blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2455018 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2455018



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 132
27.03.2015 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
23.05.2014 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
25.04.2014 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
17.04.2014 Notice on debiting of fees Search / examination 1
04.04.2014 English translation of the claims Search / examination 2
04.04.2014 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
04.04.2014 French translation of claims Search / examination 2
04.04.2014 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
24.02.2014 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
22.01.2014 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
22.01.2014 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
22.01.2014 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
22.01.2014 Text intended for grant Search / examination 13
01.06.2013 Claims Search / examination 2
01.06.2013 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
29.05.2013 Claims Search / examination 2
29.05.2013 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
24.01.2013 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
24.01.2013 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
19.12.2012 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
17.12.2012 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 3
13.12.2012 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
10.12.2012 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 4
25.09.2012 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 1
25.09.2012 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 3
24.09.2012 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 1
24.09.2012 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 3
14.09.2012 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
29.05.2012 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
25.04.2012 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
14.04.2011 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
14.04.2011 European search opinion Search / examination 2
14.04.2011 European search report Search / examination 2
21.01.2011 (Partial) set of drawings filed in response to formal objections Search / examination 1
21.01.2011 Reply to the invitation to remedy deficiencies Search / examination 1
22.12.2010 Deficiencies in application documents - annex C Search / examination 3
03.12.2010 Abstract Search / examination 1
03.12.2010 Claims Search / examination 2
03.12.2010 Description Search / examination 8
03.12.2010 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
03.12.2010 Drawings Search / examination 2
03.12.2010 General authorisation Search / examination 1
03.12.2010 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
03.12.2010 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
03.12.2010 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 8
22.11.2010 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 9
22.11.2010 Specification filed by fax and/or in non-official language Search / examination 15