Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2178333

EP2178333 - Synchronous and asynchronous interference managment [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.09.2012
Database last updated on 15.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip18.07.2014Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 20.08.2014  [2014/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Qualcomm Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
[2010/16]
Inventor(s)01 / Horn, Gavin, Bernhard
c/o QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA, 92121-1714 / US
02 / Sampath, Ashwin
c/o QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA, 92121-1714 / US
03 / Nanda, Sanjiv
c/o QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA, 92121-1714 / US
 [2011/44]
Former [2010/16]01 / Horn, Gavin, Bernhard
c/o QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA, 92121-1714 / US
02 / Sampath, Ashwin
c/o QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA, 92121-1714 / US
03 / Nanda, Sanjiv
c/o QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA, 92121-1714 / US
Representative(s)Hohgardt, Martin
Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB
Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte
Prinzregentenplatz 7
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2011/44]Hohgardt, Martin
Bardehle Pagenberg
Prinzregentenplatz 7
81675 München / DE
Former [2010/16]Hohgardt, Martin
Bardehle Pagenberg Dost Altenburg Geissler Galileiplatz 1
81679 München / DE
Application number, filing date10151215.031.03.2008
[2010/16]
Priority number, dateUS2008002784907.02.2008         Original published format: US 27849
[2010/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2178333
Date:21.04.2010
Language:EN
[2010/16]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2178333
Date:17.11.2010
[2010/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2178333
Date:02.11.2011
Language:EN
[2011/44]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.10.2010
ClassificationInternational:H04W72/08, H04B1/10
[2010/16]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/16]
TitleGerman:Synchrone und asynchrone Interferenzbewältigung[2010/16]
English:Synchronous and asynchronous interference managment[2010/16]
French:Gestion d'interférences synchrones et asynchrones[2010/16]
Examination procedure20.01.2010Examination requested  [2010/16]
24.05.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.09.2011Fee for grant paid
13.09.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP08006296.1  / EP2088827
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20080006296) is  17.02.2010
Opposition(s)03.08.2012No opposition filed within time limit [2012/41]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.01.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
10.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU31.03.2008
AT02.11.2011
BE02.11.2011
CY02.11.2011
CZ02.11.2011
DK02.11.2011
EE02.11.2011
FI02.11.2011
HR02.11.2011
IT02.11.2011
LT02.11.2011
LV02.11.2011
MT02.11.2011
NL02.11.2011
PL02.11.2011
RO02.11.2011
SE02.11.2011
SI02.11.2011
SK02.11.2011
TR02.11.2011
BG02.02.2012
NO02.02.2012
GR03.02.2012
ES13.02.2012
IS02.03.2012
PT02.03.2012
CH31.03.2012
IE31.03.2012
LI31.03.2012
LU31.03.2012
MC31.03.2012
FR02.04.2012
[2014/34]
Former [2014/27]AT02.11.2011
BE02.11.2011
CY02.11.2011
CZ02.11.2011
DK02.11.2011
EE02.11.2011
FI02.11.2011
HR02.11.2011
IT02.11.2011
LT02.11.2011
LV02.11.2011
MT02.11.2011
NL02.11.2011
PL02.11.2011
RO02.11.2011
SE02.11.2011
SI02.11.2011
SK02.11.2011
TR02.11.2011
BG02.02.2012
NO02.02.2012
GR03.02.2012
ES13.02.2012
IS02.03.2012
PT02.03.2012
CH31.03.2012
IE31.03.2012
LI31.03.2012
LU31.03.2012
MC31.03.2012
FR02.04.2012
Former [2014/21]AT02.11.2011
BE02.11.2011
CY02.11.2011
CZ02.11.2011
DK02.11.2011
EE02.11.2011
FI02.11.2011
HR02.11.2011
IT02.11.2011
LT02.11.2011
LV02.11.2011
MT02.11.2011
NL02.11.2011
PL02.11.2011
RO02.11.2011
SE02.11.2011
SI02.11.2011
SK02.11.2011
TR02.11.2011
BG02.02.2012
NO02.02.2012
GR03.02.2012
ES13.02.2012
IS02.03.2012
PT02.03.2012
CH31.03.2012
IE31.03.2012
LI31.03.2012
MC31.03.2012
FR02.04.2012
Former [2013/35]AT02.11.2011
BE02.11.2011
CY02.11.2011
CZ02.11.2011
DK02.11.2011
EE02.11.2011
FI02.11.2011
HR02.11.2011
IT02.11.2011
LT02.11.2011
LV02.11.2011
MT02.11.2011
NL02.11.2011
PL02.11.2011
RO02.11.2011
SE02.11.2011
SI02.11.2011
SK02.11.2011
BG02.02.2012
NO02.02.2012
GR03.02.2012
ES13.02.2012
IS02.03.2012
PT02.03.2012
CH31.03.2012
IE31.03.2012
LI31.03.2012
MC31.03.2012
FR02.04.2012
Former [2013/29]AT02.11.2011
BE02.11.2011
CY02.11.2011
CZ02.11.2011
DK02.11.2011
EE02.11.2011
FI02.11.2011
HR02.11.2011
IT02.11.2011
LT02.11.2011
LV02.11.2011
NL02.11.2011
PL02.11.2011
RO02.11.2011
SE02.11.2011
SI02.11.2011
SK02.11.2011
BG02.02.2012
NO02.02.2012
GR03.02.2012
ES13.02.2012
IS02.03.2012
PT02.03.2012
CH31.03.2012
IE31.03.2012
LI31.03.2012
MC31.03.2012
FR02.04.2012
Former [2013/22]AT02.11.2011
BE02.11.2011
CY02.11.2011
CZ02.11.2011
DK02.11.2011
EE02.11.2011
HR02.11.2011
IT02.11.2011
LT02.11.2011
LV02.11.2011
NL02.11.2011
PL02.11.2011
RO02.11.2011
SE02.11.2011
SI02.11.2011
SK02.11.2011
BG02.02.2012
NO02.02.2012
GR03.02.2012
ES13.02.2012
IS02.03.2012
PT02.03.2012
CH31.03.2012
IE31.03.2012
LI31.03.2012
MC31.03.2012
FR02.04.2012
Former [2013/08]AT02.11.2011
BE02.11.2011
CY02.11.2011
CZ02.11.2011
DK02.11.2011
EE02.11.2011
HR02.11.2011
IT02.11.2011
LT02.11.2011
LV02.11.2011
NL02.11.2011
PL02.11.2011
RO02.11.2011
SE02.11.2011
SI02.11.2011
SK02.11.2011
BG02.02.2012
NO02.02.2012
GR03.02.2012
IS02.03.2012
PT02.03.2012
CH31.03.2012
IE31.03.2012
LI31.03.2012
MC31.03.2012
FR02.04.2012
Former [2013/07]AT02.11.2011
BE02.11.2011
CY02.11.2011
CZ02.11.2011
DK02.11.2011
EE02.11.2011
HR02.11.2011
IT02.11.2011
LT02.11.2011
LV02.11.2011
NL02.11.2011
PL02.11.2011
RO02.11.2011
SE02.11.2011
SI02.11.2011
SK02.11.2011
BG02.02.2012
NO02.02.2012
GR03.02.2012
IS02.03.2012
PT02.03.2012
CH31.03.2012
LI31.03.2012
MC31.03.2012
FR02.04.2012
Former [2012/47]BE02.11.2011
CY02.11.2011
CZ02.11.2011
DK02.11.2011
EE02.11.2011
HR02.11.2011
IT02.11.2011
LT02.11.2011
LV02.11.2011
NL02.11.2011
PL02.11.2011
RO02.11.2011
SE02.11.2011
SI02.11.2011
SK02.11.2011
BG02.02.2012
NO02.02.2012
GR03.02.2012
IS02.03.2012
PT02.03.2012
MC31.03.2012
Former [2012/37]BE02.11.2011
CY02.11.2011
CZ02.11.2011
DK02.11.2011
EE02.11.2011
HR02.11.2011
IT02.11.2011
LT02.11.2011
LV02.11.2011
NL02.11.2011
PL02.11.2011
RO02.11.2011
SE02.11.2011
SI02.11.2011
SK02.11.2011
BG02.02.2012
NO02.02.2012
GR03.02.2012
IS02.03.2012
PT02.03.2012
Former [2012/36]BE02.11.2011
CY02.11.2011
CZ02.11.2011
DK02.11.2011
EE02.11.2011
HR02.11.2011
LT02.11.2011
LV02.11.2011
NL02.11.2011
PL02.11.2011
RO02.11.2011
SE02.11.2011
SI02.11.2011
SK02.11.2011
BG02.02.2012
NO02.02.2012
GR03.02.2012
IS02.03.2012
PT02.03.2012
Former [2012/35]BE02.11.2011
CY02.11.2011
CZ02.11.2011
DK02.11.2011
EE02.11.2011
HR02.11.2011
LT02.11.2011
LV02.11.2011
NL02.11.2011
PL02.11.2011
SE02.11.2011
SI02.11.2011
BG02.02.2012
NO02.02.2012
GR03.02.2012
IS02.03.2012
PT02.03.2012
Former [2012/34]BE02.11.2011
CY02.11.2011
CZ02.11.2011
HR02.11.2011
LT02.11.2011
LV02.11.2011
NL02.11.2011
PL02.11.2011
SE02.11.2011
SI02.11.2011
NO02.02.2012
GR03.02.2012
IS02.03.2012
PT02.03.2012
Former [2012/28]BE02.11.2011
CY02.11.2011
HR02.11.2011
LT02.11.2011
LV02.11.2011
NL02.11.2011
PL02.11.2011
SE02.11.2011
SI02.11.2011
NO02.02.2012
GR03.02.2012
IS02.03.2012
PT02.03.2012
Former [2012/27]BE02.11.2011
HR02.11.2011
LT02.11.2011
LV02.11.2011
NL02.11.2011
PL02.11.2011
SE02.11.2011
SI02.11.2011
NO02.02.2012
GR03.02.2012
IS02.03.2012
PT02.03.2012
Former [2012/26]BE02.11.2011
LT02.11.2011
LV02.11.2011
NL02.11.2011
PL02.11.2011
SE02.11.2011
SI02.11.2011
NO02.02.2012
GR03.02.2012
IS02.03.2012
PT02.03.2012
Former [2012/25]BE02.11.2011
LT02.11.2011
LV02.11.2011
NL02.11.2011
SE02.11.2011
SI02.11.2011
NO02.02.2012
GR03.02.2012
IS02.03.2012
PT02.03.2012
Former [2012/24]LT02.11.2011
LV02.11.2011
NL02.11.2011
SE02.11.2011
SI02.11.2011
NO02.02.2012
GR03.02.2012
IS02.03.2012
PT02.03.2012
Former [2012/23]LT02.11.2011
NL02.11.2011
NO02.02.2012
GR03.02.2012
IS02.03.2012
PT02.03.2012
Former [2012/21]LT02.11.2011
NO02.02.2012
IS02.03.2012
Former [2012/20]LT02.11.2011
NO02.02.2012
Documents cited:Search[A]  - HUI MA ET AL, "PHY/MAC adaptation approaches for dense wireless LAN MESH", COMMUNICATION SYSTEMS SOFTWARE AND MIDDLEWARE AND WORKSHOPS, 2008. COMSWARE 2008. 3RD INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20080106), ISBN 978-1-4244-1796-4, pages 204 - 207, XP031279672 [A] 1,14,15 * Section II, Chapter 2.1 * * figure 2 *
by applicantUS2007105574