Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2455018

EP2455018 - Trocar sheath for insertion into a skin incision [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.03.2015
Database last updated on 11.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Karl Storz GmbH & Co. KG
Mittelstraße 8
78532 Tuttlingen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/21]For all designated states
Karl Storz GmbH & Co. KG
Mittelstraße 8
78532 Tuttlingen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Oberländer, Martin
c/o Karl Storz GmbH & Co. KG
Mittelstrasse 8
78532 Tuttlingen / DE
02 / Portscheller, Christian
c/o Karl Storz GmbH & Co. KG
Mittelstrasse 8
78532 Tuttlingen / DE
03 / Sauer, Michael
c/o Karl Storz GmbH & Co. KG
Mittelstrasse 8
78532 Tuttlingen / DE
04 / Wagner, Sebastian
c/o Karl Storz GmbH & Co. KG
Mittelstrasse 8
78532 Tuttlingen / DE
 [2012/21]
Representative(s)Fugmann, Winfried , et al
Karl Storz GmbH & Co. KG
Mittelstrasse 8
78532 Tuttlingen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/04]Fugmann, Winfried , et al
Karl Storz GmbH & Co. KG Mittelstrasse 8
78532 Tuttlingen / DE
Former [2012/21]Straub, Bernd
Karl Storz GmbH & Co. KG Patentabteilung Mittelstrasse 8
78532 Tuttlingen / DE
Application number, filing date10014823.822.11.2010
[2012/21]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2455018
Date:23.05.2012
Language:DE
[2012/21]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2455018
Date:21.05.2014
Language:DE
[2014/21]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.04.2011
ClassificationInternational:A61B17/34, // A61B17/00
[2012/21]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/21]
TitleGerman:Trokarhülse zum Einsetzen in eine Hautinzision[2012/21]
English:Trocar sheath for insertion into a skin incision[2012/21]
French:Gaine de trocart pour l'introduction dans une incision de peau[2012/21]
Examination procedure14.09.2012Examination requested  [2012/44]
24.09.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.01.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.05.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.01.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.04.2014Fee for grant paid
04.04.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
04.04.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  24.01.2013
Opposition(s)24.02.2015No opposition filed within time limit [2015/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.11.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
29.11.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU22.11.2010
AL21.05.2014
BG21.05.2014
CY21.05.2014
CZ21.05.2014
DK21.05.2014
EE21.05.2014
ES21.05.2014
FI21.05.2014
HR21.05.2014
LT21.05.2014
LV21.05.2014
MC21.05.2014
MK21.05.2014
MT21.05.2014
NL21.05.2014
PL21.05.2014
RO21.05.2014
RS21.05.2014
SE21.05.2014
SI21.05.2014
SK21.05.2014
SM21.05.2014
TR21.05.2014
NO21.08.2014
GR22.08.2014
IS21.09.2014
PT22.09.2014
IE22.11.2014
LU22.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
[2018/46]
Former [2018/30]HU22.11.2010
BG21.05.2014
CY21.05.2014
CZ21.05.2014
DK21.05.2014
EE21.05.2014
ES21.05.2014
FI21.05.2014
HR21.05.2014
LT21.05.2014
LV21.05.2014
MC21.05.2014
MK21.05.2014
MT21.05.2014
NL21.05.2014
PL21.05.2014
RO21.05.2014
RS21.05.2014
SE21.05.2014
SI21.05.2014
SK21.05.2014
SM21.05.2014
TR21.05.2014
NO21.08.2014
GR22.08.2014
IS21.09.2014
PT22.09.2014
IE22.11.2014
LU22.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
Former [2016/33]HU22.11.2010
BG21.05.2014
CY21.05.2014
CZ21.05.2014
DK21.05.2014
EE21.05.2014
ES21.05.2014
FI21.05.2014
HR21.05.2014
LT21.05.2014
LV21.05.2014
MC21.05.2014
MT21.05.2014
NL21.05.2014
PL21.05.2014
RO21.05.2014
RS21.05.2014
SE21.05.2014
SI21.05.2014
SK21.05.2014
SM21.05.2014
TR21.05.2014
NO21.08.2014
GR22.08.2014
IS21.09.2014
PT22.09.2014
IE22.11.2014
LU22.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
Former [2016/32]HU22.11.2010
BG21.05.2014
CY21.05.2014
CZ21.05.2014
DK21.05.2014
EE21.05.2014
ES21.05.2014
FI21.05.2014
HR21.05.2014
LT21.05.2014
LV21.05.2014
MC21.05.2014
NL21.05.2014
PL21.05.2014
RO21.05.2014
RS21.05.2014
SE21.05.2014
SI21.05.2014
SK21.05.2014
SM21.05.2014
TR21.05.2014
NO21.08.2014
GR22.08.2014
IS21.09.2014
PT22.09.2014
IE22.11.2014
LU22.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
Former [2016/31]BG21.05.2014
CY21.05.2014
CZ21.05.2014
DK21.05.2014
EE21.05.2014
ES21.05.2014
FI21.05.2014
HR21.05.2014
LT21.05.2014
LV21.05.2014
MC21.05.2014
NL21.05.2014
PL21.05.2014
RO21.05.2014
RS21.05.2014
SE21.05.2014
SI21.05.2014
SK21.05.2014
SM21.05.2014
NO21.08.2014
GR22.08.2014
IS21.09.2014
PT22.09.2014
IE22.11.2014
LU22.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
Former [2016/28]BG21.05.2014
CZ21.05.2014
DK21.05.2014
EE21.05.2014
ES21.05.2014
FI21.05.2014
HR21.05.2014
LT21.05.2014
LV21.05.2014
MC21.05.2014
NL21.05.2014
PL21.05.2014
RO21.05.2014
RS21.05.2014
SE21.05.2014
SI21.05.2014
SK21.05.2014
SM21.05.2014
NO21.08.2014
GR22.08.2014
IS21.09.2014
PT22.09.2014
IE22.11.2014
LU22.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
Former [2016/22]CZ21.05.2014
DK21.05.2014
EE21.05.2014
ES21.05.2014
FI21.05.2014
HR21.05.2014
LT21.05.2014
LV21.05.2014
MC21.05.2014
NL21.05.2014
PL21.05.2014
RO21.05.2014
RS21.05.2014
SE21.05.2014
SI21.05.2014
SK21.05.2014
SM21.05.2014
NO21.08.2014
GR22.08.2014
IS21.09.2014
PT22.09.2014
IE22.11.2014
LU22.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
Former [2015/46]CZ21.05.2014
DK21.05.2014
EE21.05.2014
ES21.05.2014
FI21.05.2014
HR21.05.2014
LT21.05.2014
LV21.05.2014
MC21.05.2014
NL21.05.2014
PL21.05.2014
RO21.05.2014
RS21.05.2014
SE21.05.2014
SI21.05.2014
SK21.05.2014
NO21.08.2014
GR22.08.2014
IS21.09.2014
PT22.09.2014
IE22.11.2014
LU22.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
Former [2015/36]CZ21.05.2014
DK21.05.2014
EE21.05.2014
ES21.05.2014
FI21.05.2014
HR21.05.2014
LT21.05.2014
LV21.05.2014
MC21.05.2014
NL21.05.2014
PL21.05.2014
RO21.05.2014
RS21.05.2014
SE21.05.2014
SI21.05.2014
SK21.05.2014
NO21.08.2014
GR22.08.2014
IS21.09.2014
PT22.09.2014
LU22.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
Former [2015/33]CZ21.05.2014
DK21.05.2014
EE21.05.2014
ES21.05.2014
FI21.05.2014
HR21.05.2014
LT21.05.2014
LV21.05.2014
MC21.05.2014
NL21.05.2014
PL21.05.2014
RO21.05.2014
RS21.05.2014
SE21.05.2014
SK21.05.2014
NO21.08.2014
GR22.08.2014
IS21.09.2014
PT22.09.2014
LU22.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
Former [2015/32]CZ21.05.2014
DK21.05.2014
EE21.05.2014
ES21.05.2014
FI21.05.2014
HR21.05.2014
LT21.05.2014
LV21.05.2014
MC21.05.2014
NL21.05.2014
PL21.05.2014
RO21.05.2014
RS21.05.2014
SE21.05.2014
SK21.05.2014
NO21.08.2014
GR22.08.2014
IS21.09.2014
PT22.09.2014
LU22.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
Former [2015/30]CZ21.05.2014
DK21.05.2014
EE21.05.2014
ES21.05.2014
FI21.05.2014
HR21.05.2014
LT21.05.2014
LV21.05.2014
NL21.05.2014
PL21.05.2014
RO21.05.2014
RS21.05.2014
SE21.05.2014
SK21.05.2014
NO21.08.2014
GR22.08.2014
IS21.09.2014
PT22.09.2014
LU22.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
Former [2015/12]CZ21.05.2014
DK21.05.2014
EE21.05.2014
ES21.05.2014
FI21.05.2014
HR21.05.2014
LT21.05.2014
LV21.05.2014
NL21.05.2014
PL21.05.2014
RO21.05.2014
RS21.05.2014
SE21.05.2014
SK21.05.2014
NO21.08.2014
GR22.08.2014
IS21.09.2014
PT22.09.2014
Former [2015/11]CZ21.05.2014
DK21.05.2014
EE21.05.2014
ES21.05.2014
FI21.05.2014
HR21.05.2014
LT21.05.2014
LV21.05.2014
PL21.05.2014
RO21.05.2014
RS21.05.2014
SE21.05.2014
SK21.05.2014
NO21.08.2014
GR22.08.2014
IS21.09.2014
PT22.09.2014
Former [2015/10]CZ21.05.2014
DK21.05.2014
EE21.05.2014
ES21.05.2014
FI21.05.2014
HR21.05.2014
LT21.05.2014
LV21.05.2014
PL21.05.2014
RS21.05.2014
SE21.05.2014
SK21.05.2014
NO21.08.2014
GR22.08.2014
IS21.09.2014
PT22.09.2014
Former [2015/08]DK21.05.2014
ES21.05.2014
FI21.05.2014
HR21.05.2014
LT21.05.2014
LV21.05.2014
PL21.05.2014
RS21.05.2014
SE21.05.2014
NO21.08.2014
GR22.08.2014
IS21.09.2014
PT22.09.2014
Former [2015/02]ES21.05.2014
FI21.05.2014
HR21.05.2014
LT21.05.2014
LV21.05.2014
PL21.05.2014
RS21.05.2014
SE21.05.2014
NO21.08.2014
GR22.08.2014
IS21.09.2014
PT22.09.2014
Former [2014/52]ES21.05.2014
FI21.05.2014
HR21.05.2014
LT21.05.2014
LV21.05.2014
PL21.05.2014
RS21.05.2014
SE21.05.2014
NO21.08.2014
GR22.08.2014
IS21.09.2014
Former [2014/50]ES21.05.2014
FI21.05.2014
HR21.05.2014
LT21.05.2014
LV21.05.2014
PL21.05.2014
SE21.05.2014
NO21.08.2014
GR22.08.2014
IS21.09.2014
Former [2014/49]FI21.05.2014
LT21.05.2014
NO21.08.2014
IS21.09.2014
Former [2014/48]LT21.05.2014
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2003233115  (EVERSULL CHRISTIAN SCOTT [US] ET AL) [X] 1,2,4,5,7,8 * paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0060]; figures 1-7 * * paragraph [0073] - paragraph [0076] * [I] 3,6,9;
 [XI]US5176649  (WAKABAYASHI AKIO [US]) [X] 1,4 * column 2, line 9 - line 44; figures 1-7 * [I] 2,3,9;
 [XI]US2005192483  (BONADIO FRANK [IE] ET AL) [X] 1 * abstract * [I] 2;
 [X]NL9302140  (BENEDICT MARIE DOORSCHODT BENEDICT MARIE DOORSCHODT [NL] DOORSCHODT BE) [X] 1,4 * abstract *;
 [A]US2003216770  (PERSIDSKY MAXIM D [US] ET AL) [A] 3 * paragraph [0092]; figures 1-4 *;
 [A]US2006036277  (KIETURAKIS MACIEJ J [US] ET AL) [A] 5-8 * abstract *;
 [A]US6004303  (PETERSON FRANCIS C [US]) [A] 9 * column 3, line 21 - line 37; figures 1-3 *