blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2280486

EP2280486 - Interleaved pipelined binary search A/D converter [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  13.01.2012
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip13.01.2012Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 15.02.2012  [2012/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Interuniversitair Micro-Elektronica Centrum
Kapeldreef 75
3001 Leuven / BE
For all designated states
VRIJE UNIVERSITEIT BRUSSEL
Pleinlaan 2
1050 Brussel / BE
[2011/05]
Inventor(s)01 / Verbruggen, Bob
Tiensesteenweg 289/0001
3010 Kessel-Lo / BE
 [2011/05]
Representative(s)BiiP cvba
Engels Plein 3 bus 102
3000 Leuven / BE
[N/P]
Former [2011/05]BiiP cvba
Culliganlaan 1B
1831 Diegem (Bruxelles) / BE
Application number, filing date10151660.726.01.2010
[2011/05]
Priority number, dateUS20090224519P10.07.2009         Original published format: US 224519 P
[2011/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2280486
Date:02.02.2011
Language:EN
[2011/05]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.11.2010
ClassificationIPC:H03M1/10, // H03M1/44, H03M1/16, H03M1/36
[2011/05]
CPC:
H03M1/002 (EP,US); H03M1/10 (KR); H03M1/1023 (EP,US);
H03M1/16 (KR); H03M1/36 (KR); H03M1/44 (KR);
H03M1/1215 (EP,US); H03M1/1235 (EP,US); H03M1/164 (EP,US);
H03M1/361 (EP,US); H03M1/445 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2011/05]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:Analog-Digital-Wandler mit sich überlappend geführter binärer Suche[2011/05]
English:Interleaved pipelined binary search A/D converter[2011/05]
French:Convertisseur analogique/numérique de recherche binaire de pipeline et entrelacé[2011/05]
Examination procedure03.08.2011Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2012/07]
08.09.2011Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2012/07]
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[Y]EP1679799  (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-7 * paragraphs [0099] - [0138]; figures 14-15 *;
 [YD]US2005062635  (FRANZ BERND [DE]) [YD] 1-7 * abstract *;
 [A]US2003132867  (OSTROM KENNETH A [US], et al) [A] 1-7 * paragraphs [0015] - [0040]; figure 9 *;
 [A]US6169502  (JOHNSON SANDRA MARIE [US], et al) [A] 2,3 * abstract *
by applicantUS2005062635
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.