Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2214356

EP2214356 - SYSTEM FOR FORWARDING A PACKET WITH A HIERARCHICALLY STRUCTURED VARIABLE-LENGTH IDENTIFIER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2010/31]System for forwarding a packet with a hierarchically structured variable-length identifier
[2015/40]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  31.03.2017
Database last updated on 15.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.09.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MT
published on 24.10.2018  [2018/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Palo Alto Research Center Incorporated
3333 Coyote Hill Road
Palo Alto, California 94304 / US
[2010/31]
Inventor(s)01 / Jacobson, Van L.
15 Skyline Drive
Woodside, CA 94062 / US
02 / Thornton, James D.
3312 Bay Road
Redwood City, CA 94063 / US
 [2016/21]
Former [2010/31]01 / Jacobson, Van L.
15 Skyline Drive
Woodside, CA 94062 / US
02 / Thornton, James D.
3312 Bay Road
Redwood City, CA 94063 / US
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[2016/21]
Former [2010/31]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
Application number, filing date10152134.229.01.2010
[2010/31]
Priority number, dateUS20090148871P30.01.2009         Original published format: US 148871 P
US2009056500523.09.2009         Original published format: US 565005
[2010/31]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2214356
Date:04.08.2010
Language:EN
[2010/31]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2214356
Date:25.05.2016
Language:EN
[2016/21]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.05.2010
ClassificationInternational:H04L29/08, H04L12/701, H04L29/12, H04L12/743
[2015/40]
Former International [2010/31]H04L12/56, H04L29/12, G06F17/30
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/21]
Former [2010/31]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:SYSTEM ZUR WEITERLEITUNG EINES PAKETS MIT HIERARCHISCH STRUKTURIERTEN IDENTIFIKATOREN MIT VARIABLER LÄNGE[2015/40]
English:SYSTEM FOR FORWARDING A PACKET WITH A HIERARCHICALLY STRUCTURED VARIABLE-LENGTH IDENTIFIER[2015/40]
French:SYSTÈME DE TRANSFERT D'UN PAQUET AVEC UN IDENTIFICATEUR À LONGUEUR VARIABLE STRUCTURÉE HIÉRARCHIQUEMENT[2015/40]
Former [2010/31]System zur Weiterleitung eines Pakets mit hierarchisch strukturierten Identifikatoren mit variabler Länge
Former [2010/31]System for forwarding a packet with a hierarchically structured variable-length identifier
Former [2010/31]Système de transfert d'un paquet avec un identificateur à longueur variable structurée hiérarchiquement
Examination procedure11.10.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.02.2011Examination requested  [2011/11]
24.01.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.08.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.03.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
07.03.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.03.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.07.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.09.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.12.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.04.2016Fee for grant paid
08.04.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
08.04.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  24.01.2012
Opposition(s)28.02.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.01.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
31.01.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
31.01.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
02.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
01.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT25.05.2016
BE25.05.2016
CZ25.05.2016
DK25.05.2016
EE25.05.2016
ES25.05.2016
FI25.05.2016
HR25.05.2016
IT25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
LV25.05.2016
MC25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
PL25.05.2016
RO25.05.2016
SE25.05.2016
SI25.05.2016
SK25.05.2016
SM25.05.2016
NO25.08.2016
GR26.08.2016
PT26.09.2016
IE29.01.2017
LU29.01.2017
MT29.01.2017
CH31.01.2017
LI31.01.2017
[2018/43]
Former [2018/13]AT25.05.2016
BE25.05.2016
CZ25.05.2016
DK25.05.2016
EE25.05.2016
ES25.05.2016
FI25.05.2016
HR25.05.2016
IT25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
LV25.05.2016
MC25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
PL25.05.2016
RO25.05.2016
SE25.05.2016
SI25.05.2016
SK25.05.2016
SM25.05.2016
NO25.08.2016
GR26.08.2016
PT26.09.2016
IE29.01.2017
LU29.01.2017
CH31.01.2017
LI31.01.2017
Former [2017/51]AT25.05.2016
BE25.05.2016
CZ25.05.2016
DK25.05.2016
EE25.05.2016
ES25.05.2016
FI25.05.2016
HR25.05.2016
IT25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
LV25.05.2016
MC25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
PL25.05.2016
RO25.05.2016
SE25.05.2016
SI25.05.2016
SK25.05.2016
SM25.05.2016
NO25.08.2016
GR26.08.2016
PT26.09.2016
LU29.01.2017
CH31.01.2017
LI31.01.2017
Former [2017/47]AT25.05.2016
BE25.05.2016
CZ25.05.2016
DK25.05.2016
EE25.05.2016
ES25.05.2016
FI25.05.2016
HR25.05.2016
IT25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
LV25.05.2016
MC25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
PL25.05.2016
RO25.05.2016
SE25.05.2016
SI25.05.2016
SK25.05.2016
SM25.05.2016
NO25.08.2016
GR26.08.2016
PT26.09.2016
Former [2017/37]AT25.05.2016
BE25.05.2016
CZ25.05.2016
DK25.05.2016
EE25.05.2016
ES25.05.2016
FI25.05.2016
HR25.05.2016
IT25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
LV25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
PL25.05.2016
RO25.05.2016
SE25.05.2016
SI25.05.2016
SK25.05.2016
SM25.05.2016
NO25.08.2016
GR26.08.2016
PT26.09.2016
Former [2017/11]AT25.05.2016
BE25.05.2016
CZ25.05.2016
DK25.05.2016
EE25.05.2016
ES25.05.2016
FI25.05.2016
HR25.05.2016
IT25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
LV25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
PL25.05.2016
RO25.05.2016
SE25.05.2016
SK25.05.2016
SM25.05.2016
NO25.08.2016
GR26.08.2016
PT26.09.2016
Former [2017/10]BE25.05.2016
CZ25.05.2016
DK25.05.2016
EE25.05.2016
ES25.05.2016
FI25.05.2016
HR25.05.2016
IT25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
LV25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
PL25.05.2016
RO25.05.2016
SE25.05.2016
SK25.05.2016
NO25.08.2016
GR26.08.2016
PT26.09.2016
Former [2017/09]CZ25.05.2016
DK25.05.2016
EE25.05.2016
ES25.05.2016
FI25.05.2016
HR25.05.2016
IT25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
LV25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
RO25.05.2016
SE25.05.2016
NO25.08.2016
GR26.08.2016
PT26.09.2016
Former [2017/07]DK25.05.2016
ES25.05.2016
FI25.05.2016
HR25.05.2016
IT25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
LV25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
SE25.05.2016
NO25.08.2016
GR26.08.2016
PT26.09.2016
Former [2017/04]ES25.05.2016
FI25.05.2016
HR25.05.2016
IT25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
LV25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
SE25.05.2016
NO25.08.2016
GR26.08.2016
PT26.09.2016
Former [2016/52]ES25.05.2016
FI25.05.2016
HR25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
LV25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
SE25.05.2016
NO25.08.2016
GR26.08.2016
PT26.09.2016
Former [2016/51]ES25.05.2016
FI25.05.2016
HR25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
LV25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
NO25.08.2016
GR26.08.2016
PT26.09.2016
Former [2016/50]ES25.05.2016
FI25.05.2016
HR25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
LV25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
NO25.08.2016
Former [2016/49]FI25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
NO25.08.2016
Former [2016/46]LT25.05.2016
NO25.08.2016
Documents cited:Search[XAI]WO03005288  (IBM [US], et al) [X] 1,9 * page 2, line 16 - line 31 * [A] 2-4,10-12 [I] 5-8,13-15;
 [A]US2006173831  (BASSO CLAUDE [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0054] * * paragraph [0042] *
 [A]  MARCEL WALDVOGEL, B. PLATTNER, G. VARGHESE, ULRICH BREUER, "Fast Longest Prefix Matching: Algorithms, Analysis, and Applications", (20021231), pages 1, 24 - 29, Internet, URL: http://citeseerx.ist.psu.edu/viewdoc/summary?doi=10.1.1.21.339, (20100412), XP002577471 [A] 1-15 * paragraph [03.2] - paragraph [3.2.2] *
ExaminationUS2002199014