Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2209196

EP2209196 - Protection circuit for an isolated switch-mode power supply [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2010/29]Protection circuit
[2013/48]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.01.2015
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.06.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 25.07.2018  [2018/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Vestel Elektronik Sanayi ve Ticaret A.S.
Organize Sanayi Bölgesi
45030 Manisa / TR
[2010/29]
Inventor(s)01 / Çesmeci, Mete
Vestel Elektronik Sanayi ve Ticaret A.S.
Organize Sanayi Bölgesi
45030 Manisa / TR
 [2013/49]
Former [2010/29]01 / ÇESMECI, Mete
Vestel Elektronik Sanayi ve Ticaret A.S. Organize Sanayi Bölgesi
45030 Manisa / TR
Representative(s)Cayli, Hülya
Paragon Consultancy Inc. Koza Sokak No: 63/2 GOP
06540 Ankara / TR
[2014/12]
Former [2010/29]Cayli, Hülya
Paragon Consultancy Inc. Koza Sokak No: 63/2 GOP
06540 Ankara / TR
Application number, filing date10150134.405.01.2010
[2010/29]
Priority number, dateTR2009000034816.01.2009         Original published format: TR 200900348
[2010/29]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2209196
Date:21.07.2010
Language:EN
[2010/29]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2209196
Date:19.03.2014
Language:EN
[2014/12]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.04.2010
ClassificationInternational:H02M3/335, H02M1/32
[2010/29]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2010/29]
TitleGerman:Schutzschaltung für ein isoliertes Schaltnetzteil[2013/48]
English:Protection circuit for an isolated switch-mode power supply[2013/48]
French:Circuit de protection pour une alimentation à découpage isolée[2013/48]
Former [2010/29]Schutzschaltung
Former [2010/29]Protection circuit
Former [2010/29]Circuit de protection
Examination procedure18.01.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.01.2011Examination requested  [2011/09]
27.11.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.03.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.04.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.07.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.11.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.02.2014Fee for grant paid
07.02.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  27.11.2012
Opposition(s)22.12.2014No opposition filed within time limit [2015/09]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.12.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
13.12.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
13.12.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU05.01.2010
AT19.03.2014
BE19.03.2014
CY19.03.2014
CZ19.03.2014
DK19.03.2014
EE19.03.2014
FI19.03.2014
HR19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
LV19.03.2014
MC19.03.2014
MK19.03.2014
MT19.03.2014
NL19.03.2014
PL19.03.2014
RO19.03.2014
SE19.03.2014
SI19.03.2014
SK19.03.2014
SM19.03.2014
BG19.06.2014
NO19.06.2014
GR20.06.2014
IS19.07.2014
PT21.07.2014
[2018/30]
Former [2017/39]HU05.01.2010
AT19.03.2014
BE19.03.2014
CY19.03.2014
CZ19.03.2014
DK19.03.2014
EE19.03.2014
FI19.03.2014
HR19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
LV19.03.2014
MC19.03.2014
MT19.03.2014
NL19.03.2014
PL19.03.2014
RO19.03.2014
SE19.03.2014
SI19.03.2014
SK19.03.2014
SM19.03.2014
BG19.06.2014
NO19.06.2014
GR20.06.2014
IS19.07.2014
PT21.07.2014
Former [2017/03]AT19.03.2014
BE19.03.2014
CY19.03.2014
CZ19.03.2014
DK19.03.2014
EE19.03.2014
FI19.03.2014
HR19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
LV19.03.2014
MC19.03.2014
MT19.03.2014
NL19.03.2014
PL19.03.2014
RO19.03.2014
SE19.03.2014
SI19.03.2014
SK19.03.2014
BG19.06.2014
NO19.06.2014
GR20.06.2014
IS19.07.2014
PT21.07.2014
Former [2016/28]AT19.03.2014
BE19.03.2014
CY19.03.2014
CZ19.03.2014
DK19.03.2014
EE19.03.2014
FI19.03.2014
HR19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
LV19.03.2014
MC19.03.2014
NL19.03.2014
PL19.03.2014
RO19.03.2014
SE19.03.2014
SI19.03.2014
SK19.03.2014
BG19.06.2014
NO19.06.2014
GR20.06.2014
IS19.07.2014
PT21.07.2014
Former [2015/43]AT19.03.2014
BE19.03.2014
CY19.03.2014
CZ19.03.2014
DK19.03.2014
EE19.03.2014
FI19.03.2014
HR19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
LV19.03.2014
MC19.03.2014
NL19.03.2014
PL19.03.2014
RO19.03.2014
SE19.03.2014
SI19.03.2014
SK19.03.2014
BG19.06.2014
NO19.06.2014
IS19.07.2014
PT21.07.2014
Former [2015/36]AT19.03.2014
BE19.03.2014
CY19.03.2014
CZ19.03.2014
DK19.03.2014
EE19.03.2014
FI19.03.2014
HR19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
LV19.03.2014
NL19.03.2014
PL19.03.2014
RO19.03.2014
SE19.03.2014
SI19.03.2014
SK19.03.2014
BG19.06.2014
NO19.06.2014
IS19.07.2014
PT21.07.2014
Former [2015/08]AT19.03.2014
BE19.03.2014
CY19.03.2014
CZ19.03.2014
DK19.03.2014
EE19.03.2014
FI19.03.2014
HR19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
LV19.03.2014
NL19.03.2014
PL19.03.2014
RO19.03.2014
SE19.03.2014
SK19.03.2014
BG19.06.2014
NO19.06.2014
IS19.07.2014
PT21.07.2014
Former [2015/02]AT19.03.2014
BE19.03.2014
CY19.03.2014
CZ19.03.2014
EE19.03.2014
FI19.03.2014
HR19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
LV19.03.2014
NL19.03.2014
PL19.03.2014
RO19.03.2014
SE19.03.2014
SK19.03.2014
BG19.06.2014
NO19.06.2014
IS19.07.2014
PT21.07.2014
Former [2014/51]AT19.03.2014
BE19.03.2014
CY19.03.2014
CZ19.03.2014
EE19.03.2014
FI19.03.2014
HR19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
LV19.03.2014
NL19.03.2014
PL19.03.2014
RO19.03.2014
SE19.03.2014
SK19.03.2014
BG19.06.2014
NO19.06.2014
IS19.07.2014
Former [2014/50]BE19.03.2014
CY19.03.2014
CZ19.03.2014
EE19.03.2014
FI19.03.2014
HR19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
LV19.03.2014
NL19.03.2014
PL19.03.2014
RO19.03.2014
SE19.03.2014
SK19.03.2014
BG19.06.2014
NO19.06.2014
IS19.07.2014
Former [2014/49]BE19.03.2014
CY19.03.2014
CZ19.03.2014
EE19.03.2014
FI19.03.2014
HR19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
LV19.03.2014
RO19.03.2014
SE19.03.2014
BG19.06.2014
NO19.06.2014
IS19.07.2014
Former [2014/48]BE19.03.2014
CY19.03.2014
CZ19.03.2014
EE19.03.2014
FI19.03.2014
HR19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
LV19.03.2014
SE19.03.2014
BG19.06.2014
NO19.06.2014
Former [2014/46]BE19.03.2014
CY19.03.2014
FI19.03.2014
HR19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
LV19.03.2014
SE19.03.2014
NO19.06.2014
Former [2014/41]CY19.03.2014
FI19.03.2014
HR19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
LV19.03.2014
SE19.03.2014
NO19.06.2014
Former [2014/37]CY19.03.2014
FI19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
SE19.03.2014
NO19.06.2014
Former [2014/36]LT19.03.2014
NO19.06.2014
Documents cited:Search[I]EP1331722  (THOMSON LICENSING SA [FR]) [I] 1-9 * paragraphs [0013] - [0025]; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]US2004201937  (YOSHIDA KATSUYUKI [JP]) [A] 1-9 * abstract * * paragraphs [0008] , [0028] - [0041] *;
 [A]US6088244  (SHIOYA MASAKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-9 * figure 3 *;
 [A]US2006028847  (RYU YOUNG-CHUL [KR], et al) [A] 1-9 * figures 2-4 *
by applicantUS2001009517
 US4270164