Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2207076

EP2207076 - Mobile terminal having foldable display and operation method for the same [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  30.08.2019
Database last updated on 24.02.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  20.05.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  18.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip30.08.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 02.10.2019  [2019/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
129, Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 443-742 / KR
[2019/40]
Former [2012/39]For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
129, Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 443-742 / KR
Former [2010/28]For all designated states
SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD.
416 Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si
Gyeonggi-do / KR
Inventor(s)01 / Kim, Jin Yong
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd
416 Maetan-dong
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si
Gyeonggi-do / KR
02 / Oh, Jung Yeob
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd
416 Maetan-dong
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si
Gyeonggi-do / KR
03 / Lee, Myeong Lo
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd
416 Maetan-dong
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si
Gyeonggi-do / KR
04 / Kim, Kyung Hwa
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd
416 Maetan-dong
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si
Gyeonggi-do / KR
 [2019/40]
Former [2010/28]01 / Kim, Jin Yong
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd 416 Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si
Gyeonggi-do / KR
02 / Oh, Jung Yeob
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd 416 Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si
Gyeonggi-do / KR
03 / Lee, Myeong Lo
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd 416 Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si
Gyeonggi-do / KR
04 / Kim, Kyung Hwa
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd 416 Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si
Gyeonggi-do / KR
Representative(s)HGF Limited
Saviour House
9 St. Saviourgate
York YO1 8NQ / GB
[2019/40]
Former [2013/32]Jenkins, Richard Gavin , et al
Harrison Goddard Foote LLP
Saviour House
9 St Saviourgate
York YO1 8NQ / GB
Former [2012/35]Harrison Goddard Foote
Saviour House
9 St. Saviourgate
York
YO1 8NQ / GB
Former [2010/28]Boakes, Jason Carrington
Harrison Goddard Foote 106 Micklegate
York, Yorkshire YO1 6JX / GB
Application number, filing date10150309.208.01.2010
[2010/28]
Priority number, dateKR2009000177109.01.2009         Original published format: KR 20090001771
[2010/28]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2207076
Date:14.07.2010
Language:EN
[2010/28]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2207076
Date:26.03.2014
Language:EN
[2014/13]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2207076
Date:02.10.2019
Language:EN
[2019/40]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.02.2014
ClassificationInternational:G06F1/16
[2010/28]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/40]
Former [2010/28]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Tragbares Endgerät mit zusammenklappbarem Display und Betriebsverfahren für dieses Gerät[2010/28]
English:Mobile terminal having foldable display and operation method for the same[2010/28]
French:Terminal mobile doté d'un écran pliable et son procédé de fonctionnement[2010/28]
Examination procedure26.09.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.09.2014Examination requested  [2014/45]
22.11.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.03.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.07.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.11.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.05.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.08.2019Fee for grant paid
20.08.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
20.08.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  22.11.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.11.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
13.11.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
12.11.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
11.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
31.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 07
09.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 08
13.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 09
23.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 10
Documents cited:Search[XI]JP2004287793  (CANON KK) [X] 1-4,6,9,11,12 * paragraph [0013]; paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0056]; figures 1,3 * [I] 5,7,8,10,13-15;
 [XI]US2007120762  (O'GORMAN ROBERT W [US]) [X] 1,2,9 * the whole document * [I] 3-8,10-15;
 [I]US2006182272  (NURMI MIKKO [FI], et al) [I] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [I]US2008165269  (KIM SOON-HWA [KR], et al) [I] 1-15 * the whole document *