Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2255760

EP2255760 - Method and device for performing online aberrometrie in refractive eye correction indices [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  28.03.2014
Database last updated on 15.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip28.03.2014Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 30.04.2014  [2014/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Carl Zeiss Meditec AG
Göschwitzer Strasse 51-52
07745 Jena / DE
[2010/48]
Inventor(s)01 / Dick, Manfred
Birkenweg 9
07926, Gefell / DE
02 / Schröder, Eckhard
Hans-Sachs-Strasse 9
90542, Eckental / DE
03 / Fiedler, Joachim
Schlehenweg 4
74564, Crailsheim / DE
 [2011/09]
Former [2010/48]01 / Dick, Manfred
Birkenweg 9
07926, Gefell / DE
02 / Schröder, Eckhard
Hans-Sachs-Strasse 9
90542, Eckental / DE
03 / Fiedler, Joachim
Mittlerer Weg 84
74564, Crailsheim / DE
Representative(s)Breit, Ulrich
Geyer, Fehners & Partner mbB
Patentanwälte
Perhamerstrasse 31
80687 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2010/48]Breit, Ulrich
Geyer, Fehners & Partner Patentanwälte Perhamerstrasse 31
80687 München / DE
Application number, filing date10152328.011.08.2000
[2010/48]
Priority number, dateDE199913820311.08.1999         Original published format: DE 19938203
[2010/48]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2255760
Date:01.12.2010
Language:DE
[2010/48]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2255760
Date:01.05.2013
Language:DE
[2013/18]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.04.2013
ClassificationInternational:A61F9/01, A61F9/008, A61B3/10, G01J9/00, B23K26/06, A61F9/013
[2013/18]
Former International [2010/48]A61F9/01
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2010/48]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur vollständigen Korrektur von Sehfehlern des menschlichen Auges[2010/48]
English:Method and device for performing online aberrometrie in refractive eye correction indices[2010/48]
French:Procédé et dispositif d'aberrométrie en ligne lors de la correction refractive des yeux[2010/48]
Examination procedure05.11.2013Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2014/18]
10.12.2013Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2014/18]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP00951495.1  / EP1119323
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20000951495) is  27.04.2006
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.02.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
01.02.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
01.02.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
01.02.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
01.02.2010Renewal fee patent year 07
01.02.2010Renewal fee patent year 08
01.02.2010Renewal fee patent year 09
01.02.2010Renewal fee patent year 10
25.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 11
24.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 12
23.08.2012Renewal fee patent year 13
23.08.2013Renewal fee patent year 14
Documents cited:Search[XY]WO9201417  (HORWITZ LARRY S [US]) [X] 1,2,4 * page 14, paragraph 1 - page 22, paragraph 6 * * page 30, line 1 - line 28 * [Y] 3,5,6;
 [I]WO9927334  (AUTONOMOUS TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [I] 1,2,4-6 * page 12, line 19 - line 34 * * page 32, line 5 - line 27 * * page 3, line 10 - line 34 *;
 [A]US5777719  (WILLIAMS DAVID R [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * column 4, line 12 - line 21 * * abstract *
 [Y]  - STERN D ET AL, "CORNEAL ABLATION BY NANOSECOND, PICOSECOND, AND FEMTOSECOND LASERS AT 532 AND 625 NM", ARCHIVES OF OPHTHALMOLOGY, AMERICAN MEDICAL ASSOCIATION, US, (19890401), vol. 107, no. 4, ISSN 0003-9950, pages 587 - 592, XP009028838 [Y] 3,5,6 * page 587 *
by applicantDE19705119
 DE19727573