Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2179666

EP2179666 - Smokeless Tobacco Compositions And Methods For Treating Tobacco For Use Therein [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  27.07.2012
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip08.04.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
08.04.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Company
Bowman Gray Technical Center
Post Office Box 1487
950 Reynolds Boulevard
Winston-Salem, NC 27102 / US
[N/P]
Former [2010/17]For all designated states
R.J.Reynolds Tobacco Company
Bowman Gray Technical Center Post Office Box 1487 950 Reynolds Boulevard
Winston-Salem, NC 27102 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Mua, John-Paul
152 Redmeadow Drive
Advance NC 27066 / US
02 / Holton, Darrell Eugene Jr.
5331 Sterling Forest Drive
Clemmons NC 27012 / US
03 / Figlar, James Neil
2835 Griffin Road
Rural Hall, NC 27045 / US
04 / Monsalud, Luis Rosete Jr.
1555 Barry Oak Court
Kernersville NC 27284 / US
 [2012/35]
Former [2011/17]01 / Mua, John-Paul
152 Redmeadow Drive
Advance NC 27066 / US
02 / Holton, Darrell Eugene Jr.
5331 Sterling Forest Drive
Clemmons NC 27012 / US
03 / Figlar, James Neil
2835 Griffin Road
Rural Hall, NC 27045 / US
04 / Monsalud, Luis Rosete Jr.
1555 Barry Oak Court
Kernersville NC 27284 / US
Former [2010/49]01 / Dube, Michael Francis
130 Northpond Lane
Winston-Salem NC 27106 / US
02 / Mua, John-Paul
152 Redmeadow Drive
Advance NC 27066 / US
03 / Holton, Darrell Eugene Jr.
5331 Sterling Forest Drive
Clemmons NC 27012 / US
04 / Stokes, Cynthia Stewart
10 Vance Street
Lexington NC 27292 / US
05 / Figlar, James Neil
2835 Griffin Road
Rural Hall, NC 27045 / US
06 / Brinkley, Paul Andrew
2001 Motsinger Road
Winston-Salem NC 27107 / US
07 / McClanahan, David Neil
1271 Abingdon Way
Winston-Salem NC 27106 / US
08 / Flinchum, Jack Gray Jr.
1210 Brook Acres Trail
Clemmons NC 27012 / US
09 / Monsalud, Luis Rosete Jr.
1555 Barry Oak Court
Kernersville NC 27284 / US
10 / Cantrell, Daniel Verdin
4125 Winding Oaks Trail
Lewisville NC 27106 / US
Former [2010/17]01 / Dube, Michael Francis
130 Northpond Lane
Winston-Salem NC 27106 / US
02 / Mua, John-Paul
152 Redmeadow Drive
Advance NC 27066 / US
03 / Holton, Darrell Eugene Jr.
5331 Sterling Forest Drive
Clemmons NC 27012 / US
04 / Stokes, Cynthia Stewart
10 Vance Street
Lexington NC 27292 / US
05 / Figlar, James Neil
2130 Rossmore Road
Clemmons NC 27012 / US
06 / Brinkley, Paul Andrew
2001 Motsinger Road
Winston-Salem NC 27107 / US
07 / McClanahan, David Neil
1271 Abingdon Way
Winston-Salem NC 27106 / US
08 / Flinchum, Jack Gray Jr.
1210 Brook Acres Trail
Clemmons NC 27012 / US
09 / Monsalud, Luis Rosete Jr.
1555 Barry Oak Court
Kernersville NC 27284 / US
10 / Cantrell, Daniel Verdin
4125 Winding Oaks Trail
Lewisville NC 27106 / US
Representative(s)Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Uhlandstrasse 14c
70182 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/35]Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte
Uhlandstrasse 14c
70182 Stuttgart / DE
Former [2010/17]Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte
Uhlandstrasse 14c
70182 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date10152287.822.07.2008
[2010/17]
Priority number, dateUS2007078160423.07.2007         Original published format: US 781604
US2007078166623.07.2007         Original published format: US 781666
US2007078164123.07.2007         Original published format: US 781641
[2010/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2179666
Date:28.04.2010
Language:EN
[2010/17]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2179666
Date:22.09.2010
[2010/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2179666
Date:29.08.2012
Language:EN
[2012/35]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.08.2010
ClassificationInternational:A24B15/28, A24B13/00, A24B3/04
[2012/11]
Former International [2010/17]A24B13/00, A24B15/00, A24B3/04, A24B15/30
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/17]
TitleGerman:Rauchlose Tabakzusammensetzungen und Verfahren zur Behandlung von Tabak zu dessen Verwendung darin[2010/17]
English:Smokeless Tobacco Compositions And Methods For Treating Tobacco For Use Therein[2010/17]
French:Composition de tabac sans fumée et procédé pour le traitement du tabac pour de tels usages[2010/17]
Examination procedure18.03.2011Observations by third parties
22.03.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.03.2011Examination requested  [2011/17]
13.09.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.01.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.03.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.06.2012Fee for grant paid
28.06.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP08796428.4  / EP2173200
Divisional application(s)EP11157884.5  / EP2377413
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20080796428) is  30.12.2010
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  27.05.2013  06.06.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Japan Tobacco Inc.
JT Bldg., 2-2-1 Toranomon
Minato-ku
Tokyo 105-8422 / JP
Opponent's representative
Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
 02  29.05.2013  06.06.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Swedish Match North Europe AB
Maria Skolgata 83
118 85 Stockholm / SE
Opponent's representative
Valea AB, et al
Box 1098
405 23 Göteborg / SE
 [2016/16]
Former [2015/02]
Opponent(s)01  27.05.2013  06.06.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Japan Tobacco Inc.
JT Bldg., 2-2-1 Toranomon
Minato-ku
Tokyo 105-8422 / JP
Opponent's representative
Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
 02  29.05.2013  06.06.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Swedish Match North Europe AB
Maria Skolgata 83
118 85 Stockholm / SE
Opponent's representative
Nikolopoulou, Sofia, et al
Aegis Patent AB
Adolf Lemons väg
SE-187 76 Täby / SE
Former [2014/46]
Opponent(s)01  27.05.2013  06.06.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Japan Tobacco Inc.
JT Bldg., 2-2-1 Toranomon
Minato-ku
Tokyo 105-8422 / JP
Opponent's representative
Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
 02  29.05.2013  06.06.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Swedish Match North Europe AB
Maria Skolgata 83
118 85 Stockholm / SE
Opponent's representative
Zacco Sweden AB, et al
P.O. Box 5581
114 85 Stockholm / SE
Former [2013/28]
Opponent(s)01  27.05.2013  06.06.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Japan Tobacco Inc.
JT Bldg., 2-2-1 Toranomon
Minato-ku
Tokyo 105-8422 / JP
Opponent's representative
HOFFMANN EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
 02  29.05.2013  06.06.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Swedish Match North Europe AB
Maria Skolgata 83
118 85 Stockholm / SE
Opponent's representative
Nikolopoulou, Sofia, et al
Zacco Sweden AB
P.O. Box 5581
114 85 Stockholm / SE
05.07.2013Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
15.01.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
13.10.2015Date of oral proceedings
23.02.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
24.02.2016Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
Appeal following opposition25.04.2016Appeal received No.  T1020/16
05.07.2016Statement of grounds filed
22.04.2016Appeal received
05.07.2016Statement of grounds filed
21.04.2016Appeal received
22.06.2016Statement of grounds filed
28.01.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.07.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
12.07.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
13.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU22.07.2008
AT29.08.2012
BE29.08.2012
CY29.08.2012
CZ29.08.2012
DK29.08.2012
EE29.08.2012
FI29.08.2012
HR29.08.2012
LT29.08.2012
LV29.08.2012
MC29.08.2012
MT29.08.2012
NL29.08.2012
PL29.08.2012
RO29.08.2012
SI29.08.2012
SK29.08.2012
TR29.08.2012
BG29.11.2012
NO29.11.2012
GR30.11.2012
IS29.12.2012
PT31.12.2012
IE22.07.2013
LU22.07.2013
CH31.07.2013
LI31.07.2013
[2015/34]
Former [2015/32]AT29.08.2012
BE29.08.2012
CY29.08.2012
CZ29.08.2012
DK29.08.2012
EE29.08.2012
FI29.08.2012
HR29.08.2012
LT29.08.2012
LV29.08.2012
MC29.08.2012
MT29.08.2012
NL29.08.2012
PL29.08.2012
RO29.08.2012
SI29.08.2012
SK29.08.2012
TR29.08.2012
BG29.11.2012
NO29.11.2012
GR30.11.2012
IS29.12.2012
PT31.12.2012
IE22.07.2013
CH31.07.2013
LI31.07.2013
Former [2014/33]AT29.08.2012
BE29.08.2012
CY29.08.2012
CZ29.08.2012
DK29.08.2012
EE29.08.2012
FI29.08.2012
HR29.08.2012
LT29.08.2012
LV29.08.2012
MC29.08.2012
NL29.08.2012
PL29.08.2012
RO29.08.2012
SI29.08.2012
SK29.08.2012
BG29.11.2012
NO29.11.2012
GR30.11.2012
IS29.12.2012
PT31.12.2012
IE22.07.2013
CH31.07.2013
LI31.07.2013
Former [2014/20]AT29.08.2012
BE29.08.2012
CY29.08.2012
CZ29.08.2012
DK29.08.2012
EE29.08.2012
FI29.08.2012
HR29.08.2012
LT29.08.2012
LV29.08.2012
MC29.08.2012
NL29.08.2012
PL29.08.2012
RO29.08.2012
SI29.08.2012
SK29.08.2012
BG29.11.2012
NO29.11.2012
GR30.11.2012
IS29.12.2012
PT31.12.2012
CH31.07.2013
LI31.07.2013
Former [2014/14]AT29.08.2012
BE29.08.2012
CY29.08.2012
CZ29.08.2012
DK29.08.2012
EE29.08.2012
FI29.08.2012
HR29.08.2012
LT29.08.2012
LV29.08.2012
MC29.08.2012
NL29.08.2012
PL29.08.2012
RO29.08.2012
SI29.08.2012
SK29.08.2012
BG29.11.2012
NO29.11.2012
GR30.11.2012
IS29.12.2012
PT31.12.2012
Former [2013/34]AT29.08.2012
BE29.08.2012
CY29.08.2012
CZ29.08.2012
DK29.08.2012
EE29.08.2012
FI29.08.2012
HR29.08.2012
LT29.08.2012
LV29.08.2012
NL29.08.2012
PL29.08.2012
RO29.08.2012
SI29.08.2012
SK29.08.2012
BG29.11.2012
NO29.11.2012
GR30.11.2012
IS29.12.2012
PT31.12.2012
Former [2013/23]AT29.08.2012
BE29.08.2012
CY29.08.2012
CZ29.08.2012
DK29.08.2012
EE29.08.2012
FI29.08.2012
HR29.08.2012
LT29.08.2012
LV29.08.2012
NL29.08.2012
PL29.08.2012
RO29.08.2012
SI29.08.2012
SK29.08.2012
NO29.11.2012
GR30.11.2012
IS29.12.2012
PT31.12.2012
Former [2013/22]AT29.08.2012
BE29.08.2012
CY29.08.2012
CZ29.08.2012
DK29.08.2012
EE29.08.2012
FI29.08.2012
HR29.08.2012
LT29.08.2012
LV29.08.2012
NL29.08.2012
SI29.08.2012
NO29.11.2012
GR30.11.2012
IS29.12.2012
PT31.12.2012
Former [2013/21]AT29.08.2012
BE29.08.2012
CY29.08.2012
DK29.08.2012
FI29.08.2012
HR29.08.2012
LT29.08.2012
LV29.08.2012
SI29.08.2012
NO29.11.2012
GR30.11.2012
IS29.12.2012
PT31.12.2012
Former [2013/13]AT29.08.2012
BE29.08.2012
CY29.08.2012
FI29.08.2012
HR29.08.2012
LT29.08.2012
LV29.08.2012
SI29.08.2012
NO29.11.2012
GR30.11.2012
IS29.12.2012
PT31.12.2012
Former [2013/12]AT29.08.2012
BE29.08.2012
CY29.08.2012
FI29.08.2012
HR29.08.2012
LT29.08.2012
LV29.08.2012
SI29.08.2012
NO29.11.2012
GR30.11.2012
IS29.12.2012
Former [2013/11]AT29.08.2012
CY29.08.2012
FI29.08.2012
HR29.08.2012
LT29.08.2012
LV29.08.2012
SI29.08.2012
NO29.11.2012
GR30.11.2012
IS29.12.2012
Former [2013/10]AT29.08.2012
CY29.08.2012
FI29.08.2012
HR29.08.2012
LT29.08.2012
NO29.11.2012
IS29.12.2012
Former [2013/09]AT29.08.2012
FI29.08.2012
LT29.08.2012
NO29.11.2012
Former [2013/08]AT29.08.2012
LT29.08.2012
NO29.11.2012
Former [2013/07]AT29.08.2012
Documents cited:Search[A]US2004118422  (LUNDIN JORGEN [SE], et al) [A] 1-17 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0011] *;
 [A]US5099864  (YOUNG HARVEY J [US], et al) [A] 1-17 * column 2, line 20 - column 3, line 30; example 1 *
by applicantUS1376586
 US3696917
 US4513756
 US4528993
 US4624269
 US4987907
 US5092352
 US5387416
 US2005244521
 WO2004095959
 WO2005063060
 WO2005004480
 WO2005016036
 WO2005041699
 US6953040
 US7032601
 US2005178398
 US2006191548
 US2004261807
 US4150677
 US4967771
 US5005593
 US5148819
 US5435325
 US5065775
 US5360022
 US5131414
 US5131415
 US5318050
 US3398754
 US3847164
 US4131117
 US4270552
 US4308877
 US4341228
 US4421126
 US4706692
 US4962774
 US4941484
 US4987906
 US5056537
 US5143097
 US5159942
 US5325877
 US5445169
 US5501237
 US5533530
 US3353541
 US3399454
 US3483874
 US3760815
 US4674519
 US4972854
 US5023354
 US5099864
 US5101839
 US5203354
 US5327917
 US5339838
 US5598866
 US5715844
 US5724998
 US6216706
 EP0565360
 EP1055375
 WO9801233
 US2007068540
 US3550598
 US4889144
 US5004595
 US5690990
 US5759599
 US6039901
 US6045835
 US6056992
 US6106875
 US6117455
 US6325859
 US6482433
 US6612429
 US6929814
 US2006174901
 US2007095357
 WO2007037962
 US3339558
 US3390686
 US3685521
 US3916914
 US6631722
 US7115085
 US2006272663
 US2006130861
 US2006144412
 US2007012327
 WO03009711
 WO2006136197
 WO2006136199
 WO2007010407
 WO2007060543
 US5223185
 US5387093
 US5882680
 US6719933
 US6949256
 US2004224020
 US2005123601
 US2005196437
 US2005249676
 US6887307
 US6923981
 US4660577
 US6730832
 US6895974
 US7025066
 US4882128
 US5121757
 US5370139
 US5343879
 US5413122
 US5962662
 US6048404
 US6298858
 US6325860
 US6428624
 US6591841
 US6695924
 US2004173228
 US2004250821
 US5234008
 US4534372
 US4596259
 US6083527
 US2006210488
 US2006228308
 US4148325
 US6510855
 US6834654
 US2006198873
 US4821749
 US787611
 US1086306
 US1437095
 US1757477
 US2122421
 US2148147
 US2170107
 US2274649
 US2770239
 US3612065
 US3851653
 US3889689
 US4143666
 US4194514
 US4366824
 US4388933
 US4641667
 WO9631255
 US2004118422
 US4607479
 US4631899
 US5346734
 US6162516
 US2005061339
 US5167244
 US7014039
 US2007095356
 US2007062549
 WO2007057789
 WO2007057791
    - SANTHOSH ET AL., PHYTOMEDICINE, (2005), vol. 12, pages 216 - 220
    - RADZUAN ET AL., PORIM BULLETIN, (1999), vol. 39, pages 33 - 38
    - IWAMOTO ET AL., AAPS PHARM. SCI. TECH., (2002), vol. 3, no. 3, page 25
    - THE EFSA JOURNAL, (2004), vol. 85, pages 1 - 32
    - NESTOR ET AL., BEITRAGE TABAKFORSCH. INT., (2003), vol. 20, pages 467 - 475
    - ROTON ET AL., BEITRAGE TABAKFORSCH. INT., (2005), vol. 21, pages 305 - 320
    - STAAF ET AL., BEITRAGE TABAKFORSCH. INT., (2005), vol. 21, pages 321 - 330
    - TAKAHASHI ET AL., ORAL MICROBIOLOGY AND IMMUNOLOGY, (2004), vol. 19, no. 1, pages 61 - 64
 US20060461633
 US20070696416
 US20050233399
 US20060351919
 US20060461628