blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2458466

EP2458466 - Automatic supervision and control system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.01.2021
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  24.01.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  21.11.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  23.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip08.07.2022Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 10.08.2022  [2022/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Industrial Development of Automotivo Components, IDACO corp
3rd Industrial Zone-No. 243/17+250-St. 36
6th October City / EG
[2012/22]
Inventor(s)01 / Fouad, Hisham Gamal El-Din Mahoud
3rd Industrial Zone
No. 243/17+250-St 36.
6th October City / EG
 [2012/22]
Representative(s)Lorente Berges, Ana, et al
A2 Estudio Legal
C/ Maria de Molina n° 41
28006 Madrid / ES
[N/P]
Former [2020/09]Lorente Berges, Ana, et al
A2 Estudio Legal
C/Alcalá 143, 3° Dcha.
28009 Madrid / ES
Former [2012/22]Lorente Berges, Ana, et al
Avenida General Perón N° 19
Planta Baja, Puerta C
28020 Madrid / ES
Application number, filing date10015133.130.11.2010
[2012/22]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2458466
Date:30.05.2012
Language:EN
[2012/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2458466
Date:26.02.2020
Language:EN
[2020/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.07.2011
ClassificationIPC:G05B23/02, G06Q10/06
[2018/48]
CPC:
G06Q10/06395 (EP,US); G05B23/0294 (EP,US); G06Q10/063114 (EP,US)
Former IPC [2012/22]G05B23/02
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2020/09]
Former [2012/22]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Automatisches Überwachungs- und Steuerungssystem[2012/22]
English:Automatic supervision and control system[2012/22]
French:Système de supervision et de contrôle automatique[2012/22]
Examination procedure13.12.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
31.10.2012Examination requested  [2012/50]
22.11.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.02.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.11.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.01.2020Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
15.01.2020Fee for grant paid
15.01.2020Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  22.11.2018
Opposition(s)27.11.2020No opposition filed within time limit [2021/05]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.11.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
13.11.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
03.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
30.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
26.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
20.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 08
16.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 09
29.11.2019Renewal fee patent year 10
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU30.11.2010
AL26.02.2020
AT26.02.2020
CY26.02.2020
CZ26.02.2020
DK26.02.2020
EE26.02.2020
ES26.02.2020
FI26.02.2020
HR26.02.2020
IT26.02.2020
LT26.02.2020
LV26.02.2020
MC26.02.2020
MK26.02.2020
MT26.02.2020
NL26.02.2020
PL26.02.2020
RO26.02.2020
RS26.02.2020
SE26.02.2020
SI26.02.2020
SK26.02.2020
SM26.02.2020
TR26.02.2020
BG26.05.2020
NO26.05.2020
GR27.05.2020
IS26.06.2020
PT19.07.2020
[2022/31]
Former [2022/30]HU30.11.2010
AL26.02.2020
AT26.02.2020
CY26.02.2020
CZ26.02.2020
DK26.02.2020
EE26.02.2020
ES26.02.2020
FI26.02.2020
HR26.02.2020
IT26.02.2020
LT26.02.2020
LV26.02.2020
MC26.02.2020
MT26.02.2020
NL26.02.2020
PL26.02.2020
RO26.02.2020
RS26.02.2020
SE26.02.2020
SI26.02.2020
SK26.02.2020
SM26.02.2020
TR26.02.2020
BG26.05.2020
NO26.05.2020
GR27.05.2020
IS26.06.2020
PT19.07.2020
Former [2022/27]HU30.11.2010
AT26.02.2020
CY26.02.2020
CZ26.02.2020
DK26.02.2020
EE26.02.2020
ES26.02.2020
FI26.02.2020
HR26.02.2020
IT26.02.2020
LT26.02.2020
LV26.02.2020
MC26.02.2020
MT26.02.2020
NL26.02.2020
PL26.02.2020
RO26.02.2020
RS26.02.2020
SE26.02.2020
SI26.02.2020
SK26.02.2020
SM26.02.2020
TR26.02.2020
BG26.05.2020
NO26.05.2020
GR27.05.2020
IS26.06.2020
PT19.07.2020
Former [2022/26]AT26.02.2020
CZ26.02.2020
DK26.02.2020
EE26.02.2020
ES26.02.2020
FI26.02.2020
HR26.02.2020
IT26.02.2020
LT26.02.2020
LV26.02.2020
MC26.02.2020
NL26.02.2020
PL26.02.2020
RO26.02.2020
RS26.02.2020
SE26.02.2020
SI26.02.2020
SK26.02.2020
SM26.02.2020
TR26.02.2020
BG26.05.2020
NO26.05.2020
GR27.05.2020
IS26.06.2020
PT19.07.2020
Former [2021/31]AT26.02.2020
CZ26.02.2020
DK26.02.2020
EE26.02.2020
ES26.02.2020
FI26.02.2020
HR26.02.2020
IT26.02.2020
LT26.02.2020
LV26.02.2020
MC26.02.2020
NL26.02.2020
PL26.02.2020
RO26.02.2020
RS26.02.2020
SE26.02.2020
SI26.02.2020
SK26.02.2020
SM26.02.2020
BG26.05.2020
NO26.05.2020
GR27.05.2020
IS26.06.2020
PT19.07.2020
Former [2021/10]AT26.02.2020
CZ26.02.2020
DK26.02.2020
EE26.02.2020
ES26.02.2020
FI26.02.2020
HR26.02.2020
IT26.02.2020
LT26.02.2020
LV26.02.2020
NL26.02.2020
PL26.02.2020
RO26.02.2020
RS26.02.2020
SE26.02.2020
SI26.02.2020
SK26.02.2020
SM26.02.2020
BG26.05.2020
NO26.05.2020
GR27.05.2020
IS26.06.2020
PT19.07.2020
Former [2020/50]CZ26.02.2020
DK26.02.2020
EE26.02.2020
ES26.02.2020
FI26.02.2020
HR26.02.2020
LT26.02.2020
LV26.02.2020
NL26.02.2020
RO26.02.2020
RS26.02.2020
SE26.02.2020
SK26.02.2020
SM26.02.2020
BG26.05.2020
NO26.05.2020
GR27.05.2020
IS26.06.2020
PT19.07.2020
Former [2020/49]CZ26.02.2020
DK26.02.2020
ES26.02.2020
FI26.02.2020
HR26.02.2020
LT26.02.2020
LV26.02.2020
NL26.02.2020
RO26.02.2020
RS26.02.2020
SE26.02.2020
SK26.02.2020
SM26.02.2020
BG26.05.2020
NO26.05.2020
GR27.05.2020
IS26.06.2020
PT19.07.2020
Former [2020/48]DK26.02.2020
ES26.02.2020
FI26.02.2020
HR26.02.2020
LT26.02.2020
LV26.02.2020
NL26.02.2020
RO26.02.2020
RS26.02.2020
SE26.02.2020
SM26.02.2020
BG26.05.2020
NO26.05.2020
GR27.05.2020
IS26.06.2020
PT19.07.2020
Former [2020/47]DK26.02.2020
ES26.02.2020
FI26.02.2020
HR26.02.2020
LT26.02.2020
LV26.02.2020
NL26.02.2020
RS26.02.2020
SE26.02.2020
BG26.05.2020
NO26.05.2020
GR27.05.2020
IS26.06.2020
Former [2020/45]FI26.02.2020
HR26.02.2020
LV26.02.2020
NL26.02.2020
RS26.02.2020
SE26.02.2020
BG26.05.2020
NO26.05.2020
GR27.05.2020
IS26.06.2020
Former [2020/40]FI26.02.2020
HR26.02.2020
LV26.02.2020
RS26.02.2020
SE26.02.2020
BG26.05.2020
NO26.05.2020
GR27.05.2020
IS26.06.2020
Former [2020/39]FI26.02.2020
HR26.02.2020
LV26.02.2020
RS26.02.2020
SE26.02.2020
BG26.05.2020
NO26.05.2020
GR27.05.2020
Former [2020/38]FI26.02.2020
HR26.02.2020
LV26.02.2020
RS26.02.2020
SE26.02.2020
NO26.05.2020
GR27.05.2020
Former [2020/37]FI26.02.2020
HR26.02.2020
LV26.02.2020
RS26.02.2020
SE26.02.2020
NO26.05.2020
Former [2020/35]FI26.02.2020
NO26.05.2020
Documents cited:Search[Y]WO2005017635  (QUAKER OATS CO [US], et al) [Y] 1-3,5 * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0030] *;
 [Y]US7110850  (BECKER ARND [DE], et al) [Y] 5* column 7, line 41 - line 46 *;
 [Y]US7379782  (COCCO DENNIS P [CA]) [Y] 1-3,5 * column 8, line 3 - line 67 * * column 12, line 1 - column 13, line 10 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.