Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2290571

EP2290571 - Method for ensuring the viability of blood to be transfused [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  08.07.2016
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.03.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Haemonetics Corporation
400 Wood Road
Braintree MA 02184-9114 / US
[2019/09]
Former [2011/09]For all designated states
Neoteric Technology, Limited
302-1233 Beach Avenue
Vancouver, British Columbia V6E 1V4 / CA
Inventor(s)01 / Auchinleck, Geoffrey Fletcher
302-1233 Beach Avenue
Vancouver British Columbia V6E 1V4 / CA
 [2011/09]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2011/09]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
Application number, filing date10012933.718.02.2005
[2011/09]
Priority number, dateUS2004078343819.02.2004         Original published format: US 783438
[2011/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2290571
Date:02.03.2011
Language:EN
[2011/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.02.2011
ClassificationInternational:G06F19/00
[2011/09]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2011/09]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Sicherstellung der Lebensfähigkeit von Blut zur Transfusion[2011/09]
English:Method for ensuring the viability of blood to be transfused[2011/09]
French:Procédé pour assurer la viabilité de sang pour transfusion[2011/09]
Examination procedure02.09.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.09.2011Examination requested  [2011/42]
26.02.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.07.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.09.2017Date of oral proceedings
12.10.2017Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
12.10.2017Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Appeal following examination22.12.2017Appeal received No.  T0635/18
22.02.2018Statement of grounds filed
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP05714466.9  / EP1716531
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20050714466) is  13.08.2007
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
27.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
27.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
27.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
23.02.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
24.02.2012Renewal fee patent year 08
27.02.2013Renewal fee patent year 09
27.02.2014Renewal fee patent year 10
26.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 11
26.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 12
27.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 13
27.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 14
27.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 15
Documents cited:Search[X]  - NORFOLK ET AL, "Blood Collection and Blood Tracking: LEEDS TEACHING HOSPITALS NHS TRUST", Presentations from SHOT (Serious Hazards of Transfusion) Meeting 2003, (20030926), pages 1 - 19, SHOT (Serious Hazards of Transfusion), URL: http://www.shotuk.org/wp-content/uploads/2010/03/DNLeeds.pdf, (20110110), XP002613548 [X] 1-7 * the whole document *
 [X]  - ANONYMOUS, "Blood Management", INTERNET CITATION, (20030605), URL: http://web.archive.org/web/20030605063115/http://dataloguk.com/blood_ management.htm, (20070426), XP002431442 [X] 1-7 * page 1 - page 4 *
 [I]  - ASHFORD P ET AL, "Guidelines for blood bank computing", TRANSFUSION MEDICINE, OXFORD, GB, (20001201), vol. 10, no. 4, doi:10.1046/J.1365-3148.2000.00273.X, pages 307 - 314, XP002339356 [I] 1-7 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1365-3148.2000.00273.x
by applicantUS20040783438