blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2437001

EP2437001 - Service device for cleaning and maintenance of a solar panel arrangement [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.06.2014
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Manu Systems AG
Brunnstr. 25
93053 Regensburg / DE
[2013/10]
Former [2012/14]For all designated states
Fachhochschule Regensburg
Seybothstrasse 2
93053 Regensburg / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Monkman, Gareth
Waldweidenweg 10
93053 Regensburg / DE
02 / Baar, Christian
Hauptstrasse 6
86687 Kaisheim / DE
03 / Fischer, Arthur
Dechbettener Weinberg 3a
93051 Regensburg / DE
04 / Jäger, Stefan
Furtweg 3b
85716 Unterschleissheim / DE
05 / Kilbertus, Sebastian
Hauptstrasse 60a
93105 Tegernheim / DE
06 / Patzak, Adrian
Friedrich-Ebert-Strasse 26
93051 Regensburg / DE
07 / Schumm, Michael
Rathausstrasse 5a
96114 Hirschaid / DE
08 / Treiber, Daniel
Kleinfeld 1
94359 Loitzendorf / DE
 [2013/14]
Former [2012/14]01 / Monkan, Gareth
Waldweidenweg 10
93053 Regensburg / DE
02 / Baar, Christian
Hauptstrasse 6
86687 Kaisheim / DE
03 / Fischer, Arthur
Dechbettener Weinberg 3a
93051 Regensburg / DE
04 / Jäger, Stefan
Furtweg 3b
85716 Unterschleissheim / DE
05 / Kilbertus, Sebastian
Hauptstrasse 60a
93105 Tegernheim / DE
06 / Patzak, Adrian
Friedrich-Ebert-Strasse 26
93051 Regensburg / DE
07 / Treiber, Daniel
Kleinfeld 1
94359 Loitzendorf / DE
Representative(s)Sparing, Rolf Klaus, et al
Bonnekamp & Sparing
Patentanwaltskanzlei
European Patent and Trademark Law Firm
Malkastenstrasse 7
40211 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/14]Sparing, Rolf Klaus, et al
Bonnekamp & Sparing Patentanwaltskanzlei, European Patent & Trade Mark Law Firm, Goltsteinstrasse 19
40211 Düsseldorf / DE
Application number, filing date10012717.401.10.2010
[2012/14]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2437001
Date:04.04.2012
Language:EN
[2012/14]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2437001
Date:14.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/33]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.04.2011
ClassificationIPC:F24J2/46, A47L1/02, B08B1/00
[2012/14]
CPC:
F24S40/20 (EP,US); H02S50/00 (KR); B08B1/00 (KR);
B08B1/30 (EP,US); B08B1/32 (EP,US); B08B3/00 (KR);
A46B13/001 (EP,US); A46B2200/3073 (EP,US); A46B7/10 (EP,US);
Y02E10/40 (EP,US); Y02E10/50 (EP) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/14]
TitleGerman:Service-Vorrichtung zur Reinigung und Wartung einer Sonnenkollektoranordnung[2012/14]
English:Service device for cleaning and maintenance of a solar panel arrangement[2012/14]
French:Dispositif de services pour la nettoyage et la maintenance d'un agencement de panneau solaire[2012/14]
Examination procedure08.06.2011Examination requested  [2012/14]
05.03.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.06.2013Fee for grant paid
27.06.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  05.03.2013
Opposition(s)15.05.2014No opposition filed within time limit [2014/30]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.10.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU01.10.2010
AL14.08.2013
AT14.08.2013
BE14.08.2013
BG14.08.2013
CY14.08.2013
CZ14.08.2013
DK14.08.2013
EE14.08.2013
FI14.08.2013
HR14.08.2013
LT14.08.2013
LV14.08.2013
MC14.08.2013
MK14.08.2013
MT14.08.2013
NL14.08.2013
PL14.08.2013
RO14.08.2013
SE14.08.2013
SI14.08.2013
SK14.08.2013
SM14.08.2013
TR14.08.2013
IE01.10.2013
LU01.10.2013
NO14.11.2013
RS14.11.2013
GR15.11.2013
IS14.12.2013
PT16.12.2013
[2018/46]
Former [2015/41]HU01.10.2010
AT14.08.2013
BE14.08.2013
BG14.08.2013
CY14.08.2013
CZ14.08.2013
DK14.08.2013
EE14.08.2013
FI14.08.2013
HR14.08.2013
LT14.08.2013
LV14.08.2013
MC14.08.2013
MK14.08.2013
MT14.08.2013
NL14.08.2013
PL14.08.2013
RO14.08.2013
SE14.08.2013
SI14.08.2013
SK14.08.2013
SM14.08.2013
TR14.08.2013
IE01.10.2013
LU01.10.2013
NO14.11.2013
RS14.11.2013
GR15.11.2013
IS14.12.2013
PT16.12.2013
Former [2015/34]HU01.10.2010
AT14.08.2013
BE14.08.2013
BG14.08.2013
CY14.08.2013
CZ14.08.2013
DK14.08.2013
EE14.08.2013
FI14.08.2013
HR14.08.2013
LT14.08.2013
LV14.08.2013
MC14.08.2013
MK14.08.2013
NL14.08.2013
PL14.08.2013
RO14.08.2013
SE14.08.2013
SI14.08.2013
SK14.08.2013
SM14.08.2013
TR14.08.2013
IE01.10.2013
LU01.10.2013
NO14.11.2013
RS14.11.2013
GR15.11.2013
IS14.12.2013
PT16.12.2013
Former [2015/32]AT14.08.2013
BE14.08.2013
CY14.08.2013
CZ14.08.2013
DK14.08.2013
EE14.08.2013
FI14.08.2013
HR14.08.2013
LT14.08.2013
LV14.08.2013
MC14.08.2013
MK14.08.2013
NL14.08.2013
PL14.08.2013
RO14.08.2013
SE14.08.2013
SI14.08.2013
SK14.08.2013
SM14.08.2013
TR14.08.2013
IE01.10.2013
NO14.11.2013
GR15.11.2013
IS14.12.2013
PT16.12.2013
Former [2015/25]AT14.08.2013
BE14.08.2013
CY14.08.2013
CZ14.08.2013
DK14.08.2013
EE14.08.2013
FI14.08.2013
HR14.08.2013
LT14.08.2013
LV14.08.2013
MC14.08.2013
NL14.08.2013
PL14.08.2013
RO14.08.2013
SE14.08.2013
SI14.08.2013
SK14.08.2013
SM14.08.2013
IE01.10.2013
NO14.11.2013
GR15.11.2013
IS14.12.2013
PT16.12.2013
Former [2014/48]AT14.08.2013
BE14.08.2013
CY14.08.2013
CZ14.08.2013
DK14.08.2013
EE14.08.2013
FI14.08.2013
HR14.08.2013
LT14.08.2013
LV14.08.2013
MC14.08.2013
NL14.08.2013
PL14.08.2013
RO14.08.2013
SE14.08.2013
SI14.08.2013
SK14.08.2013
IE01.10.2013
NO14.11.2013
GR15.11.2013
IS14.12.2013
PT16.12.2013
Former [2014/25]AT14.08.2013
BE14.08.2013
CY14.08.2013
CZ14.08.2013
DK14.08.2013
EE14.08.2013
FI14.08.2013
HR14.08.2013
LT14.08.2013
LV14.08.2013
MC14.08.2013
NL14.08.2013
PL14.08.2013
RO14.08.2013
SE14.08.2013
SI14.08.2013
SK14.08.2013
NO14.11.2013
GR15.11.2013
IS14.12.2013
PT16.12.2013
Former [2014/23]AT14.08.2013
BE14.08.2013
CY14.08.2013
CZ14.08.2013
DK14.08.2013
EE14.08.2013
FI14.08.2013
HR14.08.2013
LT14.08.2013
LV14.08.2013
NL14.08.2013
PL14.08.2013
RO14.08.2013
SE14.08.2013
SI14.08.2013
SK14.08.2013
NO14.11.2013
GR15.11.2013
IS14.12.2013
PT16.12.2013
Former [2014/22]AT14.08.2013
BE14.08.2013
CY14.08.2013
DK14.08.2013
FI14.08.2013
HR14.08.2013
LT14.08.2013
LV14.08.2013
NL14.08.2013
PL14.08.2013
RO14.08.2013
SE14.08.2013
SI14.08.2013
NO14.11.2013
GR15.11.2013
IS14.12.2013
PT16.12.2013
Former [2014/21]AT14.08.2013
BE14.08.2013
CY14.08.2013
DK14.08.2013
FI14.08.2013
HR14.08.2013
LT14.08.2013
LV14.08.2013
PL14.08.2013
SE14.08.2013
SI14.08.2013
NO14.11.2013
GR15.11.2013
IS14.12.2013
PT16.12.2013
Former [2014/18]AT14.08.2013
BE14.08.2013
CY14.08.2013
FI14.08.2013
HR14.08.2013
LT14.08.2013
LV14.08.2013
PL14.08.2013
SE14.08.2013
SI14.08.2013
NO14.11.2013
GR15.11.2013
IS14.12.2013
PT16.12.2013
Former [2014/14]AT14.08.2013
BE14.08.2013
FI14.08.2013
HR14.08.2013
LT14.08.2013
LV14.08.2013
PL14.08.2013
SE14.08.2013
SI14.08.2013
CY21.08.2013
NO14.11.2013
GR15.11.2013
IS14.12.2013
PT16.12.2013
Former [2014/12]AT14.08.2013
FI14.08.2013
HR14.08.2013
LT14.08.2013
LV14.08.2013
PL14.08.2013
SE14.08.2013
SI14.08.2013
CY21.08.2013
NO14.11.2013
GR15.11.2013
IS14.12.2013
PT16.12.2013
Former [2014/11]AT14.08.2013
FI14.08.2013
HR14.08.2013
LT14.08.2013
PL14.08.2013
SE14.08.2013
CY21.08.2013
NO14.11.2013
IS14.12.2013
PT16.12.2013
Former [2014/10]AT14.08.2013
HR14.08.2013
LT14.08.2013
SE14.08.2013
CY21.08.2013
NO14.11.2013
IS14.12.2013
PT16.12.2013
Former [2014/09]AT14.08.2013
HR14.08.2013
LT14.08.2013
SE14.08.2013
NO14.11.2013
PT16.12.2013
Former [2014/08]LT14.08.2013
NO14.11.2013
PT16.12.2013
Former [2014/07]NO14.11.2013
Documents cited:Search[A]DE202006003697U  (SCHULZ EBERHARD [DE]) [A] 1,10 * paragraphs [0018] - [0031]; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]DE102006053704  (NOVATEC BIOSOL AG [DE]) [A] 1,2,5-7,9,10,12,14 * paragraphs [0016] - [0019]; figures 1,2 *;
 [AD]EP2048455  (BROWN GROUP SPAIN S A [ES]) [AD] 1,10 * abstract ** column 3; figures 1-3 *
by applicantEP0538521
 WO2008058528
 EP2048455
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.