Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2362221

EP2362221 - Antagonists of HMG1 for treating inflamatory conditions [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  29.03.2013
Database last updated on 10.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.11.2019New entry: Invitation to file observations in an appeal + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Feinstein Institute for Medical Research
350 Community Drive
Manhasset, NY 11030 / US
[2011/35]
Inventor(s)01 / Tracey, Kevin J.
17 Highview Avenue
Old Greenwich, CT 06870 / US
02 / Wang, Haichao
12 Lombardi Street
Edison, NJ 08820 / US
 [2011/35]
Representative(s)Potter Clarkson
The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2013/37]Potter Clarkson LLP
The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham
NG1 5GG / GB
Former [2011/35]Didmon, Mark , et al
Potter Clarkson LLP Park View House 58 The Ropewalk
Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB
Application number, filing date10075469.611.02.2000
[2011/35]
Priority number, dateUS1999024857411.02.1999         Original published format: US 248574
[2011/35]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2362221
Date:31.08.2011
Language:EN
[2011/35]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.07.2011
ClassificationInternational:G01N33/566, A61K38/00, C12P21/06
[2011/35]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2011/35]
TitleGerman:HMG1-Antagonisten zur Behandlung von Entzündungserkrankungen[2011/35]
English:Antagonists of HMG1 for treating inflamatory conditions[2011/35]
French:Antagonistes de HMG1 pour le traitement de maladies inflammatoires[2011/35]
Examination procedure11.10.2010Examination requested  [2011/35]
10.04.2012Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time
31.05.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.09.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.03.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.11.2015Date of oral proceedings
16.12.2015Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
16.12.2015Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Appeal following examination10.02.2016Appeal received No.  T1148/16
22.04.2016Statement of grounds filed
27.11.2019Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M04) [2019/48]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP00915762.9  / EP1165110
EP05077852.1  / EP1707214
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report
30.05.2012Request for further processing filed
30.05.2012Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
14.06.2012Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
12.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
12.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
12.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
12.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
12.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 08
12.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 09
12.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 10
12.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 11
23.02.2011Renewal fee patent year 12
24.02.2012Renewal fee patent year 13
27.02.2013Renewal fee patent year 14
27.02.2014Renewal fee patent year 15
26.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 16
26.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 17
27.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 18
14.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 19
13.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 20
Documents cited:Search[T]EP1165110  (LONG ISLAND JEWISH RES INST [US] THE FEINSTEIN INST MEDICAL RES [US]) [T] 1-16 * the whole document *
 [XA]  - TOMITA N ET AL, "DIRECT IN VIVO GENE INTRODUCTION INTO RAT KIDNEY", BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS, ACADEMIC PRESS INC. ORLANDO, FL, US, vol. 186, no. 1, ISSN 0006-291X, (19920715), pages 129 - 134, BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS, ACADEMIC PRESS INC. ORLANDO, FL, US, XP000579745 [X] 4,5,16 * the whole document * [A] 1-3,6-15

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0006-291X(05)80784-3
 [XI]  - MERENMIES ET AL, "30-kDa heparin-binding protein of brain (amphoterin) involved in neurite outgrowth", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF BIOLOCHEMICAL BIOLOGISTS, BIRMINGHAM,, US, vol. 25, no. 266, ISSN 0021-9258, (19910905), pages 16722 - 16729, JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF BIOLOCHEMICAL BIOLOGISTS, BIRMINGHAM,, US, XP002078451 [X] 2,4,11,13 * the whole document * [I] 12,14
 [A]  - PARKKINEN JAAKKO ET AL, "Amphotericin, the 30-kDa protein in a family of HMG1-type polypeptides: Enhanced expression in transformed cells, leading edge localization, and interactions with plasminogen activation", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, vol. 268, no. 26, ISSN 0021-9258, (1993), pages 19726 - 19738, JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, XP002406968 [A] 1-10 * abstract *
by applicant   - ZHANG; TRACEY, The Cytokine Handbook, ACADEMIC PRESS LIMITED, (1998), pages 515 - 547
    - LANDSMAN; BUSTIN, BIOESSAYS, (1993), vol. 15, pages 539 - 546
    - BAXEVANIS; LANDSMAN, NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (1995), vol. 23, pages 514 - 523
    - MERENMIES ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1991), vol. 266, pages 16722 - 16729
    - MILEV ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1998), vol. 273, pages 6998 - 7005
    - SALMIVIRTA ET AL., EXP. CELL RES., (1992), vol. 200, pages 444 - 451
    - MELLONI ET AL., BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS. RES. COMMUN., (1995), vol. 210, pages 82 - 89
    - MELLONI ET AL., FEBS LETT., (1995), vol. 368, pages 466 - 470
    - MOHAN ET AL., BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS. RES. COMMUN., (1992), vol. 182, pages 689 - 696
    - YAMAWAKI ET AL., J. NEUROSCI. RES., (1996), vol. 44, pages 586 - 593
    - VASSALLI ET AL., J. CLIN. INVEST., (1991), vol. 88, pages 1067 - 1072
    - REDLITZ; PLOW, BAILLIERES CLIN. HAEMATOL., (1995), vol. 8, pages 313 - 327
    - PARKKINE ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1991), vol. 266, pages 16730 - 16735
    - ZHANG ET AL., EXP. MED., (1997), vol. 185, pages 1759 - 1768