3756, XP003024380
    - MOHAMMAD SHAREEF KHAN, ILaaj-al-Amraaz, page 328,
    - "Bhünimbädicürnam (tridosajasothe)", DATABASE TKDL, Database accession no. AK/2467B, XP003024381
    - MADHAVAH, Vrndarnädhava, page 418,
    - "Raughane-e-Surkh", DATABASE TKDL, Database accession no. AH5/504, XP003024382
    - MOHAMMAD AKMAL KHAN, Qaraabaadeen Azam wa Akmal, pages 399 - 400,