Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP2343315

Designated contracting statesAT 
BE 
BG 
CH 
CY 
CZ 
DE 
DK 
EE 
ES 
FI 
FR 
GB 
GR 
HU 
IE 
IT 
LI 
LU 
MC 
NL 
PT 
RO 
SE 
SI 
SK 
TR 
Examination procedure29.06.2012Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2012/46]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
13.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
13.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
13.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
13.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
13.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 08
24.02.2012Renewal fee patent year 09
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:13.07.2011 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20101025
 
Event date:13.07.2011 
Event description:DIVISIONAL APPLICATION: REFERENCE TO EARLIER APPLICATION
Ref Document Number:1594892
Country of Ref Document:EP
Kind Code of Ref Document:P
 
Event date:13.07.2011 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A2
Designated State(s):AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR
 
Event date:16.11.2011 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:C07K 14/47 20060101AFI20111012BHEP
 
Event date:16.11.2011 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:C12N 15/12 20060101ALI20111012BHEP
 
Event date:16.11.2011 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:C12Q 1/68 20060101ALI20111012BHEP
 
Event date:16.11.2011 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:A61K 38/17 20060101ALI20111012BHEP
 
Event date:16.11.2011 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:C07K 16/18 20060101ALI20111012BHEP
 
Event date:16.11.2011 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:A01K 67/027 20060101ALI20111012BHEP
 
Event date:16.11.2011 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:A61K 39/00 20060101ALI20111012BHEP
 
Event date:16.11.2011 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:C12N 15/11 20060101ALI20111012BHEP
 
Event date:23.11.2011 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A3
Designated State(s):AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR
 
Event date:14.11.2012 
Event description:APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN
Effective DATE:20120524