Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2343315

EP2343315 - Nucleic acid and corresponding protein named 158P1D7 useful in the treatment and detection of bladder and other cancers [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  12.10.2012
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2012Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 14.11.2012  [2012/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Agensys, Inc.
2225 Colorado Boulevard
Santa Monica, CA 90404 / US
[2011/28]
Inventor(s)01 / Jakobovits, Aya
3135 Hutton Drive
Beverly Hills, CA 90210 / US
02 / Morrison, Robert Kendall
1044 Yale Street
Santa Monica, CA 90403 / US
03 / Raitano, Arthur B.
12685 Rose Avenue
Los Angeles, CA 90066 / US
04 / Challita-Eid, Pia, M.
15745 Morrison Street
Encino, CA 91436 / US
05 / Perez-Villar, Juan, J.
Calle Sierra Calderona 55 Urbanizacion Monasterios Puzol
Valencia 46530 / ES
06 / Morrison, Karen, Jane, Meyrick
1044 Yale Street
Santa Monica, CA 90403 / US
07 / Faris, Mary
2538 Almaden Court
Los Angeles, CA 90077 / US
08 / Ge, Wangmao
4838 Hollow Corner Road, Apt. 314
Culver City, CA 90230 / US
09 / Gudas, Jean
13340 Chalon Road
Los Angeles, CA 90049 / US
10 / Kanner, Steven, B.
1107 Princeton Street 101
SAnta Monica, CA 90403 / US
 [2011/28]
Representative(s)Lord, Hilton David , et al
Marks & Clerk LLP
90 Long Acre
London WC2E 9RA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2011/28]Lord, Hilton David , et al
Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre
London WC2E 9RA / GB
Application number, filing date10075689.910.02.2004
[2011/28]
Priority number, dateUS20030446633P10.02.2003         Original published format: US 446633 P
[2011/28]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2343315
Date:13.07.2011
Language:EN
[2011/28]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2343315
Date:23.11.2011
Language:EN
[2011/47]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.10.2011
ClassificationInternational:C07K14/47, C12N15/12, C12Q1/68, A61K38/17, C07K16/18, A01K67/027, A61K39/00, C12N15/11
[2011/28]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2011/28]
TitleGerman:Nukleinsäure und entsprechendes Protein mit der Bezeichnung 158P1D7, das sich für die Behandlung und den Nachweis von Blasenkrebs und anderen Krebserkrankungen eignet[2011/28]
English:Nucleic acid and corresponding protein named 158P1D7 useful in the treatment and detection of bladder and other cancers[2011/28]
French:Acide nucléique et protéine correspondante appelée 158P1D7 utile pour le traitement et la détection de cancer de la vessie et autres[2011/28]
Examination procedure25.10.2010Examination requested  [2011/28]
24.05.2012Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2012/46]
29.06.2012Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2012/46]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP04709923.9  / EP1594892
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20040709923) is  20.09.2007
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
13.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
13.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
13.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
13.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
13.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 08
24.02.2012Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search[Y]WO0216593  (AGENSYS INC [US]) [Y] 1-21 * the whole document, in particular SEQ ID NOs: 656 and 657 and tables *;
 [Y]WO02059377  (EOS BIOTECHNOLOGY INC [US]) [Y] 1-21 * abstract *;
 [Y]WO0181363  (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORP [US], et al) [Y] 1-21 * the whole document, in particular Tables and claims *;
 [Y]WO0226826  (CURAGEN CORP [US], et al) [Y] 1-21 * the whole document, in particular the claims *;
 [Y]WO0220569  (SCHERING CORP [US]) [Y] 1-21 * the whole document, in particular SEQ ID NOs: 24, 25 and 27 *;
 WO03102155  [ ] (CURAGEN CORP [US], et al)
 [Y]  - "Human gene of the invention NOV25a SEQ ID NO:565.", Geneseq, (20040325), Database accession no. ADH71669, URL: EBI, XP002660787 [Y] 1-21 * the whole document, in particular the sequence (SEQ ID NO: 565);; sequence . *
by applicantWO9733602
 US4640835
 US4496689
 US4301144
 US4670417
 US4791192
 US4179337
 US5428130
 WO9824893
 US6162963
 US6150584
 US6114598
 US4736866
 US4870009
 US5837501
 US5382510
 US5952170
 US5955280
 US5925523
 US5846722
 US6004746
 US5723286
 US5733731
 US5928868
 US6146635
 US5962428
 US5580859
 US5589466
 US5804566
 US5739118
 US5736524
 US5679647
 WO9804720
 US5922687
 US4722848
 US5736142
 WO9324640
 US5279833
 WO9106309
 US5204253
 WO9507707
 US4235871
 US4501728
 US4837028
 US5019369
 US5840501
 US5939533
 US5919652
 US5681702
 US5597909
 US5545730
 US5594117
 US5591584
 US5571670
 US5580731
 US5624802
 US5635352
 US5594118
 US5359100
 US5124246
 US5681697
 US6365797
 US6107540
 WO9104753
 WO9010448
 EP0360257
 US5254678
 WO9426877
 WO9420127
 WO9403205
 GB2211504
    - VOLGELZANG, ET AL, Comprehensive Textbook of Genitourinarv Oncology, WILLIAMS & WILKINS, (1996), pages 295 - 556
    - J UROL, (2001), vol. 165, page 1067
    - J UROL, (2001), vol. 166, page 470
    - J UROL, (1999), vol. 161, page 810
    - CATALONA ET AL., J UROL, (1987), vol. 137, pages 220 - 224
    - FLAMM ET AL., UROLOGE, (1994), vol. 33, pages 138 - 143
    - BAZARBASHI ET AL., SURG ONCOL., (2000), vol. 74, pages 181 - 4
    - NISHIYAMA ET AL., CLIN CANCER RES, (2001), vol. 7, pages 23 - 31
    - ZLOTTA ET AL., EUR UROL, (2000), vol. 37, no. 3, pages 10 - 15
    - HOPP T.P.; WOODS K.P., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A, (1981), vol. 78, pages 3824 - 3828
    - KYTE J.; DOULITTLE R.F., J. MOI. BLOI., (1982), vol. 157, pages 105 - 132
    - JANIN J., NATURE, (1979), vol. 277, pages 491 - 492
    - BHASKARAN R.; PONNUSWAMY P.K., J. PEPT. PROTEIN RES., (1988), vol. 32, pages 242 - 255
    - DELEAGE, G.; ROUX B., PROTEIN ENGINEERING, (1987), vol. 1, pages 289 - 294
    - COMBET C.; BLANCHET C.; GEOURJON C.; DELEAGE G., HNN - HIERARCHICAL NEURAL NETWORK METHOD (NPS@: NETWORK PROTEIN SEQUENCE ANALYSIS TIBS, vol. 25, no. 3, (200003), pages 147 - 150, URL: pbil.ibcp.fr/cgi-bin/npsa_automat.pl?page=npsa_nn.html
    - K. HOFMANN; W. STOFFEL, "TMBASE - A database of membrane spanning protein segments", BIOL. CHEM. HOPPE-SEYLER, (1993), vol. 374, page 166
    - "A hidden Markov model for predicting transmembrane helices in protein sequences", ERIK L.L. SONNHAMMER; GUNNAR VON HEIJNE; ANDERS KROGH, In Proc. of Sixth Int. Conf. on Intelligent Systems for Molecular Biology, CA: AAAI PRESS, (1998), pages 175 - 182
    - WHITTMORE, SEMIN UROL, (1983), vol. 1, pages 4 - 10
    - KRAJINOVIC ET AL., MUTAT. RES., (1998), vol. 382, no. 3-4, pages 81 - 83
    - JOHANSSON ET AL., BLOOD, (1995), vol. 86, no. 10, pages 3905 - 3914
    - FINGER ET AL., P.N.A.S., (1988), vol. 85, no. 23, pages 9158 - 9162
    - EVANS ET AL., AM. J. OBSTET GYNECOL, (1994), vol. 171, no. 4, pages 1055 - 1057
    - MARROGI ET AL., J. CUTAN. PATHOL., (1999), vol. 26, no. 8, pages 369 - 378
    - SYNTHESIS, (1988), vol. 1, pages 1 - 5
    - LYER, R. P. ET AL., J. ORG. CHEM., (1990), vol. 55, pages 4693 - 4698
    - LYER, R. P. ET AL., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1990), vol. 112, pages 1253 - 1254
    - PARTRIDGE ET AL., ANTISENSE & NUCLEIC ACID DRUG DEVELOPMENT, (1996), vol. 6, pages 169 - 175
    - L. A. COUTURE; D. T. STINCHCOMB, TRENDS GENET, (1996), vol. 12, pages 510 - 515
    - MULLER ET AL., MCB, (1991), vol. 11, page 1785
    - KOZAK, MOL. CELL BIOL., (1989), vol. 9, pages 5073 - 5080
    - KOZAK, PNAS, (1995), vol. 92, no. 7, pages 2662 - 2666
    - KOZAK, NAR, (1987), vol. 15, no. 20, pages 8125 - 8148
    - LUBERT STRYER, Biochemistry. 2nd Ed., STANFORD UNIVERSITY, pages 13 - 15
    - HENIKOFF ET AL., PNAS, (1992), vol. 89, pages 10915 - 10919
    - LEI ET AL., J BIOL CHEM, (19950519), vol. 270, no. 20, pages 11882 - 6
    - CARTER ET AL., NUCL. ACIDS RES., (1986), vol. 13, page 4331
    - ZOLLER ET AL., NUCL. ACIDS RES., (1987), vol. 10, page 6487
    - WELLS ET AL., GENE, (1985), vol. 34, page 315
    - WELLS ET AL., PHRLOS. TRANS. R. SOC. LONDON SERA, (1986), vol. 317, page 415
    - CHOTHIA, J. MOL. BIOL., (1976), vol. 150, page 1
    - NAIR ET AL., J. IMMUNOL, (2000), vol. 165, no. 12, pages 6949 - 6955
    - HEBBES ET AL., MOL IMMUNOL, (1989), vol. 26, no. 9, pages 865 - 73
    - SCHWARTZ ET AL., J IMMUNOL, (1985), vol. 135, no. 4, pages 2598 - 608
    - CHEN ET AL., LAB INVEST., (1998), vol. 78, no. 2, pages 165 - 174
    - GAIDDON ET AL., ENDOCRINOLOGY, (1995), vol. 136, no. 10, pages 4331 - 4338
    - HALL ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (1996), vol. 24, no. 6, pages 1119 - 1126
    - PETERZIEL ET AL., ONCOGENE, (1999), vol. 18, no. 46, pages 6322 - 6329
    - O'BRIAN, ONCOL. REP., (1998), vol. 5, no. 2, pages 305 - 309
    - DENNIS ET AL., BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS. ACTA, (1999), vol. 1473, no. 1, pages 21 - 34
    - RAJU ET AL., EXP. CELL RES., (1997), vol. 235, no. 1, pages 145 - 154
    - TRESTON ET AL., J. NATL. CANCER INST. MONOGR., (1992), pages 169 - 175
    - SETTE, IMMUNOGENETICS, (1999), vol. 50, no. 3-4, pages 201 - 212
    - SETTE ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (2001), vol. 166, no. 2, pages 1389 - 1397
    - SIDNEY ET AL., HUM. IMMUNOL., vol. 199758, no. 1, pages 12 - 20
    - KONDO ET AL., IMMUNOGENETES, (1997), vol. 45, no. 4, pages 249 - 258
    - SIDNEY ET AL., J. IMMUNEL., (1996), vol. 157, no. 8, pages 3480 - 90
    - FALK, NATURE, (1991), vol. 351, pages 290 - 6
    - HUNT ET AL., SCIENCE, (1992), vol. 255, pages 1261 - 3
    - PARKER ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1992), vol. 149, pages 3580 - 7
    - PARKER ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1994), vol. 152, pages 163 - 75
    - BORRAS-CUESTA ET AL., HUM. IMMUNOL., (2000), vol. 61, no. 3, pages 266 - 278
    - ALEXANDER ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (2000), vol. 164, no. 3, pages 1625 - 1633
    - ALEXANDER ET AL., PMID: 7895164
    - O'SULLIVAN ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., vol. 1991147, no. 8, pages 2663 - 2669
    - ALEXANDER ET AL., IMMUNITY, vol. 19941, no. 9, pages 751 - 761
    - ALEXANDER ET AL., IMMUNOL. RES., (1998), vol. 18, no. 2, pages 79 - 92
    - FALK ET AL., NATURE, (1991), vol. 351, pages 290 - 6
    - XUE ET AL., PROSTATE, (1997), vol. 30, pages 73 - 8
    - PESHWA ET AL., PROSTATE, (1998), vol. 36, pages 129 - 38
    - DONNELLY ET AL., ANN. REV. IMMUNOL., (1997), vol. 15, pages 617 - 648
    - JONES ET AL., NATURE, (1986), vol. 321, pages 522 - 525
    - RIECHMANN ET AL., NATURE, (1988), vol. 332, pages 323 - 327
    - VERHOEYEN, SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 239, pages 1534 - 1536
    - CARTER ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1993), vol. 89, page 4285
    - SIMS ET AL., J. LMMUNOL., (1993), vol. 151, page 2296
    - VAUGHAN, NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1998), vol. 16, pages 535 - 539
    - CLARK, M, Protein Engineering of Antibody Molecules for Prophylactic and Therapeutic Applications in Man, NOTTINGHAM ACADEMIC, (1993), pages 45 - 64
    - BURTON; BARBAS, HUMAN ANTIBODIES FROM COMBINATORIAL LIBRARIES, pages 65 - 82
    - JAKOBOVITS, EXP. OPIN. INVEST. DRUGS, (1998), vol. 7, no. 4, pages 607 - 614
    - WOLFF ET AL., CANCER RES., vol. 53, pages 2560 - 2565
    - BUUS, S. ET AL., CELL, (1986), vol. 47, page 1071
    - BABBITT, B. P. ET AL., NATURE, (1985), vol. 317, page 359
    - TOWNSEND, A.; BODMER, H., ANNU. REV. IMMUNOL., (1989), vol. 7, page 601
    - GERMAIN, R. N., ANNU. REV. IMMUNOL., (1993), vol. 11, page 403
    - SOUTHWOOD ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1998), vol. 160, page 3363
    - RAMMENSEE, IMMUNOGENETICS, (1995), vol. 41, page 178
    - RAMMENSEE ET AL., SYFPEITHI, URL: syfpeithi.bmi-heidelberg.com
    - SETTE, A.; SIDNEY, J., CUN: OPIN. IMMUNOL., (1998), vol. 10, page 478
    - ENGELHARD, V. H., CURR. OPIN. IMMUNOL., (1994), vol. 6, page 13
    - SETTE, A.; GREY, H. M., CUN: OPIN. IMMUNOL., (1992), vol. 4, page 79
    - SINIGAGLIA, F.; HAMMER, J., CURR. BIOL., (1994), vol. 6, page 52
    - RUPPERT, CELL, (1993), vol. 74, pages 929 - 937
    - KONDO ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1995), vol. 155, pages 4307 - 4312
    - SIDNEY ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1996), vol. 157, pages 3480 - 3490
    - SIDNEY ET AL., HUMAN IMMUNOL., (1996), vol. 45, pages 79 - 93
    - SETTE, A.; SIDNEY, J. IMMUNOGENETICS, (199911), vol. 50, no. 3-4, pages 201 - 12
    - MADDEN, D.R., ANNU. REV. LMMUNOL., (1995), vol. 13, page 587
    - SMITH ET AL., LMMUNITY, (1996), vol. 4, page 203
    - FREMONT ET AL., LMMUNITY, (1998), vol. 8, page 305
    - STEM ET AL., STRUCTURE, (1994), vol. 2, page 245
    - JONES, E.Y., CURR. OPIN. IMMUNOL., (1997), vol. 9, page 75
    - BROWN, J. H. ET AL., NATURE, (1993), vol. 364, page 33
    - GUO, H. C., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1993), vol. 90, page 8053
    - GUO, H. C., NATURE, (1992), vol. 360, page 364
    - SILVER, M. L. ET AL., NATURE, (1992), vol. 360, page 367
    - MATSUMURA, M. ET AL., SCIENCE, (1992), vol. 257, page 927
    - MADDEN ET AL., CELL, (1992), vol. 70, page 1035
    - FREMONT, D. H. ET AL., SCIENCE, (1992), vol. 257, page 919
    - SAPER, M. A.; BJORKMAN, P. J.; WILEY, D. C., J. MOL. BIOL., (1991), vol. 219, page 277
    - WENTWORTH, P. A. ET AL., MOL IMMUNOL., (1995), vol. 32, page 603
    - CELLS, E., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1994), vol. 91, page 2105
    - TSAI, V. ET AL., J. IMMUNOL, (1997), vol. 158, page 1796
    - KAWASHIMA, I. ET AL., HUMAN IMMUNOL., (1998), vol. 59, page 1
    - WENTWORTH, P. A. ET AL., J. /MMUNO/., (1996), vol. 26, page 97
    - WENTWORTH, P. A. ET AL., LNT IMMUNOL., (1996), vol. 8, page 651
    - ALEXANDER, J., J. IMMUNOL., (1997), vol. 159, page 4753
    - REHERMANN, B. ET AL., J. EXP. MED., (1995), vol. 181, page 1047
    - DOOLAN, D. L. ET AL., IMMUNITY, (1997), vol. 7, page 97
    - BERTONI, R. ET AL., J. CLIN. INVEST., (1997), vol. 100, page 503
    - THRELKELD, S. C. ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1997), vol. 159, page 1648
    - DIEPOLDER, H. M. ET AL., J. VIRAL., (1997), vol. 71, page 6011
    - LI ET AL., CELL, (1992), vol. 69, page 915
    - BRADLEY, Teratocarcinomas and Embryonic Stem Cells: A Practical Approach, IRL, (1987), pages 113 - 152
    - ALERS ET AL., LAB INVEST., (1997), vol. 77, no. 5, pages 437 - 438
    - ISAACS, CANCER SURV., (1995), vol. 23, pages 19 - 32
    - GREVER ET AL., J. COMP. NEUROL., (19961209), vol. 376, no. 2, pages 306 - 14
    - MURPHY ET AL., PROSTATE, (2000), vol. 42, no. 4, pages 315 - 317
    - SU ET AL., SEMIN. SURG. ONCOL., (2000), vol. 18, no. 1, pages 17 - 28
    - FREEMAN ET AL., J UROL, (19950815), vol. 4, pages 474 - 8
    - ESTELLER ET AL., CANCER RES, (2001), vol. 61, pages 3225 - 3229
    - THOMAS, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1980), vol. 77, pages 5201 - 5205
    - BOCKING ET AL., ANAL. QUANT. CYTOL., (1984), vol. 6, no. 2, pages 74 - 88
    - EPSTEIN, HUM. PATHOL., (1995), vol. 26, no. 2, pages 223 - 9
    - THORSON ET AL., MOD. PATHOL., (1998), vol. 11, no. 6, pages 543 - 51
    - BAISDEN ET AL., AM. J. SURG. PATHOL., (1999), vol. 23, no. 8, pages 918 - 24
    - AMARA ET AL., CANCER RES, (2001), vol. 61, pages 4660 - 4665
    - KONETY ET AL., CLIN CANCER RES, (2000), vol. 6, no. 7, pages 2618 - 2625
    - MARCOTTE ET AL., NATURE, (19991104), vol. 402, pages 83 - 86
    - HAMILTON BJ ET AL., BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS. RES. COMMUN., (1999), vol. 261, pages 646 - 51
    - HODGE ET AL., INT J. CANCER, (1995), vol. 63, pages 231 - 237
    - FONG ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1997), vol. 159, pages 3113 - 3117
    - HERYLN ET AL., ANN MED, (19990303), pages 66 - 78
    - MARUYAMA ET AL., CANCER IMMUNOL IMMUNOTHER, (20000604), vol. 9, no. 3, pages 123 - 32
    - VITIELLO, A. ET AL., J. CLIN. INVEST., (1995), vol. 95, no. 341
    - ELDRIDGE ET AL., MOLEC. IMMUNOL., (1991), vol. 28, pages 287 - 294
    - ALONSO ET AL., VACCINE, (1994), vol. 12, pages 299 - 306
    - JONES ET AL., VACCINE, (1995), vol. 13, pages 675 - 681
    - TAKAHASHI ET AL., NATURE, (1990), vol. 344, pages 873 - 875
    - HU ET AL., CLIN EXP IMMUNOL, (1998), vol. 113, pages 235 - 243
    - TAM, J. P., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., (1988), vol. 85, pages 5409 - 5413
    - TAM, J.P, J. IMMUNOL. METHODS, (1996), vol. 198, pages 17 - 32
    - PERKUS, M. E., Concepts in vaccine development, KAUFMANN, S. H. E., (1996), page 379
    - CHAKRABARTI, S. ET AL., NATURE, (1986), vol. 320, page 535
    - HU, S. L. ET AL., NATURE, (1986), vol. 320, page 537
    - KIENY, M.-P. ET AL., AIDS BIO/TECHNOLOGY, (1986), vol. 4, page 790
    - TOP, F. H., J. INFECT. DIS., (1971), vol. 124, page 148
    - CHANDA, P. K. ET AL., VIROLOGY, (1990), vol. 175, page 535
    - KOFLER, N. ET AL., J. IMMUNOL. METHODS., (1996), vol. 192, page 25
    - ELDRIDGE, J. H. ET AL., SEM. HEMATOL., (1993), vol. 30, page 16
    - FALO, L D., JR. ET AL., NATURE MED., (1995), vol. 7, page 649
    - WARREN, H. S.; VOGEL, F. R.; CHEDID, L. A., ANNU. REV. IMMUNOL, (1986), vol. 4, page 369
    - GUPTA, R. K. ET AL., VACCINE, (1993), vol. 11, page 293
    - REDDY, R ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1992), vol. 148, page 1585
    - ROCK, K. L, IMMUNOL. TODAY, (1996), vol. 17, page 131
    - ULMER, J. B. ET AL., SCIENCE, (1993), vol. 259, page 1745
    - ROBINSON, H. L.; HUNT, L A.; WEBSTER, R. G., VACCINE, (1993), vol. 11, page 957
    - SHIVER, J. W. ET AL., Concepts in vaccine development, KAUFMANN, S. H. E., (1996), page 423
    - CEASE, K B.; BERZOFSKY, J. A., ANNU. REV. LMMUNOL, (1994), vol. 12, page 923
    - ALEXANDER ET AL., J. LMMUNOL., (2000), vol. 164, no. 3, pages 1625 - 1633
    - ALEXANDER ET AL., IMMUNITY, (1994), vol. 1, no. 9, pages 751 - 761
    - WOLFF, SCIENCE, (1990), vol. 247, page 1465
    - RESTIFO., CURR. OPIN. IMMUNOL., (1996), vol. 8, pages 658 - 663
    - TSANG ET AL., J. NAT. CANCER INST., (1995), vol. 87, pages 982 - 990
    - STOVER ET AL., NATURE, (1991), vol. 351, pages 456 - 460
    - NISHIYAMA ET AL., CLIN CANCER RES, (2001), vol. 7, no. 1, pages 23 - 31
    - ARTHUR ET AL., CANCER GENE THER., (1997), vol. 4, pages 17 - 25
    - HENDERSON ET AL., CANCER RES., (1996), vol. 56, pages 3763 - 3770
    - RIBAS ET AL., CANCER RES., (1997), vol. 57, pages 2865 - 2869
    - ASHLEY, J. EXP. MED., (1997), vol. 186, pages 1177 - 1182
    - SLEVERS ET AL., BLOOD, (19990601), vol. 93, page 3684
    - ARLEN ET AL., CRIT. REV. IMMUNOL., (1998), vol. 18, pages 133 - 138
    - OZAKI ET AL., BLOOD, (1997), vol. 90, pages 3179 - 3186
    - TSUNENARI ET AL., BLOOD, (1997), vol. 90, pages 2437 - 2444
    - KASPRZYK ET AL., CANCER RES., (1992), vol. 52, pages 2771 - 2776
    - FUNAKOSHI ET AL., J. IMMUNOTHER. EMPHASIS TUMOR IMMUNOL., (1996), vol. 19, pages 93 - 101
    - ZHONG, LEUK. RES., (1996), vol. 20, pages 581 - 589
    - MOUN ET AL., CANCER RES., (1994), vol. 54, pages 6160 - 6166
    - VELDERS ET AL., CANCER RES., (1995), vol. 55, pages 4398 - 4403
    - SHEPARD ET AL., J. CLIN. IMMUNOL., (1991), vol. 11, pages 117 - 127
    - WAGNER ET AL., HYBRIDOMA, (1997), vol. 16, pages 33 - 40
    - FOON ET AL., J. OIN. INVEST., (1995), vol. 96, pages 334 - 342
    - HERLYM, CANCER IMMUNOL. IMMUNOTHER., (1996), vol. 43, pages 65 - 76
    - DAVILA; CELIS, J. IMMUNOL., (2000), vol. 165, pages 539 - 547
    - ROSENBERG ET AL., SCIENCE, vol. 278, pages 1447 - 1450
    - ISHIOKA ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1999), vol. 162, pages 3915 - 3925
    - AN, L; WHITTON, J. L., J. VM, (1997), vol. 71, page 2292
    - THOMSON, S. A. ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1996), vol. 157, page 822
    - WHITTON; J. L ET AL., J. VIROL., (1993), vol. 67, page 348
    - HANKE, R. ET AL., VACCINE, (1998), vol. 16, page 426
    - MANNINO; GOULD-FOGERITE, BIOTECHNIQUES, (1988), vol. 6, no. 7, page 682
    - FEIGNER ET AL., PROC. NAT'L ACAD. SCI. USA, (1987), vol. 84, page 7413
    - DERES, NATURE, (1989), vol. 342, page 561
    - SZOKA ET AL., ANN. REV.,BIOPHYS. BIOENG., (1980), vol. 9, page 467
    - FRADET, CAN J UROL, (1997), vol. 4, no. 3, pages 400 - 405
    - TULCHLNSKY ET AL., INT MOL MED, (199907), vol. 4, no. 1, pages 99 - 102
    - MINIMOTO ET AL., CANCER DETECT PREV, (2000), vol. 24, no. 1, pages 1 - 12
    - SHARIEF ET AL., BIOCHEM. MOL. BIOL. INT., (1994), vol. 33, no. 3, pages 567 - 74
    - OKEGAWA ET AL., J. UROL., (2000), vol. 163, no. 4, pages 1189 - 1190
    - STEPHAN ET AL., UROLOGY, (2000), vol. 55, no. 4, pages 560 - 3
    - ALANEN ET AL., PATHOL. RES. PRACT., (1996), vol. 192, no. 3, pages 233 - 7
    - FRADET ET AL., CAN J UROL, (1997), vol. 4, no. 3, pages 400 - 405
    - CAETANO-ANOLLES, G., BIOTECHNIQUES, (1998), vol. 25, no. 3, pages 472 - 476,478-480
    - ROBERTSON ET AL., METHODS MOL. BIOL., (1998), vol. 98, pages 121 - 154
    - SAWAI ET AL., FETAL DIAGN, THER., (199611), vol. 11, no. 6, pages 407 - 13
    - FREDERICK M. AUSUBEL ET AL., Current Protocols In Molecular Biology, (1995), vol. 2
    - RICHARDSON; MARASCO, TIBTECH, (1995), vol. 13
    - RICHARDSON ET AL., PROC. NAFL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1995), vol. 92, pages 3137 - 3141
    - BEERLI ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1994), vol. 289, pages 23931 - 23936
    - DESHANE ET AL., GENE THER., (1994), vol. 1, pages 332 - 337
    - LIN ET AL., PNAS, USA, (1995), vol. 92, no. 3, pages 679 - 683
    - SHIBAYAMA ET AL., J UROL., (1991), vol. 146, no. 4, pages 1136 - 7
    - BEECKEN ET AL., UROLOGY, (2000), vol. 56, no. 3, pages 521 - 526
    - DAVIS, GF, J BIOL SCREEN, (2002), vol. 7, page 69
    - ZLOKARNIK, SCIENCE, (1998), vol. 279, pages 84 - 8
    - HEID, GENOME RES, (1996), vol. 6, pages 986 - 94
    - TEMIN, J. NATL. CANCER INST., (1966), vol. 37, pages 167 - 175
    - EAGLE ET AL., J. EXP. MED, (1970), vol. 131, pages 836 - 879
    - TUMOR GROWTH, Biological Responses in Cancer, (1985), pages 178 - 184
    - UNKLESS ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1974), vol. 249, pages 4295 - 4305
    - STRICKLAND; BEERS, J. BIOL. CHEM., (1976), vol. 251, pages 5694 - 5702
    - WHUR ET AL., BR. J. CANCER, (1980), vol. 42, page 305 312
    - "Angiogenesis, Tumor Vascularization, and Potential Interference with Tumor Growth", GULLINO, Biological Responses in Cancer, (1985), pages 178 - 184
    - FRESHNEY, ANTICANCER RES., (1985), vol. 5, pages 111 - 130
    - CAPECCHI ET AL., SCIENCE, (1989), vol. 244, page 1288
    - GIOVANELLA ET AL., J. NAFL. CANCER INST, (1974), vol. 52, page 921
    - BRADLEY ET AL., BR. J. CANCER, (1978), vol. 38, page 263
    - SELBY ET AL., BR. J. CANCER, (1980), vol. 41, page 52
    - GONZALEZ, J.; NEGULESCU, P., CURR. OPIN. BLOTECHNOL., (1998), vol. 9, page 624
    - STELN; COHEN, CANCER RES., (1988), vol. 48, page 2659
    - VAN DER KROL ET AL., BIOTECHNIQUES, (1988), vol. 6, page 958
    - CASTANOTTO ET AL., ADV. IN PHARMACOLOGY, (1994), vol. 25, pages 289 - 317
    - HAMPEL ET AL., NUCL. ACIDS RES., (1990), vol. 18, pages 299 - 304
    - OJWANG ET AL., PROC. NAFL. ACAD. SCL. USA, (1993), vol. 90, pages 6340 - 6344
    - YAMADA ET AL., HUMAN GENE THERAPY, (1994), vol. 1, pages 39 - 45
    - LEAVITT ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD SD. USA, (1995), vol. 92, pages 699 - 703
    - LEAVITT ET AL., HUMAN GENE THERAPY, (1994), vol. 5, pages 1151 - 120
    - YAMADA ET AL., VIROLOGY, (1994), vol. 205, pages 121 - 126
    - SONG, E. ET AL., "RNA interference targeting Fas protects mice from fulminant hepatitis", NAT. MED., (2003), vol. 9, no. 3, pages 347 - 51
    - WALTER ET AL., NATURE GENETICS, (1994), vol. 7, page 22
    - PRAT ET AL., UROLOGY, (200105), vol. 57, no. 5, pages 986 - 92
    - MUSCHECK ET AL., CARCINOGENESIS, (200009), vol. 21, no. 9, pages 1721 - 26
    - TOMOVSKA ET AL., INT J ONCOL, (200106), vol. 18, no. 6, pages 1239 - 44
    - HOPP T.P.; WOODS K.R., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., (1981), vol. 78, pages 3824 - 3828
    - KYTE J.; DOOLITTLE R.F., J. MOL. BIOL., (1982), vol. 157, pages 105 - 132
    - BHASKARAN R.; PONNUSWAMY P.K., INT. J. PEPT. PROTEIN RES., (1988), vol. 32, pages 242 - 255
    - "Production of 158P1D7 in Prokaryotic Systems", FREDERICK M. AUSUBUL ET AL., Current Protocols In Molecular Biology, (1995), vol. 2
    - LINSLEY, P.S.; BRADY, W.; URNES, M.; GROSMAIRE, L.; DAMLE, N.; LEDBETTER, L., J.EXP. MED., (1991), vol. 174, pages 561 - 566
    - WELFORD K., OPT QUANT. ELECT., (1991), vol. 23, page 1
    - MORTON; MYSZKA, METHODS IN ENZYMOLOGY, (1998), vol. 295, page 268
    - SIDNEY ET AL., CURRENT PROTOCOLS IN IMMUNOLOGY, (1998), vol. 18.3.1
    - SIDNEY ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1995), vol. 154, page 247
    - SETTE ET AL., MOL. IMMUNOL., (1994), vol. 31, page 813
    - GULUKOTA ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1997), vol. 267, pages 1258 - 126
    - SOUTHWOOD ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1998), vol. 160, pages 3363 - 3373
    - PARKHURST ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1996), vol. 157, page 2539
    - POGUE ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1995), vol. 92, page 8166
    - SOUTHWOOD ET AL., J. IMMUNOL, (1998), vol. 160, pages 3363 - 3373
    - GELUK ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1994), vol. 152, pages 5742 - 5748
    - SIDNEY ET AL., HUMAN IMMUNOL, (1996), vol. 45, pages 79 - 93
    - BERTONI ET AL., J. CLIN. INVEST, (1997), vol. 100, page 503
    - DOOLAN ET AL., IMMUNITY, (1997), vol. 7, page 97
    - THRELKELD ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1997), vol. 159, page 1648
    - ALEXANDER ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1997), vol. 159, pages 4753 - 4761
    - VITIELLO ET AL., J. EXP. MED., (1991), vol. 173, page 1007
    - SIJTS ET AL., J. LMMUNOL, (1996), vol. 156, pages 683 - 692
    - DEMOTZ ET AL., NATURE, (1989), vol. 342, pages 682 - 684
    - KAGEYAMA ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1995), vol. 154, pages 567 - 576
    - ALEXANDER ET AL., IMMUNITY, (1994), vol. 1, pages 751 - 761
    - BARNETT ET AL., AIDS RES. AND HUMAN RETROVIRUSES, (1998), vol. 14, no. 3, pages S299 - S309
    - HANKE ET AL., VACCINE, (1998), vol. 16, pages 439 - 445
    - SEDEGAH ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI USA, (1998), vol. 95, pages 7648 - 53
    - HANKE; MCMICHAEL, IMMUNOL. LETTERS, (1999), vol. 66, pages 177 - 181
    - ROBINSON, NATURE MED., (1999), vol. 5, pages 526 - 34
    - OGG, SCIENCE, (1998), vol. 279, pages 2103 - 2106
    - MUSEY ET AL., N. ENGL. J. MED., (1997), vol. 337, page 1267
    - REHERMANN ET AL., NATURE MED., (1996), vol. 2, page 1104,1108
    - REHERMANN ET AL., J. CLIN. INVEST., (1996), vol. 97, pages 1655 - 1665
    - REHERMANN ET AL., J. CLIN. INVEST., (1996), vol. 98, pages 1432 - 1440
    - GUILHOT ET AL., J. VIROL., (1992), vol. 66, pages 2670 - 2678
    - NATURE MED., (1998), vol. 4, page 328
    - NATURE MED., (1996), vol. 2, page 52
    - PROSTATE, (1997), vol. 32, page 272
    - KUBO ET AL., J. LMMUNOL., (1994), vol. 152, page 3913
    - FU, X ET AL., LNT. J. CANCER, (1991), vol. 49, pages 938 - 939
    - CHANG, S. ET AL., ANTICANCER RES., (1997), vol. 17, pages 3239 - 3242
    - PERALTA, E. A. ET AL., J. UROL., (1999), vol. 162, pages 1806 - 1811
    - SAFFRAN, D. ET AL., PNAS, vol. 10, pages 1073 - 1078, URL: pnas.org/cgi/doi/10.1073/pnas.051624698
    - SAFFRAN, D.C. ET AL., CANCER AND METASTASIS REVIEWS, (1999), vol. 18, pages 437 - 449
    - HUBERT, R.S. ET AL., "STEAP: a prostate-specific cell-surface antigen highly expressed in human prostate tumors", PROC NATL ACAD SD U S A, (1999), vol. 96, no. 25, pages 14523 - 8
    - SAFFRAN, D. ET AL., PNAS, vol. 10, pages 1073 - 1078
    - FU, X. ET AL., INT. J. CANCER, (1991), vol. 49, pages 938 - 939
    - FU, X ET AL., INT J. CANCER, (1991), vol. 49, pages 938 - 939
    - CHANG, S., ANTICANCER RES., (1997), vol. 17, pages 3239 - 3242
    - 0'BRIAN ET AL., UROLOGY, (2001), vol. 58, page 1
    - WANG J ET AL., ONCOGENE, (2001), vol. 20, page 3857
    - HELLE S ET AL., BR J CANCER., (2001), vol. 85, page 74
    - BABAJKO S ET AL., MED PEDIATR ONCOL., (2001), vol. 36, page 154
    - SCALIA P ET AL., J CELL BIOCHEM., (2001), vol. 82, page 610
    - ZESLAWSKL W ET AL., EMBO J., (2001), vol. 20, page 3638
    - JONES JI.; CLEMMONS DR., ENDOCR. REV., (1995), vol. 16, page 3
    - UEKI I ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI U S A, (2000), vol. 97, page 6868
    - RAJAGOPALAN S ET AL., CELL, (2000), vol. 103, page 1033
    - CHEN J, J NEUROSD., (2001), vol. 21, page 1548
    - WU J, NATURE, (2001), vol. 410, page 948
    - BROSE K; TESSIER M, CURR OPIN NEUROBIOL., (2001), vol. 10, page 95
    - LITTLE MH ET AL., AM J PHYSIOL CELL PHYSIOL., (2001), vol. 281, page C486
    - LACY SE, GENOMICS, (1999), vol. 62, page 417
    - BOTTCHER RT ET AL., NATURE CELL BIOL, (2004), vol. 6, page 38
    - J NEUROCHEM., (2001), vol. 76, pages 217 - 223
    - CELL GROWTH DIFFER., (2000), vol. 11, page 279
    - J BIOL CHEM., (1999), vol. 274, page 801
    - ONCOGENE, (2000), vol. 19, page 3003
    - J. CELL BIOL., (1997), vol. 138, page 913
    - FRASER SP; GRIMES JA; DJAMGOZ MB, PROSTATE, (2000), vol. 44, page 61
    - JOHNSON DE; OCHIENG J; EVANS SL, ANTICANCER DRUGS, (1996), vol. 7, page 288
    - SONG Z., CANCER RES., (2000), vol. 60, page 6730
    - CANCER RES., (1999), vol. 59, page 6010
    - ABDEL-MALEK ZA, J CELL PHYSIOL., (1988), vol. 136, page 247
    - HANAHAN D; FOLKMAN J., CELL, (1996), vol. 86, page 353
    - FOLKMAN J., ENDOCRINOLOGY., (1998), vol. 139, page 441
    - SMID-KOOPMAN E ET AL., BR J CANCER., (2000), vol. 83, page 246
    - CHEN K ET AL., THYROID., (2001), vol. 11, page 41
    - STORRIE B ET AL., METHODS ENZYMOL., (1990), vol. 182, pages 203 - 25
    - PEMBERTON, P.A. ET AL., J OF HISTOCHEMISTRY AND CYTOCHEMISTRY, (1997), vol. 45, pages 1697 - 1706
    - VALETTI C. ET AL., MOL BIOL CELL, (1999), vol. 10, page 4107
    - HUBER L ET AL., MOL. CELL. BIOL., (1995), vol. 15, page 918
    - ZESLAWSKI W ET AL., EMBO J., (2001), vol. 20, page 3638
    - YU H; ROHAN T, J NATL CANCER INST., (2000), vol. 92, page 1472
    - CURR OPIN CHEM BIOL., (1999), vol. 3, page 64
    - A. SALAMOV; V. SOLOVYEV, "Ab initio gene finding in Drosophila genomic DNA", GENOME RESEARCH., (200004), vol. 10, no. 4, pages 516 - 22
    - SOUTHAN, C., "A genomic perspective on human proteases", FEBS LETT., (20010608), vol. 498, no. 2-3, pages 214 - 8
    - DE SOUZA, S.J. ET AL., "identification of human chromosome 22 transcribed sequences with ORF expressed sequence tags", PROC. NATL ACAD SCI U S A., (20001107), vol. 97, no. 23, pages 12690 - 3
    - BRENNAN, S.O. ET AL., "Albumin banks peninsula: a new termination variant characterized by electrospray mass spectrometry", BIOCHEM BIOPHYS ACTA, (19990817), vol. 1433, no. 1-2, pages 321 - 6
    - FERRANTI P ET AL., "Differential splicing of pre-messenger RNA produces multiple forms of mature caprine alpha(sl)-casein", EURJ BIOCHEM., (19971001), vol. 249, no. 1, pages 1 - 7
    - WELLMANN S ET AL., "Specific reverse transcription-PCR quantification of vascular endothelial growth factor (VEGF) splice variants by LightCycler technology", CLIN CHEM., (200104), vol. 47, no. 4, pages 654 - 60
    - JIA, H.P. ET AL., "Discovery of new human beta-defensins using a genomics-based approach", GENE, (20010124), vol. 263, no. 1-2, pages 211 - 8
    - BRIGLE, K.E. ET AL., "Organization of the murine reduced folate carrier gene and identification of variant splice forms", BIOCHEM BLOPHYS ACTA, (19970807), vol. 1353, no. 2, pages 191 - 8
    - P. NOWOTNY, J. M. KWON; A. M. GOATE, "SNP analysis to dissect human traits", CURR. OPIN. NEUROBIOL., (20011011), no. 5, pages 637 - 641
    - M. PIRMOHAMED; B. K. PARK, "Genetic susceptibility to adverse drug reactions", TRENDS PHARMACOL. SD., (200106), vol. 22, no. 6, pages 298 - 305
    - J. H. RILEY; C. J. ALLAN; E. LAI; A. ROSES, "The use of single nucleotide polymorphisms in the isolation of common disease genes", PHARMACOGENOMICS, (200002), vol. 1, no. 1, pages 39 - 47
    - R. JUDSON; J. C. STEPHENS; A. WLNDEMUTH, "The predictive power of haplotypes in clinical response", PHARMACOGENOMICS, (200002), vol. 1, no. 1, pages 15 - 26
    - P. BEAN, "The promising voyage of SNP target discovery", AM. CLIN. LAB., (200110), vol. 20, no. 9, pages 18 - 20
    - K. M. WEISS, "In search of human variation", GENOME RES., (199807), vol. 8, no. 7, pages 691 - 697
    - M. M. SHE, "Enabling large-scale pharmacogenetic studies by high-throughput mutation detection and genotyping technologies", CLIN. CHEM., (200102), vol. 47, no. 2, pages 164 - 172
    - Z. GU; L. HILLIER; P. Y. KWOK, "Single nudeotide polymorphism hunting in cyberspace", HUM. MUTAT, (1998), vol. 12, no. 4, pages 221 - 225
    - P. Y. KWOK, "Methods for genotyping single nudeotide polymorphisms", ANNU. REV. GENOMICS HUM. GENET., (2001), vol. 2, pages 235 - 258
    - M. KOKORIS; K. DIX; K. MOYNIHAN; J. MATHIS; B. ERWIN; P. GRASS; B. HINES; A. DUESTERHOEFT, "High-throughput SNP genotyping with the Masscode system", MOL. DIAGN., (200012), vol. 5, no. 4, pages 329 - 340
    - POTAMIANOS S., ANTICANCER RES, (2000), vol. 20, no. 2A, pages 925 - 948
    - MEERSON, N. R., HEPATOLOGY, (1998), vol. 27, pages 563 - 568
    - DIVGI ET AL., J. NATL. CANCER INST., (1991), vol. 83, pages 97 - 104
    - DIVGI ET AL., J. NATL. CANCER LNST., (1991), vol. 83, pages 97 - 104
    - ELBASHIR S.M. ET AL., "Duplexes of 21-nudeotide RNAs Mediate RNA interference in Cultured Mammalian Cells", NATURE, (2001), vol. 411, no. 6836, pages 494 - 8
 WO1997US01019