Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2295039

EP2295039 - Method of preparing pancreatin pellets, in particular pancreatin micropellets, and pancreatin pellets prepared thereby [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2011/11]Pancreatin pellets, in particular pancreatin micropellets and method for producing same
[2012/46]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  13.06.2018
Database last updated on 17.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.04.2019New entry: Despatch of communication that patent is revoked 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nordmark Arzneimittel GmbH & Co. KG
Pinnauallee 4
25436 Uetersen / DE
[2013/50]
Former [2011/11]For all designated states
Nordmark Arzneimittel GmbH & Co.KG
Pinnauallee 4
25436 Uetersen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Kurfürst, Manfred, Dr.
Kirchenstrasse 24
D-25436 Moorrege / DE
02 / Moest, Thomas, Dr.
An der Düne 9
D-25436 Moorrege / DE
03 / Doleschal, Walter, Dr.
Eichendorffstrasse 7
D-25436 Uetersen / DE
 [2012/50]
Former [2011/11]01 / Kurfürst, Manfred
Kirchenstrasse 24
D-25436 Moorrege / DE
02 / Moest, Thomas
An der Düne 9
D-25436 Moorrege / DE
03 / Doleschal, Walter
Eichendorffstrasse 7
D-25436 Uetersen / DE
Representative(s)RGTH
Patentanwälte PartGmbB
Neuer Wall 10
20354 Hamburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/50]Richter Werdermann Gerbaulet Hofmann
Patentanwälte
Neuer Wall 10
20354 Hamburg / DE
Former [2011/11]Richter, Werdermann, Gerbaulet & Hofmann
Patentanwälte Neuer Wall 10
20354 Hamburg / DE
Application number, filing date10150491.812.01.2010
[2011/11]
Priority number, dateDE20092011699U28.08.2009         Original published format: DE 202009011699 U
[2011/11]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2295039
Date:16.03.2011
Language:DE
[2011/11]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2295039
Date:11.12.2013
Language:DE
[2013/50]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.07.2010
ClassificationInternational:A61K9/16, A61K9/50, A61K38/46
[2011/11]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2011/11]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung von Pankreatin-Pellets, insbesondere Pankreatin-Mikropellets, und hiernach hergestellte Pankreatin-Pellets[2012/46]
English:Method of preparing pancreatin pellets, in particular pancreatin micropellets, and pancreatin pellets prepared thereby[2012/46]
French:Procédé de préparation de pellets de pancréatine, notamment micro-pellets de pancréatine, et pellets de pancréatine préparées ainsi[2012/46]
Former [2011/11]Pankreatin-Pellets, insbesondere Pankreatin-Mikropellets, und Verfahren zu deren Herstellung
Former [2011/11]Pancreatin pellets, in particular pancreatin micropellets and method for producing same
Former [2011/11]Pellets de pancréatine, notamment micro-pellets de pancréatine et leur procédé de fabrication
Examination procedure08.03.2011Examination requested  [2011/16]
08.09.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
14.11.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.04.2013Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time
25.06.2013Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
11.07.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
31.10.2013Fee for grant paid
31.10.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  14.11.2012
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  10.09.2014  15.09.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Murray, Adrian D'Coligny
Pinsent Masons LLP
30 Crown Place
Earl Street
London EC2A 4ES / GB
Opponent's representative
Sharp, Christopher William
Pinsent Masons LLP
30 Crown Place
Earl Street
London EC2A 4ES / GB
 [2018/02]
Former [2014/42]
Opponent(s)01  10.09.2014   
Murray, Adrian D'Coligny
Pinsent Masons
30 Crown Place
Earl Street
London
EC2A 4ES / GB
16.10.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
22.04.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
11.11.2016Date of oral proceedings
14.06.2018Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
14.06.2018Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition14.08.2018Appeal received No.  T2054/18
24.10.2018Statement of grounds filed
Request for further processing for:25.06.2013Request for further processing filed
25.06.2013Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
05.07.2013Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.01.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
30.01.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU12.01.2010
BG11.12.2013
CY11.12.2013
CZ11.12.2013
DK11.12.2013
EE11.12.2013
ES11.12.2013
FI11.12.2013
HR11.12.2013
LT11.12.2013
LV11.12.2013
MC11.12.2013
MK11.12.2013
MT11.12.2013
RO11.12.2013
SE11.12.2013
SI11.12.2013
SK11.12.2013
SM11.12.2013
IE12.01.2014
LU12.01.2014
BE31.01.2014
CH31.01.2014
LI31.01.2014
NO11.03.2014
GR12.03.2014
IS11.04.2014
PT11.04.2014
AT12.01.2015
[2018/30]
Former [2016/32]HU12.01.2010
BG11.12.2013
CY11.12.2013
CZ11.12.2013
DK11.12.2013
EE11.12.2013
ES11.12.2013
FI11.12.2013
HR11.12.2013
LT11.12.2013
LV11.12.2013
MC11.12.2013
MT11.12.2013
RO11.12.2013
SE11.12.2013
SI11.12.2013
SK11.12.2013
SM11.12.2013
IE12.01.2014
LU12.01.2014
BE31.01.2014
CH31.01.2014
LI31.01.2014
NO11.03.2014
GR12.03.2014
IS11.04.2014
PT11.04.2014
AT12.01.2015
Former [2016/28]BG11.12.2013
CY11.12.2013
CZ11.12.2013
DK11.12.2013
EE11.12.2013
ES11.12.2013
FI11.12.2013
HR11.12.2013
LT11.12.2013
LV11.12.2013
MC11.12.2013
MT11.12.2013
RO11.12.2013
SE11.12.2013
SI11.12.2013
SK11.12.2013
SM11.12.2013
IE12.01.2014
LU12.01.2014
BE31.01.2014
CH31.01.2014
LI31.01.2014
NO11.03.2014
GR12.03.2014
IS11.04.2014
PT11.04.2014
AT12.01.2015
Former [2016/25]CY11.12.2013
CZ11.12.2013
DK11.12.2013
EE11.12.2013
ES11.12.2013
FI11.12.2013
HR11.12.2013
LT11.12.2013
LV11.12.2013
MC11.12.2013
MT11.12.2013
RO11.12.2013
SE11.12.2013
SI11.12.2013
SK11.12.2013
SM11.12.2013
IE12.01.2014
LU12.01.2014
BE31.01.2014
CH31.01.2014
LI31.01.2014
NO11.03.2014
IS11.04.2014
PT11.04.2014
AT12.01.2015
Former [2016/22]CY11.12.2013
CZ11.12.2013
DK11.12.2013
EE11.12.2013
ES11.12.2013
FI11.12.2013
HR11.12.2013
LT11.12.2013
LV11.12.2013
MC11.12.2013
MT11.12.2013
RO11.12.2013
SE11.12.2013
SI11.12.2013
SK11.12.2013
SM11.12.2013
IE12.01.2014
LU12.01.2014
BE31.01.2014
CH31.01.2014
LI31.01.2014
NO11.03.2014
IS11.04.2014
PT11.04.2014
Former [2016/12]CY11.12.2013
CZ11.12.2013
DK11.12.2013
EE11.12.2013
ES11.12.2013
FI11.12.2013
HR11.12.2013
LT11.12.2013
LV11.12.2013
MC11.12.2013
MT11.12.2013
RO11.12.2013
SE11.12.2013
SI11.12.2013
SK11.12.2013
IE12.01.2014
LU12.01.2014
BE31.01.2014
CH31.01.2014
LI31.01.2014
NO11.03.2014
IS11.04.2014
PT11.04.2014
Former [2015/14]CY11.12.2013
CZ11.12.2013
DK11.12.2013
EE11.12.2013
ES11.12.2013
FI11.12.2013
HR11.12.2013
LT11.12.2013
LV11.12.2013
MC11.12.2013
RO11.12.2013
SE11.12.2013
SI11.12.2013
SK11.12.2013
IE12.01.2014
LU12.01.2014
BE31.01.2014
CH31.01.2014
LI31.01.2014
NO11.03.2014
IS11.04.2014
PT11.04.2014
Former [2015/08]CY11.12.2013
CZ11.12.2013
DK11.12.2013
EE11.12.2013
ES11.12.2013
FI11.12.2013
HR11.12.2013
LT11.12.2013
LV11.12.2013
MC11.12.2013
RO11.12.2013
SE11.12.2013
SK11.12.2013
IE12.01.2014
LU12.01.2014
BE31.01.2014
CH31.01.2014
LI31.01.2014
NO11.03.2014
IS11.04.2014
PT11.04.2014
Former [2015/07]CY11.12.2013
CZ11.12.2013
DK11.12.2013
EE11.12.2013
ES11.12.2013
FI11.12.2013
HR11.12.2013
LT11.12.2013
LV11.12.2013
MC11.12.2013
RO11.12.2013
SE11.12.2013
SK11.12.2013
IE12.01.2014
LU12.01.2014
CH31.01.2014
LI31.01.2014
NO11.03.2014
IS11.04.2014
PT11.04.2014
Former [2014/48]CY11.12.2013
CZ11.12.2013
DK11.12.2013
EE11.12.2013
ES11.12.2013
FI11.12.2013
HR11.12.2013
LT11.12.2013
LV11.12.2013
MC11.12.2013
RO11.12.2013
SE11.12.2013
SK11.12.2013
LU12.01.2014
CH31.01.2014
LI31.01.2014
NO11.03.2014
IS11.04.2014
PT11.04.2014
Former [2014/46]CY11.12.2013
CZ11.12.2013
EE11.12.2013
ES11.12.2013
FI11.12.2013
HR11.12.2013
LT11.12.2013
LV11.12.2013
MC11.12.2013
RO11.12.2013
SE11.12.2013
SK11.12.2013
LU12.01.2014
CH31.01.2014
LI31.01.2014
NO11.03.2014
IS11.04.2014
PT11.04.2014
Former [2014/44]CY11.12.2013
CZ11.12.2013
EE11.12.2013
ES11.12.2013
FI11.12.2013
HR11.12.2013
LT11.12.2013
LV11.12.2013
MC11.12.2013
RO11.12.2013
SE11.12.2013
SK11.12.2013
LU12.01.2014
NO11.03.2014
IS11.04.2014
PT11.04.2014
Former [2014/41]CY11.12.2013
CZ11.12.2013
EE11.12.2013
ES11.12.2013
FI11.12.2013
HR11.12.2013
LT11.12.2013
LV11.12.2013
RO11.12.2013
SE11.12.2013
SK11.12.2013
LU12.01.2014
NO11.03.2014
IS11.04.2014
PT11.04.2014
Former [2014/37]CY11.12.2013
CZ11.12.2013
EE11.12.2013
ES11.12.2013
FI11.12.2013
HR11.12.2013
LT11.12.2013
LV11.12.2013
RO11.12.2013
SE11.12.2013
SK11.12.2013
NO11.03.2014
IS11.04.2014
PT11.04.2014
Former [2014/36]CY11.12.2013
EE11.12.2013
FI11.12.2013
HR11.12.2013
LT11.12.2013
LV11.12.2013
SE11.12.2013
NO11.03.2014
IS11.04.2014
Former [2014/26]CY11.12.2013
FI11.12.2013
HR11.12.2013
LT11.12.2013
LV11.12.2013
SE11.12.2013
NO11.03.2014
Former [2014/25]FI11.12.2013
HR11.12.2013
LT11.12.2013
LV11.12.2013
SE11.12.2013
NO11.03.2014
Former [2014/23]FI11.12.2013
HR11.12.2013
LT11.12.2013
SE11.12.2013
NO11.03.2014
Former [2014/22]FI11.12.2013
LT11.12.2013
SE11.12.2013
NO11.03.2014
Former [2014/20]LT11.12.2013
NO11.03.2014
Documents cited:Search[X]US4280971  (WISCHNIEWSKI MARTIN, et al) [X] 1-15 * column 1, line 49 - column 2, line 66 *;
 [X]EP0436110  (BIOCHEMIE GMBH [AT]) [X] 1-12,14,15 * example - *;
 [A]US5378462  (BOEDECKER BERND [DE], et al) [A] 1-15 * example - *
by applicantDE3248588
 US4280971
 EP0436110
 US5378462