blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2455018


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
12.10.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.11.2018  [2018/46]
22.06.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.07.2018  [2018/30]
15.07.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  17.08.2016  [2016/33]
08.07.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.08.2016  [2016/32]
01.07.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  03.08.2016  [2016/31]
10.06.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.07.2016  [2016/28]
29.04.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  01.06.2016  [2016/22]
09.10.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.11.2015  [2015/46]
31.07.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  02.09.2015  [2015/36]
10.07.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.08.2015  [2015/33]
03.07.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  05.08.2015  [2015/32]
19.06.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.07.2015  [2015/30]
27.03.2015 No opposition filed within time limit published on  29.04.2015  [2015/18]
13.02.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.03.2015  [2015/12]
06.02.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.03.2015  [2015/11]
30.01.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.03.2015  [2015/10]
16.01.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.02.2015  [2015/08]
05.12.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.01.2015  [2015/02]
21.11.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.12.2014  [2014/52]
07.11.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.12.2014  [2014/50]
31.10.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  03.12.2014  [2014/49]
24.10.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.11.2014  [2014/48]
18.04.2014 (Expected) grant published on  21.05.2014  [2014/21]
17.04.2014 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
17.04.2014 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
08.04.2014 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
28.02.2014 Change - representative published on  02.04.2014  [2014/14]
21.01.2014 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
17.01.2014 Change - classification published on  19.02.2014  [2014/08]
27.12.2013 Change - classification published on  29.01.2014  [2014/05]
03.12.2013 New entry: Renewal fee paid
29.05.2013 New entry: Reply to examination report
23.01.2013 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
18.01.2013 First examination report
21.12.2012 Change - representative published on  23.01.2013  [2013/04]
27.11.2012 New entry: Renewal fee paid
28.09.2012 Request for examination filed published on  31.10.2012  [2012/44]
24.09.2012 Amendment by applicant
22.05.2012 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  23.05.2012  [2012/21]